Kentucky Eastern District Court
Judge:Karen K Caldwell
Case #: 6:23-cv-00148
Nature of Suit899 Other Statutes - Administrative Procedure Act/Review or Appeal of Agency Decision
Cause05:551 Administrative Procedure Act
Case Filed:Aug 11, 2023
Last checked: Wednesday Feb 07, 2024 5:23 AM EST
Defendant
Rohit Chopra
Represented By
Kevin E. Friedl, GOV
Consumer Financial Protection Bureau
contact info
Karen S Bloom, GOV
Consumer Financial Protection Bureau
contact info
Defendant
Consumer Financial Protection Bureau
Represented By
Kevin E. Friedl, GOV
Consumer Financial Protection Bureau
contact info
Karen S Bloom, GOV
Consumer Financial Protection Bureau
contact info
Plaintiff
Citizens Deposit Bank of Arlington, Inc.
Represented By
M. Thurman Senn
Morgan Pottinger Mcgravey, P.S.C. - Louisville
contact info
John T. McGarvey
Morgan Pottinger Mcgravey, P.S.C. - Louisville
contact info
Plaintiff
First Community Bank of the Heartland, Inc.
Represented By
M. Thurman Senn
Morgan Pottinger Mcgravey, P.S.C. - Louisville
contact info
John T. McGarvey
Morgan Pottinger Mcgravey, P.S.C. - Louisville
contact info
Plaintiff
First Southern National Bank
Represented By
M. Thurman Senn
Morgan Pottinger Mcgravey, P.S.C. - Louisville
contact info
John T. McGarvey
Morgan Pottinger Mcgravey, P.S.C. - Louisville
contact info
Plaintiff
Kentucky Bankers Association
Represented By
M. Thurman Senn
Morgan Pottinger Mcgravey, P.S.C. - Louisville
contact info
John T. McGarvey
Morgan Pottinger Mcgravey, P.S.C. - Louisville
contact info
Plaintiff
Morgantown Bank & Trust Company
Represented By
M. Thurman Senn
Morgan Pottinger Mcgravey, P.S.C. - Louisville
contact info
John T. McGarvey
Morgan Pottinger Mcgravey, P.S.C. - Louisville
contact info
Plaintiff
The Farmers Bank of Milton, Ky.
Represented By
M. Thurman Senn
Morgan Pottinger Mcgravey, P.S.C. - Louisville
contact info
John T. McGarvey
Morgan Pottinger Mcgravey, P.S.C. - Louisville
contact info
Plaintiff
The Monticello Banking Company
Represented By
M. Thurman Senn
Morgan Pottinger Mcgravey, P.S.C. - Louisville
contact info
John T. McGarvey
Morgan Pottinger Mcgravey, P.S.C. - Louisville
contact info
Plaintiff
The Peoples Bank, Marion, Kentucky
Represented By
M. Thurman Senn
Morgan Pottinger Mcgravey, P.S.C. - Louisville
contact info
John T. McGarvey
Morgan Pottinger Mcgravey, P.S.C. - Louisville
contact info
Plaintiff
The Sacramento Deposit Bank
Represented By
M. Thurman Senn
Morgan Pottinger Mcgravey, P.S.C. - Louisville
contact info
John T. McGarvey
Morgan Pottinger Mcgravey, P.S.C. - Louisville
contact info

GPO Sep 14 2023
OPINION & ORDER: (1) Plaintiffs' motion for injunctive relief is GRANTED (DE 15); (2) The Consumer Financial Protection Bureau is ENJOINED from enforcing the Small Business Lending Rule until the Supreme Court issues an opinion ruling that the funding structure of the CFPB is constitutional; and (3) The Court will not require security due to the lack of evidence that the Consumer Financial Protection Bureau will incur any monetary costs or damages because of the preliminary injunction. Signed by Judge Karen K. Caldwell on 9/14/2023.(MM)cc: COR
GPO Aug 08 2024
OPINION & ORDER: (1) Defendants' motion to maintain the stay is GRANTED (DE 25); (2) This action is STAYED until the Texas District Court proceeds to final judgment; and (3) All other motions pending in this matter are DENIED AS MOOT. Signed by Judge Karen K. Caldwell on 8/7/2024.(MM)cc: COR
