New York Southern District Court
Judge:Cathy Seibel
Case #: 7:23-cv-07279
Nature of Suit440 Civil Rights - Other Civil Rights
Cause42:1981 Job Discrimination (Race)
Case Filed:Aug 16, 2023
Last checked: Monday Feb 12, 2024 3:31 AM EST
Defendant
Wells Fargo Advisors LLC
Represented By
David Jordan Kass
Fisher & Phillips LLP
contact info
Colleen P. Tandy
Fisher & Phillips, Llp (nj)
contact info
Plaintiff
Peter F Valdez
Represented By
Thomas Martin Gambino
Law Office Of Thomas M. Gambino & Associates PC
contact info


Docket last updated: 81 minutes ago
Thursday, May 01, 2025
67 67 respm Declaration in Opposition to Motion Thu 05/01 4:59 PM
FILING ERROR - DUPLICATE DOCKET ENTRY - DECLARATION of Peter Valdez in Opposition re:50 MOTION for Summary Judgment .. Document filed by Peter F Valdez..(Gambino, Thomas) Modified on 5/2/2025 (lb)
Related: [-]
66 66 respm Declaration in Opposition to Motion Thu 05/01 4:58 PM
FILING ERROR - DUPLICATE DOCKET ENTRY - DECLARATION of Thomas M. Gambino, Esq. in Opposition re:50 MOTION for Summary Judgment .. Document filed by Peter F Valdez..(Gambino, Thomas) Modified on 5/2/2025 (lb)
Related: [-]
65 65 24 pgs respm Memorandum of Law in Opposition to Motion Thu 05/01 4:57 PM
FILING ERROR - DUPLICATE DOCKET ENTRY - MEMORANDUM OF LAW in Opposition re:50 MOTION for Summary Judgment . . Document filed by Peter F Valdez..(Gambino, Thomas) Modified on 5/2/2025 (lb)
Related: [-]
64 64 respm Affidavit in Support of Motion Thu 05/01 2:54 PM
AFFIDAVIT of Word Count in Support re:50 MOTION for Summary Judgment .. Document filed by Wells Fargo Advisors LLC..(Tandy, Colleen)
Related: [-]
63 63 respm Reply Memorandum of Law in Support of Motion Thu 05/01 2:53 PM
REPLY MEMORANDUM OF LAW in Support re:50 MOTION for Summary Judgment . . Document filed by Wells Fargo Advisors LLC..(Tandy, Colleen)
Related: [-]
62 62 respm Affidavit in Opposition to Motion Thu 05/01 2:52 PM
AFFIDAVIT of Word Count in Opposition re:50 MOTION for Summary Judgment .. Document filed by Wells Fargo Advisors LLC..(Tandy, Colleen)
Related: [-]
61 61 respm Declaration in Opposition to Motion Thu 05/01 2:51 PM
DECLARATION of Peter Valdez in Opposition re:50 MOTION for Summary Judgment .. Document filed by Wells Fargo Advisors LLC..(Tandy, Colleen)
Related: [-]
60 60 respm Declaration in Opposition to Motion Thu 05/01 2:49 PM
DECLARATION of Thomas M. Gambino, Esq. in Opposition re:50 MOTION for Summary Judgment .. Document filed by Wells Fargo Advisors LLC..(Tandy, Colleen)
Related: [-]
Att: 1 Exhibit Exhibit A - Branch Reassignment,
Att: 2 Exhibit Exhibit B - Interview March 9, 2020,
Att: 3 Exhibit Exhibit C - 2019 Performance Evaluation,
Att: 4 Exhibit Exhibit D - 2020 Performance Evaluation,
Att: 5 Exhibit Exhibit E - 2021 Performance Evaluation,
Att: 6 Exhibit Exhibit F - 2022 Performance Evaluation,
Att: 7 Exhibit Exhibit G - 2023 Performance Evaluation,
Att: 8 Exhibit Exhibit H - Plaintiff's Emails
59 59 notice Notice (Other) Thu 05/01 2:42 PM
NOTICE of Plaintiff's Counter Statement of Facts re:50 MOTION for Summary Judgment .. Document filed by Wells Fargo Advisors LLC..(Tandy, Colleen)
Related: [-]
58 58 24 pgs respm Memorandum of Law in Opposition to Motion Thu 05/01 2:40 PM
MEMORANDUM OF LAW in Opposition re:50 MOTION for Summary Judgment . . Document filed by Wells Fargo Advisors LLC..(Tandy, Colleen)
Related: [-]
57 57 respm Affidavit in Support of Motion Thu 05/01 2:38 PM
AFFIDAVIT of Word Count in Support re:50 MOTION for Summary Judgment .. Document filed by Wells Fargo Advisors LLC..(Tandy, Colleen)
Related: [-]
56 56 respm Declaration in Support of Motion Thu 05/01 2:35 PM
