New Jersey District Court
Judge:Zahid N Quraishi
Referred: J Brendan Day
Case #: 3:23-cv-04770
Nature of Suit830 Property Rights - Patent
Cause15:1126 Patent Infringement
Case Filed:Aug 17, 2023
Re-opened:Aug 01, 2024
Terminated:Jun 28, 2024
Last checked: Tuesday Feb 13, 2024 3:32 AM EST
Defendant
KENNEDY INTERNATIONAL, INC.
Represented By
KRISTEN SMITH
Stevens & Lee
contact info
MARK H. ANANIA
Stevens & Lee
contact info
Plaintiff
AZUROUS, INC
Represented By
RYAN W. O'DONNELL
Volpe Koenig
contact info
MICHAEL F. SNYDER
Volpe & Koenig
contact info

GPO Jun 28 2024
OPINION Filed. Signed by Judge Zahid N. Quraishi on 6/28/2024. (jal, )

Docket last updated: 2 hours ago
Monday, December 02, 2024
34 34 1 pgs order Order Mon 12/02 11:09 AM
ORDER Granting Defendant's Motion for Leave to File Sur-Reply. Signed by Judge Zahid N. Quraishi on 12/2/2024. (amv)
Related: [-]
Friday, November 29, 2024
33 33 misc Letter Fri 11/29 3:36 PM
Letter from Ryan W. O'Donnell To the Honorable Zahid N. Quraishi re Application for Leave to File Sur-Reply re32 Reply Brief to Opposition to Motion,.(O'DONNELL, RYAN)
Related: [-]
Att: 1 Exhibit A,
Att: 2 Text of Proposed Order,
Att: 3 Certificate of Service
Monday, November 25, 2024
32 32 respm Reply Brief to Opposition to Motion Mon 11/25 4:48 PM
REPLY BRIEF to Opposition to Motion filed by KENNEDY INTERNATIONAL, INC. re29 MOTION to Dismiss Plaintiff's Amended Complaint (ANANIA, MARK)
Related: [-]
Att: 1 Declaration of Mark H. Anania,
Att: 2 Exhibit F,
Att: 3 Exhibit G
Monday, November 18, 2024
31 31 30+ pgs respm Memorandum in Opposition of Motion Mon 11/18 10:11 PM
MEMORANDUM in Opposition filed by AZUROUS, INC re29 MOTION to Dismiss Plaintiff's Amended Complaint (SNYDER, MICHAEL)
Related: [-]
Att: 1 Text of Proposed Order Text
Tuesday, October 29, 2024
30 30 respm Letter Rule 7.1 Tue 10/29 3:19 PM
Rule 7.1(d)(5) Letter for an automatic extension of the return date of a dispositive motion filed by AZUROUS, INC re29 MOTION to Dismiss Plaintiff's Amended Complaint (O'DONNELL, RYAN)
Related: [-]
utility Set/Reset Motion and R&R Deadlines/Hearings Tue 10/29 4:33 PM
Reset Deadlines as to29 MOTION to Dismiss Plaintiff's Amended Complaint . Motion set for 12/2/2024 before Judge Zahid N. Quraishi. Unless otherwise directed by the Court, this motion will be decided on the papers and no appearances are required. Note that this is an automatically generated message from the Clerk`s Office and does not supersede any previous or subsequent orders from the Court. (amv)
Related: [-]
Friday, October 25, 2024
29 29 motion Dismiss Fri 10/25 12:50 PM
MOTION to Dismiss Plaintiff's Amended Complaint by KENNEDY INTERNATIONAL, INC.. Responses due by 11/4/2024.(ANANIA, MARK)
Related: [-]
Att: 1 Memorandum of Law in Support of Motion to Dismiss Plaintiff's Amended Complaint,
Att: 2 Text of Proposed Order
utility Set/Reset Motion and R&R Deadlines/Hearings Fri 10/25 3:12 PM
