Michigan Eastern District Court
Judge:Bernard A Friedman
Referred: Kimberly G Altman
Case #: 2:23-cv-12089
Nature of Suit440 Civil Rights - Other Civil Rights
CauseNo cause code entered
Case Filed:Aug 14, 2023
Terminated:Mar 22, 2024
Last checked: Saturday Feb 10, 2024 3:51 AM EST
Defendant
Nicole Milz
Represented By
Cameron R. Getto
Zausmer, P.C.
contact info
Defendant
The Guidance Center
Represented By
Cameron R. Getto
Zausmer, P.C.
contact info
Plaintiff
Dijon Townsend
22083 Dale
Brownstown, MI 48183

GPO Feb 27 2024
REPORT AND RECOMMENDATION RECOMMENDING GRANTING DEFENDANTS' 11 MOTION to Dismiss Rule 12(c) filed by Nicole Milz, The Guidance Center - Signed by Magistrate Judge Kimberly G. Altman. (CCie)
GPO Mar 22 2024
OPINION AND ORDER OVERRULING OBJECTIONS 25 TO MAGISTRATE JUDGE'S REPORT AND RECOMMENDATION TO GRANT MOTION TO DISMISS; ADOPTING REPORT AND RECOMMENDATION 24; GRANTING MOTION TO DISMISS 11; WITHDRAWING ORDER OF REFERENCE 16; DENYING MOTION FOR LEAVE TO REQUEST CONSOLIDATION 26; DENYING MOTION TO CONSOLIDATE 27; DENYING MOTION FOR RECONSIDERATION 29; AND ADDRESSING PETITION FOR WRIT OF MANDAMUS 31. Signed by District Judge Bernard A. Friedman. (JCur)

Docket last updated: 05/23/2025 11:59 PM EDT
Wednesday, February 12, 2025
40 40 appeal Appeal Mandate Thu 02/13 2:17 PM
MANDATE from U.S. Court of Appeals - Sixth Circuit as to33 Notice of Appeal filed by Dijon Townsend [Appeal Case Number 24-1293 (JPar)
Related: [-]
Friday, January 17, 2025
39 39 appeal Appeal Order/Opinion/Judgment Fri 01/17 11:52 AM
ORDER from U.S. Court of Appeals - Sixth Circuit re33 Notice of Appeal filed by Dijon Townsend [Appeal Case Number 24-1293 (ABun)
Related: [-]
Thursday, January 02, 2025
38 38 appeal Appeal Mandate Thu 01/02 11:48 AM
MANDATE from U.S. Court of Appeals - Sixth Circuit as to33 Notice of Appeal filed by Dijon Townsend,37 Appeal Order/Opinion/Judgment,36 Appeal Order/Opinion/Judgment [Appeal Case Number 24-1293 (MSyl)
Related: [-]
Wednesday, December 04, 2024
37 37 appeal Appeal Order/Opinion/Judgment Wed 12/04 10:41 AM
JUDGMENT from U.S. Court of Appeals - Sixth Circuit re33 Notice of Appeal filed by Dijon Townsend [Appeal Case Number 24-1293 (ABun)
Related: [-]
36 36 appeal Appeal Order/Opinion/Judgment Wed 12/04 10:38 AM
ORDER from U.S. Court of Appeals - Sixth Circuit re33 Notice of Appeal filed by Dijon Townsend [Appeal Case Number 24-1293 (ABun)
Related: [-]
Friday, April 05, 2024
35 35 appeal Certificate of Service of Notice of Appeal - 6th Circuit* Fri 04/05 10:35 AM
Certificate of Service re33 Notice of Appeal. (NAhm)
Related: [-]
Wednesday, April 03, 2024
34 34 petition Application to Proceed Without Prepaying Fees or Costs Fri 04/05 10:35 AM
APPLICATION to Proceed without prepaying fees or costs on Appeal by Dijon Townsend. [Submitted Through Pro Se Portal] (NAhm)
Related: [-]
33 33 appeal Notice of Appeal - 6th Circuit Fri 04/05 10:34 AM
NOTICE OF APPEAL by Dijon Townsend re32 Memorandum Opinion & Order,, Order Adopting Report and Recommendation,. Fee Status: IFP. [Submitted Through Pro Se Portal] (NAhm)
