BAPTISTE v. VOX MEDIA, INC. et al
District Of Columbia District Court | |
Case #: | 1:23-cv-02161 |
Nature of Suit | 440 Civil Rights - Other Civil Rights |
Cause | 18:1961 Racketeering (RICO) Act |
Case Filed: | Aug 05, 2023 |
Terminated: | Feb 02, 2024 |
Last checked: Tuesday Jul 09, 2024 10:43 AM EDT |
Defendant
RUPERT MURDOCH
|
|
Defendant
NEW YORK MAGAZINE
|
|
Defendant
NEW YORK POST
|
|
Defendant
SUONG NGUYEN
|
|
Defendant
AIDAN O'ROURKE
|
|
Defendant
GREGORY PANTLIN
|
|
Defendant
WILLIAM PAOLI
|
|
Defendant
INA PARK
|
|
Defendant
SARA POLLACK
|
|
Defendant
WILLAIM C. PRICE
|
|
Defendant
JOHN QUINN
|
|
Defendant
QUINN EMANUEL LLP.
|
|
Defendant
CHRIS REYNOLDS
|
|
Defendant
RIVERS J. MORRELL III
|
|
Defendant
ROSEWOOD SAND HILL HOTEL
|
|
Defendant
FRANK W. NEMECEK
|
|
Defendant
JOSEPH C. SARLES
|
|
Defendant
MARK SCHAEFFER
|
|
Defendant
JOSEPH W. SCOTT
|
|
Defendant
SEQUOIA CAPITAL
|
|
Defendant
STALK AMBER
|
|
Defendant
MICHAEL STRICKLAND
|
|
Defendant
KATHLEEN SULLIVAN
|
|
Defendant
CHRISTOPHER TAYBACK
|
|
Defendant
TWO BEAR CAPITAL
|
|
Defendant
BRUCE VAN DALSEM
|
|
Defendant
VOX MEDIA, INC.
|
|
Defendant
GLASER WEIL
|
|
Defendant
WILSON SONSINI GOODRICH & ROSATI
|
|
Defendant
BRIAN NASH
|
|
Defendant
JILL BASINGER
|
|
Defendant
MARGARET CARUSO
|
|
Defendant
JONATHAN B. COLE
|
|
Defendant
MARSHALL R. COLE
|
|
Defendant
TARA COLLINS
|
|
Defendant
DIANE M DOOLITTLE
|
|
Defendant
PATRICK DOOLITTLE
|
|
Defendant
DAVID FECHEIMER
|
|
Defendant
MICHAEL FEENBERG
|
|
Defendant
MICHAEL W. FEENBERG
|
|
Defendant
ALEX GERBI
|
|
Defendant
PATRICIA GLASER
|
|
Defendant
MICHAEL LEWIS GOGUEN
|
|
Defendant
GOODWIN PROCTER
|
|
Defendant
MICHAEL F. GRADY
|
|
Defendant
TED GREENO
|
|
Defendant
MARK HOLSHER
|
|
Defendant
MEGAN M. KERR
|
|
Defendant
KIRKLAND & ELLIS LLP.
|
|
Defendant
DAVID KLEIN
|
|
Defendant
MICHAEL LIFRAK
|
|
Defendant
MICHAEL MCCARTHY
|
|
Defendant
ANTHONY MCCUSKER
|
|
Defendant
RIVERS MORRELL
|
|
Defendant
MSNBC
|
|
Defendant
RYAN BAKER
|
|
Plaintiff
AMBER BAPTISTE
8306 Wilshire Blvd #2020
Los Angeles, CA 90211 |
Docket last updated: 2 hours ago |
Friday, February 02, 2024 | ||
3 | 3
![]() ORDER DISMISSING PRO SE CASE WITHOUT PREJUDICE. Ordered that the application of the plaintiff to proceed in forma pauperis is2 granted. This is a final appealable Order. Pro Se party has been notified by first class mail. Signed by Judge Carl J. Nichols on 02/02/2024. (zcb) |
|
Saturday, August 05, 2023 | ||
misc
Receipt of Initiating Pleading & IFP Application
Mon 08/14 3:51 PM
Initiating Pleading & IFP Application Received on 08/05/2023. A copy of the docket sheet has been mailed to the address of record for the pro se party. (zcb) |