Pennsylvania Eastern District Court
Judge:Harvey Bartle, III
Case #: 2:23-cv-03153
Nature of Suit443 Civil Rights - Housing/Accommodations
Cause42:405 Fair Housing Act
Case Filed:Aug 10, 2023
Terminated:Nov 27, 2023
Last checked: Tuesday Feb 06, 2024 3:53 AM EST
Defendant
PAT BOVITZ
Defendant
TYRONE WALLACE, JR.
Defendant
JEREMY PILKERTON
Defendant
PGM REAL ESTATES & ASSOCIATES
Defendant
JAQUANA MORALES
Defendant
FELICIA MOLINA
Defendant
F. ANTHONY KATE'S
Defendant
DEBORAH JOHNSON
Defendant
JOHN DOES MAINTENANCE PGM.
Defendant
DALE GRAVETTE
Defendant
BRENDA GOMEZ
Defendant
JUSTIN GALL
Defendant
CHESTER COUNTY HOUSING AUTHORITY
Defendant
BRENDA BOLT
Defendant
JAMIE WHEELER
Defendant
JASON SANTORA
Defendant
APRIL LANDIS
Defendant
DAN BOYES
Plaintiff
LAUREN E. WISSMAN
719 STRICKERSVILLE ROAD
LANDENBERG, PA 19350
TERMINATED PARTIES
Defendant
PGM REAL ESTATE LLC, PROPERTY MANAGEMENT
Terminated: 11/06/2023
Defendant
PGM REAL ESTATE LLC, MAINTENANCE CONTRACTOR
Terminated: 11/06/2023
Defendant
ANTHONY KATES
Terminated: 11/06/2023
Defendant
JUSTIN GAIL
Terminated: 11/06/2023
Defendant
JOE EDWARDS
Terminated: 11/06/2023
Defendant
JANE OR JOHN DOES
Terminated: 11/06/2023

GPO Oct 04 2023
MEMORANDUM AND/OR OPINION. SIGNED BY HONORABLE HARVEY BARTLE, III ON 10/4/23. 10/4/23 ENTERED AND COPIES MAILED TO PLAINTIFF.(jaa, ) Modified on 10/4/2023 (jaa, ).
GPO Oct 04 2023
ES MAILED TO PLAINTIFF WITH FORMS.(jaa, )ORDER THAT LEAVE TO PROCEED IN FORMA PAUPERIS IS GRANTED PURSUANT TO 28 U.S.C. § 1915. 2. THE COMPLAINT IS DEEMED FILED. 3. FOR THE REASONS STATED IN THE COURTS MEMORANDUM, THE COMPLAINT IS DISMISSED AS FOLLOWS: A. THE FOLLOWING CLAIMS ARE DISMISSED WITHOUT PREJUDICE FOR FAILURE TO STATE A CLAIM PURSUANT TO 28 U.S.C. § 1915(E)(2)(B)(II): (1) ALL CLAIMS PURSUANT TO § 1983; (2) ALL CLAIMS PURSUANT TO THE FAIR HOUSING ACT; AND (3) ALL CLAIMS PURSUANT TO THE AMERICANS WITH DISABILITIES ACT; AND B. ALL STATE LAW CLAIMS ARE DISMISSED WITHOUT PREJUDICE FOR LACK OF SUBJECT MATTER JURISDICTION. 4. WISSMAN MAY FILE AN AMENDED COMPLAINT WITHIN THIRTY (30) DAYS OF THE DATE OF THIS ORDER. ANY AMENDED COMPLAINT MUST IDENTIFY ALL DEFENDANTS IN THE CAPTION OF THE AMENDED COMPLAINT IN ADDITION TO IDENTIFYING THEM IN THE BODY OF THE AMENDED COMPLAINT AND SHALL STATE 2 THE BASIS FOR WISSMANS CLAIMS AGAINST EACH DEFENDANT. THE AMENDED COMPLAINT SHALL BE A COMPLETE DOCUMENT THAT DOES NOT RELY ON THE INITIAL COMPLAINT OR OTHER PAPERS FILED IN THIS CASE TO STATE A CLAIM. WHEN DRAFTING HER AMENDED COMPLAINT, WISSMAN SHOULD BE MINDFUL OF THE COURTS REASONS FOR DISMISSING THE CLAIMS IN HER INITIAL COMPLAINT AS EXPLAINED IN THE COURTS MEMORANDUM. UPON THE FILING OF AN AMENDED COMPLAINT, THE CLERK SHALL NOT MAKE SERVICE UNTIL SO ORDERED BY THE COURT. 5. THE CLERK OF COURT IS DIRECTED TO SEND WISSMAN A BLANK COPY OF THIS COURTS CURRENT STANDARD FORM TO BE USED BY A SELF-REPRESENTED LITIGANT FILING A CIVIL ACTION BEARING THE ABOVE-CAPTIONED CIVIL ACTION NUMBER. WISSMAN MAY USE THIS FORM TO FILE HER AMENDED COMPLAINT IF SHE CHOOSES TO DO SO AS OUTLINED HEREIN. SIGNED BY HONORABLE HARVEY BARTLE, III ON 10/4/23. 10/4/23 ENTERED AND COPI
