Florida Southern District Court
Judge:Rodolfo A Ruiz, II
Referred: Jacqueline Becerra
Case #: 1:23-cv-23126
Nature of Suit480 Other Statutes - Consumer Credit
Cause15:1692 Fair Debt Collection Act
Case Filed:Aug 17, 2023
Terminated:Dec 11, 2023
Last checked: Tuesday Feb 13, 2024 3:22 AM EST
Defendant
Capital One Bank (USA) N.A
1111 e main st 16th floor
richmond, VA 23219
Represented By
Andrew Kemp-Gerstel
Liebler Gonzalez & Portuondo PA
contact info
Michael Darren Starks
Liebler, Gonzalez & Portuondo
contact info
Defendant
Pollack & Rosen, P.A.
806 Douglas Road, South Tower Suite 200
Coral Gables, FL 33134
Represented By
Kevin John Spinozza
Pollack , Rosen P.A.
contact info
Ramiro Gustavo Kruss
Pollack And Rosen
contact info
Manuel Alejandro Peraza
Peraza Law, P.A.
contact info
Mediator
Mark Stein
Mark Stein Law 2999 N.E. 191st Street Suite 330i
Aventura,, FL 33180
Plaintiff
Nicholas Quintana
Represented By
Laura Andrea Abril
Lovat Law
contact info
Monique Nicole Reyes
Lovat Law
contact info


Docket last updated: 34 minutes ago
Friday, December 15, 2023
46 46 1 pgs order Order Dismissing/Closing Case or Party Mon 12/18 9:54 AM
ORDER OF DISMISSAL re45 STIPULATION of Dismissal with Prejudice by Nicholas Quintana. ORDERED AND ADJUDGED that this case is DISMISSED with prejudice, with each party to bear its own costs and attorneys' fees. The Clerk is instructed to mark this case CLOSED, and any pending motions are DENIED AS MOOT. Signed by Judge Rodolfo A. Ruiz, II on 12/15/2023. See attached document for full details. (rbe)
Related: [-]
45 45 misc Stipulation of Dismissal - aty Fri 12/15 10:23 AM
STIPULATION of Dismissal with Prejudice by Nicholas Quintana Related [+]
Related: [-] yes, Monique
Monday, December 11, 2023
44 44 order Administrative Order Mon 12/11 4:19 PM
Administrative Order Closing Case. The parties shall file a stipulation of dismissal within thirty (30) days of the date of this Order. Signed by Judge Rodolfo A. Ruiz, II on 12/11/2023. See attached document for full details. (agh)
Related: [-]
43 43 notice Notice of Settlement - aty Mon 12/11 1:44 PM
NOTICE of Settlement and Motion to Stay Deadlines by Nicholas Quintana Related [+]
Related: [-] yes, Monique
Wednesday, November 29, 2023
42 42 notice Clerk's Notice - Attorney Admissions Wed 11/29 8:58 AM
CLERK'S NOTICE - Attorney Admissions has updated the address information as submitted through attorney's PACER account for attorney Michael Darren Starks. (cw)
Related: [-]
Tuesday, November 28, 2023
41 41 notice Notice of Change of Address, Email or Law Firm Name Tue 11/28 4:27 PM
NOTICE of Change of Address, Email or Law Firm Name by Michael Darren Starks (Starks, Michael)
Related: [-]
Wednesday, November 15, 2023
40 40 1 pgs order Order Scheduling Mediation Thu 11/16 10:15 AM
ORDER Scheduling Mediation. The mediation conference in this matter shall be held with Mark Stein on February 14, 2024 at 10:30 A.M. via Zoom. Signed by Judge Rodolfo A. Ruiz, II on 11/15/2023. See attached document for full details. (rbe)
Related: [-]
39 39 adr Notice of Mediator Selection and/or Hearing Wed 11/15 3:14 PM
Joint NOTICE of Mediator Selection and Hearing. Selected/Added Mark Stein as Mediator. Mediation Hearing set for 2/14/2024 at 10:30 a.m.. Related [+]
Related: [-] yes, Monique
Att: 1 Text of Proposed Order
Tuesday, November 14, 2023
38 38 1 pgs order Order to Show Cause Tue 11/14 5:44 PM
ORDER TO SHOW CAUSE. On or before November 16, 2023 , the parties shall comply with the requirements of the Scheduling Order and schedule a time and date for mediation. Signed by Judge Rodolfo A. Ruiz, II on 11/14/2023. See attached document for full details. (agh)
Related: [-]
