Florida Southern District Court
Judge:William P Dimitrouleas
Referred: Patrick M Hunt
Case #: 1:23-cv-23116
Nature of Suit442 Civil Rights - Employment
Cause28:1442 Notice of Removal
Case Filed:Aug 16, 2023
Terminated:Jun 13, 2024
Case in other court:11th Judicial Circuit Court, 23-018436-CA- 01
Last checked: Monday Feb 12, 2024 3:23 AM EST
Defendant
Amazon.com Services LLC
Represented By
Alexander Castro
Fisher & Phillips
contact info
Jennifer Saltz Bullock
Morgan, Lewis & Bockius LLP
contact info
Miguel Angel Morel
Littler Mendelson PC
contact info
Emily Allison Selig
Littler Mendelson, P.C.
contact info
Mediator
Carlos J. Burruezo
Plaintiff
Nesly Saintil
Represented By
Jason Saul Remer
Remer, Georges-Pierre & Hoogerwoerd, PLLC
contact info
Michael Thomas Wojnar
contact info


Docket last updated: 75 minutes ago
Thursday, June 13, 2024
26 26 1 pgs order Order Dismissing/Closing Case or Party Thu 06/13 9:21 AM
ORDER OF DISMISSAL / Closing Case. (With Prejudice) Signed by Judge William P. Dimitrouleas on 6/13/2024. See attached document for full details. (pcs)
Related: [-]
Wednesday, June 12, 2024
25 25 misc Stipulation of Dismissal - aty Wed 06/12 3:38 PM
STIPULATION of Dismissal by Amazon.com Services LLC (Castro, Alexander)
Related: [-]
Tuesday, June 11, 2024
24 24 2 pgs order Order to Show Cause Tue 06/11 10:56 AM
ORDER TO SHOW CAUSE Show Cause Response due by 6/18/2024. Signed by Judge William P. Dimitrouleas on 6/11/2024. See attached document for full details. (pcs)
Related: [-]
Thursday, May 30, 2024
23 23 notice Notice of Settlement - aty Thu 05/30 3:47 PM
NOTICE of Settlement Joint by Amazon.com Services LLC (Bullock, Jennifer)
Related: [-]
Wednesday, May 29, 2024
22 22 adr Mediation Report Wed 05/29 11:21 AM
FINAL MEDIATION REPORT by Mediator Carlos J. Burruezo. Disposition: Settled in full. Mediation held/partially held via video-conference. Filed by Carlos J. Burruezo.(Burruezo, Carlos)
Related: [-]
Friday, March 22, 2024
21 21 notice Clerk's Notice - Attorney Admissions Fri 03/22 11:23 AM
CLERK'S NOTICE - Attorney Admissions has updated the address information as submitted through attorney's PACER account for attorney Alexander Castro re19 Notice of Change of Address, Email or Law Firm Name. (cw)
Related: [-]
20 20 notice Clerk's Notice - Attorney Admissions Fri 03/22 8:39 AM
CLERK'S NOTICE - Attorney Admissions has updated the email information as submitted through attorney's PACER account for attorney Alexander Castro re19 Notice of Change of Address, Email or Law Firm Name. If Attorney wishes to update his address, he must submit the necessary change through his PACER account. (cw)
Related: [-]
Thursday, March 21, 2024
19 19 notice Notice of Change of Address, Email or Law Firm Name Thu 03/21 6:17 PM
NOTICE of Change of Address, Email or Law Firm Name by Alexander Castro (Castro, Alexander)
Related: [-]
Wednesday, March 20, 2024
18 18 order - Order (PAPERLESS or pdf attached) Wed 03/20 12:26 PM
GENERAL ORDER ON DISCOVERY OBJECTIONS AND PROCEDURES. Signed by Magistrate Judge Patrick M. Hunt on 3/20/2024. See attached document for full details. (hhr)
Related: [-]
17 17 order Clerk's Notice of Reassignment of Case Wed 03/20 9:56 AM
CLERK'S NOTICE OF REASSIGNMENT OF CASE. Case reassigned to Magistrate Judge Patrick M. Hunt for all further proceedings. Magistrate Judge Jacqueline Becerra-MJ no longer assigned to case. (yar)
Related: [-]
Thursday, February 01, 2024
16 16 1 pgs order Order on Motion to Withdraw as Attorney Thu 02/01 1:42 PM
ORDER GRANTING UNOPPOSED MOTION TO WITHDRAW AS COUNSEL granting15 Motion to Withdraw as Attorney. Michael Thomas Wojnar representing Saintil, Nesly (Plaintiff) withdrawn from case. Signed by Judge William P. Dimitrouleas on 2/1/2024. See attached document for full details. (pcs)
