North Carolina Western District Court
Judge:Frank D Whitney
Referred: Susan C Rodriguez
Case #: 3:23-cv-00512
Nature of Suit791 Labor - Employee Retirement Income Security Act
Cause29:1132 E.R.I.S.A.-Employee Benefits
Case Filed:Aug 14, 2023
Terminated:Aug 28, 2024
Last checked: Saturday Feb 10, 2024 3:44 AM EST
Defendant
Corteva, Inc.
Represented By
Todd D. Wozniak
Holland & Knight
contact info
Nishma Patel
Holland & Knight, LLP
contact info
Thomas R. Woodrow
Holland & Knight
contact info
Defendant
EIDP, Inc.
Represented By
Todd D. Wozniak
Holland & Knight
contact info
Nishma Patel
Holland & Knight, LLP
contact info
Thomas R. Woodrow
Holland & Knight
contact info
Defendant
The Benefit Plans Administrative Committee
Represented By
Todd D. Wozniak
Holland & Knight
contact info
Nishma Patel
Holland & Knight, LLP
contact info
Thomas R. Woodrow
Holland & Knight
contact info
Defendant
The Pension and Retirement Plan
Represented By
Todd D. Wozniak
Holland & Knight
contact info
Nishma Patel
Holland & Knight, LLP
contact info
Thomas R. Woodrow
Holland & Knight
contact info
Plaintiff
David Gasper
Represented By
Bryan Lee Tyson
Marcellino & Tyson, PLLC
contact info


Docket last updated: 2 hours ago
Friday, October 04, 2024
46 46 appeal Case Number - Court of Appeals Fri 10/04 1:06 PM
USCA Case Number 24-1959 for44 Notice of Appeal, USCA Case Manager: Richard H. Sewell. (nvc)
Related: [-]
Thursday, October 03, 2024
45 45 appeal Transmission of Notice of Appeal to USCA Thu 10/03 8:36 AM
Transmission of Notice of Appeal to US Court of Appeals re44 Notice of Appeal(ams)
Related: [-]
Wednesday, September 25, 2024
44 44 appeal Notice of Appeal Wed 09/25 9:24 PM
NOTICE OF APPEAL as to43 Clerk's Judgment,42 Order on Motion for Summary Judgment,, Order on Motion for Miscellaneous Relief,,, by David Gasper. Filing fee $ 605, receipt number ANCWDC-6679928. Use this link www.ca4.uscourts.gov to retrieve 4th Circuit case opening documents, i.e. Appearance of Counsel, Docketing Statement, Disclosure Statement, and Transcript Order Form. Note: Your Transcript Order Form must be served on the District Court as well as the Circuit Court. (Tyson, Bryan)
Related: [-]
Wednesday, August 28, 2024
43 43 order Judgment - Clerk Wed 08/28 8:27 AM
CLERK'S JUDGMENT is hereby entered in accordance with the Court's Order dated 8/28/24. Signed by Clerk, Katherine Hord Simon. (clc)
Related: [-]
42 42 22 pgs order Order on Motion for Summary Judgment Order on Motion for Miscellaneous Relief Wed 08/28 8:24 AM
ORDER granting 29 Motion for Summary Judgment ; granting 30 Motion To Exclude The Expert Report of Plaintiff's Identified Expert; denying 31 Motion for Summary Judgment. Signed by District Judge Frank D. Whitney on 8/27/24. (clc)
Related: [-]
Monday, August 19, 2024
41 41 trial Exhibit List Mon 08/19 9:29 PM
Exhibit List /Joint Proposed Pretrial Order by David Gasper.(Tyson, Bryan)
Related: [-]
Wednesday, May 01, 2024
40 40 respm Reply to Response to Motion Wed 05/01 8:23 PM
REPLY to Response to Motion re31 MOTION for Summary Judgment by David Gasper. (Tyson, Bryan)
Related: [-]
39 39 respm Reply to Response to Motion Wed 05/01 1:01 PM
REPLY to Response to Motion re30 MOTION to Exclude Expert Report by Corteva, Inc., EIDP, Inc., The Benefit Plans Administrative Committee, The Pension and Retirement Plan. (Patel, Nishma)
