Delaware District Court
Judge:Gregory B Williams
Referred: Christopher J Burke
Case #: 1:23-cv-00879
Nature of Suit835 Property Rights - Patent – Abbreviated New Drug Application
Cause35:271 Patent Infringement
Case Filed:Aug 10, 2023
Last checked: Friday Mar 15, 2024 11:42 PM EDT
Defendant
Aurobindo Pharma Limited
Represented By
Kenneth S. Caufield
contact info
Julia S. Kim
contact info
Kenneth Laurence Dorsney
Morris James LLP
contact info
Edward D. Pergament
contact info
Cortlan S. Hitch
Morris James LLP
contact info
Defendant
Cipla Limited
Represented By
Daniel Taylor
Smith, Katzenstein & Jenkins LLP
contact info
Louis H. Weinstein
contact info
Joshua I. Miller
contact info
Amlan Ray
contact info
Frank D. Rodriguez
contact info
Defendant
Dexcel Pharma Technologies Limited
Represented By
Gaby L. Longsworth, Ph.D.
contact info
Alexander V. Alfano
contact info
Anne Shea Gaza
Young, Conaway, Stargatt & Taylor LLP
contact info
Dennies Varughese, Pharm.D
contact info
Samantha G. Wilson
Young, Conaway, Stargatt & Taylor LLP
contact info
Defendant
Zenara Pharma Private Limited
Represented By
Dmitry V. Shelhoff
contact info
Julia S. Kim
contact info
Kenneth S. Canfield
contact info
Kenneth Laurence Dorsney
Morris James LLP
contact info
Edward D. Pergament
contact info
Plaintiff
FoldRx Pharmaceuticals, LLC
Represented By
Megan Elizabeth Dellinger
Morris, Nichols, Arsht & Tunnell LLP
contact info
Jack B. Blumenfeld
Morris, Nichols, Arsht & Tunnell LLP
contact info
Plaintiff
PF PRISM IMB B.V.
Represented By
Megan Elizabeth Dellinger
Morris, Nichols, Arsht & Tunnell LLP
contact info
Jack B. Blumenfeld
Morris, Nichols, Arsht & Tunnell LLP
contact info
Plaintiff
Pfizer Inc.
Represented By
Megan Elizabeth Dellinger
Morris, Nichols, Arsht & Tunnell LLP
contact info
Jack B. Blumenfeld
Morris, Nichols, Arsht & Tunnell LLP
contact info
Plaintiff
The Scripps Research Institute
Represented By
Megan Elizabeth Dellinger
Morris, Nichols, Arsht & Tunnell LLP
contact info
Jack B. Blumenfeld
Morris, Nichols, Arsht & Tunnell LLP
contact info
Plaintiff
Wyeth LLC
Represented By
Megan Elizabeth Dellinger
Morris, Nichols, Arsht & Tunnell LLP
contact info
Jack B. Blumenfeld
Morris, Nichols, Arsht & Tunnell LLP
contact info


Docket last updated: 3 hours ago
Wednesday, May 07, 2025
198 198 misc Redacted Document Wed 05/07 3:00 PM
REDACTED VERSION of189 Stipulation by FoldRx Pharmaceuticals, LLC, PF PRISM IMB B.V., Pfizer Inc., The Scripps Research Institute, Wyeth LLC. (Dellinger, Megan)
Related: [-]
197 197 misc Redacted Document Wed 05/07 2:56 PM
REDACTED VERSION of188 Stipulation by FoldRx Pharmaceuticals, LLC, PF PRISM IMB B.V., Pfizer Inc., The Scripps Research Institute, Wyeth LLC. (Dellinger, Megan)
Related: [-]
Tuesday, May 06, 2025
order SO ORDERED Tue 05/06 8:33 AM
SO ORDERED, re195 Joint MOTION to Resolve Discovery Dispute re 185 Oral Order,,,,,, filed by Dexcel Pharma Technologies Limited Signed by Judge Gregory B. Williams on 5/6/2025. (lnb)
Related: [-]
Monday, May 05, 2025
196 196 misc Letter Mon 05/05 4:10 PM
Letter to The Honorable Christopher J. Burke from Anne Shea Gaza regarding Opening Letter Brief in Support of Defendant Dexcel Pharma Technologies's Motion to Compel Plaintiffs to Produce Requested Contention Documents - re195 Joint MOTION to Resolve Discovery Dispute re 185 Oral Order,,,,,, , 185 Oral Order,,,,,,.(Gaza, Anne)
Related: [-]
Att: 1 Exhibit A,
Att: 2 Exhibit B,
Att: 3 Exhibit C,
Att: 4 Exhibit D,
Att: 5 Text of Proposed Order
195 195 motion Miscellaneous Relief Mon 05/05 4:05 PM