Set Deadlines as to29 MOTION to Dismiss Plaintiff's Amended Complaint . Motion set for 11/18/2024 before Judge Zahid N. Quraishi. Unless otherwise directed by the Court, this motion will be decided on the papers and no appearances are required. Note that this is an automatically generated message from the Clerk`s Office and does not supersede any previous or subsequent orders from the Court. (mlh)
Related: [-]
Thursday, September 26, 2024
28 28 order Text Order Thu 09/26 2:28 PM
TEXT ORDER: The undersigned held telephone conferences with the parties on 9/5/24 and 9/17/24 to explore settlement. It now appearing that a settlement conference would not be potentially fruitful at this time, and the undersigned having conferred with Judge Quraishi, a pre-motion conference is waived. Defendant is granted leave to file a motion to dismiss the amended complaint, and shall do so on or before 10/25/24. The motion shall be returnable on 11/18/24. So Ordered by Magistrate Judge J. Brendan Day on 9/26/2024. (cry)
Related: [-]
Thursday, September 05, 2024
minutes Status Conference Thu 09/05 12:33 PM
Text Minute Entry for proceedings held before Magistrate Judge J. Brendan Day: Status Conference held on 9/5/2024. (cry)
Related: [-]
Tuesday, September 03, 2024
27 27 order Text Order ~Util - Set Hearings Tue 09/03 3:09 PM
TEXT ORDER: Having reviewed the parties' recent correspondence (Dkts.25 ,26 ), the undersigned will hold a telephone status conference with counsel on 9/5/24 at 11:00 a.m.; dial-in information will be provided. So Ordered by Magistrate Judge J. Brendan Day on 9/3/2024. (cry)
Related: [-]
Friday, August 30, 2024
26 26 misc Letter Fri 08/30 3:04 PM
Letter from Michael F. Snyder to Hon. Judge Quraishi in Response to Request for Pre-Motion Conference on Motion to Dismiss Amended Complaint re25 Letter. (O'DONNELL, RYAN)
Related: [-]
Monday, August 26, 2024
25 25 misc Letter Mon 08/26 12:53 PM
Letter from Mark H. Anania to Hon. Judge Quraishi for Pre-Motion Conference on Motion to Dismiss re22 Amended Complaint. (ANANIA, MARK)
Related: [-]
Wednesday, August 07, 2024
24 24 misc Application for Clerk Order to Ext Answer/Proposed Order Wed 08/07 12:32 PM
Application and Proposed Order for Clerk's Order to extend time to answer as to Amended Complaint.. (ANANIA, MARK)
Related: [-]
utility Update Answer Due Deadline Wed 08/07 3:29 PM
Clerk`s Text Order - The24 Application for Clerk's Order to Ext Answer/Proposed Order submitted by KENNEDY INTERNATIONAL, INC. has been GRANTED. The answer due date has been set for 8/26/2024. (amv)
Related: [-]
Thursday, August 01, 2024
23 23 order Text Order Thu 08/01 9:53 AM
TEXT ORDER: In light of the Plaintiff filing an amended complaint22 , this case is hereby REOPENED. So Ordered by Judge Zahid N. Quraishi on 8/1/2024. (kas)
Related: [-]
Monday, July 29, 2024
22 22 cmp Amended Complaint Mon 07/29 4:47 PM
AMENDED COMPLAINT against KENNEDY INTERNATIONAL, INC., filed by AZUROUS, INC.(O'DONNELL, RYAN)
Related: [-]
Att: 1 Exhibit A,
Att: 2 Exhibit B,
Att: 3 Exhibit C,
Att: 4 Exhibit D,
Att: 5 Exhibit E,
Att: 6 Certificate of Service
Friday, June 28, 2024
21 21 2 pgs order Order on Motion to Dismiss Fri 06/28 3:02 PM
ORDER granting in part and denying in part11 Motion to Dismiss; The Clerk's Office is directed to administratively terminate this matter. Signed by Judge Zahid N. Quraishi on 6/28/2024. (jal, )
