Consolidated
Lead case: 1:23-md-03076

Florida Southern District Court
Judge:K Michael Moore
Case #: 1:23-cv-23064
Nature of Suit370 Torts - Personal Property - Other Fraud
Cause28:1332 Diversity-Fraud
Case Filed:Aug 14, 2023
Terminated:Aug 14, 2023
Case in other court:California Central, 2:23-cv-05951
Last checked: Saturday Feb 10, 2024 3:27 AM EST
Defendant
David Gene Lawrence
Defendant
Naomi Osaka
Defendant
Solomid Corporation
Plaintiff
Alexander Chernyavsky
Represented By
Brooke A. Alexander
Boies Schiller Flexner LLP
contact info
Hsiao Chun Mao
Boies Schiller Flexner LLP
contact info
Plaintiff
Gary Gallant
Represented By
Brooke A. Alexander
Boies Schiller Flexner LLP
contact info
Hsiao Chun Mao
Boies Schiller Flexner LLP
contact info
Plaintiff
Edwin Garrison
Represented By
Brooke A. Alexander
Boies Schiller Flexner LLP
contact info
Hsiao Chun Mao
Boies Schiller Flexner LLP
contact info
Plaintiff
Sunil Kavuri
Represented By
Brooke A. Alexander
Boies Schiller Flexner LLP
contact info
Hsiao Chun Mao
Boies Schiller Flexner LLP
contact info
Plaintiff
Skyler Lindeen
Represented By
Brooke A. Alexander
Boies Schiller Flexner LLP
contact info
Hsiao Chun Mao
Boies Schiller Flexner LLP
contact info
Plaintiff
David Nicol
Represented By
Brooke A. Alexander
Boies Schiller Flexner LLP
contact info
Hsiao Chun Mao
Boies Schiller Flexner LLP
contact info
Plaintiff
Gary Piano
Represented By
Brooke A. Alexander
Boies Schiller Flexner LLP
contact info
Hsiao Chun Mao
Boies Schiller Flexner LLP
contact info
Plaintiff
Gregg Podalsky
201 South Biscayne Boulevard Suite 1205
Miami, FL 33131
Represented By
Brooke A. Alexander
Boies Schiller Flexner LLP
contact info
Hsiao Chun Mao
Boies Schiller Flexner LLP
contact info
TERMINATED PARTIES
Defendant
Shohei Ohtani
Terminated: 07/24/2023


Docket last updated: 05/15/2025 11:59 PM EDT
Monday, August 14, 2023
19 19 PAPERLESS ORDER STAYING CASE. THIS CAUSE came before the Court upon a sua sponte review of the record. The Court notes that this case is a member case in In Re: FTX Cryptocurrency Exchange Collapse Litigation, 1:23-md-03076-KMM. In the interests of judicial economy, it is hereby ORDERED AND ADJUDGED that this case is STAYED. The Clerk of the Court is instructed to administratively close this case for statistical purposes, while the claims proceed under 1:23-md-03076-KMM. The Court shall retain jurisdiction and the case shall be restored to the active docket upon motion of a party if circumstances change so that the action may proceed to final disposition. Signed by Judge K. Michael Moore on 8/14/2023. (rfr) (jas)
Related: [-]
18 18 Clerks Notice of Judge Assignment to Judge K. Michael Moore. (jas)
Related: [-]
17 17 Case transferred in from California Central; Case Number 2:23-cv-05951. Electronic file including transfer order and docket sheet received. .(jas).
Related: [-]
Wednesday, August 09, 2023
16 16 Conditional Transfer Order - CTO-2 from the United States Judicial Panel on Multidistrict Litigation, MDL 3076, transferring case to USDC, Southern District of Florida and assigned to Honorable K. Michael Moore. Case transferred electronically. (MD JS-6. Case Terminated.) (rolm)
Related: [-]
Thursday, August 03, 2023
15 15 ORDER by Judge Andre Birotte Jr. Granting Application of Non-Resident Attorney Brooke A. Alexander to Appear Pro Hac Vice on behalf of Plaintiffs Edwin Garrison, Gregg Podalsky, Skyler Lindeen, Alexander Chernyavsky, Gary Piano, Sunil Kavuri, Gary Gallant, and David Nicol, designating Hsiao C. Mao as local counsel12 ,14 . (gk)
Related: [-]
Monday, July 31, 2023
14 14 Corrected APPLICATION of Non-Resident Attorney Brooke A. Alexander to Appear Pro Hac Vice on behalf of Plaintiffs Alexander Chernyavsky, Gary Gallant, Edwin Garrison, Sunil Kavuri, Skyler Lindeen, David Nicol, Gary Piano, Gregg Podalsky (Pro Hac Vice Fee - $500 Previously Paid on 7/27/2023, Receipt No. ACACDC-35747628) filed by Plaintiffs Alexander Chernyavsky, Gary Gallant, Edwin Garrison, Sunil Kavuri, Skyler Lindeen, David Nicol, Gary Piano, Gregg Podalsky. (Mao, Hsiao)
Related: [-]
Att: 1 Proposed Order
Friday, July 28, 2023
