Dayton Senior Care, LLC
Member Case
Lead case is: 3:23-bk-02924
Lead case is: 3:23-bk-02924
Tennessee Middle Bankruptcy Court | |
Chapter 11 | |
Judge: | Charles M Walker |
Case #: | 3:23-bk-02926 |
Case Filed: | Aug 14, 2023 |
Type | Other Entity Type |
Tax ID | subscribers only |
# of Creditors | 200-999 |
Est. Assets | $10,000,001 to $50 million |
Est. Liabilities | $100,000,001 to $500 million |
Nature of Debts | Primarily Business |
Debtor
Dayton Senior Care, LLC
5790 Denlinger Rd.
Dayton, OH 45426 |
Represented By
|
Last checked: never |
U.S. Trustee
US TRUSTEE
OFFICE OF THE UNITED STATES TRUSTEE 701 BROADWAY STE 318
NASHVILLE, TN 37203 |
Docket last updated: 05/03/2024 12:03 PM CDT |
Thursday, February 22, 2024 | ||
court
Case Reassigned
Thu 02/22 12:04 PM
Judge Charles M Walker added to case. Involvement of Judge Marian F Harrison Terminated . (rmw) |
||
Thursday, October 05, 2023 | ||
7 | 7
notice
Notice of Appearance and Request for Service - BK Notice
Thu 10/05 1:37 PM
Notice of Appearance and Request for Service pursuant to Rule 2002. Filed on the behalf of: Creditor FIG 20, LLC. (NASH, AARON) |
|
Friday, August 18, 2023 | ||
6 | 6
court
BNC Certificate of Notice
Fri 08/18 11:38 PM
BNC Certificate of Notice. Notice Date 08/18/2023. (Admin.) |
|
Wednesday, August 16, 2023 | ||
5 | 5
4
pgs
order
Order
Wed 08/16 11:04 AM
Order Directing the Joint Administration of the Debtors' Chapter 11 Cases . Signed on 8/16/2023. (cdw) |
|
Tuesday, August 15, 2023 | ||
4 | 4
notice
Notice of Appearance and Request for Service - BK Notice
Tue 08/15 5:38 PM
Notice of Appearance and Request for Service pursuant to Rule 2002. Filed on the behalf of: U.S. Trustee US TRUSTEE. (SELIBER, MEGAN) |
|
3 | 3
utility
Public Remark (NEF)
Tue 08/15 10:22 AM
Remark - Notification to Filer re the case opening deficiency. The Mailing List of Creditors has not been uploaded in this case. For creditors and parties-in-interest to receive notice, the Filer must file the mailing list using the correct ECF event located under Bankruptcy Events > Miscellaneous > Original Creditor Mailing List. Once the original Notice of Bankruptcy Case/Meeting of Creditors is mailed through the BNC, no second meeting of creditors is sent out by the Clerk. The debtor is responsible for ensuring creditors get notice of the original Notice of Bankruptcy Case/Meeting of Creditors. See, LBR 2002-1(a) and ECF Procedure 4, Consequences of Electronic Filing. (rmw) |
|
Monday, August 14, 2023 | ||
2 | 2
crditcrd
Auto-Docket of Payment
Mon 08/14 6:49 PM
Receipt of Voluntary Petition (Chapter 11)([LINK:3:23-bk-02926] ) [misc,volp11] (1738.00). Receipt number A18228306. Fee amount $ 1738.00. (U.S. Treasury) |
|
1 | 1
18
pgs
misc
Voluntary Petition (Chapter 11)
Mon 08/14 5:34 PM
Chapter 11 Voluntary Petition Non-Individual. Fee Amount is $1738.00. Chapter 11 Plan due by 12/12/2023. Disclosure Statement due by 12/12/2023. Appointment of health care ombudsman due by 09/13/2023. (GONZALES, ROBERT) |