Minnesota District Court
Judge:Nancy E Brasel
Referred: Tony N Leung
Case #: 0:23-cv-02512
Nature of Suit480 Other Statutes - Consumer Credit
Cause15:1692 Fair Debt Collection Act
Case Filed:Aug 15, 2023
Terminated:Mar 10, 2025
Last checked: Sunday Feb 11, 2024 2:31 AM CST
Counter Claimant
Northeastern Title Loans, LLC
Represented By
Jacob B Sellers
Greenstein And Sellers PLLC
contact info
Counter Defendant
Thanh Truong
Represented By
Kwame Osafo-Addo
Kwame'S Law Firm PLLC
contact info
Cross Claimant
Northeastern Title Loans, LLC
Represented By
Jacob B Sellers
Greenstein And Sellers PLLC
contact info
Cross Defendant
Valley Apple Ford, Inc.
Represented By
Amy M Sieben
Fisher Bren & Sheridan LLP
contact info
Bradley D Fisher
Fisher Bren & Sheridan LLP
contact info
Defendant
Northeastern Title Loans, LLC
Represented By
Jacob B Sellers
Greenstein And Sellers PLLC
contact info
Defendant
11th Hour Recovery L.L.C.
Defendant
IAA Inc.
Represented By
Jacob B Sellers
Greenstein And Sellers PLLC
contact info
Defendant
Valley Apple Ford, Inc.
Represented By
Amy M Sieben
Fisher Bren & Sheridan LLP
contact info
Bradley D Fisher
Fisher Bren & Sheridan LLP
contact info
Plaintiff
Thanh Truong
Represented By
Kwame Osafo-Addo
Kwame'S Law Firm PLLC
contact info
TERMINATED PARTIES
Defendant
11th Hour Recovery, Inc.
Terminated: 09/01/2023
Represented By
Jacob B Sellers
Greenstein And Sellers PLLC
contact info
Defendant
Insurance Auto Auctions, Inc.
Terminated: 12/05/2023
Represented By
Jacob B Sellers
Greenstein And Sellers PLLC
contact info
Defendant
11th Hour Recovery, L.L.C.
Terminated: 12/05/2023
Represented By
Jacob B Sellers
Greenstein And Sellers PLLC
contact info
Defendant
Valley Ford, Inc.
Terminated: 12/05/2023
Plaintiff
Mason Truong
Terminated: 12/05/2023
Represented By
Kwame Osafo-Addo
Kwame'S Law Firm PLLC
contact info


Docket last updated: 03/18/2025 11:59 PM CDT
Monday, March 10, 2025
88 88 1 pgs order Order Dismissing Case Mon 03/10 1:59 PM
ORDER DISMISSING CASE re86 Stipulation of Dismissal. Signed by Judge Nancy E. Brasel on 3/10/2025. (KMW)
Related: [-]
87 87 misc Proposed Order to Judge re Stipulation Mon 03/10 9:57 AM
PROPOSED ORDER TO JUDGE re86 Stipulation of Dismissal. (Sellers, Jacob)
Related: [-]
86 86 misc Stipulation of Dismissal Mon 03/10 9:24 AM
STIPULATION of Dismissal by 11th Hour Recovery, Inc., IAA Inc., Northeastern Title Loans, LLC. Jointly Signed by Northeastern Title Loans, LLC, 11th Hour Recovery, Inc., IAA, Inc., Thanh Truong, and Apple Valley Ford, Inc.. (Sellers, Jacob)
Related: [-]