Missouri Eastern District Court
Case #: 4:23-cr-00357
Case Filed:Jul 12, 2023
Terminated:Jan 28, 2025
Last checked: Friday Aug 11, 2023 2:47 AM CDT
Defendant
James W. Grindell (1)
Represented By
William J. Ekiss
Ekiss Law Firm
contact info
Plaintiff
USA
Represented By
Kyle Timothy Bateman
United States Attorneys Office - St. Louis
contact info


Docket last updated: 03/20/2025 4:34 PM CDT
Wednesday, July 12, 2023
Warrant Issued as to Indictment in case as to James W. Grindell. (JKL)
Related: [-]
1 1 INDICTMENT returned in open court on 7/12/2023 to Judge Matthew T. Schelp by the Foreperson of the Grand Jury. Referred to Magistrate Judge Rodney H. Holmes as to James W. Grindell (1) count(s) 1. FORFEITURE ALLEGATION. (JKL)
Related: [-]
Att: 1 Criminal Cover Sheet
2 2 4 pgs REDACTED INDICTMENT returned in open court on 7/12/2023 to Judge Matthew T. Schelp by the Foreperson of the Grand Jury. Referred to Magistrate Judge Rodney H. Holmes as to James W. Grindell (1): Former count 1 is now count 1r.. (JKL)
Related: [-]
3 3 ENTRY OF ATTORNEY APPEARANCE Kyle Timothy Bateman appearing for USA. (JKL)
Related: [-]
4 4 Order:...IT IS BY THE COURT ORDERED that said indictment shall be sealed and suppressed by the Clerk of the Court until said defendant is in custody or has given bail for the defendant's final appearance. Order as to James W. Grindell. Signed by District Judge Matthew T. Schelp on 7/12/2023. (JKL)
Related: [-]
5 5 Pursuant to Local Rule 2.08, the assigned/referred magistrate judge is designated and authorized by the court to exercise full authority in this assigned/referred action or matter under 28 U.S.C. Sec. 636 and 18 U.S.C Sec. 3401, including any case budgeting matters. (auto)
Related: [-]