Joint MOTION to Resolve Discovery Dispute re 185 Oral Order,,,,,, - filed by Dexcel Pharma Technologies Limited. Motions referred to Christopher J. Burke.(Gaza, Anne)
Related: [-]
194 194 order SO ORDERED Mon 05/05 9:15 AM
[SEALED] SO ORDERED, re188 Stipulation filed by Wyeth LLC, PF PRISM IMB B.V., FoldRx Pharmaceuticals, LLC, Pfizer Inc., The Scripps Research Institute. Signed by Judge Gregory B. Williams on 5/5/2025.This document will be emailed to local counsel. (lnb)
Related: [-]
order SO ORDERED Mon 05/05 8:16 AM
SO ORDERED, re192 Stipulation Regarding Authenticity and Admissibility of Documents filed by Wyeth LLC, PF PRISM IMB B.V., FoldRx Pharmaceuticals, LLC, Pfizer Inc., The Scripps Research Institute. Signed by Judge Gregory B. Williams on 5/5/2025. (lnb)
Related: [-]
[SEALED] SO ORDERED, re188 Stipulation filed by Wyeth LLC, PF PRISM IMB B.V., FoldRx Pharmaceuticals, LLC, Pfizer Inc., The Scripps Research Institute. Signed by Judge Gregory B. Williams on 5/5/2025.This document will be emailed to local counsel. (lnb)
Related: [-]
order SO ORDERED Mon 05/05 11:41 AM
SO ORDERED D.I.189 Stipulation Regarding Discovery filed by Wyeth LLC, PF PRISM IMB B.V., FoldRx Pharmaceuticals, LLC, Pfizer Inc., The Scripps Research Institute. Ordered by Judge Christopher J. Burke on 5/5/2025. (mlc)
Related: [-]
Friday, May 02, 2025
193 193 discov Notice of Service Fri 05/02 4:23 PM
NOTICE OF SERVICE of Defendant Cipla Limited's Second Supplemental Responses and Objections to Plaintiffs First Set of Interrogatories (Nos. 1-5) and Responses and Objections to Plaintiffs Second Set of Individual Interrogatories (Nos. 6-7) filed by Cipla Limited.(Taylor, Daniel)
Related: [-]
192 192 misc Stipulation-General (See Motion List for Stipulation to Extend Time) Fri 05/02 4:04 PM
STIPULATION and [Proposed] Order Regarding Authenticity and Admissibility of Documents by FoldRx Pharmaceuticals, LLC, PF PRISM IMB B.V., Pfizer Inc., The Scripps Research Institute, Wyeth LLC. (Dellinger, Megan)
Related: [-]
191 191 discov Notice of Service Fri 05/02 3:37 PM
NOTICE OF SERVICE of (1) Plaintiffs' First Supplemental Responses and Objections to Defendants' Second Set of Common Interrogatories (Nos. 4-8); and (2) Plaintiffs' Fourth Supplemental Responses and Objections to Defendants' First Set of Collective Interrogatories (Nos. 1-3) filed by FoldRx Pharmaceuticals, LLC, PF PRISM IMB B.V., Pfizer Inc., The Scripps Research Institute, Wyeth LLC.(Dellinger, Megan)
Related: [-]
190 190 discov Notice of Service Fri 05/02 3:32 PM
NOTICE OF SERVICE of Plaintiffs' Second Supplemental Objections and Responses and Objections to Dexcel Pharma Technologies Limited's First Set of Interrogatories (Nos. 1-3) filed by FoldRx Pharmaceuticals, LLC, PF PRISM IMB B.V., Pfizer Inc., The Scripps Research Institute, Wyeth LLC.(Dellinger, Megan)
Related: [-]
189 189 misc Stipulation-General (See Motion List for Stipulation to Extend Time) Fri 05/02 3:24 PM
[SEALED] STIPULATION Regarding Discovery by FoldRx Pharmaceuticals, LLC, PF PRISM IMB B.V., Pfizer Inc., The Scripps Research Institute, Wyeth LLC. (Dellinger, Megan)
Related: [-]
188 188 misc Stipulation-General (See Motion List for Stipulation to Extend Time) Fri 05/02 3:18 PM
[SEALED] STIPULATION Regarding Discovery by FoldRx Pharmaceuticals, LLC, PF PRISM IMB B.V., Pfizer Inc., The Scripps Research Institute, Wyeth LLC. (Dellinger, Megan)
Related: [-]
Wednesday, April 30, 2025
187 187 discov Notice of Service Wed 04/30 5:49 PM
NOTICE OF SERVICE of Defendant, Aurobindo Pharma Limited's First Supplemental Responses and Objections to Plaintiffs' Second Set of Interrogatories (Nos. 3-6) filed by Aurobindo Pharma Limited.(Myer, R.)
Related: [-]