Georgia Northern District Court
Judge:Richard W Story
Case #: 2:23-cv-00155
Nature of Suit893 Other Statutes - Environmental Matters
Cause33:1365 Environmental Matters
Case Filed:Aug 09, 2023
Last checked: Monday Feb 05, 2024 3:31 AM EST
Counter Claimant
City of Cumming
Represented By
W. Jason Pettus
Mcangus, Goudelock & Courie, LLC
contact info
Kevin James Tallant
Tallant Howell
contact info
Counter Defendant
Blount Construction Company, Inc.
Represented By
Juan Sebastian Patino Bravo
Chalmers, Adams, Backer & Kaufman, LLC
contact info
James M. Hicks, III
Chalmers, Adams, Backer & Kaufman, LLC
contact info
Kurt Robert Hilbert
Chalmers, Adams, Backer & Kaufman, LLC
contact info
Alex Benjamin Kaufman
Chalmers, Adams, Backer & Kaufman, LLC
contact info
Janie Hagood
Swift, Currie, Mcghee & Hiers Llp-Atl
contact info
Defendant
City of Cumming
Represented By
W. Jason Pettus
Mcangus, Goudelock & Courie, LLC
contact info
Kevin James Tallant
Tallant Howell
contact info
Plaintiff
Blount Construction Company, Inc.
Represented By
Juan Sebastian Patino Bravo
Chalmers, Adams, Backer & Kaufman, LLC
contact info
James M. Hicks, III
Chalmers, Adams, Backer & Kaufman, LLC
contact info
Kurt Robert Hilbert
Chalmers, Adams, Backer & Kaufman, LLC
contact info
Alex Benjamin Kaufman
Chalmers, Adams, Backer & Kaufman, LLC
contact info
Janie Hagood
Swift, Currie, Mcghee & Hiers Llp-Atl
contact info


Docket last updated: 4 hours ago
Wednesday, April 30, 2025
79 79 service Affidavit of Service Wed 04/30 4:30 PM
AFFIDAVIT of Service Capital City Electrical, LLC . (Pettus, W.)
Related: [-]
78 78 notice Notice of Filing Wed 04/30 3:17 PM
NOTICE of Filing by City of Cumming Expert Disclosures (Pettus, W.)
Related: [-]
77 77 discov Initial Disclosures Wed 04/30 3:16 PM
Supplemental Initial Disclosures by City of Cumming.(Pettus, W.)
Related: [-]
76 76 discov Certificate of Service Wed 04/30 3:12 PM
CERTIFICATE OF SERVICE of Discovery by City of Cumming.(Pettus, W.)
Related: [-]
75 75 answer Answer to Counterclaim Wed 04/30 3:10 PM
Second Amended Answer ANSWER to1 Complaint by City of Cumming. (Pettus, W.) Please visit our website at http://www.gand.uscourts.gov to obtain Pretrial Instructions. Modified on 4/30/2025 to edit docket entry (ddm)
Related: [-]
74 74 service Affidavit of Service Wed 04/30 1:59 PM
AFFIDAVIT of Service for Affidavit of Service Non-Party .(Pettus, W.)
Related: [-]
Att: 1 Affidavit of Service Advanced Industrial Resources,
Att: 2 Affidavit of Non-Service
Friday, April 25, 2025
73 73 discov Certificate of Service Fri 04/25 3:07 PM
CERTIFICATE OF SERVICE of Discovery by City of Cumming.(Pettus, W.)
Related: [-]
72 72 notice Notice (Other) Fri 04/25 2:13 PM
NOTICE by City of Cumming of Intent to Serve Subpoenas to Tesitify at a Deposition in a Civil Action on Non-Parties (Pettus, W.)
Related: [-]
Thursday, April 24, 2025
71 71 notice Notice (Other) Thu 04/24 2:32 PM
Notice of Filing Expert Disclosures filed by by Blount Construction Company, Inc. (Patino Bravo, Juan) Modified on 4/24/2025 to edit docket text (ddm)
Related: [-]