New Jersey District Court
Judge:Michael E Farbiarz
Referred: Stacey D Adams
Case #: 2:23-cv-04376
Nature of Suit365 Torts - Personal Injury - Product Liability
Cause28:1441 Notice of Removal- Personal Injury
Case Filed:Aug 11, 2023
Terminated:Feb 25, 2025
Case in other court:Superior Court of New Jersey; Hudson County, HUD-L-002465-23
Last checked: Wednesday Feb 07, 2024 5:36 AM EST
Defendant
AMAZON, INC.
Defendant
RHINOSYSTEMS, INC.
Represented By
LISA A HERBERT
Nelson Mullins Riley & Scarborough LLP
contact info
Notice Only
arbnwk
Notice Only
PHV JENNY A. COVINGTON
Plaintiff
EUGENE GLEASON
Represented By
ALEXANDER N. SCHACHTEL
Law Office Of Alexander Schachtel, LLC
contact info


Docket last updated: 69 minutes ago
Tuesday, February 25, 2025
34 34 order Order of Dismissal Tue 02/25 8:19 AM
TEXT ORDER: The Plaintiff has not indicated whether he still intends to pursue his claims against Amazon, Inc. by the ordered deadline. See ECF 33 . Therefore, the Clerk of Court is ordered to close this case. So Ordered by Judge Michael E. Farbiarz on 2/25/2025. (ro, )
Related: [-]
Wednesday, February 19, 2025
33 33 order Order Wed 02/19 11:57 AM
TEXT ORDER: On or before February 21 at 5:00 PM, the Plaintiff shall indicate whether it still intends to pursue its claims against Amazon, Inc. in a letter of no more than one page. If the Plaintiff does not state its intentions by that deadline, the Court shall order the Clerk of Court to close the case. So Ordered by Judge Michael E. Farbiarz on 2/19/25. (ro, )
Related: [-]
Wednesday, August 21, 2024
32 32 order Stipulation and Order ~Util - Add and Terminate Parties Wed 08/21 12:58 PM
STIPULATION AND ORDER OF DISMISSAL with prejudice and without costs as to Defendant, RHINOSYSTEMS, INC.; RHINOSYSTEMS, INC. terminated. Signed by Judge Michael E. Farbiarz on 8/21/2024. (wh)
Related: [-]
Monday, August 19, 2024
31 31 misc Stipulation of Dismissal (aty) Mon 08/19 10:55 AM
STIPULATION of Dismissal with Prejudice by RHINOSYSTEMS, INC.. (HERBERT, LISA)
Related: [-]
Wednesday, July 10, 2024
30 30 order Text Order Wed 07/10 4:24 PM
TEXT ORDER: Please be advised that the Telephone Conference scheduled for 8/12/24 at 12:00 p.m. is ADJOURNED. The Court will issue an Order rescheduling the Conference. So Ordered by Magistrate Judge Jessica S. Allen on 7/10/24. (jbb)
Related: [-]
Tuesday, July 09, 2024
29 29 utility Case Assigned/Reassigned Tue 07/09 10:58 AM
Case Reassigned to Magistrate Judge Stacey D. Adams. Magistrate Judge Jessica S. Allen no longer assigned to the case. (nic, )
Related: [-]
Thursday, June 20, 2024
28 28 1 pgs order Order Appointing Mediator ~Util - Set Hearings Thu 06/20 2:43 PM
LETTER ORDER Appointing Mediator. The parties have selected Retired Judge Mark B. Epstein to mediate this matter. The parties are directed to file a joint letter on or before 8/7/24, addressing the outcome of Mediation. A Telephone Status Conference is scheduled for 8/12/24 at 12:00 p.m. Signed by Magistrate Judge Jessica S. Allen on 6/20/2024. (qa, )
Related: [-]
Monday, June 17, 2024
27 27 misc Letter Mon 06/17 11:21 AM
Letter from Jenny A. Covington, Esq. re 26 Order,,. (HERBERT, LISA)
Related: [-]
Friday, May 24, 2024
26 26 order Order Fri 05/24 10:14 AM
