Florida Southern District Court
Judge:Jose E Martinez
Referred: Eduardo I Sanchez
Case #: 1:23-cv-23124
Nature of Suit365 Torts - Personal Injury - Product Liability
Cause28:1446 Notice of Removal-Personal Injury
Case Filed:Aug 17, 2023
Terminated:Nov 12, 2024
Case in other court:11th Judicial Circuit, in and for Miami-Dade Count, 23-013281-CA-01
Last checked: Tuesday Feb 13, 2024 3:23 AM EST
Defendant
CTS Cement Manufacturing Corporation
Lloyd, Gray, Whitehead & Monroe 125 West Romana St Suite 330
Pensacola, FL 32502
Represented By
Justin T. Keeton
Lloyd, Gray, Whithead & Monroe, P.C.
contact info
Bradley Seldin
Florida Health Law Center
contact info
Gregory K. Rettig
Lloyd, Gray, Whithead & Monroe, P.C.
contact info
Defendant
Home Depot U.S.A. Inc.
Represented By
Jessica Lynn Lafaurie
Lydecker LLP
contact info
Plaintiff
Yindra Rodriguez Sanchez
Friedman, Rodman, Frank & Estrada 3636 West Flagler Street
Miami, FL 33135
Represented By
Ronald David Rodman
Friedman, Rodman, Frank & Estrada, P.A.
contact info


Docket last updated: 27 minutes ago
Thursday, April 03, 2025
68 68 order Order on Motion for Extension of Time Thu 04/03 4:37 PM
PAPERLESS ORDER terminating65 Motion for Extension of Time. Signed by Judge Jose E. Martinez on 4/3/2025. (knu)
Related: [-]