Georgia Northern District Court
Judge:Steve C Jones
Referred: Walter E Johnson
Case #: 1:23-cv-03556
Nature of Suit480 Other Statutes - Consumer Credit
Cause15:1681 Fair Credit Reporting Act
Case Filed:Aug 10, 2023
Terminated:Nov 06, 2024
Last checked: Tuesday Feb 06, 2024 3:31 AM EST
Defendant
Equifax Information Services LLC
Represented By
Norman Charles Campbell, II
Equifax, Inc.
contact info
Defendant
Experian Information Solutions, Inc.
Represented By
Rebecca Crawford Reynolds
Jones Day - Atlanta
contact info
Defendant
Trans Union, LLC
Represented By
Paul W Sheldon
Quilling Selander Lownds Winslett Moser, P.C.
contact info
Plaintiff
Michelle Lynn Criss
Represented By
Joseph Powell McClelland, III
Joseph P. Mcclelland, LLC
contact info


Docket last updated: 3 hours ago
Thursday, January 16, 2025
43 43 misc Stipulation of Dismissal Thu 01/16 10:18 AM
STIPULATION of Dismissal as to Equifax only by Michelle Lynn Criss. (McClelland, Joseph)
Related: [-]
Wednesday, November 06, 2024
42 42 1 pgs order Order ~Util - Set Submission Deadline Wed 11/06 4:12 PM
ORDER DISMISSING this action without prejudice to the right, upon good cause shown within sixty (60) days to reopen the action if settlement is not consummated. The Clerk is directed to ADMINISTRATIVELY TERMINATE this action. If this matter is not reopened by the parties within sixty (60) days it will be deemed to have been dismissed with prejudice. Signed by Judge Steve C. Jones on 11/06/2024. (ddm)
Related: [-]
utility Terminate Civil Case Wed 11/06 4:14 PM
Civil Case Terminated. Magistrate Judge Walter E. Johnson terminated from case. (ddm)
Related: [-]
Wednesday, October 30, 2024
41 41 misc Stipulation of Dismissal Wed 10/30 3:06 PM
STIPULATION of Dismissal as to Experian only by Michelle Lynn Criss. (McClelland, Joseph)
Related: [-]
misc Clerks Entry of Dismissal Wed 10/30 3:23 PM
Clerk's Entry of Dismissal APPROVING41 Stipulation of Dismissal With Prejudice as to Experian Information Solutions, Inc. only pursuant to Fed.R.Civ.P.41(a)(1)(A)(ii), with both sides bearing their own fees and costs. (ddm)
Related: [-]
Tuesday, October 29, 2024
40 40 notice Notice of Settlement Tue 10/29 3:17 PM
NOTICE of Settlement as to Equifax only by Michelle Lynn Criss (McClelland, Joseph)
Related: [-]
Friday, September 27, 2024
39 39 discov Certificate of Service Fri 09/27 1:14 PM
CERTIFICATE OF SERVICE Notice of Intent to Serve Subpoena by Michelle Lynn Criss.(McClelland, Joseph)
Related: [-]
Friday, September 20, 2024
38 38 2 pgs order Order on Motion for Extension of Time to Complete Discovery Fri 09/20 10:07 AM
ORDER granting37 Motion for Extension of Time to Complete Discovery. Discovery ends on 12/24/2024. Motions for summary judgment no later than 1/23/2025. Proposed Pretrial Order due by 1/23/2025, or within thirty days from a final ruling on any motion for summary judgment that is not dispositive of all claims advanced by the parties. Signed by Magistrate Judge Walter E. Johnson on 9/20/24. (klb)
Related: [-]
Thursday, September 19, 2024
37 37 motion Extension of Time to Complete Discovery Thu 09/19 3:22 PM
Joint MOTION for Extension of Time to Complete Discovery by Michelle Lynn Criss.(McClelland, Joseph)
Related: [-]
Att: 1 Text of Proposed Order Proposed Order
Wednesday, August 28, 2024
36 36 misc Stipulation of Dismissal Wed 08/28 10:51 AM
