Florida Middle District Court
Case #: 6:23-mj-01892
Case Filed:Aug 11, 2023
Terminated:Aug 11, 2023
Last checked: Monday Aug 14, 2023 3:24 AM EDT
Plaintiff
USA
Represented By
Courtney Richardson-Jones
Doj-Usao
contact info
TERMINATED PARTIES
Defendant
Travis Wilson (1)
Terminated: 08/11/2023
Represented By
Erin Brenna Hyde
Federal Public Defender'S Office
contact info


Docket last updated: 08/14/2023 3:28 AM EDT
Friday, August 11, 2023
NOTICE to Southern District of Florida of a Rule 5 or Rule 32 Initial Appearance as to Travis Wilson regarding your case number: 0:14-cr-60061-JIC. Using your PACER account, you may retrieve the docket sheet and any documents via the case number link. No documents/record will be sent. If you require certified copies of any documents please send a request to InterdistrictTransfer_FLMD@flmd.uscourts.gov. If you wish the court to use a different email address in the future, please send a request to update your address to InterdistrictTransfer_TXND@txnd.uscourts.gov. (TNP)
Related: [-]
1 1 Arrest pursuant to Rule 32.1 of Travis Wilson from the Southern District of Florida.(TNP)
Related: [-]
Att: 1 Southern District of Florida 12C Petition
2 2 Minute Entry for In Person proceedings held before Magistrate Judge Daniel C. Irick: INITIAL APPEARANCE in Rule 32.1 proceedings held on 8/11/2023 as to Travis Wilson from the Southern District of Florida. (Digital) (TNP)
Related: [-]
3 3 ***CJA 23 Financial Affidavit by Travis Wilson. (TNP)
Related: [-]
4 4 Ore Tenus MOTION to Appoint Counsel by Travis Wilson. (TNP)
Related: [-]
5 5 ORDER APPOINTING FEDERAL PUBLIC DEFENDER, granting 4 Ore Tenus Motion to Appoint Counsel as to Travis Wilson (1). Signed by Magistrate Judge Daniel C. Irick on 8/11/2023. (TNP)
Related: [-]
6 6 WAIVER of Rule 32.1 hearing by Travis Wilson. (TNP)
Related: [-]
7 7 Ore Tenus MOTION for Detention by USA as to Travis Wilson. (TNP)
Related: [-]
8 8 ORDER OF DETENTION PENDING FURTHER PROCEEDINGS, granting without prejudice 7 Ore Tenus Motion for Detention as to Travis Wilson (1). Signed by Magistrate Judge Daniel C. Irick on 8/11/2023. (TNP)
Related: [-]
9 9 COMMITMENT TO ANOTHER DISTRICT as to Travis Wilson. Defendant committed to the Southern District of Florida. Signed by Magistrate Judge Daniel C. Irick on 8/11/2023. (TNP)
Related: [-]
10 10 NOTICE of Standing Order Regarding Due Process Protections Act,[LINK:3:20-mc-20-TJC, Doc 1] as to Travis Wilson: Pursuant to the Due Process Protections Act, the Court confirms the United States' disclosure obligation under Brady v. Maryland, 373 U.S. 83 (1963), and its progeny and orders the United States to comply with that obligation. Violating this order may result in consequences, including exclusion of evidence, adverse jury instructions, dismissal of charges, contempt proceedings, and other sanctions. Signed by Judge Timothy J. Corrigan. (TNP)
Related: [-]
11 11 ORDER OF REMOVAL pursuant to Rule 32.1 to the Southern District of Florida as to Travis Wilson. Signed by Magistrate Judge Daniel C. Irick on 8/11/2023. (TNP)
Related: [-]