Texas Northern District Court
Judge:Ed Kinkeade
Case #: 3:23-cv-01809
Nature of Suit442 Civil Rights - Employment
Cause42:2000e Job Discrimination (Employment)
Case Filed:Aug 14, 2023
Terminated:Oct 18, 2023
Last checked: Saturday Feb 10, 2024 3:02 AM CST
Defendant
Hardie's Fresh Foods
Represented By
Sonia B Alfaro
Meaders & Lanagan
contact info
Defendant
Jennifer Hardie-Austin
Plaintiff
Steven Alves
Represented By
Walker Green Harman, Jr.
The Harman Firm LLP
contact info


Docket last updated: 05/07/2025 11:59 PM CDT
Monday, December 04, 2023
7 7 order Order of Dismissal or Administrative Closure Mon 12/04 10:28 AM
ELECTRONIC Order Dismissing Case. In accordance with the Court's order entered November 27, 2023 (Doc. No. 6), the Court hereby DISMISSES this case with prejudice . See also Doc. No. 5. (Ordered by Judge Ed Kinkeade on 12/4/2023) (chmb)
Related: [-]
Monday, November 27, 2023
6 6 order Order Mon 11/27 2:51 PM
ELECTRONIC ORDER: The Court ordered the parties to file their dismissal papers by November 17, 2023. See Doc. No. 5. To-date, the parties have not filed any dismissal papers. The Court will dismiss this case with prejudice no later than December 1, 2023 , unless the parties file a motion or stipulation to dismiss the case prior to this date. (Ordered by Judge Ed Kinkeade on 11/27/2023) (chmb)
Related: [-]
Wednesday, October 18, 2023
5 5 order Order of Dismissal or Administrative Closure Wed 10/18 2:26 PM
ELECTRONIC Order Administratively Closing Case. The Court has been notified this case settled. The parties are DIRECTED to file the necessary dismissal papers within 30 days from the date of this Order . There appears to be no further reason at this time to maintain the file as open for statistical purposes. The Clerk is, therefore, instructed to submit a JS-6 form to the Administrative Office, thereby removing this case from the statistical records. Nothing in this Order shall be considered a dismissal or disposition of this case, and should further proceedings become necessary or desirable, any party or the Court may initiate such further proceedings in the same manner as if this Order had not been entered. (Ordered by Judge Ed Kinkeade on 10/18/2023) (chmb)
Related: [-]
Friday, September 15, 2023
4 4 answer Answer to Complaint Fri 09/15 1:30 PM
ANSWER to1 Complaint,,,, filed by Hardie's Fresh Foods. Unless exempted, attorneys who are not admitted to practice in the Northern District of Texas must seek admission promptly. Forms and Instructions found at www.txnd.uscourts.gov, or by clicking here:[LINK:Attorney Information - Bar Membership] . If admission requirements are not satisfied within 21 days, the clerk will notify the presiding judge. Attorney Sonia B Alfaro added to party Hardie's Fresh Foods(pty:dft) (Alfaro, Sonia)
Related: [-]
Monday, August 14, 2023
3 3 service Summons Issued Mon 08/14 3:08 PM
Summons Issued as to Hardie's Fresh Foods, Jennifer Hardie-Austin. (agc)
Related: [-]
2 2 qcref Kinkeade Mon 08/14 3:03 PM
New Case Notes: A filing fee has been paid. Pursuant to Misc. Order 6, Plaintiff is provided the Notice of Right to Consent to Proceed Before A U.S. Magistrate Judge (Judge Horan). Clerk to provide copy to plaintiff if not received electronically. (agc)
Related: [-]
1 1 cmp Complaint Mon 08/14 9:43 AM
COMPLAINT WITH JURY DEMAND against Hardie's Fresh Foods, Jennifer Hardie-Austin filed by Steven Alves. (Filing fee $402; Receipt number BTXNDC-13952392) Clerk to issue summons(es). In each Notice of Electronic Filing, the judge assignment is indicated, and a link to the[LINK:Judges Copy Requirements] and[LINK:Judge Specific Requirements] is provided. The court reminds the filer that any required copy of this and future documents must be delivered to the judge, in the manner prescribed, within three business days of filing. Unless exempted, attorneys who are not admitted to practice in the Northern District of Texas must seek admission promptly. Forms, instructions, and exemption information may be found at www.txnd.uscourts.gov, or by clicking here:[LINK:Attorney Information - Bar Membership] . If admission requirements are not satisfied within 21 days, the clerk will notify the presiding judge. (Harman, Walker)
Related: [-]