DECLARATION of Suzanne Lichtman in Support re:50 MOTION for Summary Judgment .. Document filed by Wells Fargo Advisors LLC..(Tandy, Colleen)
Related: [-]
55 55 misc Redacted Document Thu 05/01 2:34 PM
***SELECTED PARTIES***REDACTION to54 Affidavit in Support of Motion,,,,,,,, by Wells Fargo Advisors LLC, Peter F ValdezMotion or Order to File Under Seal:49 .(Tandy, Colleen)
Related: [-]
54 54 respm Affidavit in Support of Motion Thu 05/01 2:07 PM
AFFIDAVIT of Colleen P. Tandy, Esq. in Support re:50 MOTION for Summary Judgment .. Document filed by Wells Fargo Advisors LLC..(Tandy, Colleen)
Related: [-]
Att: 1 Exhibit Exhibit 1 - Offer Letter,
Att: 2 Exhibit Exhibit 2 - Workday Report,
Att: 3 Exhibit Exhibit 3A - Deposition Transcript Excerpts,
Att: 4 Exhibit Exhibit 3B - Deposition Transcript Excerpts,
Att: 5 Exhibit Exhibit 3C - Deposition Transcript Excerpts,
Att: 6 Exhibit Exhibit 3D - Deposition Transcript Excerpts,
Att: 7 Exhibit Exhibit 3E - Deposition Transcript Excerpts,
Att: 8 Exhibit Exhibit 3F - Deposition Transcript Excerpts,
Att: 9 Exhibit Exhibit 3G - Deposition Transcript Excerpts,
Att: 10 Exhibit Exhibit 7 - Initial Interview,
Att: 11 Exhibit Exhibit 8 - E-mail dated March 13, 2020,
Att: 12 Exhibit Exhibit 9 - E-mail Thread December 2019 through January 2020,
Att: 13 Exhibit Exhibit 10 - E-mail Thread January 2020 through February 2020,
Att: 14 Exhibit Exhibit 11 - Informal Warning,
Att: 15 Exhibit Exhibit 12 - Call to Employee Relations,
Att: 16 Exhibit Exhibit 13 - E-Mail Thread May 4, 2020,
Att: 17 Exhibit Exhibit 14 - E-mail Thread May 4-8, 2020,
Att: 18 Exhibit Exhibit 17 - E-mail October 21, 2020,
Att: 19 Exhibit Exhibit 18 - Transcription of Conversation,
Att: 20 Exhibit Exhibit 19 - Transcription of Conversation,
Att: 21 Exhibit Exhibit 20 - Transcription of Conversation,
Att: 22 Exhibit Exhibit 21 - Transcription of Conversation,
Att: 23 Exhibit Exhibit 22 - Transcription of Conversation,
Att: 24 Exhibit Exhibit 23 - Transcription of Conversation,
Att: 25 Exhibit Exhibit 24 - E-mail Thread April 2021 to May 2021,
Att: 26 Exhibit Exhibit 25 - Phone Interview,
Att: 27 Exhibit Exhibit 26 - Transcription of Conversation,
Att: 28 Exhibit Exhibit 28 - Formal Warning,
Att: 29 Exhibit Exhibit 29 - Call to Employee Relations,
Att: 30 Exhibit Exhibit 31 - Employment Investigation Report,
Att: 31 Exhibit Exhibit 32 - June 15, 2021 Interview,
Att: 32 Exhibit Exhibit 33 - June 15, 2021 Interview,
Att: 33 Exhibit Exhibit 34 - Interviews,
Att: 34 Exhibit Exhibit 37 - Request for Accommodation,
Att: 35 Exhibit Exhibit 38 - Year-End Performance Evaluation,
Att: 36 Exhibit Exhibit 39 - Interview Notes,
Att: 37 Exhibit Exhibit 40 - Workday Report
53 53 respm Affidavit in Support of Motion Thu 05/01 1:32 PM
FILING ERROR - DEFICIENT DOCKET ENTRY - (SEE DOCUMENT#54) AFFIDAVIT of Colleen P. Tandy, Esq. in Support re:50 MOTION for Summary Judgment .. Document filed by Wells Fargo Advisors LLC..(Tandy, Colleen) Modified on 5/1/2025 (lb)
Related: [-]
52 52 notice Notice (Other) Thu 05/01 1:28 PM
NOTICE of Statement of Undisputed Material Facts re:50 MOTION for Summary Judgment .. Document filed by Wells Fargo Advisors LLC..(Tandy, Colleen)
Related: [-]
51 51 30+ pgs respm Memorandum of Law in Support of Motion Thu 05/01 1:10 PM
MEMORANDUM OF LAW in Support re:50 MOTION for Summary Judgment . . Document filed by Wells Fargo Advisors LLC..(Tandy, Colleen)
Related: [-]
50 50 motion Summary Judgment Thu 05/01 1:08 PM
MOTION for Summary Judgment . Document filed by Wells Fargo Advisors LLC..(Tandy, Colleen)
Related: [-]