Related: [-]
38 38 respm Reply to Response to Motion Wed 05/01 1:00 PM
REPLY to Response to Motion re31 MOTION for Summary Judgment by Corteva, Inc., EIDP, Inc., The Benefit Plans Administrative Committee, The Pension and Retirement Plan. (Patel, Nishma)
Related: [-]
Thursday, April 25, 2024
37 37 motion Leave to File Document Thu 04/25 1:20 PM
MOTION for Leave to File Reply In Support of Motion to Exclude The Expert Report of Plaintiff's Identified Expert Steven B. Long, Esq. by Corteva, Inc., EIDP, Inc., The Benefit Plans Administrative Committee, The Pension and Retirement Plan. Responses due by 5/9/2024 (Patel, Nishma)
Related: [-]
Att: 1 Proposed Order
order Order on Motion for Leave to File Thu 04/25 2:33 PM
TEXT-ONLY ORDER granting 37 Motion for Leave to File Reply. Reply due by 5/1/2024. So Ordered. Entered by US Magistrate Judge Susan C. Rodriguez on 4/25/2024. (DLG)
Related: [-]
Wednesday, April 24, 2024
36 36 respm Response in Opposition to Motion Wed 04/24 11:25 PM
RESPONSE in Opposition re29 MOTION for Summary Judgment by David Gasper. Replies due by 5/1/2024(Tyson, Bryan)
Related: [-]
Att: 1 Exhibit Ex. A--Declaration of Steven B. Long
35 35 respm Response to Motion Wed 04/24 7:58 PM
RESPONSE to Motion re30 MOTION To Exclude the Expert Report of Steven B. Long, Esq. by David Gasper. Replies due by 5/1/2024 (Auckland, Hannah)
Related: [-]
34 34 respm Response in Opposition to Motion Wed 04/24 12:22 PM
RESPONSE in Opposition re31 MOTION for Summary Judgment by Plaintiff by Corteva, Inc., EIDP, Inc., The Benefit Plans Administrative Committee, The Pension and Retirement Plan. Replies due by 5/1/2024 (Patel, Nishma)
Related: [-]
Friday, April 05, 2024
33 33 motion Extension of Time Fri 04/05 10:52 AM
Consent MOTION for Extension of Time to File Response/Reply re:29 MOTION for Summary Judgment and 30 Motion to Exclude Expert Report by David Gasper. Responses due by 4/19/2024 (Tyson, Bryan)
Related: [-]
order Order on Motion for Extension of Time Fri 04/05 11:30 AM
TEXT-ONLY ORDER granting 33 Consent MOTION for Extension of Time to File Response re: 29 MOTION for Summary Judgment, 30 Motion to Exclude Expert Report, 31 MOTION for Summary Judgment. Responses due by 4/24/2024. So Ordered. Entered by US Magistrate Judge Susan C. Rodriguez on 4/5/2024. (DLG)
Related: [-]
Wednesday, April 03, 2024
32 32 7 pgs order Order on Motion for Judgment on the Pleadings Wed 04/03 4:22 PM
ORDER granting 7 Motion for Judgment on the Pleadings. Plaintiffs Second Claim for Relief under ERISA§ 502(a)(3) is DISMISSED. Signed by District Judge Frank D. Whitney on 4/3/24. (clc)
Related: [-]
Wednesday, March 27, 2024
31 31 motion Summary Judgment Wed 03/27 11:32 PM
MOTION for Summary Judgment by David Gasper. Responses due by 4/10/2024 (Tyson, Bryan)
Related: [-]
Att: 1 Memorandum Brief in Support of Motion for Summary Judgment,
Att: 2 Affidavit Declaration of Plaintiff,
Att: 3 Exhibit Defendants' Responses to Interrogatories
30 30 misc Miscellaneous Filing Wed 03/27 11:56 AM
Miscellaneous Filing by Corteva, Inc., EIDP, Inc., The Benefit Plans Administrative Committee, The Pension and Retirement Plan. Motion To Exclude The Expert Report of Plaintiff's Identified Expert, Steven B. Long, Esq.(Patel, Nishma)
Related: [-]