Related: [-]
Att: 1 Exhibit,
Att: 2 Exhibit B
Friday, March 22, 2024
32 32 19 pgs order Memorandum Opinion & Order Adopting Report and Recommendation Fri 03/22 3:53 PM
OPINION AND ORDER OVERRULING OBJECTIONS25 TO MAGISTRATE JUDGE'S REPORT AND RECOMMENDATION TO GRANT MOTION TO DISMISS; ADOPTING REPORT AND RECOMMENDATION24 ; GRANTING MOTION TO DISMISS11 ; WITHDRAWING ORDER OF REFERENCE16 ; DENYING MOTION FOR LEAVE TO REQUEST CONSOLIDATION26 ; DENYING MOTION TO CONSOLIDATE27 ; DENYING MOTION FOR RECONSIDERATION29 ; AND ADDRESSING PETITION FOR WRIT OF MANDAMUS31 . Signed by District Judge Bernard A. Friedman. (JCur)
Related: [-]
service Certificate of Service Fri 03/22 4:00 PM
TEXT-ONLY CERTIFICATE OF SERVICE re32 Opinion & Order, Adopting Report and Recommendation on Dijon Townsend at 22083 Dale, Brownstown, MI 48183. (JCur)
Related: [-]
Monday, March 18, 2024
31 31 cmp Civil Case - Petition for Writ of Mandamus Tue 03/19 12:49 PM
Petition for Writ of Mandamus filed by Dijon Townsend against All Defendants [Submitted Through Pro Se Portal] (NAhm)
Related: [-]
Att: 1 Exhibit B,
Att: 2 Exhibit B
Saturday, March 09, 2024
30 30 trial Exhibit Mon 03/11 11:25 AM
EXHIBITS in support of29 Motion for reconsideration by Dijon Townsend (submitted through the pro-se upload) (DPer)
Related: [-]
29 29 motion Motion - Free Mon 03/11 11:23 AM
MOTION for reconsideration by Dijon Townsend. (submitted through the pro-se upload) (DPer)
Related: [-]
Thursday, March 07, 2024
28 28 respm Response to Motion Thu 03/07 9:28 AM
RESPONSE to27 MOTION to Consolidate Cases filed by All Defendants. (Getto, Cameron)
Related: [-]
Att: 1 Index of Exhibits,
Att: 2 Exhibit Ex. A - Opinion and Order,
Att: 3 Exhibit Ex. B - Judgment
Wednesday, March 06, 2024
27 27 motion Consolidate Cases Wed 03/06 2:26 PM
MOTION to Consolidate Cases by Dijon Townsend. [Submitted Through Pro Se Portal] (NAhm)
Related: [-]
26 26 motion Leave to File Wed 03/06 1:19 PM
MOTION for Leave to Request for Consolidation of Cases 23-11188 and 23-12089 by Dijon Townsend.[Submitted Through Pro Se Portal] (NAhm)
Related: [-]
Monday, March 04, 2024
25 25 respoth Objection to Report and Recommendation Wed 03/06 11:45 AM
OBJECTION to24 Report and Recommendation by Dijon Townsend. [Submitted Through Pro Se Portal] (NAhm)
Related: [-]
Tuesday, February 27, 2024
24 24 motion Report and Recommendation Tue 02/27 3:45 PM
REPORT AND RECOMMENDATION RECOMMENDING GRANTING DEFENDANTS'11 MOTION to Dismiss Rule 12(c) filed by Nicole Milz, The Guidance Center - Signed by Magistrate Judge Kimberly G. Altman. (CCie)
Related: [-]
service Certificate of Service Tue 02/27 3:47 PM
TEXT-ONLY CERTIFICATE OF SERVICE re24 REPORT AND RECOMMENDATION re11 MOTION to Dismiss Rule 12(c) filed by Nicole Milz, The Guidance Center on Dijon Townsend at 22083 Dale, Brownstown, MI 48183 (CCie)
Related: [-]
Wednesday, November 01, 2023
23 23 4 pgs order Order on Motion - Free Order on Motion to Stay Wed 11/01 3:26 PM