GPO Jan 28 2025
OPINION & ORDER: 1) Plaintiffs' motion to leave to file a First Amended Complaint (DE 37) is GRANTED; 2) the Clerk of the Court is DIRECTED to file the tendered First Amended Complaint (DE 37-1) with accompanying exhibits (DE 37-2 7) into the record; 3) Defendants SHALL file an answer or response to the First Amended Complaint pursuant to the Federal Rules of Civil Procedure; 4) Plaintiffs' motion to dismiss Counts 1 through 4 of their complaint (DE 34) is DENIED as moot; and 5) the STAY of this matter is LIFTED. Signed by Judge Karen K. Caldwell on 01/28/2025.(KJA)cc: COR

Docket last updated: 35 minutes ago
Tuesday, March 11, 2025
48 48 6 pgs order Order Terminate Motions Staying Case Tue 03/11 2:23 PM
ORDER: The Court hereby ORDERS that the CFPB's motion for an extension of time (DE44 ) to file a response to the First Amended Complaint is GRANTED as follows: 1) this action is STAYED until May 30, 2025; 2) the CFPB MUST FILE a response to Plaintiffs' First Amended Complaint on or before May 30, 2025; 3) the deadlines for Plaintiffs in this action to comply with the Rule are STAYED until further orders of the Court; the Court will establish new deadlines after consulting with the CFPB and Plaintiffs after the CFPB files its response to Plaintiffs' First Amended Complaint; and 4) the CFPB SHALL FILE a notice with the Court within 7 days of the Fifth Circuit's ruling in the Texas litigation. The Court further HEREBY ORDERS that Plaintiffs' motion for status conference (DE47 ) is DENIED, the Court seeing no need for a status conference until the CFPB's position regarding this litigation is clarified in its response to the First Amended Complaint. Signed by Judge Karen K. Caldwell on 03/11/2025.(KJA)
Related: [-]
Thursday, March 06, 2025
47 47 motion For Order Thu 03/06 1:37 PM
MOTION for Order by First Community Bank of the Heartland, Inc., First Southern National Bank, Kentucky Bankers Association, Morgantown Bank & Trust Company, The Farmers Bank of Milton, Ky., The Monticello Banking Company, The Peoples Bank, Marion, Kentucky, The Sacramento Deposit Bank For Status Conference(Senn, M.)
Related: [-]
Att: 1 Proposed Order Proposed Order
Thursday, February 13, 2025
utility Motion Submitted Thu 02/13 9:28 AM
***MOTION SUBMITTED TO CHAMBERS of Karen K. Caldwell for review: re44 MOTION for Extension of Time to File by Consumer Financial Protection Bureau, Rohit Chopra to Respond to Amended Complaint (KJA)
Related: [-]
Tuesday, February 11, 2025
46 46 respm Reply to Response to Motion Tue 02/11 4:14 PM
REPLY to Response to Motion re44 MOTION for Extension of Time to File by Consumer Financial Protection Bureau, Rohit Chopra to Respond to Amended Complaint filed by Consumer Financial Protection Bureau, Rohit Chopra. (Gorodetsky, Lauren)
Related: [-]
Friday, February 07, 2025
45 45 respm Response to Motion Fri 02/07 5:10 PM
RESPONSE to Motion re44 MOTION for Extension of Time to File by Consumer Financial Protection Bureau, Rohit Chopra to Respond to Amended Complaint filed by First Southern National Bank, Morgantown Bank & Trust Company, The Farmers Bank of Milton, Ky., The Peoples Bank, Marion, Kentucky, The Monticello Banking Company, The Sacramento Deposit Bank, Kentucky Bankers Association, First Community Bank of the Heartland, Inc..(Senn, M.)