Att: 1 Memorandum In Support of Motion To Exclude The Expert Report of Plaintiff's Identified Expert, Steven B. Long, Esq.,
Att: 2 Exhibit to Motion to Exclude The Expert Report of Plaintiff's Identified Expert, Steven B. Long, Esq.,
Att: 3 Proposed Order
29 29 motion Summary Judgment Wed 03/27 11:31 AM
MOTION for Summary Judgment by Corteva, Inc., EIDP, Inc., The Benefit Plans Administrative Committee, The Pension and Retirement Plan. Responses due by 4/10/2024 (Patel, Nishma)
Related: [-]
Att: 1 Memorandum Memorandum in Support of Motion for Summary Judgment
Thursday, March 14, 2024
28 28 adr Report of Mediation Thu 03/14 1:47 PM
REPORT of Mediation. Outcome of Mediation: Parties reached an Impasse.(tlj)
Related: [-]
Att: 1 Envelope
Wednesday, March 13, 2024
27 27 misc Status Report Wed 03/13 4:12 PM
STATUS REPORT on Mediation by Corteva, Inc., EIDP, Inc., The Benefit Plans Administrative Committee, The Pension and Retirement Plan (Patel, Nishma)
Related: [-]
Friday, March 01, 2024
26 26 adr Designation of Mediator Fri 03/01 4:10 PM
DESIGNATION of Calvin B. Bennett as Mediator by all the parties. (Auckland, Hannah)
Related: [-]
25 25 notice Notice of Appearance Fri 03/01 4:08 PM
NOTICE of Appearance by Hannah Auckland on behalf of David Gasper (Auckland, Hannah)
Related: [-]
Thursday, February 29, 2024
24 24 1 pgs order Order on Motion for Leave to Appear Pro Hac Vice Thu 02/29 8:20 AM
ORDER granting 23 Motion for Leave to Appear Pro Hac Vice added Monica I. Perkowski for EIDP, Inc., Corteva, Inc., The Pension and Retirement Plan, and The Benefit Plans Administrative Committee (Pro Hac Vice Attorney served via NEF). Signed by US Magistrate Judge Susan C. Rodriguez on 2/28/2024. (brl)
Related: [-]
notice Notice - Out of State Counsel Thu 02/29 8:21 AM
Notice to Monica I. Perkowski: Pursuant to Local Rule 83.1 you are required to Register for E-Filing Access or Link Existing Account[LINK:Link] . (Attorney served via NEF) Deadline by 3/7/2024. (brl)
Related: [-]
Wednesday, February 28, 2024
23 23 motion Appear Pro Hac Vice - one motion per atty Wed 02/28 5:17 PM
MOTION for Leave to Appear Pro Hac Vice as to Nishma Patel Filing fee $ 300, receipt number ANCWDC-6421407. by Corteva, Inc., EIDP, Inc., The Benefit Plans Administrative Committee, The Pension and Retirement Plan. (Patel, Nishma)
Related: [-]
Tuesday, January 23, 2024
22 22 motion Extension of Time Tue 01/23 11:18 AM
Joint MOTION for Extension of Time of Scheduling Order Deadlines for Dispositive Motions by Corteva, Inc., EIDP, Inc., The Benefit Plans Administrative Committee, The Pension and Retirement Plan. Responses due by 2/6/2024 (Patel, Nishma)
Related: [-]
order Order on Motion for Extension of Time Tue 01/23 2:34 PM
TEXT-ONLY ORDER granting 22 Joint MOTION for Extension of Time of Scheduling Order Deadlines for Dispositive Motions and Mediation. Motions due by 3/27/2024. Mediation deadline set for 3/13/2024. Motions hearing to be held between June 3-7, 2024. Pretrial submissions due by 8/19/2024. Bench Trial set for 9/9/2024 09:00 AM in Courtroom #5B, 401 W Trade St, Charlotte, NC 28202 before District Judge Frank D. Whitney. So Ordered. Entered by US Magistrate Judge Susan C. Rodriguez on 1/23/2024. (DLG)
Related: [-]
Monday, January 22, 2024
21 21 misc Status Report Mon 01/22 4:47 PM