ORDER DENYING PLAINTIFF'S12 Motion for Oral Argument; GRANTING DEFENDANTS'19 Motion to Stay; AND DENYING PLAINTIFF'S21 Motion to Dismiss Defendants'19 Motion to Stay - Signed by Magistrate Judge Kimberly G. Altman. (CCie)
Related: [-]
service Certificate of Service Wed 11/01 3:29 PM
TEXT-ONLY CERTIFICATE OF SERVICE re23 Order on Motion - Free, Order on Motion to Stay on Dijon Townsend at 22083 Dale, Brownstown MI 48183 (CCie)
Related: [-]
Monday, October 30, 2023
22 22 respm Response to Motion Mon 10/30 2:05 PM
RESPONSE to21 MOTION to Dismiss re19 MOTION to Stay Pending Ruling on Dispositive Motion (Expedited Consideration Requested) filed by All Defendants. (Getto, Cameron)
Related: [-]
Friday, October 27, 2023
21 21 motion Motion - Free Fri 10/27 11:26 AM
MOTION to Dismiss re19 MOTION to Stay Pending Ruling on Dispositive Motion (Expedited Consideration Requested) by Dijon Townsend. [Submitted through Pro Se Portal] (SSch)
Related: [-]
20 20 respoth Response - Free Fri 10/27 8:12 AM
RESPONSE to14 Response (Free) Response to Plaintiff's Response to Defendants Affirmative Defenses and Answers by All Defendants. (Getto, Cameron)
Related: [-]
Thursday, October 26, 2023
19 19 motion Stay Thu 10/26 2:14 PM
MOTION to Stay Pending Ruling on Dispositive Motion (Expedited Consideration Requested) by All Defendants. (Getto, Cameron)
Related: [-]
18 18 respm Response to Motion Thu 10/26 2:11 PM
RESPONSE to12 MOTION for Oral Argument filed by All Defendants. (Getto, Cameron)
Related: [-]
17 17 respm Reply to Response to Motion Thu 10/26 2:09 PM
REPLY to Response re11 MOTION to Dismiss Rule 12(c) with Response to Plaintiff's Motion to Deny Defendants' Motion to Dismiss and Grant Plaintiff's Claim filed by All Defendants. (Getto, Cameron)
Related: [-]
Att: 1 Exhibit Ex A - Report and Recommendation (Prior Case)
16 16 order Referring Pretrial Matters to Magistrate Judge* Thu 10/26 11:22 AM
ORDER Referring Matters for Full Pretrial to Magistrate Judge Kimberly G. Altman re12 Motion,11 Motion to Dismiss. Signed by District Judge Bernard A. Friedman. (JCur)
Related: [-]
service Certificate of Service Thu 10/26 11:26 AM
TEXT-ONLY CERTIFICATE OF SERVICE re16 Order Referring Pretrial Matters to Magistrate Judge on Dijon Townsend at 22083 Dale, Brownstown MI 48183. (JCur)
Related: [-]
Wednesday, October 25, 2023
15 15 service Certificate of Service/Summons Returned Executed Wed 10/25 1:28 PM
CERTIFICATE of Service/Summons Returned Executed. Nicole Milz served on 10/10/2023, answer due 10/31/2023; The Guidance Center served on 10/10/2023, answer due 10/31/2023. (TTho)
Related: [-]
Monday, October 23, 2023
14 14 respoth Response - Free Tue 10/24 1:11 PM
RESPONSE to10 Answer to Complaint and Affirmative Defenses by Dijon Townsend. [Submitted through Pro Se Portal] (SSch)
Related: [-]
13 13 respm Response to Motion Tue 10/24 1:10 PM
RESPONSE to11 MOTION to Dismiss Rule 12(c) filed by Dijon Townsend. [Titled Motion to Deny Defendant's Motion to Dismiss and Grant Plaintiff's Claim] [Submitted through Pro Se Portal] (SSch)
Related: [-]
Wednesday, October 18, 2023