Related: [-]
Att: 1 Exhibit Exh. 1 - Fifth Circuit Order Issuing Stay,
Att: 2 Proposed Order Proposed Order
Thursday, February 06, 2025
44 44 motion Extension of Time to File Document Thu 02/06 5:12 PM
MOTION for Extension of Time to File by Consumer Financial Protection Bureau, Rohit Chopra to Respond to Amended Complaint(Gorodetsky, Lauren)
Related: [-]
Att: 1 Proposed Order
Thursday, January 30, 2025
43 43 notice Other Notice Thu 01/30 1:05 PM
NOTICE by Consumer Financial Protection Bureau, Rohit Chopra of withdrawal of appearance (Bloom, Karen)
Related: [-]
Tuesday, January 28, 2025
42 42 cmp Amended Complaint Tue 01/28 10:46 AM
AMENDED COMPLAINT against Rohit Chopra, Consumer Financial Protection Bureau, filed by Kentucky Bankers Association, First Community Bank of the Heartland, Inc., The Sacramento Deposit Bank, The Monticello Banking Company, Citizens Deposit Bank of Arlington, Inc., First Southern National Bank, Morgantown Bank & Trust Company, The Farmers Bank of Milton, Ky., The Peoples Bank, Marion, Kentucky. Filed pursuant to Opinion & Order at DE41 .(KJA)
Related: [-]
Att: 1 Exhibit 1 - Dodd-Frank Section 1071,
Att: 2 Exhibit 2 - Proposed Rule 86FR56356,
Att: 3 Exhibit 3 - Final Rule,
Att: 4 Exhibit 4 - Statement on Enforcement,
Att: 5 Exhibit 5 - Election Form,
Att: 6 Exhibit 6 - Comments on Election Form
41 41 1 pgs order Memorandum Opinion and Order Terminate Motions Tue 01/28 10:25 AM
OPINION & ORDER: 1) Plaintiffs' motion to leave to file a First Amended Complaint (DE37 ) is GRANTED; 2) the Clerk of the Court is DIRECTED to file the tendered First Amended Complaint (DE37 -1) with accompanying exhibits (DE37 -2 7) into the record; 3) Defendants SHALL file an answer or response to the First Amended Complaint pursuant to the Federal Rules of Civil Procedure; 4) Plaintiffs' motion to dismiss Counts 1 through 4 of their complaint (DE34 ) is DENIED as moot; and 5) the STAY of this matter is LIFTED. Signed by Judge Karen K. Caldwell on 01/28/2025.(KJA)
Related: [-]
Friday, January 24, 2025
40 40 respoth Notice of Appearance Fri 01/24 3:51 PM
NOTICE OF APPEARANCE by Consumer Financial Protection Bureau, Rohit Chopra. (Gorodetsky, Lauren)
Related: [-]
Monday, January 06, 2025
39 39 notice Other Notice Mon 01/06 10:41 AM
NOTICE by Consumer Financial Protection Bureau, Rohit Chopra of Withdrawal of Appearance by Kevin E. Friedl (Friedl, Kevin)
Related: [-]
Friday, November 01, 2024
38 38 respoth Response Fri 11/01 3:44 PM
RESPONSE to37 Motion for Leave to File First Amended Complaint filed by Rohit Chopra, Consumer Financial Protection Bureau. (Friedl, Kevin)
Related: [-]
Friday, October 11, 2024
37 37 motion For Leave Fri 10/11 3:48 PM
MOTION for Leave by Citizens Deposit Bank of Arlington, Inc., First Community Bank of the Heartland, Inc., First Southern National Bank, Kentucky Bankers Association, Morgantown Bank & Trust Company, The Farmers Bank of Milton, Ky., The Monticello Banking Company, The Peoples Bank, Marion, Kentucky, The Sacramento Deposit Bank to File First Amended and Supplemental Complaint(Senn, M.)