Thursday, November 02, 2023
37 37 1 pgs order Order on Motion to Dismiss for Failure to State a Claim Fri 11/03 10:12 AM
ORDER GRANTING27 DEFENDANT'S MOTION TO DISMISS BY DEFAULT. Plaintiff's claims against Defendant Pollack & Rosen, P.A. are DISMISSED without prejudice. Signed by Judge Rodolfo A. Ruiz, II on 11/2/2023. See attached document for full details. (rbe)
Related: [-]
Wednesday, November 01, 2023
36 36 order Order on Motion for Extension of Time Wed 11/01 5:44 PM
PAPERLESS ORDER granting35 Joint Motion for Extension of Time and for Leave to Participate in Mediation Remotely. The parties shall select a mediator and schedule mediation on or before November 13, 2023 . The Court has also considered the parties' concerns and determined that good cause exists to conduct the mediation remotely via video-conference. Signed by Judge Rodolfo A. Ruiz, II on 11/1/2023. (agh)
Related: [-]
35 35 motion Extension of Time Wed 11/01 2:04 PM
Joint MOTION for Extension of Time to Schedule Mediation and for Leave to Participate in Mediation Remotely via Video-Conference re31 Scheduling Order,,,,, Order Referring Case to Mediation,,,,, Order Referring Case to Magistrate Judge,,,, by Capital One Bank (USA) N.A. Responses due by 11/15/2023 (Kemp-Gerstel, Andrew)
Related: [-]
Monday, October 30, 2023
34 34 1 pgs order Order to Show Cause Mon 10/30 9:09 PM
ORDER TO SHOW CAUSE. Plaintiff shall file a Response to Defendant's Motion to Dismiss, ECF No.27 , on or before November 1, 2023 . Signed by Judge Rodolfo A. Ruiz, II on 10/30/2023. See attached document for full details. (agh)
Related: [-]
utility ~Util - Set/Reset Motion/R&R Deadlines and Hearings Tue 10/31 8:34 AM
Set/Reset Deadlines/Hearings per DE34 as to27 MOTION TO DISMISS1 Complaint FOR FAILURE TO STATE A CLAIM . Responses due by 11/1/2023 (pcs)
Related: [-]
Friday, October 20, 2023
33 33 order Order on Motion for Extension of Time to File Response/Reply/Answer Fri 10/20 2:48 PM
PAPERLESS ORDER granting Plaintiff's Unopposed Motion for Extension of Time, ECF No.32 . Plaintiff shall respond to Defendant's Motion to Dismiss, ECF No.27 on or before October 27, 2023 . Signed by Judge Rodolfo A. Ruiz, II on 10/20/2023. (agh)
Related: [-]
32 32 motion Extension of Time to File Response/Reply/Answer Fri 10/20 1:23 PM
Unopposed MOTION for Extension of Time to File Response/Reply/Answer as to27 MOTION TO DISMISS1 Complaint FOR FAILURE TO STATE A CLAIM by Nicholas Quintana. Related [+]
Related: [-] yes, Monique
utility ~Util - Set/Reset Motion/R&R Deadlines and Hearings Fri 10/20 4:01 PM
Set/Reset Deadlines/Hearings per DE 33 as to27 MOTION TO DISMISS1 Complaint FOR FAILURE TO STATE A CLAIM . Responses due by 10/27/2023 (pcs)
Related: [-]
Wednesday, October 11, 2023
31 31 order Scheduling Order Order Referring Case to Mediation Order Referring Case to Magistrate Judge Wed 10/11 1:26 PM
ORDER SETTING JURY TRIAL SCHEDULE, REQUIRING MEDIATION,AND REFERRING CERTAIN MATTERS TO MAGISTRATE JUDGE : Jury Trial set for 6/3/2024 in Miami Division before Judge Rodolfo A. Ruiz II. Calendar Call set for 5/28/2024 11:00 AM in Miami Division before Judge Rodolfo A. Ruiz II. Amended Pleadings due by 11/22/2023. Discovery due by 2/6/2024. Expert Discovery due by 2/6/2024. Joinder of Parties due by 11/22/2023. Mediation Deadline 2/13/2024. In Limine Motions due by 3/19/2024. Dispositive Motions due by 2/20/2024. Motions due by 2/20/2024. Pretrial Stipulation due by 3/19/2024.Pursuant to 28 U.S.C. § 636 and this District's Magistrate Judge Rules, all discovery matters are hereby referred to United States Magistrate Judge Jacqueline Becerra. Signed by Judge Rodolfo A. Ruiz, II on 10/11/2023. See attached document for full details. (rbe)
