Original Case: 1:17-cv-02972

Fourth Circuit U.S. Court of Appeals
Case #: 0:23-cv.pr-01835
Typecivil private / private
Nature of Suit190 Contract - Other Contract
Case Filed:Aug 11, 2023
Terminated:Oct 24, 2024
Last checked: Sunday Oct 27, 2024 4:59 AM EDT
Defendant
NAPOLI BERN RIPKA SHKOLNIK, LLP
Represented By
Kayleigh Toth Keilty
SAUL EWING LLP
contact info
Michelle N. Lipkowitz
MINTZ, LEVIN, COHN, FERRIS, GLOVSKY & POPEO, PC
contact info
William Herbert Pillsbury
contact info
Defendant
NAPOLI BERN, LLP
Represented By
Kayleigh Toth Keilty
SAUL EWING LLP
contact info
Michelle N. Lipkowitz
MINTZ, LEVIN, COHN, FERRIS, GLOVSKY & POPEO, PC
contact info
William Herbert Pillsbury
contact info
Defendant
NAPOLI, BERN & ASSOCIATES, LLP
Represented By
Kayleigh Toth Keilty
SAUL EWING LLP
contact info
Michelle N. Lipkowitz
MINTZ, LEVIN, COHN, FERRIS, GLOVSKY & POPEO, PC
contact info
William Herbert Pillsbury
contact info
Defendant
NAPOLI BERN RIPKA, LLP
Represented By
Kayleigh Toth Keilty
SAUL EWING LLP
contact info
Michelle N. Lipkowitz
MINTZ, LEVIN, COHN, FERRIS, GLOVSKY & POPEO, PC
contact info
William Herbert Pillsbury
contact info
Defendant
NAPOLI BERN RIPKA SHKOLNIK & ASSOCIATES, LLP
Represented By
Kayleigh Toth Keilty
SAUL EWING LLP
contact info
Michelle N. Lipkowitz
MINTZ, LEVIN, COHN, FERRIS, GLOVSKY & POPEO, PC
contact info
William Herbert Pillsbury
contact info
Defendant
PASTERNACK TILKER NAPOLI BERN LLP
Defendant
NAPOLI, KAISER, BERN & ASSOCIATES, LLP
Defendant
MARC J. BERN & PARTNERS LLP
Represented By
Kayleigh Toth Keilty
SAUL EWING LLP
contact info
Michelle N. Lipkowitz
MINTZ, LEVIN, COHN, FERRIS, GLOVSKY & POPEO, PC
contact info
William Herbert Pillsbury
contact info
Defendant - Appellant
PAUL NAPOLI, individually
Represented By
Meghan Katherine Finnerty
OFFIT KURMAN, PA
contact info
Timothy Cronin Lynch
OFFIT KURMAN, PA
contact info
Defendant - Appellant
NAPOLI SHKOLNIK PLLC
Represented By
Meghan Katherine Finnerty
OFFIT KURMAN, PA
contact info
Timothy Cronin Lynch
OFFIT KURMAN, PA
contact info
Defendant - Appellant
NAPOLI SHKOLNIK & ASSOCIATES, PLLC
Represented By
Meghan Katherine Finnerty
OFFIT KURMAN, PA
contact info
Timothy Cronin Lynch
OFFIT KURMAN, PA
contact info
Defendant - Appellant
PAUL NAPOLI LAW PLLC
Represented By
Meghan Katherine Finnerty
OFFIT KURMAN, PA
contact info
Timothy Cronin Lynch
OFFIT KURMAN, PA
contact info
Defendant - Appellant
NAPOLI LAW PLLC
Represented By
Meghan Katherine Finnerty
OFFIT KURMAN, PA
contact info
Timothy Cronin Lynch
OFFIT KURMAN, PA
contact info
Defendant - Appellant
PAUL J. NAPOLI, individually
Represented By
Henry Willett III
CHRISTIAN & BARTON, LLP
contact info
Timothy C. Lynch
OFFIT KURMAN, PA
contact info
Plaintiff - Appellee
KEYES LAW FIRM, LLC
Represented By
Louis Paul Malick
KRAMON & GRAHAM, PA
contact info
Bridgette Summer Hughes Niazy
KRAMON & GRAHAM, PA
contact info
John Augustine Bourgeois
KRAMON & GRAHAM, PA
contact info
Andrew Jay Graham
KRAMON & GRAHAM, PA
contact info
Emily R. Greene
KRAMON & GRAHAM, PA
contact info
Jean Evelyn Lewis
KRAMON & GRAHAM, PA
contact info
David Jonathan Shuster
KRAMON & GRAHAM, PA
contact info

GPO Oct 24 2024
PUBLISHED AUTHORED OPINION filed. Motion disposition in opinion, decline to impose sanctions [1001506642-2] Originating case number: 1:17-cv-02972-JRR. [1001660692] [23-1835]

Docket last updated: 10/27/2024 4:57 AM EDT
Friday, August 11, 2023
1 1 2 pgs Case docketed. Originating case number: 1:17-cv-02972-JRR. Case manager: RSewell. [1001419106] 23-1835 RHS [Entered: 08/11/2023 12:25 PM]
Related: [-]