New York Southern District Court
Judge:Vernon S Broderick
Case #: 1:23-cv-07239
Nature of Suit850 Other Statutes - Securities/Commodities/Exchange
Cause15:78m(a) Securities Exchange Act
Case Filed:Aug 16, 2023
Last checked: Monday Feb 12, 2024 3:25 AM EST
Defendant
Gaurav Anand
Represented By
Brette Morgan Tannenbaum
Paul Weiss (ny)
contact info
Andrew James Ehrlich
Paul Weiss (ny)
contact info
Defendant
Matthew Christensen
Represented By
Brette Morgan Tannenbaum
Paul Weiss (ny)
contact info
Andrew James Ehrlich
Paul Weiss (ny)
contact info
Defendant
Lydia Jett
Represented By
Brette Morgan Tannenbaum
Paul Weiss (ny)
contact info
Andrew James Ehrlich
Paul Weiss (ny)
contact info
Defendant
Bom Suk Kim
Represented By
Brette Morgan Tannenbaum
Paul Weiss (ny)
contact info
Andrew James Ehrlich
Paul Weiss (ny)
contact info
Defendant
Neil Mehta
Represented By
Brette Morgan Tannenbaum
Paul Weiss (ny)
contact info
Andrew James Ehrlich
Paul Weiss (ny)
contact info
Defendant
Michael Parker
Represented By
Brette Morgan Tannenbaum
Paul Weiss (ny)
contact info
Andrew James Ehrlich
Paul Weiss (ny)
contact info
Defendant
Benjamin Sun
Represented By
Brette Morgan Tannenbaum
Paul Weiss (ny)
contact info
Andrew James Ehrlich
Paul Weiss (ny)
contact info
Defendant
Harry You
Represented By
Brette Morgan Tannenbaum
Paul Weiss (ny)
contact info
Andrew James Ehrlich
Paul Weiss (ny)
contact info
Defendant
Kevin Warsh
Represented By
Brette Morgan Tannenbaum
Paul Weiss (ny)
contact info
Andrew James Ehrlich
Paul Weiss (ny)
contact info
Nominal Defendant
Coupang, Inc.
Represented By
Brette Morgan Tannenbaum
Paul Weiss (ny)
contact info
Andrew James Ehrlich
Paul Weiss (ny)
contact info
Plaintiff
Kia Tang
Represented By
Erica L. Stone
The Rosen Law Firm, P.A.
contact info
Phillip C. Kim
The Rosen Law Firm
contact info
Laurence Matthew Rosen
The Rosen Law Firm, P.A.
contact info


Docket last updated: 3 hours ago
Wednesday, April 02, 2025
19 19 notice Notice (Other) Wed 04/02 1:19 PM
NOTICE of WITHDRAWAL OF GABRIELA ALEJANDRA CARDE. Document filed by Mark Hattori, Susan Newman. Filed In Associated Cases: 1:23-cv-07239-VSB, 1:23-cv-11043-VSB.(Eagel, Lawrence)
Related: [-]
Monday, December 09, 2024
18 18 order Stipulation and Order ~Util - Case Stayed Mon 12/09 11:22 AM
STIPULATION AND ORDER REGARDING STAY OF PROCEEDINGS:Undersigned counsel for Defendants is authorized to accept, and hereby does accept as of the date hereof, service of the complaints in the Tang Action, Bryan Action, and Hattori Action on behalf of Defendants, without prejudice and without waiver of any of Defendants' defenses, objections, or arguments in this matter, except as to sufficiency of service of process. Except as provided below, all proceedings and deadlines, including any motions practice and obligation to answer, move against, or otherwise respond to the complaints in this Consolidated Derivative Action, are hereby stayed and shall remain stayed until the earlier of the date that: (1) the Securities Class Action is dismissed with prejudice and all appeals therefrom are exhausted; or (2) any defendant in the Securities Class Action files an answer to the operative complaint in that action and further set forth in this Order. (Signed by Judge Vernon S. Broderick on 12/9/2024) (rro)
Related: [-]
Friday, December 06, 2024
17 17 misc Proposed Stipulation and Order Fri 12/06 2:07 PM
PROPOSED STIPULATION AND ORDER. Document filed by Coupang, Inc., Bom Suk Kim, Gaurav Anand, Kevin Warsh, Neil Mehta, Benjamin Sun, Michael Parker, Matthew Christensen, Lydia Jett, Harry You..(Ehrlich, Andrew)
Related: [-]
Thursday, October 10, 2024
16 16 order Stipulation and Order Thu 10/10 2:24 PM