Related: [-]
20 20 19 pgs order Opinion Fri 06/28 2:56 PM
OPINION Filed. Signed by Judge Zahid N. Quraishi on 6/28/2024. (jal, )
Related: [-]
utility Terminate Civil Case Fri 06/28 3:03 PM
***Civil Case Terminated. (jal, )
Related: [-]
Monday, December 11, 2023
19 19 respm Reply Brief to Opposition to Motion Mon 12/11 2:42 PM
REPLY BRIEF to Opposition to Motion filed by KENNEDY INTERNATIONAL, INC. re11 MOTION to Dismiss Complaint (ANANIA, MARK)
Related: [-]
Att: 1 Declaration of Mark H. Anania in Support of Reply to Motion to Dismiss,
Att: 2 Exhibit D,
Att: 3 Exhibit E
Monday, December 04, 2023
18 18 respm Brief in Opposition to Motion Mon 12/04 2:41 PM
BRIEF in Opposition filed by AZUROUS, INC re11 MOTION to Dismiss Complaint (SNYDER, MICHAEL)
Related: [-]
Att: 1 Text of Proposed Order
Monday, November 20, 2023
utility Set/Reset Motion and R&R Deadlines/Hearings Mon 11/20 8:23 AM
Reset Deadlines as to11 MOTION to Dismiss Complaint . Motion set for 12/18/2023 before Judge Zahid N. Quraishi. Unless otherwise directed by the Court, this motion will be decided on the papers and no appearances are required. Note that this is an automatically generated message from the Clerk`s Office and does not supersede any previous or subsequent orders from the Court. (kht)
Related: [-]
Friday, November 17, 2023
17 17 respm Letter Rule 7.1 Fri 11/17 9:42 AM
Rule 7.1(d)(5) Letter for an automatic extension of the return date of a dispositive motion re11 MOTION to Dismiss Complaint . (O'DONNELL, RYAN)
Related: [-]
Wednesday, November 08, 2023
16 16 order Order Wed 11/08 2:32 PM
TEXT ORDER that the Court has reviewed the parties' submissions11 and15 , and hereby WAIVES the pre-motion conference. Defendant's Motion to Dismiss11 shall be treated as if it were filed today, 11/08/2023, to be made returnable 12/04/2023. Accordingly, Plaintiff shall file its opposition by 11/20/2023. So Ordered by Judge Zahid N. Quraishi on 11/8/2023. (kas)
Related: [-]
Tuesday, November 07, 2023
15 15 misc Letter Tue 11/07 3:17 PM
Letter from Michael F Snyder to the Hon. Judge Quraishi response to Defendant Kennedy International, Inc.s pre-motion Conference Request Letter. (SNYDER, MICHAEL)
Related: [-]
Monday, November 06, 2023
14 14 notice Notice of Appearance Mon 11/06 11:35 AM
NOTICE of Appearance by KRISTEN SMITH on behalf of KENNEDY INTERNATIONAL, INC. (SMITH, KRISTEN)
Related: [-]
Friday, November 03, 2023
13 13 order Order Fri 11/03 8:25 AM
TEXT ORDER that the Court construes Defendant's Motion to Dismiss11 as a pre-motion conference request per the undersigned's judicial preferences. Accordingly, Plaintiff's letter in response is due on 11/08/2023. In the meantime, the formal briefing as to the Motion to Dismiss11 is hereby STAYED. So ordered by Judge Zahid N. Quraishi on 11/3/2023. (kas)
Related: [-]
Thursday, November 02, 2023
utility Set/Reset Motion and R&R Deadlines/Hearings Thu 11/02 11:56 AM
