Adversary Proceeding
Lead BK case is: 2:23-bk-23923

Tennessee Western Bankruptcy Court
Chapter 13
Judge:Jennie D Latta
Case #: 2:23-ap-00102
Nature of Suit11 Bankruptcy - Recovery of money/property - §542 turnover of property
Case Filed:Aug 11, 2023
Terminated:Sep 07, 2023
Last checked: never
Defendant
Buckeye Check Cashing of Tennessee d/b/a Easy Money
PO Box 535
Dublin, OH 43017
Represented By
Buckeye Check Cashing of Tennessee d/b/a Easy Money
contact info
Plaintiff
Colandra Letrice Thomas
4551 Tammy Lane
Memphis, TN 38116
Represented By
David Arnold
The Arnold Law Firm, PLLC
contact info


Docket last updated: 9 hours ago
Thursday, September 07, 2023
court Close Adversary Case Thu 09/07 12:53 PM
Adversary Case 2:23-ap-102 Closed (clm)
Related: [-]
Friday, August 25, 2023
7 7 court BNC Certificate Of Mailing Fri 08/25 11:48 PM
BNC Certificate of Mailing Related [+] Notice Date 08/25/2023. (Admin.)
Related: [-] 5 Order (Adversary)
6 6 court BNC Certificate Of Mailing Fri 08/25 11:48 PM
BNC Certificate of Mailing Related [+] Notice Date 08/25/2023. (Admin.)
Related: [-] 5 Order (Adversary)
Wednesday, August 23, 2023
5 5 2 pgs order Order (Adversary) Wed 08/23 10:01 AM
Order Withdrawing Complaint For Turnover of Property To The Estate AND Notice of Entry of Judgment Related [+] (clm)
Related: [-] 1 Complaint
Wednesday, August 16, 2023
4 4 court BNC Certificate Of Mailing Wed 08/16 11:55 PM
BNC Certificate of Mailing Related [+] Notice Date 08/16/2023. (Admin.)
Related: [-] 3 Notice Of Expedited Hearing
Monday, August 14, 2023
3 3 notice Notice Of Expedited Hearing Mon 08/14 11:37 AM
Notice Of Expedited Hearing Related [+] Hearing scheduled 8/24/2023 at 10:00 AM, Room 645, Memphis, TN . (dch)
Related: [-] 1 Adversary case 23-00102 (11 (Recovery of money/property - 542 turnover of property)): Complaint by Colandra Letrice Thomas against Buckeye Check Cashing of Tennessee d/b/a Easy Money. (Arnold, David) Modified on 8/11/2023 (clm). EDITED TO SHOW 2013 FORD.
Friday, August 11, 2023
2 2 notice Adversary Proceeding Cover Sheet Fri 08/11 12:33 PM
Adversary Proceeding Cover Sheet Filed by David Arnold on behalf of Plaintiff Colandra Letrice Thomas. (Arnold, David)
Related: [-]
1 1 cmp Complaint Fri 08/11 12:19 PM
Adversary case 23-00102 (11 (Recovery of money/property - 542 turnover of property)): Complaint by Colandra Letrice Thomas against Buckeye Check Cashing of Tennessee d/b/a Easy Money. (Arnold, David)
Related: [-]