Related: [-]
Att: 1 Amended Complaint,
Att: 2 Exhibit 1 - Dodd-Frank Section 1071,
Att: 3 Exhibit 2 - Proposed Rule 86FR56356,
Att: 4 Exhibit 3 - Final Rule,
Att: 5 Exhibit 4 - Statement on Enforcement,
Att: 6 Exhibit 5 - Election Form,
Att: 7 Exhibit 6 - Comments on Election Form,
Att: 8 Exhibit 7 - Guidance Request,
Att: 9 Proposed Order
Thursday, October 03, 2024
36 36 notice Notice of Filing Thu 10/03 3:35 PM
NOTICE OF FILING by Citizens Deposit Bank of Arlington, Inc., First Community Bank of the Heartland, Inc., First Southern National Bank, Kentucky Bankers Association, Morgantown Bank & Trust Company, The Farmers Bank of Milton, Ky., The Monticello Banking Company, The Peoples Bank, Marion, Kentucky, The Sacramento Deposit Bank re33 Memorandum Opinion & Order,, Staying Case,, Terminate Motions,34 MOTION Voluntary Dismissal Of Counts 1 through 4 and Lift Stay As To Count 5 re33 Memorandum Opinion & Order,, Staying Case,, Terminate Motions, by Citizens Deposit Bank of Arlington, Inc., First Community Bank of the Heartland, Inc., First(Senn, M.)
Related: [-]
Att: 1 Exhibit Exh. A - Texas Lawsuit - Final Judgment
Friday, September 20, 2024
35 35 respoth Response Fri 09/20 4:26 PM
RESPONSE to34 filed by Rohit Chopra, Consumer Financial Protection Bureau. (Bloom, Karen)
Related: [-]
Friday, August 30, 2024
34 34 motion Miscellaneous Relief Fri 08/30 4:13 PM
MOTION Voluntary Dismissal Of Counts 1 through 4 and Lift Stay As To Count 5 re33 Memorandum Opinion & Order,, Staying Case,, Terminate Motions, by Citizens Deposit Bank of Arlington, Inc., First Community Bank of the Heartland, Inc., First Southern National Bank, Kentucky Bankers Association, Morgantown Bank & Trust Company, The Farmers Bank of Milton, Ky., The Monticello Banking Company, The Peoples Bank, Marion, Kentucky, The Sacramento Deposit Bank(Senn, M.)
Related: [-]
Att: 1 Exhibit Exh. A - Texas Lawsuit - APA Opinion,
Att: 2 Exhibit Exh. B - Texas Lawsuit - Farm Credit Amended Complaint Motion,
Att: 3 Proposed Order Proposed Order
Thursday, August 08, 2024
33 33 6 pgs order Memorandum Opinion and Order Staying Case Terminate Motions Thu 08/08 10:37 AM
OPINION & ORDER: (1) Defendants' motion to maintain the stay is GRANTED (DE25 ); (2) This action is STAYED until the Texas District Court proceeds to final judgment; and (3) All other motions pending in this matter are DENIED AS MOOT. Signed by Judge Karen K. Caldwell on 8/7/2024.(MM)
Related: [-]
Friday, August 02, 2024
utility File Submitted Fri 08/02 9:16 AM
***FILE SUBMITTED TO CHAMBERS of Judge Caldwell for review:32 RESPONSE,31 REPLY (JCP)
Related: [-]
Thursday, August 01, 2024
32 32 respoth Response Thu 08/01 12:41 PM
RESPONSE to30 Motion for Oral Argument filed by Rohit Chopra, Consumer Financial Protection Bureau. (Friedl, Kevin)
Related: [-]
31 31 respoth Reply Thu 08/01 12:37 PM
REPLY to29 ,27 in support of Motion for Protective Order filed by Rohit Chopra, Consumer Financial Protection Bureau. (Friedl, Kevin)
Related: [-]
Thursday, July 25, 2024
30 30 motion Miscellaneous Relief Thu 07/25 8:32 AM
MOTION for Oral Argument re27 MOTION for Protective Order by Rohit Chopra, Consumer Financial Protection Bureau ,25 MOTION to Stay by Rohit Chopra, Consumer Financial Protection Bureau by Citizens Deposit Bank of Arlington, Inc., First Community Bank of the Heartland, Inc., First Southern National Bank, Kentucky Bankers Association, Morgantown Bank & Trust Company, The Farmers Bank of Milton, Ky., The Monticello Banking Company, The Peoples Bank, Marion, Kentucky, The Sacramento Deposit Bank(Senn, M.)