GPO Nov 27 2023
MEMORANDUM SIGNED BY HONORABLE HARVEY BARTLE, III ON 11/27/23. 11/27/23 ENTERED. PRO SE PLAINTIFF NOT MAILED. (va)
GPO Nov 27 2023
ORDER THAT FOR THE REASONS STATED IN THE COURTS MEMORANDUM, THE AMENDED COMPLAINT IS DISMISSED WITHOUT PREJUDICE. WISSMAN MAY FILE A SECOND AMENDED COMPLAINT WITHIN THIRTY (30) DAYS OF THE DATE OF THIS ORDER. UPON THE FILING OF A SECOND AMENDED COMPLAINT, THE CLERK SHALL NOT MAKE SERVICE UNTIL SO ORDERED BY THE COURT. THE CLERK OF COURT IS DIRECTED TO SEND WISSMAN A BLANK COPY OF THIS COURTS CURRENT STANDARD FORM TO BE USED BY A SELF-REPRESENTED LITIGANT FILING A CIVIL ACTION BEARING THE ABOVE-CAPTIONED CIVIL ACTION NUMBER. ETC. SIGNED BY HONORABLE HARVEY BARTLE, III ON 11/27/23. 11/27/23 ENTERED. PRO SE PLAINTIFF NOT MAILED. (va)

Docket last updated: 05/02/2025 11:59 PM EDT
Tuesday, November 28, 2023
misc Remark Tue 11/28 9:40 AM
MAILED OUT ORDER ENTRIES7 8 TO PLAINTIFF ON 11/28/23. (jaa, )
Related: [-]
Monday, November 27, 2023
8 8 1 pgs order Memorandum and/or Opinion Order Mon 11/27 5:31 PM
ORDER THAT FOR THE REASONS STATED IN THE COURTS MEMORANDUM, THE AMENDED COMPLAINT IS DISMISSED WITHOUT PREJUDICE. WISSMAN MAY FILE A SECOND AMENDED COMPLAINT WITHIN THIRTY (30) DAYS OF THE DATE OF THIS ORDER. UPON THE FILING OF A SECOND AMENDED COMPLAINT, THE CLERK SHALL NOT MAKE SERVICE UNTIL SO ORDERED BY THE COURT. THE CLERK OF COURT IS DIRECTED TO SEND WISSMAN A BLANK COPY OF THIS COURTS CURRENT STANDARD FORM TO BE USED BY A SELF-REPRESENTED LITIGANT FILING A CIVIL ACTION BEARING THE ABOVE-CAPTIONED CIVIL ACTION NUMBER. ETC. SIGNED BY HONORABLE HARVEY BARTLE, III ON 11/27/23. 11/27/23 ENTERED. PRO SE PLAINTIFF NOT MAILED. (va)
Related: [-]
7 7 11 pgs order Memorandum and/or Opinion Mon 11/27 5:29 PM
MEMORANDUM SIGNED BY HONORABLE HARVEY BARTLE, III ON 11/27/23. 11/27/23 ENTERED. PRO SE PLAINTIFF NOT MAILED. (va)
Related: [-]
Monday, November 06, 2023
6 6 cmp Amended Complaint Tue 11/07 12:01 PM
AMENDED COMPLAINT against DAN BOYES, JOE EDWARDS, APRIL LANDIS, JASON SANTORA, JAMIE WHEELER, CHESTER COUNTY HOUSING AUTHORITY, DALE GRAVETTE, TYRONE WALLACE, JR, BRENDA GOMEZ, DEBORAH JOHNSON, PAT BOVITZ, FELICIA MOLINA, BRENDA BOLT, JAQUANA MORALES, PGM REAL ESTATES & ASSOCIATES, JUSTIN GALL, JEREMY PILKERTON, F. ANTHONY KATE'S, JOHN DOES MAINTENANCE PGM., filed by LAUREN E. WISSMAN.(jaa, )
Related: [-]