13 13 NOTICE of Deficiency in Electronically Filed Pro Hac Vice Application RE: APPLICATION of Non-Resident Attorney Brooke A. Alexander to Appear Pro Hac Vice on behalf of Plaintiffs Alexander Chernyavsky, Gary Gallant, Edwin Garrison, Sunil Kavuri, Skyler Lindeen, David Nicol, Gary Piano, Gregg Podalsky (Pro Hac Vice Fee -12 . The following error(s) was/were found: Telephone number on application and proposed Order are inconsistent. Application has a 415 area code for phone and fax, proposed order has 213 area code for phone and fax. (lt) (Entered: 07/28/2023)
Related: [-]
Thursday, July 27, 2023
12 12 APPLICATION of Non-Resident Attorney Brooke A. Alexander to Appear Pro Hac Vice on behalf of Plaintiffs Alexander Chernyavsky, Gary Gallant, Edwin Garrison, Sunil Kavuri, Skyler Lindeen, David Nicol, Gary Piano, Gregg Podalsky (Pro Hac Vice Fee - $500 Fee Paid, Receipt No. ACACDC-35747628) filed by Plaintiff Alexander Chernyavsky, Gary Gallant, Edwin Garrison, Sunil Kavuri, Skyler Lindeen, David Nicol, Gary Piano, Gregg Podalsky. (Mao, Hsiao)
Related: [-]
Att: 1 Proposed Order
Tuesday, July 25, 2023
11 11 STANDING ORDER upon filing of the complaint by Judge Andre Birotte Jr. (cb)
Related: [-]
Monday, July 24, 2023
10 10 STIPULATION to Dismiss Defendant Shohei Ohtani filed by Plaintiff Sunil Kavuri, Skyler Lindeen, Gary Gallant, David Nicol, Alexander Chernyavsky, Edwin Garrison.(Mao, Hsiao)
Related: [-]
9 9 NOTICE OF PRO HAC VICE APPLICATION DUE for Non-Resident Attorney Brooke Alexander. A document recently filed in this case lists you as an out-of-state attorney of record. However, the Court has not been able to locate any record that you are admitted to the Bar of this Court, and you have not filed an application to appear Pro Hac Vice in this case. Accordingly, within 5 business days of the date of this notice, you must either (1) have your local counsel file an application to appear Pro Hac Vice (Form G-64) and pay the applicable fee, or (2) complete the next section of this form and return it to the court at cacd_attyadm@cacd.uscourts.gov. You have been removed as counsel of record from the docket in this case, and you will not be added back to the docket until your Pro Hac Vice status has been resolved. (sh)
Related: [-]
8 8 21 DAY Summons Issued re Complaint (Attorney Civil Case Opening),,,1 as to Defendants David Gene Lawrence, Shohei Ohtani, Naomi Osaka, Solomid Corporation. (sh)
Related: [-]
7 7 Notice to Counsel Re Consent to Proceed Before a United States Magistrate Judge. (sh)
Related: [-]
6 6 NOTICE TO PARTIES OF COURT-DIRECTED ADR PROGRAM filed. (sh)
Related: [-]
5 5 NOTICE OF ASSIGNMENT to District Judge Andre Birotte Jr and Magistrate Judge Pedro V. Castillo. (sh)
Related: [-]
Friday, July 21, 2023
4 4 NOTICE of Interested Parties filed by plaintiff All Plaintiffs, identifying Shohei Ohtani, Naomi Osaka, Lawrence Gene David, and Solomid Corporation d/b/a Team Solomid, TSM and/or TSM FTX. (Mao, Hsiao)
Related: [-]
3 3 Request for Clerk to Issue Summons on Complaint (Attorney Civil Case Opening),,,1 filed by plaintiff Alexander Chernyavsky, Gary Gallant, Edwin Garrison, Sunil Kavuri, Skyler Lindeen, David Nicol, Gary Piano, Gregg Podalsky. (Mao, Hsiao)
Related: [-]
2 2 CIVIL COVER SHEET filed by Plaintiffs Alexander Chernyavsky, Gary Gallant, Edwin Garrison, Sunil Kavuri, Skyler Lindeen, David Nicol, Gary Piano, Gregg Podalsky. (Mao, Hsiao)
Related: [-]
1 1 COMPLAINT Receipt No: ACACDC-35719494 - Fee: $402, filed by plaintiff Sunil Kavuri, Skyler Lindeen, Gary Gallant, Gregg Podalsky, David Nicol, Alexander Chernyavsky, Edwin Garrison, Gary Piano. (Attorney Hsiao Chun Mao added to party Alexander Chernyavsky(pty:pla), Attorney Hsiao Chun Mao added to party Gary Gallant(pty:pla), Attorney Hsiao Chun Mao added to party Edwin Garrison(pty:pla), Attorney Hsiao Chun Mao added to party Sunil Kavuri(pty:pla), Attorney Hsiao Chun Mao added to party Skyler Lindeen (pty:pla), Attorney Hsiao Chun Mao added to party David Nicol(pty:pla), Attorney Hsiao Chun Mao added to party Gary Piano(pty:pla), Attorney Hsiao Chun Mao added to party Gregg Podalsky(pty:pla))(Mao, Hsiao)
Related: [-]
Att: 1 Exhibit A,
Att: 2 Exhibit B,
Att: 3 Exhibit C,
Att: 4 Exhibit D,
Att: 5 Exhibit E