Member Case
Lead case is: 1:23-bk-11131

Delaware Bankruptcy Court
Chapter 11
Judge:Thomas M Horan
Case #: 1:23-bk-11132
Case Filed:Aug 09, 2023
Plan Confirmed:Feb 07, 2024

TypeCorporation
# of Creditors1,000-5,000
Est. Assets$500,000,001 to $1 billion
Est. Liabilities $1,000,000,001 to $10 billion
Nature of Business Other
Nature of Debts Primarily Business

Debtor
AB Technologies LLC, Debtor
5885 Hollis Street
Emeryville, CA 94608
Represented By
James E O'Neill
Pachulski Stang Ziehl & Jones LLP
contact info
Last checked: never
U.S. Trustee
U.S. Trustee
Office of the United States Trustee J. Caleb Boggs Federal Building 844 King Street, Suite 2207 Lockbox 35
Wilmington, DE 19801


Docket last updated: 31 minutes ago
Thursday, April 10, 2025
75 75 misc Affidavit/Declaration of Service Thu 04/10 7:25 PM
Affidavit/Declaration of Service (Supplemental) re: Notice of Agenda of Matters Scheduled for Hearing on March 26, 2025 at 3:00 P.M. (Eastern Time) Before the Honorable Thomas M. Horan at the United States Bankruptcy Court, 824 North Market Street, 3rd Floor, Courtroom No. 7, Wilmington, Delaware 19801 (Docket No. 60) . Filed by Stretto. Related [+] (Betance, Sheryl)
Related: [-] 60
Wednesday, April 09, 2025
74 74 cmp RETIRED - Complaint Wed 04/09 5:28 PM
Adversary case 25-50527 Complaint by Alexandre Zyngier against John G. Melo. Fee Amount $350 (14 (Recovery of money/property - other)),(81 (Subordination of claim or interest)). AP Summons Served due date: 7/9/2025. (Griffin, Frank)
Related: [-]
Thursday, April 03, 2025
73 73 3 pgs order Order Thu 04/03 9:44 AM
Supplemental Order Sustaining Reorganized Debtors' Eighth Omnibus Objection (Substantive) to Certain Claims (Employee Claims) Signed on 4/3/2025. (AMH)
Related: [-]
Att: 1 Schedule 1
72 72 4 pgs order Order Thu 04/03 9:38 AM
Order Granting the Creditor Trustee's Second (Non-Substantive) Omnibus Objection to Claims (Amended and Superseded Claims) Related [+] Order Signed on 4/3/2025. (AMH)
Related: [-] 50 ,70
Att: 1 Schedule 1
71 71 4 pgs order Order Thu 04/03 9:35 AM
Order Granting the Creditor Trustee's First (Non-Substantive) Omnibus Objection to Claims (Duplicate Claims) Related [+] Order Signed on 4/3/2025. (AMH)
Related: [-] 45 ,69
Att: 1 Schedule 1