Farrell et al v. United States Department of Defense et al
California Northern District Court | |
Judge: | Joseph C Spero |
Case #: | 4:23-cv-04013 |
Nature of Suit | 440 Civil Rights - Other Civil Rights |
Cause | 28:1331 Federal Question: Other Civil Rights |
Case Filed: | Aug 08, 2023 |
Last checked: Sunday Feb 04, 2024 1:22 AM PST |
Defendant
Lloyd J Austin III
|
Represented By
|
Defendant
Carlos Del Toro
|
Represented By
|
Defendant
Frank Kendall
|
Represented By
|
Defendant
United States Department of Defense
|
Represented By
|
Defendant
Christine Wormuth
|
Represented By
|
Plaintiff
Sherrill Farrell
|
Represented By
|
Plaintiff
James Gonzales
|
Represented By
|
Plaintiff
Julianne Sohn
|
Represented By
|
Plaintiff
Stephan Steffanides
|
Represented By
|
Plaintiff
Hayden Powell
|
Represented By
|
TERMINATED PARTIES | |
Plaintiff
Steven Egland
Terminated: 10/26/2023
|
Represented By
|
Docket last updated: 05/16/2025 11:59 PM PDT |
Monday, January 13, 2025 | ||
87 | 87 CLERK'S NOTICE VACATING Further Case Mgmt Conference set for 01/22/2025 at 2:00 PM. (This is a text-only entry generated by the court. There is no document associated with this entry.) (klh, COURT STAFF) | |
Wednesday, January 08, 2025 | ||
86 | 86
![]() |
|
85 | 85
![]() |
|
Set/Reset Hearing re85 Order on Motion for Miscellaneous Relief,, Fairness Hearing set for 3/12/2025 09:30 AM, Courtroom B, 15th Floor, San Francisco, CA. (klh, COURT STAFF) | ||
Monday, January 06, 2025 | ||
84 | 84
![]() |
|
83 | 83
![]() |
|
82 | 82
![]() |
|
Att: 1
![]() |
||
Att: 2
![]() |
||
Att: 3
![]() |
||
Att: 4
![]() |
||
Att: 5
![]() |
||
Att: 6
![]() |
||
Att: 7
![]() |
||
Att: 8
![]() |
||
Att: 9
![]() |
||
[LINK:Electronic filing error] . Incorrect event used. [err101]Corrected by Clerk's Office. No further action is necessary. Re:83 STIPULATION WITH PROPOSED ORDER to Dismiss Hayden Powell filed by Sherrill Farrell, James Gonzales, Hayden Powell, Julianne Sohn, Stephan Steffanides (dhm, COURT STAFF) |