Related: [-]
Att: 1 Proposed Order
Thursday, July 18, 2024
29 29 respm Response in Opposition to Motion Thu 07/18 5:03 PM
RESPONSE in Opposition re27 MOTION for Protective Order by Rohit Chopra, Consumer Financial Protection Bureau filed by First Community Bank of the Heartland, Inc., First Southern National Bank, Kentucky Bankers Association, Morgantown Bank & Trust Company, The Farmers Bank of Milton, Ky., The Monticello Banking Company, The Peoples Bank, Marion, Kentucky, The Sacramento Deposit Bank.(Senn, M.)
Related: [-]
Att: 1 Exhibit Exh. A - Plaintiffs' Election Form,
Att: 2 Exhibit Exh. B - Guiltinan - lovett Email,
Att: 3 Exhibit Exh. C - Plaintiff's First Set Of Discovery To CFPB
Wednesday, July 10, 2024
utility File Submitted Wed 07/10 11:50 AM
***FILE SUBMITTED TO CHAMBERS of Karen K. Caldwell for review:27 MOTION for Protective Order by Rohit Chopra, Consumer Financial Protection Bureau (MM)
Related: [-]
Monday, July 08, 2024
28 28 respoth Reply Mon 07/08 12:34 PM
REPLY to26 ,25 in support of Motion to Stay filed by Rohit Chopra, Consumer Financial Protection Bureau. (Friedl, Kevin)
Related: [-]
Thursday, June 27, 2024
27 27 motion Protective Order Thu 06/27 4:13 PM
MOTION for Protective Order by Rohit Chopra, Consumer Financial Protection Bureau(Friedl, Kevin)
Related: [-]
Att: 1 Proposed Order
Monday, June 24, 2024
26 26 respm Response in Opposition to Motion Mon 06/24 10:12 AM
RESPONSE in Opposition re25 MOTION to Stay by Rohit Chopra, Consumer Financial Protection Bureau filed by First Community Bank of the Heartland, Inc., First Southern National Bank, Kentucky Bankers Association, Morgantown Bank & Trust Company, The Farmers Bank of Milton, Ky., The Monticello Banking Company, The Peoples Bank, Marion, Kentucky, The Sacramento Deposit Bank.(Senn, M.)
Related: [-]
Att: 1 Exhibit Exh. A - Plaintiffs' Election Form,
Att: 2 Exhibit Exh. B - 2024 Email Exchange Regarding Election Form,
Att: 3 Exhibit Exh. C - Plaintiffs' First Set Of Discovery To CFPB,
Att: 4 Exhibit Exh. D - PACER Docket Report Texas Litigation,
Att: 5 Exhibit Exh. E - Schenk Declaration
Tuesday, June 04, 2024
25 25 motion Stay Tue 06/04 2:50 PM
MOTION to Stay by Rohit Chopra, Consumer Financial Protection Bureau(Friedl, Kevin)
Related: [-]
Att: 1 Proposed Order
Wednesday, May 22, 2024
24 24 notice Other Notice Wed 05/22 9:30 AM
NOTICE by The Monticello Banking Company re23 Staying Case,,, Order,,(Senn, M.)
