Ohio Northern District Court
Judge:Charles Esque Fleming
Case #: 1:23-cv-01561
Nature of Suit470 Other Statutes - Racketeer Influenced and Corrupt Organizations
Cause18:1961 Racketeering (RICO) Act
Case Filed:Aug 10, 2023
Last checked: Tuesday Feb 06, 2024 3:48 AM EST
Defendant
Jeffrey Armbruster
an individual 33030 Woodhaven Circle
North Ridgeville, OH 44039
Represented By
Ryan M. Gembala
Dooley Gembala Mclaughlin Pecora
contact info
Michael R. Briach
Dooley Gembala Mclaughlin Pecora
contact info
Stephen M. Bosak
Dooley Gembala Mclaughlin Pecora
contact info
Matthew A. Dooley
Dooley Gembala Mclaughlin Pecora
contact info
Patrick M. Ward
O'Toole Mclaughlin Dooley & Pecora
contact info
Defendant
Lorain County Board of Commissioners
226 Middle Avenue Fourth Floor
Elyria, OH 44035
Represented By
Ryan M. Gembala
Dooley Gembala Mclaughlin Pecora
contact info
Michael R. Briach
Dooley Gembala Mclaughlin Pecora
contact info
Stephen M. Bosak
Dooley Gembala Mclaughlin Pecora
contact info
Matthew A. Dooley
Dooley Gembala Mclaughlin Pecora
contact info
Patrick M. Ward
O'Toole Mclaughlin Dooley & Pecora
contact info
Defendant
Jeffrey Riddell
an individual 9611 Dean Rd
Vermillion, OH 44089
Represented By
Ryan M. Gembala
Dooley Gembala Mclaughlin Pecora
contact info
Michael R. Briach
Dooley Gembala Mclaughlin Pecora
contact info
Stephen M. Bosak
Dooley Gembala Mclaughlin Pecora
contact info
Matthew A. Dooley
Dooley Gembala Mclaughlin Pecora
contact info
Patrick M. Ward
O'Toole Mclaughlin Dooley & Pecora
contact info
Defendant
David J. Moore
Represented By
Ryan M. Gembala
Dooley Gembala Mclaughlin Pecora
contact info
Michael R. Briach
Dooley Gembala Mclaughlin Pecora
contact info
Stephen M. Bosak
Dooley Gembala Mclaughlin Pecora
contact info
Matthew A. Dooley
Dooley Gembala Mclaughlin Pecora
contact info
Patrick M. Ward
O'Toole Mclaughlin Dooley & Pecora
contact info
Plaintiff
Cleveland Communications, Inc.
5220 Hauserman Road
Parma, OH 44130
Represented By
Dean E. DePiero
Mcdonald Hopkins - Cleveland
contact info
Edmund W. Searby
Porter Wright Morris & Arthur
contact info
Allen T. Carter
Porter, Wright, Morris & Arthur
contact info
McDaniel M. Kelly
Porter Wright Morris & Arthur
contact info

GPO Aug 20 2024
R)Memorandum Opinion and Order: The 13 Motion to Amend is granted and the 12 Motion to Dismiss is denied as moot. See Order for additional information and requirements. Judge Charles Esque Fleming on 8/20/2024. (S,S

Docket last updated: 5 hours ago
Friday, May 09, 2025
28 28 notice Attorney Substitution (atty event) Fri 05/09 9:56 AM
Notice of Substitution of Counsel removing attorney Matthew A. Dooley and adding attorney Scott J. Orille filed by on behalf of Jeffrey Armbruster, Lorain County Board of Commissioners, David J. Moore, Jeffrey Riddell. (Orille, Scott)
Related: [-]
Thursday, October 24, 2024
27 27 resp Reply Thu 10/24 3:22 PM
Reply in support of25 Motion to dismiss Second Amended Complaint filed by Jeffrey Armbruster, Lorain County Board of Commissioners, David J. Moore, Jeffrey Riddell.(Bosak, Stephen)
Related: [-]
Att: 1 Exhibit A - Oct. 10, 2023 Memo
Thursday, October 10, 2024
26 26 resp Opposition Thu 10/10 2:59 PM
Opposition to25 Motion to dismiss Second Amended Complaint filed by Cleveland Communications, Inc.. (Kelly, McDaniel)
Related: [-]
Tuesday, September 10, 2024
25 25 motion Dismiss Tue 09/10 7:23 PM
Motion to dismiss CCI's Second Amended Complaint filed by Jeffrey Armbruster, Lorain County Board of Commissioners, David J. Moore, Jeffrey Riddell. Related document(s)24 . (Bosak, Stephen)
Related: [-]
Tuesday, August 20, 2024
24 24 cmp Amended Complaint Tue 08/20 10:54 AM
Second Amended Complaint against All Defendants. Filed by Cleveland Communications, Inc. (S,SR)
Related: [-]