Set Deadlines as to11 MOTION to Dismiss Complaint . Motion set for 12/4/2023 before Judge Zahid N. Quraishi. Unless otherwise directed by the Court, this motion will be decided on the papers and no appearances are required. Note that this is an automatically generated message from the Clerk`s Office and does not supersede any previous or subsequent orders from the Court. (jal, )
Related: [-]
Wednesday, November 01, 2023
12 12 misc Corporate Disclosure Statement (aty) Wed 11/01 4:02 PM
Corporate Disclosure Statement by KENNEDY INTERNATIONAL, INC.. (ANANIA, MARK)
Related: [-]
11 11 motion Dismiss Wed 11/01 3:58 PM
MOTION to Dismiss Complaint by KENNEDY INTERNATIONAL, INC.. Responses due by 11/20/2023.(ANANIA, MARK)
Related: [-]
Att: 1 Memorandum of Law in Support of Motion to Dismiss,
Att: 2 Declaration of Mark H. Anania in Support of Motion to Dismiss,
Att: 3 Exhibit A,
Att: 4 Exhibit B,
Att: 5 Exhibit C,
Att: 6 Text of Proposed Order
Friday, September 29, 2023
10 10 1 pgs order Order Fri 09/29 2:28 PM
LETTER ORDER granting a 30-day extension of time up to and including 11/1/2023 for Defendant Kennedy International, Inc. to respond to the Complaint. Signed by Magistrate Judge J. Brendan Day on 9/29/2023. (kht) Modified on 9/29/2023 (kht)
Related: [-]
9 9 misc Letter Fri 09/29 11:13 AM
Letter from Mark H. Anania to Hon. J. Brendan Day. (ANANIA, MARK)
Related: [-]
Friday, September 15, 2023
utility Update Answer Due Deadline Fri 09/15 8:35 AM
Clerk`s Text Order - The document8 Application for Clerk's Order to Ext Answer/Proposed Order submitted by KENNEDY INTERNATIONAL, INC. has been GRANTED. The answer due date has been set for 10/2/2023. (jal, )
Related: [-]
Thursday, September 14, 2023
8 8 misc Application for Clerk Order to Ext Answer/Proposed Order Thu 09/14 10:33 AM
Application and Proposed Order for Clerk's Order to extend time to answer. (ANANIA, MARK)
Related: [-]
7 7 notice Notice of Appearance Thu 09/14 10:27 AM
NOTICE of Appearance by MARK H. ANANIA on behalf of KENNEDY INTERNATIONAL, INC. (ANANIA, MARK)
Related: [-]
Tuesday, August 29, 2023
6 6 service Summons Returned Executed Tue 08/29 10:47 AM
SUMMONS Returned Executed by AZUROUS, INC. KENNEDY INTERNATIONAL, INC. served on 8/28/2023, answer due 9/18/2023. (SNYDER, MICHAEL)
Related: [-]
Tuesday, August 22, 2023
5 5 notice Notice of Appearance Tue 08/22 3:19 PM
NOTICE of Appearance by RYAN W. O'DONNELL on behalf of AZUROUS, INC (O'DONNELL, RYAN)
Related: [-]
Friday, August 18, 2023
4 4 misc Corporate Disclosure Statement (aty) Fri 08/18 1:05 PM
Corporate Disclosure Statement by AZUROUS, INC. (SNYDER, MICHAEL)
Related: [-]
Thursday, August 17, 2023
3 3 service Summons Issued Thu 08/17 1:46 PM
SUMMONS ISSUED as to KENNEDY INTERNATIONAL, INC.. Attached is the official court Summons, please fill out Defendant and Plaintiffs attorney information and serve. (mg, )
Related: [-]
2 2 misc AO120 Patent/Trademark Form Thu 08/17 1:42 PM
AO120 Patent/Trademark Form filed. (mg)
Related: [-]
1 1 23 pgs cmp Complaint Thu 08/17 1:39 PM
COMPLAINT against KENNEDY INTERNATIONAL, INC. with JURY DEMAND, filed by AZUROUS, INC.(mg, )
Related: [-]
Att: 1 Civil Cover Sheet,
Att: 2 Exhibit A,
Att: 3 Exhibit B,
Att: 4 1 pgs AO 120