Related: [-]
Att: 1 Exhibit SCOTUS Opinion Case 22-448
Wednesday, January 10, 2024
23 23 order Staying Case Order Wed 01/10 10:04 AM
ORDER: 1. This action is STAYED pending the Supreme Courts decision in Consumer Financial Protection Bureau v. Community Financial Services. Ass'n of America, Ltd., 143 S. Ct. 978, 215 L. Ed. 2d 104 (2023) (CFPB), 2. The plaintiffs shall file a notice with this Court within seven days of the Supreme Court's decision in CFPB. 3. Any party may at any time request the Court lift this stay prior to the Supreme Court's decision by filing a motion to that effect.. Signed by Judge Karen K. Caldwell on 1/10/2024.(MM)
Related: [-]
Monday, October 16, 2023
22 22 answer Answer to Complaint Mon 10/16 8:51 PM
ANSWER to1 Complaint,,, by Rohit Chopra, Consumer Financial Protection Bureau.(Friedl, Kevin)
Related: [-]
21 21 respoth Notice of Appearance Mon 10/16 5:28 PM
NOTICE OF APPEARANCE by Rohit Chopra, Consumer Financial Protection Bureau. (Bloom, Karen)
Related: [-]
Thursday, September 14, 2023
20 20 order Judgment Thu 09/14 3:10 PM
JUDGMENT: In accordance with the opinion and order entered on this date, the Courthereby ORDERS and ADJUDGES as follows:1) Plaintiffs' motion for injunctive relief is GRANTED (DE 15); and2) The Consumer Financial Protection Bureau is ENJOINED from enforcing theSmall Business Lending Rule until the Supreme Court issues an opinion rulingthat the funding structure of the CFPB is constitutional;3) The Court will not require security due to the lack of evidence that the ConsumerFinancial Protection Bureau will incur any monetary costs or damages because ofthe preliminary injunction; and4) This matter is APPEALABLE pursuant to 12 U.S.C. § 1292.. Signed by Judge Karen K. Caldwell on 9/14/2023.(MM)
Related: [-]
19 19 6 pgs order Memorandum Opinion and Order Terminate Motions Thu 09/14 3:08 PM
OPINION & ORDER: (1) Plaintiffs' motion for injunctive relief is GRANTED (DE15 ); (2) The Consumer Financial Protection Bureau is ENJOINED from enforcing the Small Business Lending Rule until the Supreme Court issues an opinion ruling that the funding structure of the CFPB is constitutional; and (3) The Court will not require security due to the lack of evidence that the Consumer Financial Protection Bureau will incur any monetary costs or damages because of the preliminary injunction. Signed by Judge Karen K. Caldwell on 9/14/2023.(MM)
Related: [-]
Tuesday, September 12, 2023
18 18 respm Reply to Response to Motion Tue 09/12 6:23 PM
REPLY to Response to Motion re15 MOTION for Preliminary Injunction by Citizens Deposit Bank of Arlington, Inc., First Community Bank of the Heartland, Inc., First Southern National Bank, Kentucky Bankers Association, Morgantown Bank & Trust Company, The Farmers Bank of Milton, Ky., filed by Citizens Deposit Bank of Arlington, Inc., First Community Bank of the Heartland, Inc., First Southern National Bank, Kentucky Bankers Association, Morgantown Bank & Trust Company, The Farmers Bank of Milton, Ky., The Monticello Banking Company, The Peoples Bank, Marion, Kentucky, The Sacramento Deposit Bank.(Senn, M.)