Att: 1 Exhibit A - executed agreement,
Att: 2 Exhibit B - Rochester user agreement,
Att: 3 Exhibit C - Oberlin user agreement,
Att: 4 Exhibit D - meeting agenda,
Att: 5 Exhibit E - responses to requests for admissions
23 23 minutes ~Util - Terminate Motions Memorandum Opinion and Order Tue 08/20 10:48 AM
Memorandum Opinion and Order: The13 Motion to Amend is granted and the12 Motion to Dismiss is denied as moot. See Order for additional information and requirements. Judge Charles Esque Fleming on 8/20/2024. (S,SR)
Related: [-]
Friday, June 07, 2024
22 22 oth_ans Response/Reply/Sur-Reply Fri 06/07 8:35 PM
Reply in Support of Supplement to Motion for Leave to File Second Amended Complaint filed by Cleveland Communications, Inc.. Related document(s)19 ,21 . (Kelly, McDaniel)
Related: [-]
Friday, May 31, 2024
21 21 oth_ans Response/Reply/Sur-Reply Fri 05/31 4:22 PM
Defendants' Response to Plaintiff's Supplemental Motion for Leave to File a Second Amended Complaint filed by All Defendants. Related document(s)19 . (Dooley, Matthew)
Related: [-]
Thursday, May 16, 2024
order Order on Motion to extend deadlines Thu 05/16 9:00 AM
Order [non-document] granting Defendants' Unopposed20 Motion for extension of time to file response to19 Supplement to Motion for Leave to File Second Amended Complaint until May 31, 2024. Judge Charles Esque Fleming on 5/16/2024. (S,SR)
Related: [-]
Wednesday, May 15, 2024
20 20 motion Extension (of deadlines) Wed 05/15 5:15 PM
Motion for extension of Defendants' Response to Plaintiff's Supplement to Motion for Leave to File Second Amended Complaint until May 31, 2024 filed by Jeffrey Armbruster, Lorain County Board of Commissioners, David J. Moore, Jeffrey Riddell. Related document(s)19 . (Bosak, Stephen)
Related: [-]
Friday, May 10, 2024
19 19 oth_doc Supplement (atty event) Fri 05/10 9:26 PM
Supplement to Motion for leave to File Second Amended Complaint - Supplement to Motion for Leave to File Second Amended Complaint and Incorporated Memorandum of Law, filed by Cleveland Communications, Inc.. Related document(s)13 .(Carter, Allen)
Related: [-]
Att: 1 Complaint Updated Second Amended Complaint,
Att: 2 Exhibit A to Proposed Second Amended Complaint (Executed Agreement),
Att: 3 Exhibit B to Proposed Second Amended Complaint (Rochester User Agreement),
Att: 4 Exhibit C to Proposed Second Amended Complaint (Oberlin User Agreement),
Att: 5 Exhibit D to Proposed Second Amended Complaint (Meeting Agenda),
Att: 6 Exhibit E to Proposed Second Amended Complaint (County Responses to Requests for Admission)
Tuesday, January 16, 2024
18 18 resp Reply Tue 01/16 2:16 PM
Reply in support of13 Motion for leave to File Second Amended Complaint filed by Cleveland Communications, Inc.. (Searby, Edmund)
Related: [-]
Tuesday, January 09, 2024
17 17 oth_ans Brief Tue 01/09 5:32 PM
Brief /Defendants' [Corrected] Opposition to Plaintiff's Motion for Leave to File a Second Amended Complaint filed by All Defendants. Related document(s)16 . (Dooley, Matthew)
Related: [-]
16 16 notice Notice (atty event) Tue 01/09 5:01 PM
Notice of Defendants' Corrected Filing of Defendants' Opposition to Plaintiff's Motion for Leave to File a Second Amended Complaint filed by All Defendants. Related document(s)15 .(Dooley, Matthew)
Related: [-]
Monday, January 08, 2024
15 15 resp Opposition Mon 01/08 5:44 PM
Opposition to13 Motion for leave to File Second Amended Complaint filed by All Defendants. (Dooley, Matthew)
Related: [-]
Thursday, December 28, 2023
14 14 motion Extension (of deadlines) Thu 12/28 2:40 PM
Joint Stipulation for extension of Defendants' Deadline to Respond to Plaintiff's Motion for Leave to Amend until January 8, 2024 filed by Jeffrey Armbruster, Lorain County Board of Commissioners, David J. Moore, Jeffrey Riddell. (Bosak, Stephen) Related document13 . Modified text on 12/28/2023 (M,CE)