JOINT STIPULATION AND ORDER REGARDING CONSOLIDATION OF RELATED ACTIONS, APPOINTMENT OF CO-LEAD COUNSEL, AND SCHEDULE: IT IS ACCORDINGLY STIPULATED AND AGREED, by and between the Parties through their authorized attorneys, as follows: The Joint Stipulation and [Proposed] Order Regarding Consolidation of Related Actions, Appointment of Co-Lead Counsel, and Schedule, filed on September 8, 2023 in the Tang Action as ECF No. 13, is hereby withdrawn. The Related Derivative Actions are hereby consolidated for all purposes, including pre-trial proceedings and trial, under Case No. 1:23-cv-07239 (the "Consolidated Derivative Action"): as further set forth in this Order. The parties shall submit the proposed schedule referenced in paragraph 10 of this Order by December 9, 2024. SO ORDERED. (Signed by Judge Vernon S. Broderick on 10/10/2024) (sgz)
Related: [-]
15 15 10 pgs order Memorandum & Opinion Thu 10/10 10:54 AM
OPINION & ORDER: For the foregoing reasons, it is hereby:ORDERED that the Tang, Bryan, and Hattori actions shall be consolidated pursuant to Federal Rule of Civil Procedure 42(a). IT IS FURTHER ORDERED that The Rosen Law Firm and Ridrosky Law shall be appointed as co-lead counsel for Plaintiffs in the consolidated actions. A Joint Stipulation and Order Regarding Consolidation of Related Actions, Appointment of Co-Lead Counsel, and Schedule will issue concurrently with this Opinion & Order. SO ORDERED. (Signed by Judge Vernon S. Broderick on 10/10/2024) (sgz)
Related: [-]
Monday, September 16, 2024
14 14 misc Proposed Stipulation and Order Mon 09/16 1:45 PM
PROPOSED STIPULATION AND ORDER. Document filed by Kia Tang..(MacFall, Timothy)
Related: [-]
Att: 1 Exhibit A - The Rosen Law Firm P.A. Biography,
Att: 2 Exhibit B - Rigrodsky Law, P. A. Firm Resume
Friday, September 08, 2023
13 13 misc Proposed Stipulation and Order Fri 09/08 9:33 PM
PROPOSED STIPULATION AND ORDER. Document filed by Kia Tang..(Stone, Erica)
Related: [-]
Att: 1 Exhibit A - Rosen Law Firm Resume,
Att: 2 Exhibit B - Rigrodsky Law Firm Resume
12 12 notice Notice of Appearance Fri 09/08 8:45 PM
NOTICE OF APPEARANCE by Brette Morgan Tannenbaum on behalf of Gaurav Anand, Matthew Christensen, Coupang, Inc., Lydia Jett, Bom Suk Kim, Neil Mehta, Michael Parker, Benjamin Sun, Kevin Warsh, Harry You..(Tannenbaum, Brette)
Related: [-]
11 11 notice Notice of Appearance Fri 09/08 8:42 PM
NOTICE OF APPEARANCE by Andrew James Ehrlich on behalf of Gaurav Anand, Matthew Christensen, Coupang, Inc., Lydia Jett, Bom Suk Kim, Neil Mehta, Michael Parker, Benjamin Sun, Kevin Warsh, Harry You..(Ehrlich, Andrew)
Related: [-]
Tuesday, August 22, 2023
10 10 service Affidavit of Service Complaints Tue 08/22 1:53 PM
AFFIDAVIT OF SERVICE. Coupang, Inc. served on 8/21/2023, answer due 9/11/2023. Service was accepted by Robin Hutt-Banks, Managing Agent at The Corporation Trust Company. Document filed by Kia Tang..(Stone, Erica)
Related: [-]
Monday, August 21, 2023
9 9 notice Notice of Appearance Mon 08/21 9:50 AM
NOTICE OF APPEARANCE by Erica L. Stone on behalf of Kia Tang..(Stone, Erica)
Related: [-]
utility Case Accepted as Related Mon 08/21 8:32 AM
CASE ACCEPTED AS RELATED. Create association to 1:22-cv-07309-VSB. Notice of Assignment to follow. (laq)
Related: [-]
notice Notice of Case Assignment/Reassignment Mon 08/21 8:33 AM
NOTICE OF CASE REASSIGNMENT to Judge Vernon S. Broderick. Judge Unassigned is no longer assigned to the case. (laq)
Related: [-]
utility Case Designation Mon 08/21 8:34 AM
Magistrate Judge Valerie Figueredo is so designated. Pursuant to 28 U.S.C. Section 636(c) and Fed. R. Civ. P. 73(b)(1) parties are notified that they may consent to proceed before a United States Magistrate Judge. Parties who wish to consent may access the necessary form at the following link:[LINK:https://nysd.uscourts.gov/sites/default/files/2018-06/AO-3.pdf] . (laq)
Related: [-]
Friday, August 18, 2023
8 8 service Summons Issued Fri 08/18 12:25 PM
ELECTRONIC SUMMONS ISSUED as to Gaurav Anand, Matthew Christensen, Coupang, Inc., Lydia Jett, Bom Suk Kim, Neil Mehta, Michael Parker, Benjamin Sun, Kevin Warsh, Harry You. (vf)