STIPULATION of Dismissal as to Trans Union, LLC Only by Michelle Lynn Criss. (McClelland, Joseph)
Related: [-]
misc Clerks Entry of Dismissal Wed 08/28 11:17 AM
Clerk's Entry of Dismissal APPROVING36 Stipulation of Dismissal With Prejudice as to Trans Union, LLC only pursuant to Fed.R.Civ.P.41(a)(1)(A)(ii). Both sides are to bear their own fees and costs. (ddm)
Related: [-]
Wednesday, July 17, 2024
35 35 notice Notice of Settlement Wed 07/17 5:45 PM
NOTICE of Settlement as to Trans Union, LLC Only by Michelle Lynn Criss (McClelland, Joseph)
Related: [-]
Thursday, June 06, 2024
order Order on Motion to Withdraw as Attorney Thu 06/06 9:30 AM
ORAL ORDER granting34 Motion to Withdraw as Attorney. Attorney Rebecca Crawford Reynolds terminated. Entered by Magistrate Judge Walter E. Johnson on 6/6/24. (klb)
Related: [-]
Wednesday, June 05, 2024
34 34 motion Withdraw As Attorney Wed 06/05 4:32 PM
MOTION to Withdraw Rebecca Crawford Reynolds as Attorneyby Experian Information Solutions, Inc.. Related [+]
Related: [-] ynolds, Rebecca
Tuesday, June 04, 2024
33 33 discov Certificate of Service Tue 06/04 1:16 PM
CERTIFICATE OF SERVICE Notice of Intent to Serve Subpoena by Michelle Lynn Criss.(McClelland, Joseph)
Related: [-]
Monday, June 03, 2024
32 32 notice Notice of Appearance Mon 06/03 5:08 PM
NOTICE of Appearance by Grant Edward Schnell on behalf of Experian Information Solutions, Inc. (Schnell, Grant)
Related: [-]
Friday, May 31, 2024
31 31 discov Certificate of Service Fri 05/31 6:02 PM
CERTIFICATE OF SERVICE of Discovery Requests to Plaintiff by Trans Union, LLC.(Sheldon, Paul)
Related: [-]
Wednesday, April 24, 2024
30 30 discov Certificate of Service Wed 04/24 8:03 PM
CERTIFICATE OF SERVICE of Rule 26(a)(1) Disclosures by Experian Information Solutions, Inc. Related [+]
Related: [-] ynolds, Rebecca
Thursday, February 08, 2024
29 29 discov Initial Disclosures Thu 02/08 12:55 PM
Initial Disclosures by Equifax Information Services LLC.(Campbell, Norman)
Related: [-]
Monday, February 05, 2024
28 28 discov Certificate of Service Mon 02/05 4:50 PM
CERTIFICATE OF SERVICE of Rule 26(a)(1) Initial Disclosures by Trans Union, LLC.(Sheldon, Paul)
Related: [-]
Thursday, January 25, 2024
27 27 order Notice to Parties Regarding Summary Judgment Motions Thu 01/25 9:57 AM
NOTICE to Parties Regarding Summary Judgment Motions. Signed by Magistrate Judge Walter E. Johnson on 1/25/24. (klb)
Related: [-]
26 26 order Scheduling Order Thu 01/25 9:57 AM
SCHEDULING ORDER: re:25 Joint Preliminary Report and Discovery Plan. As an initial matter, the undersigned observes that mediation could be successful here, given the parties' indication that there is a possibility of settlement. The Court offers the services of its Magistrate Judges to mediate cases at no cost. Should the parties desire to mediate, they may contact the chambers of the Honorable Russell G. Vineyard (404-215-1375), Chief United States Magistrate Judge. Discovery ends on 9/25/2024. Motions under Local Rule 7.1(A)(2) including motions to amend pleadings due by 2/26/2024. Motions for summary judgment no later than 10/25/2024. Proposed Pretrial Order due by 10/25/2024, or within thirty days from a final ruling on any motion for summary judgment that is not dispositive of all claims advanced by the parties. Signed by Magistrate Judge Walter E. Johnson on 1/25/24. (klb)
