Pennsylvania Eastern District Court
Judge:John M Gallagher
Case #: 5:23-cv-03068
Nature of Suit350 Torts - Personal Injury - Motor Vehicle
Cause28:1332 Diversity-Tort/Motor Vehicle (P.I.)
Case Filed:Aug 09, 2023
Terminated:Jan 09, 2024
Last checked: Monday Feb 05, 2024 3:42 AM EST
Defendant
EMMA VONTOR
431 Old Philadelphia Pike
Douglassville, PA 19518
Represented By
DAVID A. SANTILLI
Styliades, Mezzanotte & Hasson
contact info
Defendant
MICHAEL VONTOR
431 Old Philadelphia Pike
Douglassville, PA 19518
Represented By
DAVID A. SANTILLI
Styliades, Mezzanotte & Hasson
contact info
Plaintiff
KURT GILBERT
7520 Maple Avenue Apartment 310
Takoma Park, MD 20912
Represented By
BRANDON A. SWARTZ
Swartz Culleton PC
contact info
LARISSA K. STASZKIW
Swartz Culleton PC
contact info


Docket last updated: 2 hours ago
Tuesday, January 09, 2024
17 17 1 pgs order Order Dismissing Case - 41(b) Tue 01/09 9:01 AM
ORDER DISMISSING ACTION WITH PREJUDICE PURSUANT TO LOCAL RULE 41.1(b), PURSUANT TO AGREEMENT OF COUNSEL WITHOUT COSTS. SIGNED BY JUDGE: JOHN M. GALLAGHER ON 1/9/24. 1/9/24 ENTERED AND COPIES E-MAILED. (DT)
Related: [-]
Monday, December 18, 2023
16 16 notice Notice of Hearing Mon 12/18 7:42 AM
NOTICE of Hearing: VIRTUAL ARBITRATION HEARING SET FOR 1/9/2024 at 2:00 p.m. Rescheduled from 1/9/2024 at 10:00 a.m.(rv)
Related: [-]
Friday, December 01, 2023
15 15 1 pgs order Order Referring Case to Arbitration Fri 12/01 2:42 PM
ORDER THAT THIS CASE IS REFERRED TO ARBITRATION. THE FOLLOWING CERTIFIED ARBITRATORS HAVE BEEN RANDOMLY SELECTED TO HEAR THIS CASE: CHAIRPERSON: WILLIAM H. HOWARD, ESQ.; ARBITRATOR: SOL H. WEISS, ESQ.; ARBITRATOR: ANDREW M. MILZ, ESQ. THE ARBITRATION HEARING WILL BE HELD ON 1/9/24, AT 10:00 AM, VIA VIDEOCONFERENCE, ETC.SIGNED BY HONORABLE JOHN M. GALLAGHER ON 12/1/23. 12/1/23 ENTERED AND COPIES E-MAILED.(amas)
Related: [-]
Friday, October 20, 2023
14 14 1 pgs order Order on Motion to Compel Fri 10/20 12:08 PM
ORDER OF 10/20/23 THAT DEFENDNATS' MOTION TO COMPEL (ECF NO. 13) IS DENIED WITHOUT PREJUDICE. L. SIGNED BY HONORABLE JOHN M. GALLAGHER ON 10/20/23.10/20/23 ENTERED AND COPIES E-MAILED.(dt)
Related: [-]
Thursday, October 19, 2023
13 13 motion Compel Thu 10/19 7:51 AM
MOTION to Compel filed by EMMA VONTOR, MICHAEL VONTOR..(SANTILLI, DAVID)
Related: [-]
Friday, September 22, 2023
12 12 adr Arbitration Procedural Order Fri 09/22 10:38 AM
Arbitration Procedural Order 9/22/23. Entered and copies e-mailed.(rv)
Related: [-]
11 11 notice Notice of Hearing Fri 09/22 10:36 AM
NOTICE of Hearing: VIRTUAL ARBITRATION HEARING SET FOR 1/9/2023 10:00 AM.(rv)
Related: [-]
Wednesday, September 20, 2023
10 10 adr Notice Re: Arbitration Consent of Video Conference Wed 09/20 9:43 AM
Notice Re: Arbitration Consent of Video Conference(STASZKIW, LARISSA)
Related: [-]
Tuesday, September 19, 2023
9 9 adr Notice Re: Arbitration Consent of Video Conference Tue 09/19 3:54 PM
Notice Re: Arbitration Consent of Video Conference(SANTILLI, DAVID)
Related: [-]
Monday, September 18, 2023
8 8 adr Notice Re: Arbitration Video Conference Mon 09/18 7:42 PM
Notice Re: Arbitration Video Conference(rv)
Related: [-]
Att: 1 Consent
Wednesday, September 13, 2023
7 7 misc Affidavit Wed 09/13 12:57 PM
AFFIDAVIT OF SERVICE by KURT GILBERT. (STASZKIW, LARISSA)
Related: [-]
6 6 misc Affidavit Wed 09/13 12:55 PM
AFFIDAVIT OF SERVICE - EMMA VONTOR by KURT GILBERT. (STASZKIW, LARISSA)
Related: [-]
Friday, September 08, 2023
5 5 answer Answer to Complaint Fri 09/08 8:40 AM
ANSWER to Complaint together with w/ affirmative defenses by EMMA VONTOR, MICHAEL VONTOR.(SANTILLI, DAVID)
Related: [-]
Friday, September 01, 2023
4 4 notice Notice of Appearance Fri 09/01 1:14 PM
NOTICE of Appearance by DAVID A. SANTILLI on behalf of EMMA VONTOR, MICHAEL VONTOR (SANTILLI, DAVID)
Related: [-]
Thursday, August 10, 2023
3 3 notice Notice of Appearance Thu 08/10 11:34 AM
NOTICE of Appearance by LARISSA K. STASZKIW on behalf of KURT GILBERT (STASZKIW, LARISSA)
Related: [-]
Wednesday, August 09, 2023
2 2 service Summons Issued Thu 08/10 11:16 AM
Summons Issued as to EMMA VONTOR, MICHAEL VONTOR. Forwarded To: Counsel on 8/10/23 (dt)
Related: [-]
1 1 COMPLAINT against EMMA VONTOR, MICHAEL VONTOR ( Filing fee $ 402 receipt number APAEDC-16868991.), filed by KURT GILBERT.(SWARTZ, BRANDON) (Main Document 1 replaced on 8/10/2023) (sbt).
Related: [-]