Ohio Northern District Court
Judge:David A Ruiz
Case #: 1:23-cv-01587
Nature of Suit448 Civil Rights - Education
Cause28:1331 Federal Question: Other Civil Rights
Case Filed:Aug 15, 2023
Last checked: Sunday Feb 11, 2024 4:02 AM EST
Defendant
Cleveland Institute of the Arts
Represented By
Rebecca J. Bennett
Ogletree Deakins
contact info
Federico G. Barrera, III
Ogletree Deakins Nash Smoak & Stewart - Cleveland
contact info
Plaintiff
Grace Dunbar
3569 Ridgewood Road
Toledo, OH 43606
Represented By
Norman A Abood
Law Office Of Norman A. Abood
contact info


Docket last updated: 05/23/2025 11:59 PM EDT
Thursday, January 25, 2024
12 12 resp Reply Thu 01/25 12:17 PM
Reply in support of3 Motion to dismiss for failure to state a claim filed by Cleveland Institute of the Arts. (Bennett, Rebecca)
Related: [-]
Friday, January 12, 2024
11 11 2 pgs order Order Fri 01/12 3:04 PM
Order. The Court converts Plaintiff's Proposed Stipulation of Dismissal of Count Two (R.7 ) into a motion to amend Plaintiff's Complaint brought under Fed. R. Civ. P. 15(a)(2), and said motion (R. 7) is GRANTED. Count Two is dismissed with prejudice; the Court does not require the parties to file an Amended Complaint or an Amended Answer. Judge David A. Ruiz on 1/12/2024. (K,MJ)
Related: [-]
Wednesday, January 03, 2024
10 10 motion Extension of Time to File Response/Reply to Motion Wed 01/03 8:02 AM
Unopposed Motion for extension of time until January 25, 2024 to file response/reply to3 Motion to dismiss for failure to state a claim filed by Defendant Cleveland Institute of the Arts. Related document(s)3 . (Bennett, Rebecca)
Related: [-]
order Order on Motion for extension of time to file response/reply to motion Wed 01/03 11:09 AM
Order [non-document] granting Defendant's10 Motion for Extension of Time to File Reply. Defendant shall reply to Plaintiff's8 Opposition to Motion to Dismiss on or before 01/25/2024. Judge David A. Ruiz on 01/03/2024. (K,MJ)
Related: [-]
Wednesday, December 20, 2023
9 9 notice Notice (atty event) Wed 12/20 10:49 AM
Notice of Filing Exhibit filed by Grace Dunbar. Related document(s)8 .(Abood, Norman)
Related: [-]
8 8 resp Opposition Wed 12/20 10:05 AM
Opposition to3 Motion to dismiss for failure to state a claim filed by Grace Dunbar. (Abood, Norman)
Related: [-]
7 7 notice Stipulation (atty event) Wed 12/20 8:48 AM
Proposed Stipulation of dismissl of count two only filed by Grace Dunbar. (Abood, Norman)
Related: [-]
Wednesday, December 06, 2023
6 6 oth_doc Proposed Order Wed 12/06 11:28 AM
Proposed Order filed by Grace Dunbar. Related document(s)5 . (Abood, Norman)
Related: [-]
5 5 motion Extension of Time to File Response/Reply to Motion Wed 12/06 11:25 AM
Motion for extension of time until 12/21/23 to file response/reply to3 Motion to dismiss for failure to state a claim filed by Plaintiff Grace Dunbar. Related document(s)3 . (Abood, Norman)
Related: [-]
order Order on Motion for extension of time to file response/reply to motion Wed 12/06 2:19 PM
Order [non-document] granting Plaintiff's5 Motion for Extension of Time to File Response. Plaintiff shall respond to Defendant's3 Motion to Dismiss on or before 12/21/2023. Judge David A. Ruiz on 12/06/2023. (K,MJ)
Related: [-]
Monday, December 04, 2023
4 4 notice Attorney Substitution (atty event) Mon 12/04 4:28 PM
Notice of Substitution of Counsel removing attorney Federico G. Barrera III and adding attorney Rebecca J. Bennett filed by on behalf of Cleveland Institute of the Arts. (Bennett, Rebecca)
Related: [-]
Tuesday, November 07, 2023
3 3 motion Dismiss for Failure to State a Claim Tue 11/07 11:30 AM
Motion to dismiss for failure to state a claim filed by Defendant Cleveland Institute of the Arts.(Barrera, Federico)
Related: [-]
Att: 1 Exhibit A - Title IX Policy
Tuesday, August 15, 2023
2 2 oth_evt Summons Issued Tue 08/15 12:01 PM
Original Summons and Magistrate Consent Form issued to counsel for service upon Cleveland Institute of the Arts.. (H,Ch)
Related: [-]
Att: 1 Magistrate Consent Form
1 1 cmp Complaint Tue 08/15 11:08 AM
Complaint with jury demand against Cleveland Institute of the Arts. Filing fee paid $ 402, Receipt number AOHNDC-12132398. Filed by Grace Dunbar. (Abood, Norman)
Related: [-]
Att: 1 Civil Cover Sheet,
Att: 2 Summons
utility Add and Terminate Judge Tue 08/15 11:50 AM
Judge David A. Ruiz assigned to case. (H,Ch)
Related: [-]
oth_evt Random Assignment of Magistrate Judge Tue 08/15 11:52 AM
Random Assignment of Magistrate Judge pursuant to Local Rule 3.1. In the event of a referral, case will be assigned to Magistrate Judge Jonathan D. Greenberg. (H,Ch)
Related: [-]