Michigan Eastern District Court
Judge:Nancy G Edmunds
Referred: Curtis Ivy, Jr
Case #: 2:23-cv-12073
Nature of Suit440 Civil Rights - Other Civil Rights
Cause28:1331 Fed. Question
Case Filed:Aug 14, 2023
Terminated:May 06, 2025
Last checked: Saturday Feb 10, 2024 3:47 AM EST
Defendant
Blue Cross Blue Shield of Michigan
Represented By
Michelle R. Heikka
Blue Cross Blue Shield Of Michigan
contact info
Rudolph Porter Makupson
Blue Cross Blue Shield Of Michigan
contact info
Brandon C. Hubbard
Dickinson Wright PLLC
contact info
Nolan John Moody
Dickinson Wright PLLC
contact info
Zachary Pelton
Dickinson Wright PLLC
contact info
Plaintiff
Stephanie Morawski
Represented By
Noah S. Hurwitz
Hurwitz Law PLLC
contact info

GPO Oct 10 2023
ORDER Dismissing Plaintiff's State Law Claims - Signed by District Judge Nancy G. Edmunds. (LBar)

Docket last updated: 05/15/2025 11:59 PM EDT
Tuesday, May 06, 2025
21 21 order Dismissing Case - Stipulated Order Tue 05/06 3:39 PM
STIPULATION and ORDER of Dismissal with Prejudice. Signed by District Judge Nancy G. Edmunds. (TVil)
Related: [-]
Tuesday, February 18, 2025
notice Text-Only Notice of Hearing Cancelled Tue 02/18 12:18 PM
TEXT-ONLY NOTICE: Remote Status Conference on 3/5/2025 is Cancelled. (MarW)
Related: [-]
Tuesday, February 11, 2025
20 20 notice Notice - Other Tue 02/11 2:27 PM
NOTICE by All Parties of Stay Pending Resolution (Hurwitz, Noah)
Related: [-]
Att: 1 Exhibit A, 2025.02.05 ECF 88 - STIPULATED ORDER
Wednesday, January 29, 2025
19 19 notice Appear* Wed 01/29 8:49 AM
NOTICE TO APPEAR REMOTELY: Status Conference set for 3/5/2025 at 11:30 AM before District Judge Nancy G. Edmunds . Counsel to receive Zoom information in a separate email prior to conference. (MarW)
Related: [-]
Tuesday, January 28, 2025
minutes Status Conference Wed 01/29 8:45 AM
Minute Entry for remote proceedings before District Judge Nancy G. Edmunds: Status Conference held on 1/28/2025. (Court Reporter: Shacara Mapp) (MarW)
Related: [-]
Thursday, January 02, 2025
18 18 notice Appear* Thu 01/02 2:58 PM
NOTICE TO APPEAR REMOTELY: Status Conference set for 1/28/2025 at 11:00 AM before District Judge Nancy G. Edmunds . (MarW)
Related: [-]
Wednesday, September 25, 2024
notice Text-Only Notice of Hearing Cancelled Wed 09/25 9:12 AM
TEXT-ONLY NOTICE: Trailing Trial on 10/1/2024 is Cancelled (MarW)
Related: [-]
Monday, March 11, 2024
17 17 order Scheduling Order Mon 03/11 11:40 AM
STIPULATED ORDER modifying scheduling order: Discovery due by 9/30/2024 Dispositive Motion Cut-off set for 11/19/2024 Final Pretrial Conference set for 3/11/2025 02:00 PM before District Judge Nancy G. Edmunds Signed by District Judge Nancy G. Edmunds. Related [+] (DPer)
Related: [-] fer to image for additional dates
Tuesday, February 27, 2024
16 16 misc Stipulation Tue 02/27 3:24 PM
STIPULATION re13 Scheduling Order, Stipulated Motion to Modify Dates in Scheduling Order by Blue Cross Blue Shield of Michigan (Pelton, Zachary)
Related: [-]
Monday, February 12, 2024
15 15 trial Witness List Mon 02/12 4:55 PM
WITNESS LIST by Blue Cross Blue Shield of Michigan (Pelton, Zachary)
Related: [-]
14 14 trial Witness List Mon 02/12 12:33 PM
WITNESS LIST by Stephanie Morawski (Hurwitz, Noah)
Related: [-]
Monday, November 20, 2023
notice Text-Only Notice of Hearing Cancelled Mon 11/20 9:20 AM
TEXT-ONLY NOTICE: Telephone Scheduling Conference set for November 20, 2023 is Cancelled re10 Notice to Appear (LBar)
Related: [-]
Monday, November 06, 2023
13 13 order Scheduling Order Mon 11/06 11:20 AM