Related: [-]
Wednesday, January 24, 2024
25 25 misc Joint Preliminary Report and Discovery Plan Wed 01/24 3:07 PM
JOINT PRELIMINARY REPORT AND DISCOVERY PLAN filed by Michelle Lynn Criss. (McClelland, Joseph)
Related: [-]
24 24 discov Certificate of Service Wed 01/24 9:11 AM
CERTIFICATE OF SERVICE of Plaintiff's Initial Disclosures by Michelle Lynn Criss.(McClelland, Joseph)
Related: [-]
Wednesday, January 10, 2024
23 23 answer Answer to Amended Complaint Wed 01/10 10:28 PM
ANSWER to4 Amended Complaint by Equifax Information Services LLC.(Campbell, Norman)
Related: [-]
Wednesday, December 27, 2023
order Order on Motion for Extension of Time to Answer Wed 12/27 10:39 AM
ORAL ORDER granting22 Motion for Extension of Time to File Answer re4 Amended Complaint. Equifax Information Services LLC Answer due 1/10/2024. Entered by Magistrate Judge Walter E. Johnson on 12/27/23. (klb)
Related: [-]
Friday, December 22, 2023
22 22 motion Extension of Time to File Answer to Complaint Fri 12/22 6:47 PM
Second MOTION for Extension of Time to File Answer re4 Amended Complaint, by Equifax Information Services LLC. (Campbell, Norman)
Related: [-]
21 21 answer Answer to Amended Complaint Fri 12/22 5:15 PM
ANSWER to4 Amended Complaint by Experian Information Solutions, Inc. Related [+]
Related: [-] ynolds, Rebecca
Friday, December 15, 2023
20 20 2 pgs order Order on Motion for Extension of Time Fri 12/15 11:54 AM
ORDER granting19 Motion to extend Deadline for 26(f) Conference . IT IS HEREBY ORDERED that the 26(f) Conference deadline be extended by thirty (30) days through and including January 10, 2024. Signed by Magistrate Judge Walter E. Johnson on 12/15/23. (klb)
Related: [-]
Friday, December 08, 2023
19 19 motion Extension of Time Fri 12/08 9:53 AM
Joint MOTION for Extension of Time Extend Deadline for 26(f) Conference by Michelle Lynn Criss.(McClelland, Joseph)
Related: [-]
Att: 1 Text of Proposed Order Proposed Order
Monday, November 27, 2023
order Order on Motion for Extension of Time to Answer Mon 11/27 3:49 PM
ORAL ORDER granting16 Motion for Extension of Time to File Answer re4 Amended Complaint. Equifax Information Services LLC Answer due 12/27/2023. Entered by Magistrate Judge Walter E. Johnson on 11/27/23. (klb)
Related: [-]
Wednesday, November 22, 2023
18 18 misc Certificate of Interested Persons/Corporate Disclosure Statement Wed 11/22 10:26 AM
Certificate of Interested Persons and Corporate Disclosure Statement by Trans Union, LLC identifying Corporate Parent TransUnion, Corporate Parent TransUnion Intermediate Holdings, Inc., Other Affiliate T. Rowe Price Goup, Inc. for Trans Union, LLC. (Sheldon, Paul)
Related: [-]
17 17 answer Answer to Amended Complaint Wed 11/22 10:24 AM
ANSWER to4 Amended Complaint by Trans Union, LLC. Discovery ends on 4/22/2024.(Sheldon, Paul)
Related: [-]
Tuesday, November 21, 2023
16 16 motion Extension of Time to File Answer to Complaint Tue 11/21 2:35 PM
Unopposed MOTION for Extension of Time to File Answer re4 Amended Complaint, by Equifax Information Services LLC. (Campbell, Norman)
Related: [-]
15 15 misc Certificate of Interested Persons/Corporate Disclosure Statement Tue 11/21 2:22 PM
Certificate of Interested Persons and Corporate Disclosure Statement by Equifax Information Services LLC identifying Corporate Parent EQUIFAX INC for Equifax Information Services LLC. (Campbell, Norman)
