Georgia Middle District Court
Case #: 5:23-mj-00058
Case Filed:Aug 09, 2023
Last checked: Friday Aug 11, 2023 4:11 AM EDT
Defendant
PETER DAVID BARRERA (1)
Plaintiff
UNITED STATES OF AMERICA
Represented By
LEAH E MCEWEN
Us Attorney'S Office
contact info


Docket last updated: 08/11/2023 4:25 AM EDT
Wednesday, August 09, 2023
Arrest Rule 5 of PETER DAVID BARRERA (cma)
Related: [-]
Initial Appearance - Rule 5 set for 8/10/2023 02:30 PM in Macon before US MAGISTRATE JUDGE CHARLES H WEIGLE. NOTICE OF SETTING HEARING as to PETER DAVID BARRERA. (cma)
Related: [-]
NOTICE OF CANCELLATION OF HEARING as to PETER DAVID BARRERA: Initial Appearance - Rule 5 set for 8/10/2023 02:30 PM in Macon (cma)
Related: [-]
1 1 3 pgs Rule 5 Documents Received as to PETER DAVID BARRERA: Docket Sheet(cma)
Related: [-]
Att: 1 6 pgs Indictment