Minnesota District Court
Judge:Nancy E Brasel
Referred: Elizabeth Cowan Wright
Case #: 0:23-cv-02493
Nature of Suit480 Other Statutes - Consumer Credit
Cause15:1692 Fair Debt Collection Act
Case Filed:Aug 12, 2023
Terminated:Feb 20, 2024
Last checked: Friday Feb 09, 2024 3:33 AM CST
Defendant
Hanbery & Turner, P.A.
Hanbery & Turner, P.A. 33 South 6th St Suite 4160
Minneapolis, MN 55402
Represented By
Christopher R Morris
Bassford Remele
contact info
Peggah Navab
Bassford Remele PA
contact info
Plaintiff
Vanshelli Price
Represented By
Thomas J Lyons, Jr
Consumer Justice Center P.A.
contact info
Ryan D. Peterson
Peterson Legal, PLLC
contact info


Docket last updated: 03/18/2025 11:59 PM CDT
Tuesday, February 20, 2024
21 21 1 pgs order Order Dismissing Case Tue 02/20 11:58 AM
ORDER DISMISSING CASE re19 Stipulation of Dismissal. Signed by Judge Nancy E. Brasel on 2/20/2024. (KMW)
Related: [-]
20 20 misc Proposed Order to Judge re Stipulation Tue 02/20 10:59 AM
PROPOSED ORDER TO JUDGE re19 Stipulation of Dismissal. (Morris, Christopher)
Related: [-]
19 19 misc Stipulation of Dismissal Tue 02/20 10:58 AM
STIPULATION of Dismissal with Prejudice by Hanbery & Turner, P.A.. Jointly Signed by Vanshelli Price. (Morris, Christopher)
Related: [-]
Thursday, January 18, 2024
18 18 order Order/Notice of Hearing/Deadlines (Setting/Resetting) Thu 01/18 4:05 PM
(Text-Only) ORDER/NOTICE:In view of the Notice of Settlement, the Settlement Conference that was scheduled for 1/30/2024 is CANCELLED. Ordered by Magistrate Judge Elizabeth Cowan Wright on 1/18/2024.(TMA)
Related: [-]
Tuesday, January 09, 2024
17 17 notice Notice of Settlement Tue 01/09 8:26 AM
NOTICE of Settlement Between the Parties by Vanshelli Price (Lyons, Thomas)
Related: [-]
Wednesday, November 29, 2023
16 16 order Order/Notice of Hearing/Deadlines (Setting/Resetting) Wed 11/29 3:13 PM
ORDER/NOTICE OF RESCHEDULED SETTLEMENT CONFERENCE: Confidential Letter to Court due by 1/23/2024. Parties are directed to Meet and Confer by 1/16/2024. Settlement Conference set for 1/30/2024 at 09:00 AM in Courtroom 3C (STP) before Magistrate Judge Elizabeth Cowan Wright. Signed by Magistrate Judge Elizabeth Cowan Wright on 11/29/2023.(TMA)
Related: [-]
15 15 minutes Status Conference Wed 11/29 3:07 PM
(Text-Only) MINUTE ENTRY for proceedings held before Magistrate Judge Elizabeth Cowan Wright on 11/29/2023: Status Conference. No Digital Recording Telephone Conference Time: 11:30 a.m. 11:38 a.m. Total Time: 8 minutes APPEARANCES: For Plaintiff(s): Ryan Peterson For Defendant(s): Peggah Navab PROCEEDINGS: The parties provided an update as to settlement discussions and discovery. The Court will reset the settlement conference for the week of January 29, 2024, or as soon thereafter as works for the Court and parties. (TMA)
Related: [-]
14 14 order Protective Order Wed 11/29 7:34 AM
DOCUMENT FILED IN ERROR - INCORRECT CASE - PROTECTIVE ORDER Signed by Magistrate Judge Leo I. Brisbois on 11/28/2023.(JLB) Modified text on 11/29/2023 (MMP)
Related: [-]
notice Notice of Docketing Correction Wed 11/29 3:24 PM
NOTICE OF DOCKETING CORRECTION - DOCUMENT FILED IN ERROR - DOCUMENT FILED IN INCORRECT CASE for14 Protective Order (MMP)
Related: [-]
Wednesday, November 01, 2023
13 13 order Order/Notice of Hearing/Deadlines (Setting/Resetting) Wed 11/01 4:25 PM
ORDER/NOTICE: Confidential Letter to Court due by 1/18/2024. Parties are directed to Meet and Confer by 1/11/2024. Settlement Conference set for 1/25/2024 at 09:00 AM in Courtroom 3C (STP) before Magistrate Judge Elizabeth Cowan Wright. Signed by Magistrate Judge Elizabeth Cowan Wright on 11/1/2023.(TMA)
