Massachusetts District Court
Judge:Richard G Stearns
Case #: 1:23-cv-11861
Nature of Suit430 Other Statutes - Banks and Banking
Cause28:1331 Fed. Question
Case Filed:Aug 15, 2023
Terminated:Aug 17, 2023
Last checked: Sunday Feb 11, 2024 3:34 AM EST
Defendant
Penn Federal Credit Union
Plaintiff
Russell Holloway
68 Beale Street Apt 206
Quincy, MA 02170

GPO Aug 17 2023
Judge Richard G. Stearns: ORDER entered. MEMORANDUM AND ORDER - the complaint is DISMISSED pursuant to Fed. R. Civ. P. 12(h)(3) for lack of subject matter jurisdiction.(PSSA, 4)

Docket last updated: 2 hours ago
Thursday, August 17, 2023
5 5 1 pgs order Order Dismissing Case Thu 08/17 5:51 PM
Judge Richard G. Stearns: ORDER entered. ORDER DISMISSING CASE(PSSA, 4)
Related: [-]
4 4 5 pgs order Memorandum & Order Thu 08/17 5:51 PM
Judge Richard G. Stearns: ORDER entered. MEMORANDUM AND ORDER - the complaint is DISMISSED pursuant to Fed. R. Civ. P. 12(h)(3) for lack of subject matter jurisdiction.(PSSA, 4)
Related: [-]
Tuesday, August 15, 2023
3 3 notice Notice of Case Assignment Tue 08/15 2:36 PM
ELECTRONIC NOTICE of Case Assignment. Judge Richard G. Stearns assigned to case. If the trial Judge issues an Order of Reference of any matter in this case to a Magistrate Judge, the matter will be transmitted to Magistrate Judge Donald L. Cabell. (Cook, Savannah)
Related: [-]
Monday, August 14, 2023
2 2 motion Proceed In Forma Pauperis Tue 08/15 2:21 PM
MOTION for Leave to Proceed in forma pauperis by Russell Holloway.(Castilla, Francis)
Related: [-]
1 1 8 pgs cmp Complaint Tue 08/15 2:13 PM
COMPLAINT against Penn Federal Credit Union, filed by Russell Holloway.(Castilla, Francis)
Related: [-]
Att: 1 Civil Cover Sheet Category Form