Texas Eastern District Court
Judge:J Campbell Barker
Referred: John D Love
Case #: 6:23-cv-00412
Nature of Suit480 Other Statutes - Consumer Credit
Cause15:1692 Fair Debt Collection Act
Case Filed:Aug 17, 2023
Terminated:Jan 23, 2024
Last checked: Tuesday Feb 13, 2024 2:25 AM CST
Defendant
Experian Information Solutions, Inc.
Plaintiff
Kevin Gant
Represented By
Joel Spencer Halvorsen
Halvorsen Klote
contact info
TERMINATED PARTIES
Defendant
Equfiax Information Services, LLC
Terminated: 01/16/2024
Represented By
Forrest Mathew Seger, III
Clark Hill PLC
contact info
Defendant
Trans Union, LLC
Terminated: 12/04/2023
701 Brazos St., Ste. 1050
Austin, TX 78701
Defendant
Transfinancial Companies, LLC
Terminated: 12/04/2023
Represented By
E. Trent McCarthy
The Mccarthy Law Firm
contact info


Docket last updated: 6 hours ago
Tuesday, January 23, 2024
utility Remark Tue 01/23 11:35 AM
Defendant Experian Information Solutions, Inc., is dismissed with prejudice pursuant to23 notice of voluntary dismissal and FRCP 41(a)(1)(A)(i). As no defendants remain in this suit, the clerk of court will close this case. (ndc)
Related: [-]
Tuesday, January 16, 2024
24 24 1 pgs order Order ~Util - Add and Terminate Parties Tue 01/16 9:54 AM
ORDER construing23 notice of voluntary dismissal as a motion to dismiss under Rule 41(a)(2) and granting the motion. Equfiax Information Services, LLC, is dismissed with prejudice. Signed by District Judge J. Campbell Barker on 1/16/2024. (ndc)
Related: [-]
Monday, January 15, 2024
23 23 notice Notice of Voluntary Dismissal Mon 01/15 10:54 AM
NOTICE of Voluntary Dismissal by Kevin Gant(Halvorsen, Joel)
Related: [-]
Att: 1 Proposed Order
Monday, December 11, 2023
22 22 misc Stipulation of Dismissal Mon 12/11 4:11 PM
STIPULATION of Dismissal as to Equifax Information Services by Kevin Gant.(Halvorsen, Joel)
Related: [-]
Att: 1 Proposed Order
Monday, December 04, 2023
utility Remark Mon 12/04 3:16 PM
Defendant Trans Union, LLC dismissed with prejudice pursuant to19 notice of voluntary dismissal and FRCP 41(a)(1)(A)(i). (ndc)
Related: [-]
utility Remark Mon 12/04 3:17 PM
Defendant Transfinancial Companies, LLC dismissed with prejudice pursuant to21 notice of voluntary dismissal and FRCP 41(a)(1)(A)(i). (ndc)
Related: [-]
Thursday, November 30, 2023
21 21 notice Notice of Voluntary Dismissal Thu 11/30 1:57 PM
NOTICE of Voluntary Dismissal by Kevin Gant(Halvorsen, Joel)
Related: [-]
Att: 1 Proposed Order
Tuesday, November 28, 2023
20 20 notice Notice of Attorney Appearance - Pro Hac Vice Tue 11/28 4:02 PM
NOTICE of Attorney Appearance - Pro Hac Vice by E. Trent McCarthy on behalf of Transfinancial Companies, LLC. Filing fee $ 100, receipt number ATXEDC-9838799. (McCarthy, E.)
Related: [-]
Monday, November 27, 2023
19 19 notice Notice of Voluntary Dismissal Mon 11/27 1:49 PM
NOTICE of Voluntary Dismissal by Kevin Gant(Halvorsen, Joel)
Related: [-]
Att: 1 Proposed Order
Tuesday, November 21, 2023
18 18 service Summons Returned Executed Tue 11/21 1:52 PM
SUMMONS Returned Executed by Kevin Gant. Transfinancial Companies, LLC served on 11/16/2023. (Halvorsen, Joel)
Related: [-]
Tuesday, November 14, 2023
17 17 1 pgs order Order Tue 11/14 1:15 PM
ORDER FOR CLOSING DOCUMENTS. The deadlines in this matter are STAYED with respect to Defendant Experian Solutions, Inc. pending final resolution of the settlement agreement and the court ORDERS the parties to submit closing documents no later than January 15, 2024 . Signed by Magistrate Judge John D. Love on 11/14/2023. (wea, 6)
Related: [-]
Monday, November 13, 2023
16 16 notice Notice of Settlement Mon 11/13 4:28 PM
NOTICE of Settlement as to Experian Information Solutions by Kevin Gant(Halvorsen, Joel)
Related: [-]
Att: 1 Proposed Order
Tuesday, October 31, 2023
15 15 misc Report and Recommendations Tue 10/31 4:35 PM
REPORT AND RECOMMENDATION. The court RECOMMENDS that Defendant Experian Information Solutions, Inc. be DISMISSED without prejudice for failure to comply with a court order and failure to prosecute. Signed by Magistrate Judge John D. Love on 10/31/2023. (wea, 6)
Related: [-]
Friday, October 13, 2023
14 14 1 pgs order Order Fri 10/13 12:00 PM
ORDER VACATING DEADLINES AS TO DEFENDANT EQUIFAX INFORMATION SERVICES, LLC. All case deadlines and court dates are VACATED and the parties are to submit closing documents no later than December 13, 2023. Signed by Magistrate Judge John D. Love on 10/13/2023. (wea, 6)
Related: [-]
Thursday, October 12, 2023