Related: [-]
Att: 1 Exhibit Exh. 19 - CFPB v. Credit Acceptance,
Att: 2 Exhibit Exh. 20 - Chamber of Commerce v. CFPB
Tuesday, September 05, 2023
17 17 respm Response in Opposition to Motion Tue 09/05 4:58 PM
RESPONSE in Opposition re15 MOTION for Preliminary Injunction by Citizens Deposit Bank of Arlington, Inc., First Community Bank of the Heartland, Inc., First Southern National Bank, Kentucky Bankers Association, Morgantown Bank & Trust Company, The Farmers Bank of Milton, Ky., filed by Rohit Chopra, Consumer Financial Protection Bureau. (Friedl, Kevin)
Related: [-]
Tuesday, August 22, 2023
16 16 1 pgs order Order ~Util - Set Motion and R&R Deadlines/Hearings Tue 08/22 4:33 PM
ORDER re15 MOTION for Preliminary Injunction: This matter is before the Court on the plaintiffs' motion for a preliminary injunction.(DE 15.) The Court hereby ORDERS that, if the defendants object to the motion, they MUST FILE a response by Tuesday, September 5th, 2023.. Signed by Judge Karen K. Caldwell on 8/22/2023.(MM)
Related: [-]
utility Motion Submitted Tue 08/22 10:21 AM
***MOTION SUBMITTED TO CHAMBERS of Karen K. Caldwell for review: re15 MOTION for Preliminary Injunction by Citizens Deposit Bank of Arlington, Inc., First Community Bank of the Heartland, Inc., First Southern National Bank, Kentucky Bankers Association, Morgantown Bank & Trust Company, The Farmers Bank of Milton, Ky., (KJA)
Related: [-]
Monday, August 21, 2023
15 15 motion Preliminary Injunction Mon 08/21 6:11 PM
MOTION for Preliminary Injunction by Citizens Deposit Bank of Arlington, Inc., First Community Bank of the Heartland, Inc., First Southern National Bank, Kentucky Bankers Association, Morgantown Bank & Trust Company, The Farmers Bank of Milton, Ky., The Monticello Banking Company, The Peoples Bank, Marion, Kentucky, The Sacramento Deposit Bank(Senn, M.)
Related: [-]
Att: 1 Memorandum in Support Plaintiffs' Memo In Support Of Prelim. Inj..,
Att: 2 Exhibit Exh. 7 - Monticello Bank Decl.,
Att: 3 Exhibit Exh. 8 - Citizens Deposit Decl.,
Att: 4 Exhibit Exh. 9 - First Community Decl.,
Att: 5 Exhibit Exh. 10 - First Southern Decl.,
Att: 6 Exhibit Exh. 11 - Morgantown Bank Decl,
Att: 7 Exhibit Exh. 12 - Farmers Bank Decl.,
Att: 8 Exhibit Exh. 13 - Peoples Bank Decl.,
Att: 9 Exhibit Exh. 14 - Sacramento Bank Decl.,
Att: 10 Exhibit Exh. 15 - KBA Decl.,
Att: 11 Exhibit Exh. 16 - KBA Seminar Materials,
Att: 12 Exhibit Exh. 17 - KBA Comment Letter,
Att: 13 Exhibit Exh. 18 - ABA Decl.,
Att: 14 Proposed Order Proposed Injunction Order
14 14 respoth Notice of Appearance Mon 08/21 9:39 AM
NOTICE OF APPEARANCE by Rohit Chopra, Consumer Financial Protection Bureau. (Friedl, Kevin)
Related: [-]
Friday, August 11, 2023
12 12 misc Disclosure Statement pursuant to FRCP 7.1 Fri 08/11 5:42 PM
FRCP 7.1 DISCLOSURE STATEMENT by Kentucky Bankers Association. (APR)
Related: [-]
11 11 misc Disclosure Statement pursuant to FRCP 7.1 Fri 08/11 5:41 PM
FRCP 7.1 DISCLOSURE STATEMENT by The Sacramento Deposit Bank identifying Corporate Parent Sacramento Bancorp for The Sacramento Deposit Bank. (APR)
Related: [-]
10 10 misc Disclosure Statement pursuant to FRCP 7.1 Fri 08/11 5:39 PM
FRCP 7.1 DISCLOSURE STATEMENT by The Peoples Bank, Marion, Kentucky identifying Corporate Parent Peoples-Marion Bancorp, Inc. for The Peoples Bank, Marion, Kentucky. (APR)
