Roberts v. Capital One Financial Corp.
Florida Middle District Court | |
Judge: | Timothy J Corrigan |
Referred: | Joel B Toomey |
Case #: | 3:23-cv-00940 |
Nature of Suit | 890 Other Statutes - Other Statutory Actions |
Cause | 28:1441 Notice of Removal - Fair Credit Reporti |
Case Filed: | Aug 10, 2023 |
Terminated: | Nov 17, 2023 |
Last checked: Tuesday Feb 06, 2024 3:25 AM EST |
Defendant
Capital One Financial Corp.,
|
Represented By
|
Docket last updated: 05/23/2025 11:59 PM EDT |
Thursday, November 16, 2023 | ||
23 | 23
![]() ORDER dismissing this case with prejudice pursuant to 22 the Joint Stipulation of Dismissal. The Clerk should terminate all pending motions and deadlines and close the file. Signed by Judge Timothy J. Corrigan on 11/16/2023. (VNG) |
|
Tuesday, November 07, 2023 | ||
22 | 22
![]() STIPULATION of Dismissal With Prejudice by Michael J. Roberts. (Roberts, Michael) |
|
Thursday, November 02, 2023 | ||
21 | 21
order
Order on Motion for Extension of Time to File
Thu 11/02 11:48 AM
ENDORSED ORDER granting 20 Defendant's Unopposed Motion for Extension of Time to Respond to Plaintiff's First Request for Production and First Request for Admissions. Defendant shall have up to and including November 15, 2023 to respond to Plaintiff's First Request for Production of Documents and up to and including November 17, 2023 to respond to Plaintiff's First Request for Admissions. The Court notes, however, that the Motion was unnecessary. See Fed. R. Civ. P. 29(b). Signed by Magistrate Judge Joel B. Toomey on 11/2/2023. (KLA) |
|
Wednesday, November 01, 2023 | ||
20 | 20
![]() Unopposed MOTION for Extension of Time to File to Respond to Plaintiff's First Request for Production and First Request for Admissions by Capital One Financial Corp.,. (Kemp-Gerstel, Andrew) |
|
Friday, October 13, 2023 | ||
19 | 19
![]() CORPORATE Disclosure Statement by Capital One Financial Corp.,. (Kemp-Gerstel, Andrew) |
|
Thursday, October 12, 2023 | ||
18 | 18
![]() CASE MANAGEMENT AND SCHEDULING ORDER: Amended Pleadings due by 10/20/2023; Plaintiff disclosure of expert report due by 3/22/2024; Defendant disclosure of expert report due by 4/10/2024; Discovery due by 5/13/2024; Dispositive and Daubert motions due by 6/7/2024; Pretrial statement due by 10/17/2024; All other motions due by 10/17/2024; Final Pretrial Conference set for 10/23/2024 at 10:00 AM in Jacksonville Courtroom 10 D before Judge Timothy J. Corrigan; Jury Trial set for trial term commencing 11/4/2024 at 09:00 AM in Jacksonville Courtroom 10 D before Judge Timothy J. Corrigan. Signed by Judge Timothy J. Corrigan on 10/12/2023. (AMM) |
|
Tuesday, September 26, 2023 | ||
17 | 17
![]() CASE MANAGEMENT REPORT. (Starks, Michael) |
|
Friday, September 08, 2023 | ||
16 | 16
![]() Defendant, Capital One, N.A.'s Amended ANSWER and affirmative defenses to Complaint by Capital One Financial Corp.,.(Kemp-Gerstel, Andrew) |
|
Friday, September 01, 2023 | ||
15 | 15
![]() ORDER granting 13 Plaintiff's Unopposed Motion Requesting Non-Attorney E-Filing Access. See Order for details. Signed by Magistrate Judge Joel B. Toomey on 9/1/2023. (KLA) |
|
14 | 14
![]() Defendant, Capital One, N.A.'s ANSWER and affirmative defenses to 7 Complaint by Capital One Financial Corp.,.(Kemp-Gerstel, Andrew) |
|
Wednesday, August 23, 2023 | ||
13 | 13
![]() Unopposed MOTION Requesting Non-Attorney E-Filing Access by Michael J. Roberts. (BGR) |
|
