California Central Bankruptcy Court
Chapter 7
Judge:Sheri Bluebond
Case #: 2:23-bk-15188
Case Filed:Aug 12, 2023
Creditor Meeting:Sep 11, 2023

Debtor
BNA Textile Inc
1143 S Boyle
Los Angeles, CA 90023
Represented By
Ji Yoon Kim
Lk Professional Law Group
contact info
Last checked: never
Trustee
Wesley H Avery (TR)
758 E. Colorado Blvd., Suite 210
Pasadena, CA 91101
U.S. Trustee
United States Trustee (LA)
915 Wilshire Blvd, Suite 1850
Los Angeles, CA 90017


Docket last updated: 08/14/2023 12:00 AM PDT
Saturday, August 12, 2023
crditcrd Auto-Docket of Credit Card/Debit Card Sat 08/12 1:34 PM
Receipt of Voluntary Petition (Chapter 7)([LINK:2:23-bk-15188] ) [misc,volp7] ( 338.00) Filing Fee. Receipt number C55801449. Fee amount 338.00. Related [+] (U.S. Treasury)
Related: [-] Doc#1
1 1 27 pgs misc Voluntary Petition (Chapter 7) Sat 08/12 1:31 PM
Chapter 7 Voluntary Petition for Non-Individuals . Fee Amount $338 Filed by BNA Textile Inc (Kim, Ji)
Related: [-]
2 2 court Meeting of Creditors 7 (Business No Asset) (Corp No POC) Sat 08/12 2:04 PM
Meeting of Creditors with 341(a) meeting to be held on 9/11/2023 at 09:00 AM at TR 7, TELEPHONIC MEETING. FOR INSTRUCTIONS CONTACT THE TRUSTEE. (Scheduled Automatic Assignment, shared account)
Related: [-]