STATUS REPORT on ADR by Corteva, Inc., EIDP, Inc., The Benefit Plans Administrative Committee, The Pension and Retirement Plan (Patel, Nishma)
Related: [-]
Wednesday, January 17, 2024
20 20 notice Notice of Appearance Wed 01/17 5:12 PM
NOTICE of Appearance by Nishma Patel on behalf of All Defendants (Patel, Nishma)
Related: [-]
Monday, January 08, 2024
19 19 notice Notice (Other) Mon 01/08 2:29 PM
NOTICE of Filing of Administrative Record by Corteva, Inc., EIDP, Inc., The Benefit Plans Administrative Committee, The Pension and Retirement Plan re17 Administrative Record - ERISA Proceedings,18 Administrative Record - ERISA Proceedings (Woodrow, Thomas)
Related: [-]
18 18 misc Administrative Record - ERISA Proceedings Mon 01/08 2:27 PM
Administrative Record - ERISA Proceedings (Sealed - Participants) (Woodrow, Thomas)
Related: [-]
17 17 misc Administrative Record - ERISA Proceedings Mon 01/08 2:26 PM
Administrative Record - ERISA Proceedings (Sealed - Participants) (Woodrow, Thomas)
Related: [-]
Wednesday, December 06, 2023
16 16 misc Status Report Wed 12/06 5:46 PM
STATUS REPORT Regarding Administrative Record by David Gasper (Tyson, Bryan)
Related: [-]
Tuesday, November 07, 2023
15 15 notice Notice (Other) Tue 11/07 1:02 PM
NOTICE of Compliance by Corteva, Inc., EIDP, Inc., The Benefit Plans Administrative Committee, The Pension and Retirement Plan re10 Scheduling Order, (Woodrow, Thomas)
Related: [-]
Friday, November 03, 2023
14 14 1 pgs order Order on Motion for Leave to Appear Pro Hac Vice Fri 11/03 8:11 AM
ORDER granting 13 Motion for Leave to Appear Pro Hac Vice added Todd D. Wozniak for EIDP, Inc., Corteva, Inc., The Pension and Retirement Plan, and The Benefit Plans Administrative Committee. Signed by US Magistrate Judge Susan C. Rodriguez on 11/3/2023. (brl)
Related: [-]
Thursday, November 02, 2023
13 13 motion Appear Pro Hac Vice - one motion per atty Thu 11/02 4:23 PM
MOTION for Leave to Appear Pro Hac Vice as to Todd D. Wozniak Filing fee $ 288, receipt number ANCWDC6219532. by Corteva, Inc., EIDP, Inc., The Benefit Plans Administrative Committee, The Pension and Retirement Plan. (clc)
Related: [-]
Thursday, October 26, 2023
12 12 respm Reply to Response to Motion Thu 10/26 4:33 PM
REPLY to Response to Motion re7 MOTION for Judgment on the Pleadings by Corteva, Inc., EIDP, Inc., The Benefit Plans Administrative Committee, The Pension and Retirement Plan. (Woodrow, Thomas)
Related: [-]
Friday, October 20, 2023
11 11 respm Response in Opposition to Motion Fri 10/20 10:32 PM
RESPONSE in Opposition re7 MOTION for Judgment on the Pleadings by David Gasper. Replies due by 10/27/2023 (Tyson, Bryan)
Related: [-]
Tuesday, October 10, 2023
10 10 order Scheduling Order Tue 10/10 4:06 PM
Pretrial Order and Case Management Plan: Estimated Trial Time: Two (2) to Three (3) Days. Discovery due by 2/28/2024. Motions due by 2/5/2024. Mediation deadline set for 1/22/2024. Bench Trial set for 7/8/2024 09:00 AM in Courtroom #5B, 401 W Trade St, Charlotte, NC 28202 before District Judge Frank D. Whitney. Signed by District Judge Frank D. Whitney on 10/10/2023. (ams)
Related: [-]
Friday, October 06, 2023
9 9 discov Certification of Initial Attorneys Conference and Discovery Plan Fri 10/06 4:57 PM
CERTIFICATION of initial attorney conference and discovery plan (Woodrow, Thomas)