Related: [-]
Thursday, August 17, 2023
7 7 service Request for Issuance of Summons Thu 08/17 2:31 PM
REQUEST FOR ISSUANCE OF SUMMONS as to Gaurav Anand, Matthew Christensen, Coupang, Inc., Lydia Jett, Bom Suk Kim, Neil Mehta, Michael Parker, Benjamin Sun, Kevin Warsh, Harry You, re:1 Complaint. Document filed by Kia Tang..(Rosen, Laurence)
Related: [-]
misc Notice to Attorney Regarding Deficient Pleading Thu 08/17 9:25 AM
***NOTICE TO ATTORNEY REGARDING DEFICIENT PLEADING. Notice to Attorney Laurence Matthew Rosen re: Document No. 1 Complaint. The filing is deficient for the following reason(s): all of the parties listed on the pleading were not entered on CM ECF; add Kevin Warsh. Docket the event type Add Party to Pleading found under the event list Complaints and Other Initiating Documents... (jgo)
Related: [-]
notice Case Opening Initial Assignment Notice Thu 08/17 9:26 AM
CASE OPENING INITIAL ASSIGNMENT NOTICE: The above-entitled action is assigned to Judge Unassigned. .(jgo)
Related: [-]
utility Case Designated ECF Thu 08/17 9:28 AM
Case Designated ECF. (jgo)
Related: [-]
utility Case Referred as Possibly Related/Similar Thu 08/17 9:29 AM
CASE REFERRED TO Judge Vernon S. Broderick as possibly related to 22-cv-7309. (jgo)
Related: [-]
misc Notice Regarding Deleted Document Thu 08/17 9:34 AM
***DELETED DOCUMENT. Deleted document number 3 Summons Request for District of Delaware. The document was incorrectly filed in this case. (jgo)
Related: [-]
misc Notice to Attorney Regarding Deficient Request for Issuance of Summons Thu 08/17 9:35 AM
***NOTICE TO ATTORNEY REGARDING DEFICIENT REQUEST FOR ISSUANCE OF SUMMONS. Notice to Attorney Laurence Matthew Rosen to RE-FILE Document No. 5 Request for Issuance of Amended Summons,. The filing is deficient for the following reason(s): the wrong event type was used to file the request for issuance of summons; party name must be added in order for summons to be issued;. Re-file the document using the event type Request for Issuance of Summons found under the event list Service of Process - select the correct filer/filers - and attach the correct summons form PDF. (jgo)
Related: [-]
utility Add Party for Pleading Thu 08/17 2:23 PM
ADD PARTY FOR PLEADING. Defendants/Respondents Kevin Warsh added. Party added pursuant to1 Complaint.Document filed by Kia Tang. Related document:1 Complaint..(Rosen, Laurence)
Related: [-]
Wednesday, August 16, 2023
6 6 1 pgs notice Notice of Appearance Wed 08/16 5:37 PM
NOTICE OF APPEARANCE by Phillip C. Kim on behalf of Kia Tang..(Kim, Phillip)
Related: [-]
5 5 service Request for Issuance of Amended Summons Wed 08/16 2:02 AM
REQUEST FOR ISSUANCE OF AMENDED SUMMONS as to Gaurav Anand, Matthew Christensen, Coupang, Inc., Lydia Jett, Bom Suk Kim, Neil Mehta, Michael Parker, Benjamin Sun, Harry You, re:1 Complaint. Document filed by Kia Tang..(Rosen, Laurence)
Related: [-]
4 4 misc Statement of Relatedness Wed 08/16 1:55 AM
STATEMENT OF RELATEDNESS re: that this action be filed as related to 22-cv-07309-VSB. Document filed by Kia Tang..(Rosen, Laurence)
Related: [-]
3 3 2 pgs service Request for Issuance of Summons Wed 08/16 1:51 AM
REQUEST FOR ISSUANCE OF SUMMONS as to Gaurav Anand, Matthew Christensen, Coupang, Inc., Lydia Jett, Bom Suk Kim, Neil Mehta, Michael Parker, Benjamin Sun, Harry You, re:1 Complaint. Document filed by Kia Tang..(Rosen, Laurence)
Related: [-]
2 2 2 pgs misc Civil Cover Sheet Wed 08/16 1:47 AM
CIVIL COVER SHEET filed..(Rosen, Laurence)
Related: [-]
1 1 56 pgs cmp Complaint Wed 08/16 1:43 AM
COMPLAINT against Gaurav Anand, Matthew Christensen, Coupang, Inc., Lydia Jett, Bom Suk Kim, Neil Mehta, Michael Parker, Benjamin Sun, Harry You. (Filing Fee $ 402.00, Receipt Number ANYSDC-28153479)Document filed by Kia Tang..(Rosen, Laurence)
Related: [-]