TEXT ORDER: As per today's Telephone Status Conference, the parties have agreed to Mediation. The parties shall submit a joint letter on or before 6/17/24, confirming whether they have agreed to pursue private Mediation or participate in the Court referred Mediation program pursuant to Local Civil Rule 301.1, and confirming the name of the selected Mediator and date scheduled for Mediation. Due to the impending Mediation and with the parties' consent, expert discovery shall be held in abeyance, pending the outcome of Mediation. So Ordered by Magistrate Judge Jessica S. Allen on 5/24/24. (jbb)
Related: [-]
minutes Status Conference Fri 05/24 10:12 AM
Minute Entry for proceedings held before Magistrate Judge Jessica S. Allen: Telephone Status Conference held on 5/24/2024. (Court Reporter: None) (jbb)
Related: [-]
Friday, May 03, 2024
25 25 1 pgs order Order 1 - Terminate Hearings ~Util - Set Hearings Fri 05/03 1:01 PM
LETTER ORDER granting the24 Adjournment Request. However, based on the Court's availability, the Telephone Status Conference is adjourned until 5/24/24 at 9:30 a.m. Signed by Magistrate Judge Jessica S. Allen on 5/3/2024. (qa, )
Related: [-]
Thursday, May 02, 2024
24 24 misc Letter Thu 05/02 5:08 PM
Letter from Jenny Covington and Alexander Schachtel - Jointly. (HERBERT, LISA)
Related: [-]
Wednesday, April 24, 2024
23 23 order Order Wed 04/24 11:37 AM
TEXT ORDER: Please be advised that the Telephone Status Conference scheduled for 4/25/24 at 4:30 p.m. is rescheduled for 5/6/24 at 4:00 p.m. So Ordered by Magistrate Judge Jessica S. Allen on 4/24/24. (jbb)
Related: [-]
Thursday, April 18, 2024
22 22 misc Letter Thu 04/18 4:28 PM
Letter from Jenny A. Covington re 21 Order,. (HERBERT, LISA)
Related: [-]
Tuesday, April 02, 2024
21 21 order Order Tue 04/02 9:12 AM
TEXT ORDER: The parties shall submit a joint status letter on or before 4/18/24, setting forth the status of fact discovery and any other pretrial issues to be addressed by the Court. The Telephone Status Conference scheduled for 5/8/24 at 11:30 a.m. (ECF No. 20) is rescheduled for 4/25/24 at 4:30 p.m. before the Undersigned. The Conference Call information will be circulated in advance. So Ordered by Magistrate Judge Jessica S. Allen on 4/2/24. (jbb)
Related: [-]
Monday, April 01, 2024
utility Case Assigned/Reassigned Mon 04/01 4:05 PM
Case Reassigned to Magistrate Judge Jessica S. Allen. Magistrate Judge E. S. Kiel no longer assigned to the case. (mxw, )
Related: [-]
Monday, January 29, 2024
20 20 order Order ~Util - Set Hearings Mon 01/29 2:58 PM
TEXT ORDER: A telephone status conference is scheduled for May 7, 2024 at 11:30 a.m. before Magistrate Judge Edward S. Kiel. The dial in number is 973-437-5535 and the phone conference ID is 987 733 114#. The parties shall file a joint letter, at least three days before the conference, advising of the status of discovery and any other issues to be addressed. So Ordered by Magistrate Judge Edward S. Kiel on 1/29/2024. (nic, )
Related: [-]
Friday, January 26, 2024
19 19 2 pgs order Order Fri 01/26 4:22 PM
LETTER ORDER granting18 request for a two week extension of discovery deadlines. The Telephone Status Conference set for 1/29/2024 shall proceed as scheduled. Signed by Magistrate Judge Edward S. Kiel on 1/26/2024. (jd, )
Related: [-]
Wednesday, January 24, 2024
18 18 misc Letter Wed 01/24 2:58 PM
Letter from Jenny A. Covingont re13 Scheduling Order. (HERBERT, LISA)