Related: [-]
Wednesday, January 31, 2024
15 15 motion Withdraw as Attorney Wed 01/31 6:06 PM
Unopposed MOTION to Withdraw as Attorney by Michael T. Wojnar for / by Nesly Saintil. Responses due by 2/14/2024.(Wojnar, Michael)
Related: [-]
Att: 1 Text of Proposed Order
Wednesday, December 20, 2023
13 13 motion Substitution of Counsel Wed 12/20 3:22 PM
STIPULATED MOTION for Substitution of Counsel. Substituting Jennifer Bullock and Alexander Castro for Miguel Morel and Emily Selig by Amazon.com Services LLC. Attorney Jennifer Saltz Bullock added to party Amazon.com Services LLC(pty:dft). Responses due by 1/3/2024(Bullock, Jennifer)
Related: [-]
Att: 1 Text of Proposed Order
Wednesday, October 11, 2023
12 12 adr Notice of Mediator Selection and/or Hearing Wed 10/11 5:18 PM
Joint NOTICE of Mediator Selection. Selected/Added Carlos J. Burruezo as Mediator. (Morel, Miguel)
Related: [-]
Thursday, September 28, 2023
11 11 order Scheduling Order Order Referring Case to Mediation Order Referring Case to Magistrate Judge Thu 09/28 4:50 PM
Order Setting Trial Date & Discovery Deadlines, Referring Case To Mediation & Referring Discovery Motions To United States Magistrate Judge: Jury Trial set for 9/9/2024 in Fort Lauderdale Division before Judge William P. Dimitrouleas. Calendar Call set for 9/6/2024 10:00 AM in Fort Lauderdale Division before Judge William P. Dimitrouleas. The above-captioned cause is referred to United States Magistrate Judge Becerra for appropriate disposition of all pretrial discovery motions, and all motions that relate directly to these motions, such as motions for extension of time, motions for reconsideration, motions for sanctions, and motions for mental or physical examinations. Signed by Judge William P. Dimitrouleas on 9/28/2023. See attached document for full details. (rbe)
Related: [-]
Wednesday, September 27, 2023
10 10 misc Scheduling Report - Rule 26(f)/16.1 Wed 09/27 10:56 PM
Joint SCHEDULING REPORT - Rule 16.1 by Amazon.com Services LLC(Morel, Miguel)
Related: [-]
Att: 1 Exhibit A - Proposed Scheduling Order
Thursday, August 17, 2023
5 5 Order Requiring Counsel To Meet, File Joint Scheduling Report And Joint Discovery Report. Signed by Judge William P. Dimitrouleas on 8/17/2023. See attached document for full details. (rbe)
Related: [-]
4 4 ORDER OF RECUSAL. Judge Roy K. Altman recused. Case reassigned to Judge William P. Dimitrouleas for all further proceedings. Signed by Judge Roy K. Altman on 8/17/2023. See attached document for full details. (vjk)
Related: [-]
3 3 NOTICE of Attorney Appearance by Michael Thomas Wojnar on behalf of Nesly Saintil. Attorney Michael Thomas Wojnar added to party Nesly Saintil(pty:pla). (Wojnar, Michael)
Related: [-]
Wednesday, August 16, 2023
2 2 Clerks Notice of Judge Assignment to Judge Roy K. Altman and Magistrate Judge Lisette M. Reid. Pursuant to 28 USC 636(c), the parties are hereby notified that the U.S. Magistrate Judge Lisette M. Reid is available to handle any or all proceedings in this case. If agreed, parties should complete and file the Consent form found on our website. It is not necessary to file a document indicating lack of consent. (rbe)
Related: [-]
1 1 NOTICE OF REMOVAL (STATE COURT COMPLAINT - Complaint) Filing fee $ 402.00 receipt number AFLSDC-16847994, filed by Amazon.com Services LLC. No Answer/ Motion to Dismiss Filed.(Morel, Miguel) Modified text & attachment description on 8/17/2023 (rbe).
Related: [-]
Att: 1 Civil Cover Sheet,
Att: 2 Exhibit A - State Court Complaint / Filings