Georgia Southern District Court
Case #: 4:23-cr-00060
Case Filed:Jul 11, 2023
Terminated:Dec 16, 2024
Last checked: Thursday Aug 10, 2023 3:46 AM EDT
Defendant
Jawad Badger (5)
Represented By
William A. Morrison
The Morrison Firm LLC
contact info
Defendant
Lawrence Ferrell (1)
Represented By
James C. Garner
James C. Garner, LLC
contact info
Defendant
Kimani Harrison (3)
Defendant
Roman Hill (4)
Represented By
Robert Marion Mock, Jr.
contact info
Defendant
Maurice Lawrence (2)
Represented By
William Dow Bonds
The Bonds Law Firm
contact info
Defendant
Ansanta Newton (6)
Represented By
Amy Lee Copeland
Rouse & Copeland LLC
contact info
Plaintiff
USA
Represented By
Bradley Robert Thompson
Doj-Usao
contact info
Frank Morgan Pennington, II
U.S. Attorney'S Office - Savannah
contact info
Jill Ellen Steinberg
United States Attorney'S Office
contact info
Patricia Green Rhodes
U.S. Attorney'S Office - Augusta
contact info


Docket last updated: 05/11/2025 11:39 PM EDT
Tuesday, July 11, 2023
1 1 1 pgs MOTION to Seal Case by Bradley Robert Thompson as to Lawrence Ferrell, Maurice Lawrence, Kimani Harrison, Roman Hill, Jawad Badger, Ansanta Newton. REFERRED to Judge Brian K. Epps.(cmr)
Related: [-]
2 2 1 pgs ORDER granting1 Motion to Seal Case as to Lawrence Ferrell (1), Maurice Lawrence (2), Kimani Harrison (3), Roman Hill (4), Jawad Badger (5), Ansanta Newton (6). Signed by Magistrate Judge Brian K. Epps on 7/11/23. (cmr)
Related: [-]
3 3 5 pgs SEALED INDICTMENT as to Lawrence Ferrell (1) count 1, Maurice Lawrence (2) count 1, Kimani Harrison (3) count 1, Roman Hill (4) count 1, Jawad Badger (5) count 1, Ansanta Newton (6) count 1. (cmr) (cmr).
Related: [-]
Att: 1 (7/12/2023) sig page
4 4 PENALTY CERTIFICATION by Government as to Lawrence Ferrell, Maurice Lawrence, Kimani Harrison, Roman Hill, Jawad Badger, Ansanta Newton. (cmr)
Related: [-]