Related: [-]
12 12 order Scheduling Order Wed 11/01 4:17 PM
SCHEDULING ORDER: Settlement Conference set for 1/25/2024 at 09:00 AM in Courtroom 3C (STP) before Magistrate Judge Elizabeth Cowan Wright. Status Conference set for 11/29/2023 at 11:30 AM before Magistrate Judge Elizabeth Cowan Wright. Amended Pleadings due by 1/2/2024. Fact Discovery due by 4/1/2024. Expert Discovery due by 6/3/2024. Motions (non-disp) due 6/15/2024. Motions (disp) due by 8/1/2024. Ready for trial due by 12/2/2024. Signed by Magistrate Judge Elizabeth Cowan Wright on 11/1/2023.(TMA)
Related: [-]
11 11 minutes Pretrial Conference - Initial Wed 11/01 3:58 PM
(Text-Only) MINUTE ENTRY for proceedings held before Magistrate Judge Elizabeth Cowan Wright on 11/1/2023: Rule 16 Pretrial Conference. No Digital Recording , Courtroom Telephone Conference Time: 1:00 p.m. 1:15 p.m. Total Time: 15 minutes APPEARANCES: For Plaintiff(s): Thomas Lyons, Jr. For Defendant(s): Peggah Navab PROCEEDINGS: Pretrial Scheduling Order to be issued. (TMA)
Related: [-]
Tuesday, October 31, 2023
10 10 notice Notice of Appearance Tue 10/31 1:04 PM
NOTICE of Appearance by Peggah Navab on behalf of Hanbery & Turner, P.A.. (Navab, Peggah)
Related: [-]
Wednesday, October 25, 2023
9 9 misc Rule 26(f) Report Wed 10/25 11:25 AM
REPORT of Rule 26(f) Planning Meeting. Filed by Vanshelli Price. Jointly Signed by Hanbery & Turner PA.(Lyons, Thomas)
Related: [-]
Monday, October 16, 2023
8 8 order Order/Notice of Hearing/Deadlines (Setting/Resetting) Mon 10/16 11:53 AM
ORDER/NOTICE: Rule 26 Meeting Report due by 10/25/2023. Pretrial Conference set for 11/1/2023 at 01:00 PM before Magistrate Judge Elizabeth Cowan Wright. Signed by Magistrate Judge Elizabeth Cowan Wright on 10/16/2023.(TMA)
Related: [-]
Att: 1 Consent Form
Tuesday, September 05, 2023
7 7 discov Rule 7.1 - Disclosure Statement Tue 09/05 4:25 PM
RULE 7.1 DISCLOSURE STATEMENT. There is no parent corporation, publicly held corporation owning 10 percent or more of its stock, or any subsidiaries to report for Hanbery & Turner, P.A.. (Morris, Christopher)
Related: [-]
6 6 answer Answer to Complaint Tue 09/05 4:19 PM
ANSWER to Complaint filed by Hanbery & Turner, P.A.. (Morris, Christopher)
Related: [-]
Tuesday, August 15, 2023
5 5 service Summons Returned Executed Tue 08/15 5:43 PM
SUMMONS Returned Executed by Vanshelli Price. Hanbery & Turner, P.A. served on 8/14/2023, answer due 9/5/2023. (Peterson, Ryan)
Related: [-]
Monday, August 14, 2023
4 4 service Summons Issued Mon 08/14 9:15 AM
Summons Issued as to Hanbery & Turner, P.A. (CLK)
Related: [-]
3 3 notice Notice of Initial Case Assignment Mon 08/14 9:14 AM
(Text-Only) CLERK'S NOTICE OF INITIAL CASE ASSIGNMENT. Case assigned to Judge Nancy E. Brasel per Civil (3rd, 4th - Master) list, referred to Magistrate Judge Elizabeth Cowan Wright. Please use case number 23-cv-2493 NEB/ECW. Notice: All Nongovernmental Corporate Parties must file a Rule 7.1 Corporate Disclosure Statement. (CLK)
Related: [-]
Saturday, August 12, 2023
2 2 misc Exhibit/Exhibit List (Initial Pleadings and Other Non-Motion Filings) Sat 08/12 10:32 PM
EXHIBIT A re1 Complaint, filed by Vanshelli Price. (Peterson, Ryan)
Related: [-]
1 1 cmp Complaint Sat 08/12 4:11 PM
COMPLAINT and Demand for Jury Trial against Hanbery & Turner, P.A. (filing fee $ 402, receipt number AMNDC-10468445) filed by Vanshelli Price. Filer requests summons issued. (Peterson, Ryan)
Related: [-]
Att: 1 Exhibit(s) A,
Att: 2 Civil Cover Sheet