Maryland District Court
Case #: 1:23-mc-00422
Cause00:0000
Case Filed:Aug 16, 2023

Create an account to get the full party report for this case.



Docket last updated: 83 minutes ago
Thursday, November 02, 2023
3 3 orddiscp Disciplinary Order Thu 11/02 1:31 PM
ORDER OF RECIPROCAL DISCIPLINE suspending Benjamin M. Soto, nunc pro tunc from September 5, 2023. Signed by Chief Judge James K. Bredar on 11/2/2023. (sj4s, Deputy Clerk)
Related: [-]
Friday, October 13, 2023
4 4 corresp Disciplinary Document Thu 01/04 1:53 PM
Mail Returned as Undeliverable. Mail sent to Benjamin M. Soto.(mh4s, Deputy Clerk)
Related: [-]
Att: 1 Show Cause Order
Wednesday, September 27, 2023
2 2 orddiscp Disciplinary Order Wed 09/27 9:26 AM
ORDER TO SHOW CAUSE within thirty (30) days after mailing of this Order, why this Court should not impose the identical, greater, or lesser discipline as imposed by the District of Columbia Court of Appeals. Signed by Chief Judge James K. Bredar on 09/27/2023. (c/m certified, return receipt requested #7018 2290 0000 8965 3138).(mh4s, Deputy Clerk)
Related: [-]
Wednesday, August 16, 2023
1 1 notice Notice of Reciprocal Disciplinary Action Wed 08/16 2:58 PM
NOTICE OF DISCIPLINARY ACTION by the District of Columbia Court of Appeals as to Benjamin M. Soto. (Attachments #1: D.C. Court of Appeals Opinion and Order)(sj4s, Deputy Clerk)
Related: [-]