Related: [-]
8 8 7 pgs respm Memorandum in Support of Motion Fri 10/06 1:57 PM
MEMORANDUM in Support re7 MOTION for Judgment on the Pleadings by Corteva, Inc., EIDP, Inc., The Benefit Plans Administrative Committee, The Pension and Retirement Plan. (Woodrow, Thomas)
Related: [-]
7 7 motion Judgment on the Pleadings Fri 10/06 1:56 PM
MOTION for Judgment on the Pleadings by Corteva, Inc., EIDP, Inc., The Benefit Plans Administrative Committee, The Pension and Retirement Plan. Responses due by 10/20/2023 (Woodrow, Thomas)
Related: [-]
Tuesday, September 19, 2023
notice Notice to Conduct Initial Attorneys Conference Tue 09/19 1:39 PM
NOTICE pursuant to Local Rule 16.1 you are required to conduct an Initial Attorney's Conference within 14 days. At the conference, the parties are required to discuss the issue of consent to jurisdiction of a magistrate judge in accordance with Local Rules 16.1(A) and 73.1(C). The[LINK:Certificate of Initial Attorneys Conference] , and if applicable, the[LINK:Joint Stipulation of Consent to Exercise jurisdiction by a US Magistrate Judge] , should be filed within 5 days of the conference. If appropriate, a party may file a Motion to Stay the Initial Attorney's Conference. CIAC Report due by 10/10/2023. (clc)
Related: [-]
Monday, September 18, 2023
6 6 misc Corporate Disclosure Statement Mon 09/18 12:50 PM
Corporate Disclosure Statement by Corteva, Inc.. (Woodrow, Thomas)
Related: [-]
5 5 misc Corporate Disclosure Statement Mon 09/18 12:49 PM
Corporate Disclosure Statement by EIDP, Inc.. (Woodrow, Thomas)
Related: [-]
4 4 answer Answer to Complaint Mon 09/18 12:46 PM
ANSWER to1 Complaint by Corteva, Inc., EIDP, Inc., The Benefit Plans Administrative Committee, The Pension and Retirement Plan.(Woodrow, Thomas)
Related: [-]
Friday, September 08, 2023
3 3 notice Notice of Appearance Fri 09/08 11:45 AM
NOTICE of Appearance by Thomas R. Woodrow on behalf of All Defendants (Woodrow, Thomas)
Related: [-]
Tuesday, August 15, 2023
2 2 service Summons Issued Tue 08/15 7:54 AM
Summons Issued Electronically as to Corteva, Inc., EIDP, Inc., The Benefit Plans Administrative Committee, The Pension and Retirement Plan. NOTICE: Counsel shall print the summons and serve with other case opening documents in accordance with Fed.R.Civ.P.4 .(jm)
Related: [-]
Att: 1 Summons,
Att: 2 Summons,
Att: 3 Summons
Monday, August 14, 2023
1 1 14 pgs cmp Complaint Mon 08/14 6:14 PM
COMPLAINT against All Defendants ( Filing fee $ 402 receipt number ANCWDC-6181992), filed by David Gasper.(Tyson, Bryan)
Related: [-]
utility Case Assigned/Reassigned Tue 08/15 7:43 AM
Case assigned to District Judge Frank D. Whitney and US Magistrate Judge Susan C. Rodriguez. Notice: You must click this link to retrieve the[LINK:Case Assignment Packet] . This is your only notice - you will not receive a separate document. (jm)
Related: [-]
utility Initial Scheduling Order Entry - Judge Whitney Tue 08/15 7:43 AM
Clerk's Entry and Service of[LINK:Initial Scheduling Order] and[LINK:Certificate of Initial Attorney FRCP 26(f) Conference Form] pursuant to the Standing Order Governing Civil Case Management before the Honorable Frank D. Whitney (3:07-mc-47 (Doc. No. 2)). The parties are directed to click on the link above to retrieve the Order. (jm)
Related: [-]