Related: [-]
order Order on Motion to extend deadlines Thu 12/28 2:49 PM
Order [non-document] granting the14 Joint Stipulation to extend Defendants' deadline to respond to motion for leave to amend until January 8, 2024. Judge Charles Esque Fleming on 12/28/2023.(S,SR)
Related: [-]
Friday, December 15, 2023
13 13 motion Leave Fri 12/15 5:10 PM
Motion for leave to File Second Amended Complaint filed by Plaintiff Cleveland Communications, Inc..(Carter, Allen)
Related: [-]
Att: 1 Complaint (Proposed Second Amended Complaint),
Att: 2 Exhibit A to Proposed Second Amended Complaint (Executed Agreement),
Att: 3 Exhibit B to Proposed Second Amended Complaint (Rochester User Agreement),
Att: 4 Exhibit C to Proposed Second Amended Complaint (Oberlin User Agreement),
Att: 5 Exhibit D to Proposed Second Amended Complaint (Meeting Agenda),
Att: 6 Exhibit E to Proposed Second Amended Complaint (County Responses to Requests for Admission)
Thursday, November 30, 2023
12 12 motion Dismiss Thu 11/30 9:19 PM
Motion to dismiss filed by Jeffrey Armbruster, Lorain County Board of Commissioners, David J. Moore, Jeffrey Riddell. Related document(s)10 . (Bosak, Stephen)
Related: [-]
Friday, November 17, 2023
11 11 notice Notice (atty event) Fri 11/17 12:23 PM
Notice of Filing of Amended Complaint and Opposition to Defendants' Motion to Dismiss filed by Cleveland Communications, Inc.. Related document(s)10 .(Searby, Edmund)
Related: [-]
Thursday, November 16, 2023
10 10 cmp Amended Complaint Thu 11/16 3:55 PM
First Amended complaint against All Defendants. Filed by Cleveland Communications, Inc.. (Searby, Edmund)
Related: [-]
Att: 1 Exhibit A - Contract,
Att: 2 Exhibit B - Rochester User Agreement,
Att: 3 Exhibit C - Oberlin User Agreement,
Att: 4 Exhibit D - Meeting Agenda,
Att: 5 Exhibit E - County's Answers to CCI's Request for Admissions
Friday, October 27, 2023
9 9 motion Dismiss Fri 10/27 7:56 PM
Motion to dismiss filed by Jeffrey Armbruster, Lorain County Board of Commissioners, David J. Moore, Jeffrey Riddell. Related document(s)1 .(Bosak, Stephen)
Related: [-]
Att: 1 Exhibit A - Lorain County Common Pleas Docket,
Att: 2 Exhibit B - LCBC 2 21-2023 Minutes Res 23-166
Thursday, October 12, 2023
order Order on Motion for extension of time to answer Thu 10/12 2:16 PM
Order: [non-document] On 9/6/2023, Defendants Lorain County Board of Commissioners, Jeffrey Armbruster, David J. Moore, and Jeffrey Ridell's (collectively "Defendants") filed a Motion for Extension (ECF No.4 ) requesting until October 27, 2023 to answer or otherwise respond to Plaintiff Cleveland Communications, Inc.'s ("Plaintiff's") Complaint (ECF No.1 ). Plaintiff filed its Response (ECF No.5 ) to the motion on 9/8/2023, stating that it did not oppose the extension, provided Defendants waive service. Defendants filed their Reply in Support (ECF No.6 ) of the motion on 9/18/2023, agreeing to waive service. Accordingly, the Court GRANTS Defendants' motion and Defendants shall answer or otherwise respond to the Complaint by October 27, 2023. ITS IS SO ORDERED . Judge Charles Esque Fleming on 10/12/2023.(S,SR)
Related: [-]
Tuesday, September 19, 2023
8 8 service Waiver of Service Executed Tue 09/19 9:10 AM
Waiver of Service Returned Executed by David J. Moore. David J. Moore waiver sent on 8/28/2023, answer due 10/27/2023 filed on behalf of David J. Moore (Bosak, Stephen)
Related: [-]
7 7 service Waiver of Service Executed Tue 09/19 9:08 AM
Waiver of Service Returned Executed by Jeffrey Armbruster. Jeffrey Armbruster waiver sent on 8/28/2023, answer due 10/27/2023 filed on behalf of Jeffrey Armbruster (Bosak, Stephen)
Related: [-]