Related: [-]
14 14 notice Notice of Appearance Tue 11/21 2:20 PM
NOTICE of Appearance by Norman Charles Campbell, II on behalf of Equifax Information Services LLC (Campbell, Norman)
Related: [-]
Monday, November 20, 2023
13 13 2 pgs order Order on Motion for Extension of Time to Answer Mon 11/20 12:01 PM
ORDER granting11 Motion for Extension of Time to File Answer or Otherwise Respond to Plaintiff's Amended Complaint . Experian Information Solutions, Inc. Answer due 12/22/2023. Signed by Magistrate Judge Walter E. Johnson on 11/20/23. (klb)
Related: [-]
12 12 misc Certificate of Interested Persons/Corporate Disclosure Statement Mon 11/20 11:46 AM
Certificate of Interested Persons and Corporate Disclosure Statement by Experian Information Solutions, Inc. identifying Corporate Parent Experian plc, Other Affiliate Opt-Out Services LLC, Other Affiliate Central Source LLC, Other Affiliate Online Data Exchange LLC, Other Affiliate New Management Services LLC, Other Affiliate VantageScore Solutions LLC for Experian Information Solutions, Inc.. Related [+]
Related: [-] ynolds, Rebecca
11 11 motion Extension of Time to File Answer to Complaint Mon 11/20 11:41 AM
Consent MOTION for Extension of Time to File Answer or Otherwise Respond to Plaintiff's Amended Complaint by Experian Information Solutions, Inc.. Related [+]
Related: [-] ynolds, Rebecca
Att: 1 Text of Proposed Order
Friday, November 03, 2023
10 10 service Return of Service Executed Fri 11/03 10:08 AM
Return of Service Executed by Michelle Lynn Criss. Experian Information Solutions, Inc. served on 11/2/2023, answer due 11/24/2023. (McClelland, Joseph)
Related: [-]
9 9 service Return of Service Executed Fri 11/03 10:07 AM
Return of Service Executed by Michelle Lynn Criss. Trans Union, LLC served on 11/2/2023, answer due 11/24/2023. (McClelland, Joseph)
Related: [-]
8 8 service Return of Service Executed Fri 11/03 10:06 AM
Return of Service Executed by Michelle Lynn Criss. Equifax Information Services LLC served on 11/2/2023, answer due 11/24/2023. (McClelland, Joseph)
Related: [-]
Tuesday, October 10, 2023
7 7 service Electronic Summons Issued Tue 10/10 8:59 AM
Electronic Summons Issued as to Equifax Information Services LLC. (ddm)
Related: [-]
Friday, October 06, 2023
6 6 service Proposed Summons Fri 10/06 3:35 PM
PROPOSED SUMMONS filed by Michelle Lynn Criss as to Equifax (McClelland, Joseph)
Related: [-]
Tuesday, August 15, 2023
5 5 misc Certificate of Interested Persons/Corporate Disclosure Statement Tue 08/15 8:52 AM
Certificate of Interested Persons by Michelle Lynn Criss. (McClelland, Joseph)
Related: [-]
4 4 cmp Amended Complaint Tue 08/15 8:34 AM
First AMENDED COMPLAINT against Equifax Information Services LLC, Experian Information Solutions, Inc., Trans Union, LLCwith Jury Demand filed by Michelle Lynn Cross.(McClelland, Joseph)
Related: [-]
Thursday, August 10, 2023
3 3 service Electronic Summons Issued Fri 08/11 8:42 AM
Electronic Summons Issued as to Trans Union, LLC. (pdt)
Related: [-]
2 2 service Electronic Summons Issued Fri 08/11 8:40 AM
Electronic Summons Issued as to Experian Information Solutions, Inc.. (pdt)
Related: [-]
1 1 cmp Complaint Fri 08/11 8:38 AM
COMPLAINT with Jury Demand filed by Michelle Lynn Cross. (Filing fee $402, receipt number AGANDC-12807302) (pdt)
Related: [-]
Att: 1 Civil Cover Sheet