California Central District Court
Judge:Dolly M Gee
Referred: Shashi H Kewalramani
Case #: 5:23-cv-01615
Nature of Suit360 Torts - Personal Injury - Other Personal Injury
Cause28:1441 Notice of Removal - Personal Injury
Case Filed:Aug 10, 2023
Terminated:Sep 01, 2023
Case in other court:San Bernardino Superior Court, CIVSB2300062
Last checked: Tuesday Feb 06, 2024 12:24 AM PST
Defendant
Ark Post Acute Network, LLC
Represented By
Laura Karen Sitar
Pleiss Sitar Mcgrath Gates And Ajello
contact info
Kristina M. Edrington
Pleiss Sitar Mcgrath Gates And Ajello
contact info
Defendant
Does
Defendant
Reche Canyon Regional Rehab Center
Represented By
Laura Karen Sitar
Pleiss Sitar Mcgrath Gates And Ajello
contact info
Kristina M. Edrington
Pleiss Sitar Mcgrath Gates And Ajello
contact info
Plaintiff
Kenneth Berglof
Represented By
Benyahou Yeroushalmi
Yeroushalmi And Yeroushalmi
contact info
Tanaz Rostami
Yeroushalmi And Yeroushalmi
contact info
Plaintiff
Teresa Berglof
Represented By
Benyahou Yeroushalmi
Yeroushalmi And Yeroushalmi
contact info
Tanaz Rostami
Yeroushalmi And Yeroushalmi
contact info


Docket last updated: 2 hours ago
Monday, March 25, 2024
13 13 misc Receipt Fri 03/29 4:14 PM
Receipt of Copy of Remand Transmittal Letter from San Bernardino Superior Court, Case No. CIVSB2300062, acknowledged on 9/7/2023. (iv)
Related: [-]
Tuesday, September 05, 2023
12 12 misc Letter of Transmittal - Remand to Superior Court (G-17) - optional html form Tue 09/05 8:24 AM
TRANSMITTAL of documents to Clerk, San Bernardino Superior Court, San Bernardino Justice Center. A certified copy of the order of remand and a copy of the docket sheet from this court was sent to Clerk, San Bernardino Superior Court, San Bernardino Justice Center. (gk)
Related: [-]
Friday, September 01, 2023
11 11 2 pgs order Order Remand Case to State Court Tue 09/05 8:22 AM
ORDER RE STIPULATION TO REMAND MATTER BACK TO STATE COURT by Judge Dolly M. Gee: IT IS HEREBY ORDERED that the Stipulation10 is APPROVED and the action shall be remanded to the San Bernardino County Superior Court, Case Number CIVSB2300062. The Order to Show Cause dated 8/17/20239 is DISCHARGED. ( Case Terminated. Made JS-6 ) (gk)
Related: [-]
Wednesday, August 30, 2023
10 10 stip Remand Case to State Court Wed 08/30 9:02 AM
STIPULATION to Remand Case to State Court filed by Defendant Reche Canyon Regional Rehab Center.(Edrington, Kristina)
Related: [-]
Att: 1 Proposed Order
Thursday, August 17, 2023
9 9 2 pgs order Order to Show Cause Thu 08/17 2:33 PM
ORDER TO SHOW CAUSE WHY THIS ACTION SHOULD NOT BE REMANDED TO STATE COURT FOR LACK OF SUBJECT MATTER JURISDICTION by Judge Dolly M. Gee. Defendants are therefore ordered to show cause in writing by no later than August 30, 2023 why this action should not be remanded to the San Bernadino County Superior Court for lack of subject matter jurisdiction. Failure to file a timely satisfactory response by this deadline will result in the remand of this action. (SEE DOCUMENT FOR FURTHER DETAILS.) (rolm)
Related: [-]
Tuesday, August 15, 2023
8 8 order Initial Order upon Filing of Complaint - form only Tue 08/15 4:57 PM
INITIAL STANDING ORDER upon filing of the complaint by Judge Dolly M. Gee. (kti)
Related: [-]
7 7 notice Certificate/Notice of Interested Parties Tue 08/15 1:30 PM
NOTICE of Interested Parties filed by Defendants Reche Canyon Regional Rehab Center, identifying Cambridge Sierra Holdings, LLC dba Reche Canyon Regional Rehab Center and Ark Post Acute Network, LLC. (Sitar, Laura)
Related: [-]
6 6 misc Civil Cover Sheet (CV-71) Tue 08/15 1:25 PM
CIVIL COVER SHEET filed by Defendant Reche Canyon Regional Rehab Center. (Sitar, Laura)
Related: [-]
5 5 notice Deficiency in Attorney Case Opening Tue 08/15 11:41 AM
NOTICE OF DEFICIENCIES in Attorney Case Opening RE: Notice of Removal (Attorney Civil Case Opening),1 . The following error(s) was found: The Civil Cover Sheet (CV-71)is missing or incomplete. All civil actions presented for filing must be accompanied by a completed Civil Cover Sheet. See Local Rule 3-1. Counsel must file a completed Civil Cover Sheet immediately. Failure to do so may be addressed by judicial action, including sanctions. See Local Rule 83-7. No Notice of Interested Parties has been filed. A Notice of Interested Parties must be filed with every partys first appearance. See Local Rule 7.1-1. Counsel must file a Notice of Interested Parties immediately. Failure to do so may be addressed by judicial action, including sanctions. See Local Rule 83-7. (car)
Related: [-]
4 4 notice Notice to Counsel Re: Consent to Proceed Before a US Magistrate Judge - optional html form Tue 08/15 11:06 AM
Notice to Counsel Re Consent to Proceed Before a United States Magistrate Judge. (car)
Related: [-]
3 3 adr Notice to Parties of Court-Directed ADR Program (ADR-8) - optional html form Tue 08/15 11:05 AM
NOTICE TO PARTIES OF COURT-DIRECTED ADR PROGRAM filed. (car)
Related: [-]
2 2 transfer Reassignment of Eastern Division Removal Case (CV-106) - optional html form Tue 08/15 11:05 AM
NOTICE OF ASSIGNMENT of Eastern Division Removal Case and Notice re Consent to proceed before a U.S. Magistrate Judge. This case was initially assigned to District Judge Sunshine Suzanne Sykes and referred to Magistrate Judge Shashi H. Kewalramani for discovery. Pursuant to this Court's General Order in the Matter of Assignment of Cases and Duties to the District Judges, this case has been randomly reassigned to District Judge Dolly M. Gee. The case number on all documents filed with the Court in this case should read as follows: 5:23-cv-01615 DMG (SHKx). (car)
Related: [-]
Thursday, August 10, 2023
1 1 notice Notice of Removal (Attorney Civil Case Opening) Thu 08/10 3:52 PM
NOTICE OF REMOVAL from San Bernardino County Superior Court, case number CIVSB2300062 Receipt No: ACACDC-35834703 - Fee: $402, filed by Defendant Ark Post Acute Network, LLC. (Attorney Kristina M. Edrington added to party Ark Post Acute Network, LLC(pty:bkmov))(Edrington, Kristina)
Related: [-]
cmp Complaint - (Discovery) Tue 08/15 11:38 AM
CONFORMED COPY OF COMPLAINT against Defendants Ark Post Acute Network, LLC, Does 1 through 75, inclusive, Reche Canyon Regional Rehab Center. Jury Demanded, filed by Plaintiffs Teresa Berglof, Kenneth Berglof. Filed in State Court on 1/13/2023 Submitted with Exhibit A to Notice of Removal1 (car)
Related: [-]