Georgia Northern District Court
Judge:Timothy C Batten, Sr
Case #: 3:23-cv-00160
Nature of Suit190 Contract - Other Contract
Cause28:1345 Suits or Proceedings commenced by the United States
Case Filed:Aug 11, 2023
Terminated:Apr 30, 2024
Last checked: Wednesday Feb 07, 2024 5:24 AM EST
Defendant
IOD Tech LLC
Defendant
Kelvin Randell
Plaintiff
United States of America
Represented By
Vanessa A. Leo - GOV
Doj-Usao
contact info


Docket last updated: 4 hours ago
Friday, August 02, 2024
27 27 misc Certified Mail Returned Receipt Mon 08/05 2:20 PM
Certified Mail Returned Receipt re17 Abstract of Judgment (jkb)
Related: [-]
Thursday, August 01, 2024
28 28 misc Certified Mail Returned Receipt Wed 08/07 4:32 PM
Certified Mail Returned Receipt re25 Abstract of Judgment,24 Abstract of Judgment,26 Abstract of Judgment (jkb)
Related: [-]
Monday, July 29, 2024
26 26 misc Abstract of Judgment Mon 07/29 3:09 PM
Abstract of Judgment Issued to Kloud Stream LLC, as Nominee for Kelvin Randall re23 in the amount of $69,787.08 interest at 5.13% Original and Certified Copies returned to U.S. Attorney. (jkb)
Related: [-]
25 25 misc Abstract of Judgment Mon 07/29 3:08 PM
Abstract of Judgment Issued as to Kelvin Randell re22 in the amount of $69,787.08 interest at 5.13% (1)Original and (2)Certified Copies returned to U.S. Attorney. (jkb)
Related: [-]
24 24 misc Abstract of Judgment Mon 07/29 3:03 PM
Abstract of Judgment Issued as to Kelvin Randell re21 in the amount of $69,787.08 interest at 5.13% (1)Original and (2)Certified Copies returned to U.S. Attorney. (jkb)
Related: [-]
23 23 misc Praecipe for Abstract of Judgment Mon 07/29 1:41 PM
Praecipe for Abstract of Judgment by United States of America .(Leo - GOV, Vanessa)
Related: [-]
Att: 1 Supplement Abstract
22 22 misc Praecipe for Abstract of Judgment Mon 07/29 12:18 PM
Praecipe for Abstract of Judgment by United States of America .(Leo - GOV, Vanessa)
Related: [-]
Att: 1 Supplement Abstract
21 21 misc Praecipe for Abstract of Judgment Mon 07/29 11:57 AM
Praecipe for Abstract of Judgment by United States of America .(Leo - GOV, Vanessa)
Related: [-]
Att: 1 Supplement Abstract
utility Clerks Certificate of Mailing Mon 07/29 3:11 PM
Clerk's Certificate of Mailing as to United States Attorney's Office Vanessa a. Leo re25 Abstract of Judgment,24 Abstract of Judgment,26 Abstract of Judgment. CMRR# 70211970000227233952 (jkb)
Related: [-]
Monday, July 22, 2024
20 20 misc Certified Mail Returned Receipt Wed 07/24 8:35 AM
Certified Mail Returned Receipt re19 Abstract of Judgment (jkb)
Related: [-]
Tuesday, July 09, 2024
19 19 misc Abstract of Judgment Tue 07/09 8:38 AM
Abstract of Judgment Issued as to IOD Tech LLC in the amount of $69,787.08 interest at 5.13% (1) Original and (2) Certified Copies returned to U.S. Attorney. (jkb) Modified on 7/9/2024 (jkb)
Related: [-]
Monday, July 08, 2024
18 18 misc Praecipe for Abstract of Judgment Mon 07/08 6:26 PM
Praecipe for Abstract of Judgment by United States of America as to IOD Tech, LLC [amended] .(Leo - GOV, Vanessa)
Related: [-]
Att: 1 Exhibit
17 17 misc Abstract of Judgment Mon 07/08 2:19 PM
Abstract of Judgment Issued as to Kelvin Randell in the amount of $69,787.08 interest at 5.13% (1)Original and (2) Certified Copies returned to U.S. Attorney by Certified Mail. (jkb)
Related: [-]
16 16 misc Praecipe for Abstract of Judgment Mon 07/08 10:07 AM
Praecipe for Abstract of Judgment by United States of America against IOD Tech, LLC .(Leo - GOV, Vanessa) Modified on 7/8/2024 (jkb)
Related: [-]
Att: 1 Exhibit Abstract
15 15 misc Praecipe for Abstract of Judgment Mon 07/08 10:04 AM
Praecipe for Abstract of Judgment by United States of America against Kelvin Randell .(Leo - GOV, Vanessa)
Related: [-]
Att: 1 Exhibit Abstract
Tuesday, May 14, 2024
14 14 order Judgment - Default Tue 05/14 10:13 AM
AMENDED DEFAULT JUDGMENT in favor of Plaintiff against IOD Tech LLC, Kelvin Randell in the amount of $69,787.08. (dmb)
Related: [-]
utility Clerks Certificate of Mailing Tue 05/14 10:17 AM
Clerk's Certificate of Mailing as to IOD Tech LLC, Kelvin Randell re14 Order-Default Judgment, and13 Order. (dmb)
Related: [-]
Monday, May 13, 2024
13 13 2 pgs order Order Tue 05/14 10:10 AM
ORDER amending11 Order on Motion for Default Judgment and granting the United States motion10 for default judgment against Randell and IOD Tech. It is ordered and adjudged that judgment by default be entered in favor of the United States against both Randell and IOD Tech, jointly and severely, in the amount of $69,787.08.1 It is further ordered and adjudged that the judgment shall accrue postjudgment interest in favor of the United States at the rate provided by law. The Clerk is directed to amend the default judgment per this Order. Signed by Judge Timothy C. Batten, Sr. on 5/13/2024. (dmb)