Monday, August 14, 2023 | ||
12 | 12
order
Order on Motion for Extension of Time to File Response / Reply
Mon 08/14 10:24 AM
ENDORSED ORDER granting 9 Unopposed Motion for Extension of Time in Which to Respond to Complaint by Defendant Capital One. Defendant shall have up to and including August 31, 2023 to respond to the Complaint 7 . Signed by Magistrate Judge Joel B. Toomey on 8/14/2023. (TSP) |
|
Friday, August 11, 2023 | ||
11 | 11
notice
Notice to Counsel of Local Rule
Fri 08/11 5:01 PM
NOTICE of Local Rule 3.02(a)(2), which requires the parties in every civil proceeding, except those described in subsection (d), to file a case management report (CMR) using the uniform form at www.flmd.uscourts.gov. The CMR must be filed (1) within forty days after any defendant appears in an action originating in this court, (2) within forty days after the docketing of an action removed or transferred to this court, or (3) within seventy days after service on the United States attorney in an action against the United States, its agencies or employees. Judges may have a special CMR form for certain types of cases. These forms can be found at www.flmd.uscourts.gov under the Forms tab for each judge. (Signed by Deputy Clerk). (AMM) |
|
10 | 10
![]() ORDER advising Pro Se Plaintiff of some rules with which he must comply. Signed by Magistrate Judge Joel B. Toomey on 8/11/2023. (JAG) |
|
9 | 9
![]() Unopposed MOTION for Extension of Time to File Response/Reply as to1 Notice of Removal by Capital One Financial Corp.,. (Starks, Michael) |
|
8 | 8
![]() NOTICE of Lead Counsel Designation by Michael D. Starks on behalf of Capital One Financial Corp.,. Lead Counsel: Michael D. Starks. (Starks, Michael) |
|
7 | 7
![]() COMPLAINT against Capital One Financial Corp. filed by Michael J. Roberts. Filed in state court on 7/11/2023(AJS) |
|
6 | 6
notice
Notice to Counsel of Local Rule
Fri 08/11 2:20 PM
NOTICE TO COUNSEL Michael D. Starks, Stefani R. Erazo and Andrew Kemp-Gerstel of Local Rule 2.02(a), which states, "The first paper filed on behalf of a party must designate only one lead counsel who - unless the party changes the designation - remains lead counsel throughout the action." Counsel must file a Notice of Lead Counsel Designation identifying lead counsel. (Signed by Deputy Clerk). (AJS) |
|
5 | 5
notice
Notice to Counsel of Local Rule
Fri 08/11 2:19 PM
NOTICE TO COUNSEL Stefani R. Erazo of Local Rule 2.01(a), which requires membership or special admission in the Middle District bar to practice in the Middle District, except for the limited exceptions identified in the Rule. To apply for membership in the Middle District, visit www.flmd.uscourts.gov/for-lawyers. (Signed by Deputy Clerk). (AJS) |
|
Thursday, August 10, 2023 | ||
4 | 4
![]() NOTICE of Appearance by Michael D. Starks on behalf of Capital One Financial Corp., (Starks, Michael) |
|
3 | 3
utility
Case Assigned/Reassigned
Thu 08/10 12:32 PM
NEW CASE ASSIGNED to Judge Timothy J. Corrigan and Magistrate Judge Joel B. Toomey. New case number: 3:23-cv-940-TJC-JBT. (AM) |
|
2 | 2
![]() NOTICE by Capital One Financial Corp., Civil Cover Sheet (Kemp-Gerstel, Andrew) |
|
1 | 1
![]() COMPLAINT and NOTICE OF REMOVAL from Duval County Circuit Court, case number 16-2023-CA-009471-XXXX-MA filed in State Court on 07/11/2023. Filing fee $402, receipt number AFLMDC-21134188 filed by Capital One Financial Corp.,.(Kemp-Gerstel, Andrew) |
|
Att: 1
![]() |