Related: [-]
Thursday, January 18, 2024
17 17 order Discovery Confidentiality Order Thu 01/18 11:40 AM
Confidentiality Order. Signed by Magistrate Judge Edward S. Kiel on 1/18/2024. (qa, )
Related: [-]
Wednesday, January 17, 2024
16 16 misc Letter Wed 01/17 2:21 PM
Letter from Jenny A. Covington.(HERBERT, LISA)
Related: [-]
Att: 1 Text of Proposed Order
Tuesday, January 16, 2024
15 15 1 pgs order Order Tue 01/16 12:01 PM
LETTER ORDER granting the14 Request to extend the deadline to alert the Court to discovery disputes for two weeks, up to and including January 26, 2024. Signed by Magistrate Judge Edward S. Kiel on 1/16/2024. (qa, )
Related: [-]
Friday, January 12, 2024
14 14 misc Letter Fri 01/12 6:28 PM
Letter from Jenny A. Covington. (HERBERT, LISA)
Related: [-]
Tuesday, October 17, 2023
13 13 order Scheduling Order Tue 10/17 11:33 AM
ORDER scheduling a telephone status conference for 1/29/2024 at 11:00 a.m. Fact discovery is to remain open through 5/3/2024. Signed by Magistrate Judge Edward S. Kiel on 10/17/2023. (qa, )
Related: [-]
Tuesday, October 03, 2023
minutes Scheduling Conference Tue 10/03 7:35 PM
Minute Entry for proceedings held before Magistrate Judge Edward S. Kiel: R16 Scheduling Conference held on 10/3/2023. (sms)
Related: [-]
Friday, September 29, 2023
12 12 discov Joint Discovery Plan Fri 09/29 11:30 AM
Joint Discovery Plan by RHINOSYSTEMS, INC..(HERBERT, LISA)
Related: [-]
Thursday, September 14, 2023
11 11 notice Notice of Change of Address Thu 09/14 3:14 PM
NOTICE of Change of Address by LISA A HERBERT (HERBERT, LISA)
Related: [-]
Tuesday, August 29, 2023
notice Notice of Pro Hac Vice counsel added Tue 08/29 9:33 AM
Pro Hac Vice counsel, JENNY A. COVINGTON, has been added to receive Notices of Electronic Filing. Pursuant to L.Civ.R. 101.1, only local counsel are entitled to sign and file papers, enter appearances and receive payments on judgments, decrees or orders. (wh)
Related: [-]
Monday, August 28, 2023
10 10 notice Notice of Pro Hac Vice to Receive NEF Mon 08/28 3:51 PM
Notice of Request by Pro Hac Vice Jenny A. Covington to receive Notices of Electronic Filings. (HERBERT, LISA)
Related: [-]
Friday, August 25, 2023
misc Pro Hac Vice Fee Received Fri 08/25 2:33 PM
Pro Hac Vice fee for Jenny A. Covington: $ 150, receipt number 134250 (jjc, )
Related: [-]
Wednesday, August 23, 2023
9 9 2 pgs order Order ~Util - Set/Clear Flags Wed 08/23 5:07 PM
LETTER ORDER: A telephonic initial scheduling conference shall be held on October 3, 2023 at 9:45 a.m. before Magistrate Judge Edward S. Kiel. The dial in number is 1-888-684-8852 and the access code is 310-0383#. The parties shall file a proposed joint discovery plan no later than three business days before the scheduled initial conference. The Court's form joint discovery plan can be found[LINK:here] . Signed by Magistrate Judge Edward S. Kiel on 8/23/2023. (sms)
Related: [-]
Friday, August 18, 2023
8 8 answer Answer to Complaint Fri 08/18 2:00 PM
ANSWER to Complaint with JURY DEMAND and Affirmative Defenses by RHINOSYSTEMS, INC..(HERBERT, LISA)
Related: [-]
Thursday, August 17, 2023
7 7 notice Notice of Pro Hac Vice to Receive NEF Thu 08/17 3:56 PM
Notice of Request by Pro Hac Vice Jenny A. Covington to receive Notices of Electronic Filings.(HERBERT, LISA)
Related: [-]
Att: 1 Exhibit A - Copy of Letter & Payment
