Florida Middle District Court
Case #: 8:23-cr-00235
Case Filed:Jul 12, 2023
Last checked: Friday Aug 11, 2023 4:14 AM EDT
Defendant
Michael Eugene Taylor, Jr. (1)
Represented By
Howard C. Anderson
Federal Public Defender'S Office
contact info
Plaintiff
USA
Represented By
David P. Sullivan
Doj-Usao
contact info


Docket last updated: 01/20/2024 1:50 PM EST
Wednesday, July 12, 2023
1 1 5 pgs INDICTMENT returned in open court as to Michael Eugene Taylor, Jr (1) count(s) 1-3. (MCB)
Related: [-]
Att: 1 Restricted Unredacted Indictment
2 2 2 pgs MOTION to Seal by USA as to Michael Eugene Taylor, Jr. (MCB)
Related: [-]
3 3 ORDER granting 2 Motion to Seal as to Michael Eugene Taylor Jr. (1). Signed by Magistrate Judge Thomas G. Wilson on 7/12/2023. (MCB)
Related: [-]