Florida Middle District Court
Judge:Mary S Scriven
Referred: Julie S Sneed
Case #: 8:23-cv-01809
Nature of Suit710 Labor - Fair Labor Standards Act
Cause28:1331 Fed. Question: Fair Labor Standards
Case Filed:Aug 11, 2023
Terminated:Jun 04, 2024
Last checked: Wednesday Feb 07, 2024 5:17 AM EST
Defendant
Leading Edge Connections, LLC
Represented By
Sean P. Cronin
Stanton Cronin Law Group, Pl
contact info
Plaintiff
Alicia Fields
Represented By
Alan L. Quiles
Shavitz Law Group PA
contact info
Gregg I. Shavitz
Shavitz Law Group PA
contact info
Plaintiff
Katherine Sarigumba
Represented By
Alan L. Quiles
Shavitz Law Group PA
contact info
Gregg I. Shavitz
Shavitz Law Group PA
contact info


Docket last updated: 1 hours ago
Tuesday, June 04, 2024
25 25 notice Notice to Counsel of Local Rule Tue 06/04 2:31 PM
NOTICE of Local Rule 1.11(e), which provides that, unless an order states another time, a seal under Rule 1.11 expires ninety days after a case is closed and all appeals are exhausted. To prevent the content of a sealed item from appearing on the docket after the seal expires, a party or interested non-party must move for relief before the seal expires. (Signed by Deputy Clerk). (EVK)
Related: [-]
24 24 order Order Dismissing Case Tue 06/04 9:18 AM
ENDORSED ORDER OF DISMISSAL. It is ORDERED that, pursuant to Fed. R. Civ. P. 41 and upon review of 23 the Joint Stipulation of Dismissal with Prejudice, this case is DISMISSED WITH PREJUDICE. Each party shall bear its own attorneys' fees and costs associated with this matter. Any pending motions are DENIED as moot. The Clerk is directed to CLOSE this case. Signed by Judge Mary S. Scriven on 6/4/2024. (DEJ)
Related: [-]
Monday, June 03, 2024
23 23 notice Notice of voluntary dismissal Mon 06/03 2:46 PM
NOTICE of voluntary dismissal by Alicia Fields, Katherine Sarigumba (Quiles, Alan)
Related: [-]
Friday, May 03, 2024
22 22 order Order on Motion for Extension of Time to File Fri 05/03 11:51 AM
ENDORSED ORDER GRANTING 21 the Joint Motion to Extend Deadline to File Dismissal Documents. The parties shall have up to and including thirty (30) days from the date of this Order to file their dismissal documents. Signed by Judge Mary S. Scriven on 5/3/2024. (DEJ)
Related: [-]
Monday, April 29, 2024
21 21 motion Extension of Time to File Mon 04/29 3:05 PM
Joint MOTION for Extension of Time to File Dismissal Documents by All Plaintiffs. (Quiles, Alan)
Related: [-]
Friday, March 29, 2024
20 20 order Order Staying Case Fri 03/29 10:08 AM
ENDORSED ORDER DIRECTING COMPLIANCE. On May 14, 2022, the Mediator filed 19 Mediation Report, informing the Court that the above-captioned case was settled. Therefore, it is hereby ORDERED that pursuant to Rule 3.09(b) of the Local Rules of the United States District Court for the Middle District of Florida, this case is STAYED for thirty (30) calendar days from the date of this Order to allow the Parties to file either a Joint Stipulation of Dismissal or a Joint Motion to Approve Proposed FLSA Settlement Agreement. If the claims were resolved without compromise, a joint motion to approve the proposed FLSA settlement is unnecessary. Instead, the Parties are directed to file a stipulation of dismissal indicating that the claims have been resolved without compromise. Signed by Judge Thomas P. Barber on 3/29/2024, to expedite the resolution of this action. This case remains assigned to Judge Mary S. Scriven. (EOJ)
Related: [-]
Friday, March 22, 2024
19 19 2 pgs adr Mediation report Fri 03/22 12:42 PM
MEDIATION report Hearing held on March 20, 2023. Hearing outcome: Settled.. (Munoz, Shane)
Related: [-]
Monday, March 04, 2024
18 18 utility Case Assigned/Reassigned Mon 03/04 4:18 PM