Wednesday, October 04, 2023
5 5 3 pgs order Memorandum and/or Opinion Order Wed 10/04 2:16 PM
ORDER THAT LEAVE TO PROCEED IN FORMA PAUPERIS IS GRANTED PURSUANT TO 28 U.S.C. § 1915. 2. THE COMPLAINT IS DEEMED FILED. 3. FOR THE REASONS STATED IN THE COURTS MEMORANDUM, THE COMPLAINT IS DISMISSED AS FOLLOWS: A. THE FOLLOWING CLAIMS ARE DISMISSED WITHOUT PREJUDICE FOR FAILURE TO STATE A CLAIM PURSUANT TO 28 U.S.C. § 1915(E)(2)(B)(II): (1) ALL CLAIMS PURSUANT TO § 1983; (2) ALL CLAIMS PURSUANT TO THE FAIR HOUSING ACT; AND (3) ALL CLAIMS PURSUANT TO THE AMERICANS WITH DISABILITIES ACT; AND B. ALL STATE LAW CLAIMS ARE DISMISSED WITHOUT PREJUDICE FOR LACK OF SUBJECT MATTER JURISDICTION. 4. WISSMAN MAY FILE AN AMENDED COMPLAINT WITHIN THIRTY (30) DAYS OF THE DATE OF THIS ORDER. ANY AMENDED COMPLAINT MUST IDENTIFY ALL DEFENDANTS IN THE CAPTION OF THE AMENDED COMPLAINT IN ADDITION TO IDENTIFYING THEM IN THE BODY OF THE AMENDED COMPLAINT AND SHALL STATE 2 THE BASIS FOR WISSMANS CLAIMS AGAINST EACH DEFENDANT. THE AMENDED COMPLAINT SHALL BE A COMPLETE DOCUMENT THAT DOES NOT RELY ON THE INITIAL COMPLAINT OR OTHER PAPERS FILED IN THIS CASE TO STATE A CLAIM. WHEN DRAFTING HER AMENDED COMPLAINT, WISSMAN SHOULD BE MINDFUL OF THE COURTS REASONS FOR DISMISSING THE CLAIMS IN HER INITIAL COMPLAINT AS EXPLAINED IN THE COURTS MEMORANDUM. UPON THE FILING OF AN AMENDED COMPLAINT, THE CLERK SHALL NOT MAKE SERVICE UNTIL SO ORDERED BY THE COURT. 5. THE CLERK OF COURT IS DIRECTED TO SEND WISSMAN A BLANK COPY OF THIS COURTS CURRENT STANDARD FORM TO BE USED BY A SELF-REPRESENTED LITIGANT FILING A CIVIL ACTION BEARING THE ABOVE-CAPTIONED CIVIL ACTION NUMBER. WISSMAN MAY USE THIS FORM TO FILE HER AMENDED COMPLAINT IF SHE CHOOSES TO DO SO AS OUTLINED HEREIN. SIGNED BY HONORABLE HARVEY BARTLE, III ON 10/4/23. 10/4/23 ENTERED AND COPIES MAILED TO PLAINTIFF WITH FORMS.(jaa, )
Related: [-]
4 4 18 pgs order Memorandum and/or Opinion Wed 10/04 2:13 PM
MEMORANDUM AND/OR OPINION. SIGNED BY HONORABLE HARVEY BARTLE, III ON 10/4/23. 10/4/23 ENTERED AND COPIES MAILED TO PLAINTIFF.(jaa, ) Modified on 10/4/2023 (jaa, )
Related: [-]
Thursday, August 10, 2023
3 3 notice Notice re: Pro Se Guidelines Wed 08/16 4:20 PM
PRO SE NOTICE RE:GUIDELINES. MAILED TO WISSMAN.(fdc)
Related: [-]
Att: 1 pro se e-notice consent form
2 2 cmp Complaint Wed 08/16 4:14 PM
COMPLAINT against DAN BOYES, JANE OR JOHN DOES, JOE EDWARDS, JUSTIN GAIL, ANTHONY KATES, APRIL LANDIS, PGM REAL ESTATE LLC, MAINTENANCE CONTRACTOR, PGM REAL ESTATE LLC, PROPERTY MANAGEMENT, JASON SANTORA, JAMIE WHEELER, filed by LAUREN E. WISSMAN. *IFP PENDING* (fdc)
Related: [-]
1 1 motion Proceed In Forma Pauperis Wed 08/16 4:13 PM
MOTION for Leave to Proceed in forma pauperis filed by LAUREN E. WISSMAN..(fdc)
Related: [-]