6 6 2 pgs order Order on Motion for Leave to Appear Pro Hac Vice Thu 08/17 11:22 AM
ORDER granting3 Motion for Leave to Appear Pro Hac Vice as to Jenny A. Convington, Esq.. Signed by Magistrate Judge Edward S. Kiel on 8/17/2023. (ld, )
Related: [-]
Wednesday, August 16, 2023
5 5 respm Certification in Support of Motion Wed 08/16 2:48 PM
CERTIFICATION in Support filed by RHINOSYSTEMS, INC. re3 MOTION for Leave to Appear Pro Hac Vice Supplemental (HERBERT, LISA)
Related: [-]
Tuesday, August 15, 2023
utility Set/Reset Motion and R&R Deadlines/Hearings Tue 08/15 10:21 AM
Set/Reset Deadlines as to3 MOTION for Leave to Appear Pro Hac Vice . Motion set for 9/18/2023 before Magistrate Judge Edward S. Kiel. Unless otherwise directed by the Court, this motion will be decided on the papers and no appearances are required. Note that this is an automatically generated message from the Clerk`s Office and does not supersede any previous or subsequent orders from the Court. (ld, )
Related: [-]
Monday, August 14, 2023
4 4 misc Diversity Disclosure Statement Mon 08/14 4:50 PM
Diversity Disclosure Statement by RHINOSYSTEMS, INC.. (HERBERT, LISA)
Related: [-]
3 3 motion Appear Pro Hac Vice Mon 08/14 4:49 PM
MOTION for Leave to Appear Pro Hac Vice by RHINOSYSTEMS, INC..(HERBERT, LISA)
Related: [-]
Att: 1 Certification of Lisa A. Herbert,
Att: 2 Certification of Jenny A. Covington,
Att: 3 Text of Proposed Order
qc QC - Blank Diversity Disclosure Statement Mon 08/14 10:59 AM
CLERK'S QUALITY CONTROL MESSAGE - Please be advised, pursuant to Fed. R. Civ. P. 7.1(a)(2), unless the Court orders otherwise, in any action filed or removed to this Court, in which jurisdiction is based upon diversity under 28 U.S.C. 1332(a), a party or intervenor must file a disclosure statement naming and identifying the citizenship of every individual or entity whose citizenship is attributed to that party or intervenor. A party, intervenor or proposed intervenor must file the disclosure statement with its first appearance, pleading, petition, motion, response, or other request addressed to the Court.[LINK:Click here] to complete the Diversity Disclosure Statement, once complete, file it using the event Diversity Disclosure Statement. (qa, )
Related: [-]
Friday, August 11, 2023
2 2 misc Corporate Disclosure Statement (aty) Fri 08/11 4:45 PM
Corporate Disclosure Statement by RHINOSYSTEMS, INC. A/K/A OR D/B/A "NAVAGE NASAL CARE" identifying French Transit, LLC as Corporate Parent.. (HERBERT, LISA)
Related: [-]
1 1 notice Notice of Removal Fri 08/11 4:32 PM
NOTICE OF REMOVAL by RHINOSYSTEMS, INC. A/K/A OR D/B/A "NAVAGE NASAL CARE" from Superior Court of New Jersey; Hudson County, case number HUD-L-002465-23. ( Filing and Admin fee $ 402 receipt number ANJDC-14521499), filed by RHINOSYSTEMS, INC. A/K/A OR D/B/A "NAVAGE NASAL CARE".(HERBERT, LISA)
Related: [-]
Att: 1 Civil Cover Sheet,
Att: 2 Exhibit A - State court pleadings,
Att: 3 Exhibit B - DE 8 Saragosa v. Xiamen,
Att: 4 Exhibit C - DE 6 Tanner v. Elive,
Att: 5 Exhibit D - DE 1 Frances v. Kepod,
Att: 6 Certificate of Service
utility Case Assigned/Reassigned Fri 08/11 4:46 PM
Case Assigned to Judge Michael E. Farbiarz and Magistrate Judge Edward S. Kiel. (ak, )
Related: [-]
utility Case Referred to Arbitration Fri 08/11 4:46 PM
CASE REFERRED to Arbitration. (ak, )
Related: [-]