Related: [-]
9 9 misc Disclosure Statement pursuant to FRCP 7.1 Fri 08/11 5:37 PM
FRCP 7.1 DISCLOSURE STATEMENT by The Farmers Bank of Milton, Ky. identifying Corporate Parent Farmers Financial Corporation for The Farmers Bank of Milton, Ky. (APR)
Related: [-]
8 8 misc Disclosure Statement pursuant to FRCP 7.1 Fri 08/11 5:35 PM
FRCP 7.1 DISCLOSURE STATEMENT by Morgantown Bank & Trust Company identifying Corporate Parent Morgantown Deposit Bancorp Inc. for Morgantown Bank & Trust Company. (APR)
Related: [-]
7 7 misc Disclosure Statement pursuant to FRCP 7.1 Fri 08/11 5:34 PM
FRCP 7.1 DISCLOSURE STATEMENT by First Southern National Bank identifying Corporate Parent First Southern Bancorp, Inc. for First Southern National Bank. (APR)
Related: [-]
6 6 misc Disclosure Statement pursuant to FRCP 7.1 Fri 08/11 5:32 PM
FRCP 7.1 DISCLOSURE STATEMENT by First Community Bank of the Heartland, Inc. identifying Corporate Parent First Trust Financial Corporation for First Community Bank of the Heartland, Inc. (APR)
Related: [-]
5 5 misc Disclosure Statement pursuant to FRCP 7.1 Fri 08/11 5:30 PM
FRCP 7.1 DISCLOSURE STATEMENT by Citizens Deposit Bank of Arlington, Inc. identifying Corporate Parent Carlisle Bancorp, Inc. for Citizens Deposit Bank of Arlington, Inc. (APR)
Related: [-]
4 4 misc Disclosure Statement pursuant to FRCP 7.1 Fri 08/11 5:28 PM
FRCP 7.1 DISCLOSURE STATEMENT by The Monticello Banking Company identifying Corporate Parent Monticello Bankshares, Inc. for The Monticello Banking Company. (APR)
Related: [-]
3 3 service Summons Issued/Reissued Fri 08/11 5:24 PM
Summons Issued as to Rohit Chopra, U.S. Attorney, the U.S Attorney General and returned to counsel electronically for service.(APR)
Related: [-]
Att: 1 Summons - US Attorney,
Att: 2 Summons - US Attorney General
2 2 service Summons Issued/Reissued Fri 08/11 5:21 PM
Summons Issued as to Consumer Financial Protection Bureau, U.S. Attorney, the U.S Attorney General and returned to counsel electronically for service.(APR)
Related: [-]
Att: 1 Summons - US Attorney,
Att: 2 Summons - US Attorney General
1 1 30+ pgs cmp Complaint Fri 08/11 5:16 PM
COMPLAINT ( Filing fee $402; receipt number AKYEDC-5623366), filed by Kentucky Bankers Association, First Community Bank of the Heartland, Inc., The Sacramento Deposit Bank, Citizens Deposit Bank of Arlington, Inc., The Monticello Banking Company, First Southern National Bank, Morgantown Bank & Trust Company, The Farmers Bank of Milton, Ky., The Peoples Bank, Marion, Kentucky.(APR)
Related: [-]
Att: 1 Exhibit 1 - Dodd Frank Section 1071,
Att: 2 Exhibit 2 - CFPB Final Rule,
Att: 3 Exhibit 3 - CFPB Data Points Chart,
Att: 4 Exhibit 4 - CFPB Filing Inst. Guide,
Att: 5 Exhibit 5 - Texas Preliminary Injunction,
Att: 6 Exhibit 6 - CFPB Enforcement Guide,
Att: 7 Civil Cover Sheet,
Att: 8 Summons CFPB,
Att: 9 Summons CFPB - to USAG DC,
Att: 10 Summons CFPB - to US Atty EDKy,
Att: 11 Summons Chopra,
Att: 12 Summons Chopra - to USAG,
Att: 13 Summons Chopra - to US Atty EDKy
misc Conflict Check Fri 08/11 5:43 PM
Conflict Check run. (APR)
Related: [-]
utility File Submitted Fri 08/11 5:44 PM
***FILE SUBMITTED TO CHAMBERS of Judge Karen K. Caldwell for review:1 Complaint (APR)
Related: [-]