13 13 notice Notice of Settlement Thu 10/12 10:11 AM
NOTICE of Settlement as to Equifax Information Services by Kevin Gant(Halvorsen, Joel)
Related: [-]
Att: 1 Proposed Order
Wednesday, September 27, 2023
12 12 1 pgs order Order Wed 09/27 1:28 PM
ORDER VACATING DEADLINES AS TO DEFENDANT TRANS UNION, INC. All case deadlines and court dates are vacated and the parties are to submit closing documents no later than November 30, 2023. Signed by Magistrate Judge John D. Love on 9/27/2023. (wea, 6)
Related: [-]
text Application Granted for Extension of Time to Answer Complaint Wed 09/27 9:24 AM
Defendant's Unopposed First Application for Extension of Time to Answer Complaint is granted pursuant to Local Rule CV-12 for Equfiax Information Services, LLC to 10/26/2023. 30 Days Granted for Deadline Extension.( wea, 6)
Related: [-]
Tuesday, September 26, 2023
11 11 notice Disclosure Statement/Certificate of Interested Persons Tue 09/26 4:16 PM
Fed. R. Civ. P. 7.1(a)(1) Disclosure Statement filed by Equfiax Information Services, LLC identifying Corporate Parent Equifax Inc. for Equfiax Information Services, LLC. (Seger, Forrest)
Related: [-]
10 10 text Unopposed Application for Extension of Time to Answer Complaint Tue 09/26 4:09 PM
Defendant's Unopposed First Application for Extension of Time to Answer Complaint re Equfiax Information Services, LLC.( Seger, Forrest)
Related: [-]
9 9 notice Notice of Settlement Tue 09/26 9:38 AM
NOTICE of Settlement as to Trans Union by Kevin Gant(Halvorsen, Joel)
Related: [-]
Att: 1 Proposed Order
Monday, September 25, 2023
8 8 2 pgs order Order to Show Cause Mon 09/25 3:04 PM
ORDER TO SHOW CAUSE. Signed by Magistrate Judge John D. Love on 9/25/2023. (gsm)
Related: [-]
Thursday, September 21, 2023
7 7 service Summons Returned Executed Thu 09/21 9:16 AM
SUMMONS Returned Executed by Kevin Gant. Equfiax Information Services, LLC served on 9/7/2023, answer due 9/28/2023. (Halvorsen, Joel)
Related: [-]
Tuesday, September 05, 2023
6 6 service Summons Returned Executed Tue 09/05 1:09 PM
SUMMONS Returned Executed by Kevin Gant. Trans Union, LLC served on 8/30/2023, answer due 9/20/2023. (Halvorsen, Joel)
Related: [-]
5 5 service Summons Returned Executed Tue 09/05 11:12 AM
SUMMONS Returned Executed by Kevin Gant. Experian Information Solutions, Inc. served on 8/31/2023, answer due 9/21/2023. (Halvorsen, Joel)
Related: [-]
Friday, August 25, 2023
4 4 1 pgs order Order Referring Case to Magistrate Judge Fri 08/25 1:01 PM
ORDER REFERRING CASE to Magistrate Judge. Magistrate Judge John D. Love added. Signed by District Judge J. Campbell Barker on 8/25/2023. (gsm)
Related: [-]
Thursday, August 17, 2023
2 2 service Summons Issued Thu 08/17 9:56 AM
SUMMONS Issued as to Equfiax Information Services, LLC, Experian Information Solutions, Inc., Trans Union, LLC, Transfinancial Companies, LLC.(gsm)
Related: [-]
Att: 1 Summons, Trans Union LLC,
Att: 2 Summons - Experian,
Att: 3 Summons - Equifax
1 1 19 pgs cmp Complaint Thu 08/17 9:20 AM
COMPLAINT against All Defendants ( Filing fee $ 402 receipt number ATXEDC-9656135.), filed by Kevin Gant.(Halvorsen, Joel)
Related: [-]
Att: 1 Exhibit,
Att: 2 Exhibit,
Att: 3 Exhibit,
Att: 4 Exhibit,
Att: 5 Civil Cover Sheet
misc Jury Demand Thu 08/17 1:49 PM
DEMAND for Trial by Jury by Kevin Gant. (wea, 6)
Related: [-]
utility Add and Terminate Judges Thu 08/17 1:50 PM
District Judge J. Campbell Barker added. (wea, 6)
Related: [-]
utility Remark Thu 08/17 1:51 PM
COURT ORDER: The court adopts in this case Judge Barker's standing orders, which may be obtained from his page on the court's website and may be updated without separate docket entry. All parties and counsel are ordered to stay abreast of the current standing orders and to comply with those orders and with the court's local rules. Noncompliance with those standing orders or local rules may result in a sanction or other disadvantage. (wea, 6)
Related: [-]
notice Notice of Magistrate Availability Thu 08/17 1:52 PM
In accordance with the provisions of 28 USC Section 636(c), you are hereby notified that a U.S. Magistrate Judge of this district court is available to conduct any or all proceedings in this case including a jury or non-jury trial and to order the entry of a final judgment. The form[LINK:Consent to Proceed Before Magistrate Judge] is available on our website. All signed consent forms, excluding pro se parties, should be filed electronically using the event Notice Regarding Consent to Proceed Before Magistrate Judge . (wea, 6)
Related: [-]