Case Reassigned to Magistrate Judge Unassigned Magistrate. New case number: 8:23-cv-1809-MSS-UAM. Magistrate Judge Julie S. Sneed no longer assigned to the case. (MCB)
Related: [-]
Wednesday, February 14, 2024
17 17 notice Notice (Other) Wed 02/14 3:13 PM
NOTICE by Leading Edge Connections, LLC Joint Report Regarding Settlement (Cronin, Sean)
Related: [-]
Monday, January 29, 2024
16 16 2 pgs adr Mediation report Mon 01/29 6:31 PM
MEDIATION report Hearing held on January 29, 2024. Hearing outcome: Continued.. (Munoz, Shane)
Related: [-]
Friday, December 01, 2023
15 15 misc Settlement/Trial report Fri 12/01 3:43 PM
SETTLEMENT/TRIAL report by Alicia Fields, Katherine Sarigumba. (Quiles, Alan)
Related: [-]
Friday, October 27, 2023
14 14 notice Compliance notice Fri 10/27 2:46 PM
NOTICE of compliance by Leading Edge Connections, LLC (Cronin, Sean)
Related: [-]
Tuesday, October 03, 2023
13 13 answer Answer to Complaint Tue 10/03 4:27 PM
ANSWER and affirmative defenses to 1 Complaint by Leading Edge Connections, LLC.(Cronin, Sean)
Related: [-]
Wednesday, September 13, 2023
12 12 service Proof of service Wed 09/13 3:55 PM
PROOF of service by Alicia Fields, Katherine Sarigumba (Quiles, Alan)
Related: [-]
Monday, September 11, 2023
11 11 notice Notice of Lead Counsel Designation Mon 09/11 4:55 PM
NOTICE of Lead Counsel Designation by Alan L. Quiles on behalf of Alicia Fields, Katherine Sarigumba. Lead Counsel: Alan L. Quiles. (Quiles, Alan)
Related: [-]
Thursday, August 31, 2023
10 10 notice Notice to Counsel of Local Rule Thu 08/31 2:42 PM
NOTICE TO COUNSEL Alan L. Quiles and Gregg I. Shavitz of Local Rule 2.02(a), which states, "The first paper filed on behalf of a party must designate only one lead counsel who - unless the party changes the designation - remains lead counsel throughout the action." Counsel must file a Notice of Lead Counsel Designation identifying lead counsel. (Signed by Deputy Clerk). (GL)
Related: [-]
Wednesday, August 30, 2023
9 9 respoth Answer to court interrogatories Wed 08/30 2:08 PM
ANSWER to court interrogatories re:4 Case Management Scheduling Order by Alicia Fields, Katherine Sarigumba. (Quiles, Alan)
Related: [-]
8 8 respoth Answer to court interrogatories Wed 08/30 2:07 PM
ANSWER to court interrogatories re:4 Case Management Scheduling Order by Alicia Fields, Katherine Sarigumba.(Quiles, Alan)
Related: [-]
Att: 1 Exhibit Response to Interrogatories 11 and 12
7 7 respoth Answer to court interrogatories Wed 08/30 2:06 PM
ANSWER to court interrogatories re:4 Case Management Scheduling Order by Alicia Fields, Katherine Sarigumba.(Quiles, Alan)
Related: [-]
Att: 1 Exhibit Response to Interrogatories 11 and 12
Tuesday, August 29, 2023
6 6 service Summons issued Tue 08/29 10:27 AM
SUMMONS issued as to Leading Edge Connections, LLC. (BD)
Related: [-]
Monday, August 28, 2023
5 5 service Proposed summons Mon 08/28 5:15 PM
PROPOSED summons to be issued by Alicia Fields, Katherine Sarigumba. (Shavitz, Gregg)
Related: [-]
Wednesday, August 16, 2023
4 4 order Case Management Scheduling Order Wed 08/16 9:14 AM
FLSA SCHEDULING ORDER. Signed by Judge Mary S. Scriven on 8/16/2023. (BCH)
Related: [-]
Friday, August 11, 2023
3 3 utility Case Assigned/Reassigned Fri 08/11 3:50 PM
NEW CASE ASSIGNED to Judge Mary S. Scriven and Magistrate Judge Julie S. Sneed. New case number: 8:23-cv-1809-MSS-JSS. (AM)
Related: [-]
2 2 notice Notice of consent to join Fri 08/11 10:57 AM
NOTICE of consent to join by All Plaintiffs .(Quiles, Alan)
Related: [-]
Att: 1 Exhibit Consent to Join
1 1 cmp Complaint Fri 08/11 10:49 AM
COMPLAINT against All Plaintiffs with Jury Demand (Filing fee $402 receipt number AFLMDC-21138448) filed by All Plaintiffs.(Quiles, Alan)
Related: [-]
Att: 1 Exhibit Consent Form Fields,
Att: 2 Exhibit Consent Form Sarigumba,
Att: 3 Civil Cover Sheet,
Att: 4 Proposed Summons