Michigan Western District Court
Judge:Hala Y Jarbou
Referred: Maarten Vermaat
Case #: 1:23-cv-00849
Nature of Suit440 Civil Rights - Other Civil Rights
Cause42:1983 Other Civil Rights
Case Filed:Aug 14, 2023
Terminated:Mar 20, 2025
Last checked: Saturday Feb 10, 2024 3:30 AM EST
defendant
Jamestown Charter Township
a municipal corporation 2380 Riley St
Hudsonville, MI 49426
Represented By
Ross A. Leisman
Mika Meyers PLC
contact info
Ronald Milton Redick
Mika Meyers PLC
contact info
mediator
Facilitative Mediator
Represented By
Joseph E. Quandt
Kuhn Rogers PLC
contact info
plaintiff
Jamestown Shores, LLC
a Michigan limited liability company 3800 Perry St
Hudsonville, MI 49426
Represented By
Emily C. Palacios
Miller Johnson Plc (detroit)
contact info
James Buster
Miller Johnson Plc (grand Rapids)
contact info
plaintiff
Quincy Street Ventures, LLC
a Michigan limited liability company 4720 52ND STREET SE
Grand Rapids, MI 49426
Represented By
Emily C. Palacios
Miller Johnson Plc (detroit)
contact info
James Buster
Miller Johnson Plc (grand Rapids)
contact info

GPO Sep 20 2024
OPINION; signed by Chief Judge Hala Y. Jarbou (aks)
GPO Jan 13 2025
OPINION; signed by Chief Judge Hala Y. Jarbou (tls)
GPO Mar 20 2025
OPINION; signed by Chief Judge Hala Y. Jarbou (tls)

Docket last updated: 4 hours ago
Monday, April 28, 2025
74 74 order Stipulation and Order Mon 04/28 1:31 PM
STIPULATION AND ORDER extending response deadline until 5/12/2025; signed by Chief Judge Hala Y. Jarbou (aks)
Related: [-]
Friday, April 25, 2025
73 73 motion Stipulation and Order (Proposed-one document) Fri 04/25 2:47 PM
PROPOSED STIPULATION and ORDER to Extend the Deadline for Defendant's Reply to Plaintiff's Motion for Costs and Attorney's Fees by defendant Jamestown Charter Township Related [+]
Related: [-] dick, Ronald