Related: [-]
Tuesday, April 30, 2024
12 12 order Judgment - Default Tue 04/30 1:14 PM
DEFAULT JUDGMENT for Plaintiff against Kelvin Randell in the amount of $69,787.08 plus post-judgment interest in favor of the United States at the rate provided by law. (dmb)--Please refer to http://www.ca11.uscourts.gov to obtain an appeals jurisdiction checklist-- (dmb)
Related: [-]
Att: 1 (4/30/2024) Corrected Judgment
11 11 4 pgs order Order on Motion for Default Judgment Tue 04/30 1:10 PM
ORDER granting as to Randell but denying as to IOD10 Motion for Default Judgment. It is ordered and adjudged that judgment by default be entered in favor of the United States against Randell in the amount of $69,787.08.2 It is further ordered and adjudged that the judgment amount shall accrue post-judgment interest in favor of the United States at the rate provided by law. The Clerk is directed to close this case. Signed by Judge Timothy C. Batten, Sr. on 4/30/2024. (dmb)
Related: [-]
utility Submission to District Judge Tue 04/30 11:34 AM
Submission of10 MOTION for Default Judgment as to Defendant IOD Tech LLC f/k/a IOD Technology LLC and Defendant Kelvin Randell to District Judge Timothy C. Batten Sr.. (dmb)
Related: [-]
utility Terminate Civil Case Tue 04/30 1:22 PM
Civil Case Terminated. (dmb)
Related: [-]
utility Clerks Certificate of Mailing Tue 04/30 1:22 PM
Clerk's Certificate of Mailing as to IOD Tech LLC, Kelvin Randell re12 Order-Default Judgment, and11 Order on Motion for Default Judgment. (dmb)
Related: [-]
Tuesday, April 09, 2024
10 10 motion Default Judgment Tue 04/09 8:12 PM
MOTION for Default Judgment as to Defendant IOD Tech LLC f/k/a IOD Technology LLC and Defendant Kelvin Randell with Brief In Support by United States of America.(Leo - GOV, Vanessa)
Related: [-]
Att: 1 Brief Exhibit 1,
Att: 2 Exhibit Certificate of Indebtedness,
Att: 3 Text of Proposed Order
Tuesday, March 26, 2024
9 9 2 pgs order Order ~Util - Set Submission Deadline Tue 03/26 3:33 PM
ORDER directing the United States shall file a motion for default judgment on or before 4/9/2024. The United States shall include with that motion all supporting documentation and affidavits necessary to establish the amount of its damages. Signed by Judge Timothy C. Batten, Sr. on 3/26/2024. (dmb)
Related: [-]
Wednesday, January 10, 2024
utility Clerks Entry of Default Wed 01/10 1:39 PM
Clerks Entry of Default as to IOD Tech LLC and Kelvin Randell (dmb)
Related: [-]
Tuesday, January 02, 2024
8 8 motion Clerks Entry of Default Tue 01/02 3:49 PM
MOTION for Clerks Entry of Default Against Defendant IOD Tech LLC by United States of America.(Leo - GOV, Vanessa)
Related: [-]
Att: 1 Declaration in Support of United States of America's Request for Clerk's Entry of Default,
Att: 2 Text of Proposed Order
7 7 motion Clerks Entry of Default Tue 01/02 3:37 PM
MOTION for Clerks Entry of Default Against Defendant Kelvin Randell by United States of America.(Leo - GOV, Vanessa)
Related: [-]
Att: 1 Declaration in Support of United States of America's Request for Clerk's Entry of Default,
Att: 2 Text of Proposed Order
6 6 notice Notice of Filing Tue 01/02 12:00 PM
NOTICE Of Filing Certificate of Acknowledgment of Service of Process upon Defendant, IOD Tech LLC by United States of America(Leo - GOV, Vanessa)
Related: [-]
Att: 1 Certificate of Acknowledgement of the Secretary of State of the State of Georgia
Friday, September 22, 2023
5 5 service Return of Service Unexecuted Fri 09/22 5:28 PM
Return of Service Unexecuted by United States of America as to IOD Tech LLC. (Leo - GOV, Vanessa)
Related: [-]
4 4 service Return of Service Executed Fri 09/22 5:27 PM
Return of Service Executed by United States of America. Kelvin Randell served on 9/20/2023, answer due 10/11/2023. (Leo - GOV, Vanessa)
Related: [-]
Monday, August 14, 2023
3 3 service Electronic Summons Issued Mon 08/14 9:33 AM
Electronic Summons Issued as to Kelvin Randell. (jkb)
Related: [-]
2 2 service Electronic Summons Issued Mon 08/14 9:33 AM
Electronic Summons Issued as to IOD Tech LLC. (jkb)
Related: [-]
Friday, August 11, 2023
1 1 cmp Complaint Mon 08/14 9:30 AM
COMPLAINT filed by United States of America.(jkb)
Related: [-]
Att: 1 Exhibit A,
Att: 2 Exhibit B,
Att: 3 Exhibit C,
Att: 4 Exhibit D,
Att: 5 Exhibit E,
Att: 6 Civil Cover Sheet