Monday, September 18, 2023
6 6 resp Reply Mon 09/18 7:17 PM
Reply in support of4 Motion for extension of time until October 27, 2023 to answer filed by All Defendants.(Bosak, Stephen)
Related: [-]
Att: 1 Exhibit A - Waivers of Service of Summons
Monday, September 11, 2023
order Order Mon 09/11 9:13 AM
Order: [non-document] Defendants shall file a response to Plaintiff's5 Response to4 Motion for extension of time by 9/18/2023. IT IS SO ORDERED. Judge Charles Esque Fleming on 9/11/2023. (S,SR)
Related: [-]
Friday, September 08, 2023
5 5 resp Response Fri 09/08 11:57 AM
Response to4 Motion for extension of time until October 27, 2023 to answer filed by Cleveland Communications, Inc.. (Carter, Allen)
Related: [-]
Thursday, September 07, 2023
order Order Thu 09/07 8:38 AM
Order: [non-document] Pending before the Court is Defendants'4 Motion for extension of time to answer. Plaintiff shall file a response by 9/13/2023, indicating whether there is any opposition and, if so, the basis for same. IT IS SO ORDERED. Judge Charles Esque Fleming on 9/7/2023. (S,SR)
Related: [-]
Wednesday, September 06, 2023
4 4 motion Extension (answer complaint) Wed 09/06 4:49 PM
Motion for extension of time until October 27, 2023 to answer filed by Jeffrey Armbruster, Lorain County Board of Commissioners, David J. Moore, Jeffrey Riddell. Related document(s)1 .(Bosak, Stephen)
Related: [-]
Att: 1 Exhibit A - Correspondence between Counsel regarding Waivers,
Att: 2 Exhibit B - Draft Armbruster and Moore Waivers,
Att: 3 Exhibit C - CCI's State Court Complaint
Monday, August 14, 2023
oth_evt Service by Clerk Mon 08/14 10:40 AM
Service by Clerk. Summons and Complaint addressed to Jeffrey Armbruster Receipt # 7020 3160 0000 1991 3587, Lorain County Board of Commissioners Receipt # 7020 3160 0000 1991 3563, David J. Moore Receipt # 7020 3160 0000 1991 3570, Jeffrey Riddell Receipt # 7020 3160 0000 1991 3594 placed in U.S. Mail. Type of service: certified mail. (Espinoza, Paola)
Related: [-]
Friday, August 11, 2023
3 3 notice Corporate Disclosure Statement (atty event) Fri 08/11 10:52 AM
Corporate Disclosure Statement filed by Cleveland Communications, Inc.. (Carter, Allen)
Related: [-]
Thursday, August 10, 2023
2 2 oth_evt Summons Issued Thu 08/10 12:07 PM
Original Summons and Magistrate Consent Form issued to counsel for service upon Jeffrey Armbruster, Lorain County Board of Commissioners, David J. Moore, Jeffrey Riddell. (R,AP)
Related: [-]
Att: 1 Magistrate Consent Form
1 1 cmp Complaint Thu 08/10 11:10 AM
Complaint for Equitable Relief and Money Damages with jury demand against All Defendants. Filing fee paid, $402.00. Receipt number AOHNDC-12125724. Plaintiff has indicated that case may be related to pending civil action 1:23-cv-01507-JG . Filed by Cleveland Communications, Inc. (Carter, Allen)
Related: [-]
Att: 1 Exhibit A - Contract between CCI and Lorain,
Att: 2 Exhibit B - User Agreement 1,
Att: 3 Exhibit C - User Agreement 2,
Att: 4 Exhibit D - Meeting Agenda,
Att: 5 Civil Cover Sheet,
Att: 6 Summons to Lorain County Board of Commissioners,
Att: 7 Summons to David J. Moore,
Att: 8 Summons to Jeffrey Armbruster,
Att: 9 Summons to Riddell
utility Add and Terminate Judge Thu 08/10 11:47 AM
Judge Charles Esque Fleming assigned to case. (R,AP)
Related: [-]
oth_evt Random Assignment of Magistrate Judge Thu 08/10 11:48 AM
Random Assignment of Magistrate Judge pursuant to Local Rule 3.1. In the event of a referral, case will be assigned to Magistrate Judge Jonathan D. Greenberg. (R,AP)
Related: [-]
oth_evt Notice of Failure to File Corporate Disclosure Statement Fri 08/11 10:42 AM
Notice by Clerk that Cleveland Communications, Inc. failed to file a corporate disclosure statement as required by Local Rule 3.13(b). (R,AP)
Related: [-]