SCHEDULING ORDER: Discovery due by 4/12/2024; Dispositive Motion Cut-off set for 5/13/2024; Final Pretrial Order Due 8/30/2024; Final Pretrial Conference set for 9/10/2024 @ 2:00 PM before District Judge Nancy G. Edmunds; Trailing Trial Docket set for 10/1/2024 @ 9:00 am - Signed by District Judge Nancy G. Edmunds. Related [+] (LBar)
Related: [-] fer to image for additional dates
Friday, November 03, 2023
12 12 notice Appearance Fri 11/03 6:26 PM
NOTICE of Appearance by Nolan John Moody on behalf of Blue Cross Blue Shield of Michigan. (Moody, Nolan)
Related: [-]
11 11 misc Discovery Plan - Rule 26f Fri 11/03 3:52 PM
DISCOVERY plan jointly filed pursuant to Federal Rules of Civil Procedure 26(f) (Moody, Nolan)
Related: [-]
Monday, October 30, 2023
10 10 notice Appear* Mon 10/30 2:30 PM
NOTICE TO APPEAR BY TELEPHONE: Scheduling Conference set for 11/20/2023 09:15 AM before District Judge Nancy G. Edmunds **JOINT DISCOVERY PLAN TO BE FILED BY NOVEMBER 13, 2023 (LBar)
Related: [-]
9 9 misc Statement of Disclosure of Corporate Affiliations Mon 10/30 12:50 PM
STATEMENT of DISCLOSURE of CORPORATE AFFILIATIONS and FINANCIAL INTEREST by Blue Cross Blue Shield of Michigan (Hubbard, Brandon)
Related: [-]
Friday, October 27, 2023
8 8 answer Answer to Complaint Fri 10/27 3:02 PM
ANSWER to Complaint with Affirmative Defenses with Jury Demand by Blue Cross Blue Shield of Michigan. (Pelton, Zachary)
Related: [-]
Thursday, October 19, 2023
7 7 misc Attorney Appearance Thu 10/19 2:41 PM
ATTORNEY APPEARANCE: Michelle R. Heikka appearing on behalf of Blue Cross Blue Shield of Michigan (Heikka, Michelle)
Related: [-]
Monday, October 16, 2023
6 6 misc Attorney Appearance Mon 10/16 9:48 PM
ATTORNEY APPEARANCE: Rudolph Porter Makupson appearing on behalf of Blue Cross Blue Shield of Michigan (Makupson, Rudolph)
Related: [-]
Tuesday, October 10, 2023
5 5 2 pgs order Order Tue 10/10 12:36 PM
ORDER OF CONSOLIDATION FOR DISCOVERY Signed by District Judge Nancy G. Edmunds. (TTho) (LBar)
Related: [-]
Att: 1 (10/10/2023) Exhibit Stipulation and Order Regarding Consolidation
4 4 2 pgs order Order Tue 10/10 12:20 PM
ORDER Dismissing Plaintiff's State Law Claims - Signed by District Judge Nancy G. Edmunds. (LBar)
Related: [-]
Wednesday, September 13, 2023
3 3 notice Appearance Wed 09/13 4:14 PM
NOTICE of Appearance by Brandon C. Hubbard on behalf of Blue Cross Blue Shield of Michigan. (Hubbard, Brandon)
Related: [-]
Monday, August 14, 2023
2 2 service Summons Issued* Mon 08/14 11:56 AM
SUMMONS Issued for *Blue Cross Blue Shield of Michigan* (KBro)
Related: [-]
1 1 cmp Civil Case - Complaint Mon 08/14 11:53 AM
COMPLAINT filed by Stephanie Morawski against All Defendants with Jury Demand. Plaintiff requests summons issued. Receipt No: AMIEDC-9453489 - Fee: $ 402. County of 1st Plaintiff: Wayne - County Where Action Arose: Wayne - County of 1st Defendant: Wayne. [ Previously dismissed case: No] [ Possible companion case(s): District Court Eastern District of Michigan, 2:22-cv-12576, Judge Stephen J. Murphy, III ] (Hurwitz, Noah)
Related: [-]
notice Notice to Parties of Consent of a Civil Action before a Magistrate Judge Option Mon 08/14 11:56 AM
A United States Magistrate Judge of this Court is available to conduct all proceedings in this civil action in accordance with 28 U.S.C. 636c and FRCP 73. The Notice, Consent, and Reference of a Civil Action to a Magistrate Judge form is available for download at[LINK:http://www.mied.uscourts.gov] (KBro)
Related: [-]