Tennessee Eastern District Court
Judge:Clifton L Corker
Referred: Debra C Poplin
Case #: 3:23-cv-00295
Nature of Suit290 Real Property - All Other Real Property
Cause28:2409(a) Quiet Title Action
Case Filed:Aug 16, 2023
Last checked: Monday Feb 12, 2024 4:03 AM EST
Counter Claimant
United States of America
Represented By
Leah Walker McClanahan
U S Department Of Justice (knox Usao)
contact info
Counter Defendant
Gregory Ringenberg
Represented By
Damien M Schiff
Pacific Legal Foundation
contact info
Richard Edmund Graves
Frantz, Mcconnell & Seymour, LLP
contact info
Jeffrey Wilson McCoy
Pacific Legal Foundation
contact info
Defendant
United States of America
Represented By
Leah Walker McClanahan
U S Department Of Justice (knox Usao)
contact info
Plaintiff
Gregory Ringenberg
Frantz, McConnell & Seymour, LLP 550 W. Main Street, Suite 500
Knoxville, TN 37902
Represented By
Jeff McCoy
Debevoise & Plimpton
contact info
Damien M Schiff
Pacific Legal Foundation
contact info
Richard Edmund Graves
Frantz, Mcconnell & Seymour, LLP
contact info
Jeffrey Wilson McCoy
Pacific Legal Foundation
contact info


Docket last updated: 5 hours ago
Monday, May 12, 2025
138 138 notice Notice (Other) Mon 05/12 3:35 PM
NOTICE by Gregory Ringenberg of Service of Expert Disclosures (Grossman, Matthew)
Related: [-]
137 137 11 pgs respoth Memorandum in Support of Motion Mon 05/12 3:32 PM
MEMORANDUM in Support of Motion re89 MOTION to Appoint Guardian ad Litem ad Litem filed by Gregory Ringenberg.(Mullins, Benjamin)
Related: [-]
Att: 1 Affidavit
Monday, May 05, 2025
136 136 order Order on Motion for Extension of Time to File Mon 05/05 10:05 AM
Now before the Court is the Unopposed Motion for Extension of Plaintiff Expert Disclosure Deadline [Doc. 130]. Plaintiff seeks to extend the expert disclosure deadline by two weeks [ Id. ]. In light of the brevity of the extension, and for good cause shown [ see Doc. 134], the Court GRANTS the motion [ Doc. 130 ]. See E.D. Tenn. L.R. 7.2 ("Under exceptional circumstances, the Court may act upon a motion prior to the expiration of the response time."). Plaintiff shall disclosure his experts on or before May 12, 2025. Signed by Magistrate Judge Debra C. Poplin on 5/5/2026. (This entry constitutes the complete Order of the Court.) (AGA)
Related: [-]