California Central District Court
Judge:Fred W Slaughter
Referred: Karen E Scott
Case #: 8:23-cv-01467
Nature of Suit110 Contract - Insurance
Cause28:1441 Notice of Removal - Insurance Contract
Case Filed:Aug 09, 2023
Terminated:Feb 07, 2025
Last checked: Monday Feb 05, 2024 12:25 AM PST
Defendant
AETNA Life Insuance Company
Represented By
Andrea K. Williams
Gordon And Rees Scully Mansukhani LLP
contact info
Matthew Gregory Kleiner
Gordon Rees Scully Mansukhani LLP
contact info
Defendant
Does
Plaintiff
Treadstone Services PC
Represented By
Michael C Lubin
Lubin Pham And Caplin LLP
contact info
Namson Nguyen Pham
Lubin Pham And Caplin LLP
contact info
Oliver De Castro Tomas
Lubin Pham And Caplin LLP
contact info


Docket last updated: 05/21/2025 11:59 PM PDT
Friday, March 07, 2025
57 57 appeal USCA Notification of Case Number Mon 03/10 8:11 AM
NOTIFICATION from Ninth Circuit Court of Appeals of case number assigned and briefing schedule. Appeal Docket No. 25-1458 assigned to Notice of Appeal to 9th Circuit Court of Appeals56 as to plaintiff Treadstone Services PC. (mat)
Related: [-]
Wednesday, March 05, 2025
56 56 appeal Appeal to 9th Circuit Court of Appeals Wed 03/05 5:23 PM
NOTICE OF APPEAL to the 9th Circuit Court of Appeals filed by Plaintiff Treadstone Services PC. Appeal of Order on Motion to Dismiss Case54 . (Appeal Fee - $605 Fee Paid, Receipt No. CCACDC-39238685.) (Sharifi, Pantea)
Related: [-]