Related: [-]
Tuesday, October 10, 2023
30 30 misc Scheduling Report - Rule 26(f)/16.1 Tue 10/10 4:52 PM
Joint SCHEDULING REPORT - Rule 16.1 by Nicholas Quintana Related [+]
Related: [-] yes, Monique
Monday, October 09, 2023
29 29 misc Certificate of Other Affiliates/Corporate Disclosure Statement Mon 10/09 7:29 PM
Plaintiff's Certificate of Other Affiliates/Corporate Disclosure Statement - NONE disclosed by Nicholas Quintana Related [+]
Related: [-] yes, Monique
Friday, October 06, 2023
28 28 answer Answer to Complaint Fri 10/06 4:17 PM
Pollack & Rosen, P.A.'s ANSWER and Affirmative Defenses to Complaint with Jury Demand by Pollack & Rosen, P.A.. (Spinozza, Kevin)
Related: [-]
27 27 motion Dismiss for Failure to State a Claim Fri 10/06 8:34 AM
MOTION TO DISMISS1 Complaint FOR FAILURE TO STATE A CLAIM by Pollack & Rosen, P.A.. Responses due by 10/20/2023(Spinozza, Kevin)
Related: [-]
Att: 1 Exhibit 1
26 26 misc Certificate of Other Affiliates/Corporate Disclosure Statement Fri 10/06 7:45 AM
Defendant's Certificate of Other Affiliates/Corporate Disclosure Statement - NONE disclosed by Pollack & Rosen, P.A. (Spinozza, Kevin)
Related: [-]
Thursday, October 05, 2023
25 25 answer Answer to Complaint Thu 10/05 4:45 PM
Capital One's ANSWER and Affirmative Defenses to Complaint by Capital One Bank (USA) N.A. (Kemp-Gerstel, Andrew)
Related: [-]
Wednesday, October 04, 2023
24 24 misc Certificate of Other Affiliates/Corporate Disclosure Statement Wed 10/04 12:29 PM
Defendant's Certificate of Other Affiliates/Corporate Disclosure Statement - NONE disclosed by Capital One Bank (USA) N.A (Starks, Michael)
Related: [-]
Tuesday, October 03, 2023
23 23 order Order on Motion for Extension of Time Tue 10/03 5:48 PM
PAPERLESS ORDER granting Parties' Joint Motion for Extension of Time to File a Joint Scheduling Report. The parties' Joint Scheduling Report is due on or before October 10, 2023 . Signed by Judge Rodolfo A. Ruiz, II on 10/3/2023. (agh)
Related: [-]
22 22 motion Extension of Time Tue 10/03 3:52 PM
Joint MOTION for Extension of Time to file joint scheduling report re7 Order Requiring Joint Scheduling Report by Nicholas Quintana. Responses due by 10/17/2023 Related [+]
Related: [-] yes, Monique
utility ~Util - Set/Reset Deadlines/Hearings Wed 10/04 8:43 AM
Set/Reset Deadlines/Hearings per DE 23 Joint Scheduling Report due by 10/10/2023 (pcs)
Related: [-]
Tuesday, September 26, 2023
21 21 notice Notice of Attorney Appearance Tue 09/26 3:27 PM
NOTICE of Attorney Appearance by Ramiro Gustavo Kruss on behalf of Pollack & Rosen, P.A.. Attorney Ramiro Gustavo Kruss added to party Pollack & Rosen, P.A.(pty:dft). (Kruss, Ramiro)
Related: [-]
20 20 notice Notice of Attorney Appearance Tue 09/26 2:52 PM
NOTICE of Attorney Appearance by Kevin John Spinozza on behalf of Pollack & Rosen, P.A.. Attorney Kevin John Spinozza added to party Pollack & Rosen, P.A.(pty:dft). (Spinozza, Kevin)
Related: [-]
Thursday, August 17, 2023
3 3 Summons Issued as to Capital One Bank (USA) N.A, Pollack & Rosen, P.A. (rbe)
Related: [-]
2 2 Clerks Notice of Judge Assignment to Judge Rodolfo A. Ruiz, II. Pursuant to 28 USC 636(c), the parties are hereby notified that the U.S. Magistrate Judge Jacqueline Becerra is available to handle any or all proceedings in this case. If agreed, parties should complete and file the Consent form found on our website. It is not necessary to file a document indicating lack of consent. (rbe)
Related: [-]
1 1 13 pgs COMPLAINT against All Defendants. Filing fees $ 402.00 receipt number AFLSDC-16850877, filed by Nicholas Quintana. Related [+]
Related: [-] yes, Monique
Att: 1 Civil Cover Sheet,
Att: 2 Summon(s),
Att: 3 Summon(s)