12 12 motion Motion - Free Wed 10/18 4:11 PM
MOTION for Oral Argument by Dijon Townsend. [Submitted through Pro Se Portal] (SSch)
Related: [-]
11 11 motion Dismiss Wed 10/18 12:31 PM
MOTION to Dismiss Rule 12(c) by All Defendants. (Getto, Cameron)
Related: [-]
Att: 1 Index of Exhibits,
Att: 2 Exhibit Ex A - Plaintiff's Complaint,
Att: 3 Exhibit Ex. B - Magistrates Report and Recommendation prior lawsuit Townsend v The Guidance Center and Belicia Romero,
Att: 4 Exhibit Ex C - Plaintiffs references to Defendant Milz in multiple filings in prior lawsuit Townsend v The Guidance Center and Belicia Romero,
Att: 5 Exhibit Ex D- Corporate Documents of The Guidance Center,
Att: 6 Exhibit Ex E - License of Nicole Milz,
Att: 7 Exhibit Ex. F - Guidance Center Records
Monday, October 16, 2023
10 10 answer Answer to Complaint Mon 10/16 10:35 AM
ANSWER to Complaint with Affirmative Defenses with Jury Demand Reliance by All Defendants. (Getto, Cameron)
Related: [-]
Att: 1 Exhibit EX A - Townsend v The Guidance Center/Belicia Romero Complaint
9 9 notice Appearance Mon 10/16 10:31 AM
NOTICE of Appearance by Cameron R. Getto on behalf of All Defendants. (Getto, Cameron)
Related: [-]
Wednesday, October 04, 2023
8 8 service Acknowledgment Wed 10/04 4:51 PM
ACKNOWLEDGMENT from U.S. Marshal Service of Receipt of Service of Process Documents for Nicole Milz, The Guidance Center. Documents served on 10/04/2023. (DAll)
Related: [-]
Wednesday, September 20, 2023
7 7 service Summons Issued* Wed 09/20 3:52 PM
SUMMONS Issued for *Nicole Milz, The Guidance Center* (JOwe)
Related: [-]
service Service Documents Received Wed 09/20 3:47 PM
Service Documents Received (JOwe)
Related: [-]
Thursday, August 31, 2023
6 6 order Directing Service by the US Marshal Thu 08/31 12:07 PM
ORDER Directing Plaintiff to Complete Service Documents and for Service of Process by the US Marshal. Signed by District Judge Bernard A. Friedman. (JCur)
Related: [-]
5 5 2 pgs order Order on Application to Proceed Without Prepaying Fees or Costs Thu 08/31 12:03 PM
ORDER granting2 Application to Proceed Without Prepaying Fees or Costs. Signed by District Judge Bernard A. Friedman. (JCur)
Related: [-]
service Certificate of Service Thu 08/31 12:10 PM
TEXT-ONLY CERTIFICATE OF SERVICE re5 Order on Application to Proceed Without Prepaying Fees or Costs,6 Directing Service by the US Marshal on Dijon Townsend at 22083 Dale, Brownstown, MI 48183. (JCur)
Related: [-]
Wednesday, August 16, 2023
4 4 notice Regarding Parties Responsibility to Notify Court of Address Changes* Wed 08/16 4:01 PM
Notice Regarding Parties' Responsibility to Notify Court of Address Changes (DJen)
Related: [-]
Monday, August 14, 2023
2 2 petition Application to Proceed Without Prepaying Fees or Costs Tue 08/15 8:52 AM
APPLICATION to Proceed without prepaying fees or costs by Dijon Townsend. [Submitted through Pro Se Portal] (SSch)
Related: [-]
1 1 cmp Civil Case - Complaint Tue 08/15 8:51 AM
COMPLAINT filed by Dijon Townsend against Guidance Center, Nicole Milz [Submitted through Pro Se Portal] (SSch)
Related: [-]