New York Southern District Court
Judge:Analisa Torres
Referred: Jennifer E Willis
Case #: 1:23-cv-07299
Nature of Suit442 Civil Rights - Employment
Cause42:2000e-2ot Job Discrimination (other)
Case Filed:Aug 17, 2023
Terminated:Dec 06, 2024
Last checked: Tuesday Feb 13, 2024 3:33 AM EST
Defendant
Molly Lenore
Defendant
Moey, Inc.
Defendant
Joseph K. Stein
Plaintiff
Christa Ava Jagnanan
40-03 29th Street #416
Long Island City, NY 11101


Docket last updated: 05/23/2025 11:59 PM EDT
Tuesday, January 07, 2025
42 42 1 pgs order Order on Motion for Extension of Time Tue 01/07 12:22 PM
ORDER granting41 Letter Motion for Extension of Time. GRANTED. SO ORDERED. (Signed by Judge Analisa Torres on 1/7/2025) (jca)
Related: [-]
Monday, January 06, 2025
41 41 motion Extension of Time Mon 01/06 2:51 PM
JOINT LETTER MOTION for Extension of Time to 2/14/25 of the deadline of the right to reopen the action as Ordered by the Court on 12/6/24 addressed to Judge Analisa Torres from David S. Greenhaus dated January 6, 2025. Document filed by Moey, Inc., Molly Lenore, Joseph K. Stein..(Greenhaus, David)
Related: [-]
40 40 motion Extension of Time Mon 01/06 2:42 PM
FILING ERROR - DEFICIENT DOCKET ENTRY - (SEE DOCUMENT#41) JOINT LETTER MOTION for Extension of Time of the deadline of the right to reopen the action as Ordered by the Court on 12/6/24 addressed to Judge Analisa Torres from David S. Greenhaus dated January 6, 2025. Document filed by Moey, Inc., Molly Lenore, Joseph K. Stein..(Greenhaus, David) Modified on 1/6/2025 (lb)
Related: [-]
Friday, December 06, 2024
39 39 1 pgs order Order of Dismissal Fri 12/06 3:29 PM
ORDER OF DISMISSAL.... The Court has been advised that all claims asserted herein have been settled. ECF No. 38. Accordingly, the above-entitled action is hereby dismissed and discontinued without costs, and without prejudice to the right to reopen the action within thirty days of the date of this Order if the settlement is not consummated. Any application to reopen must be filed within thirty days of this Order; any application to reopen filed thereafter may be denied solely on that basis. Further, if the parties wish for the Court to retain jurisdiction for the purposes of enforcing any settlement agreement, they must submit the settlement agreement to the Court within the same thirty-day period to be so-ordered by the Court. Per Rule IV(C) of the Court's Individual Practices in Civil Cases, the Court will not retain jurisdiction to enforce a settlement agreement unless it is made part of the public record. Any pending motions are moot. All conferences are vacated. The Clerk of Court is respectfully directed to close the case and mail a copy of this order to Plaintiff pro se. SO ORDERED. (Signed by Judge Analisa Torres on 12/6/2024) (vfr)
Related: [-]
Wednesday, October 16, 2024
adr Mediation Conference Scheduled Wed 10/16 10:03 AM
SUBSEQUENT MEDIATION CONFERENCE. Mediation Conference scheduled for 11/22/2024 at 10:00 AM in telephone or video conference.(sni)
Related: [-]
Friday, October 11, 2024
adr Mediation Conference Not Held Fri 10/11 11:41 AM
MEDIATION CONFERENCE NOT HELD Mediation Conference scheduled for 11/04/2024 will not be held. Mediation Status due by 10/28/2024.(sni)
Related: [-]
Friday, October 04, 2024
adr Mediation Conference Scheduled Fri 10/04 12:04 PM
FIRST MEDIATION CONFERENCE. Mediation Conference scheduled for 11/4/2024 at 10:00 AM in telephone or video conference.(sni)
Related: [-]
Friday, September 27, 2024
adr Notice of Mediator Assignment Fri 09/27 11:25 AM
NOTICE OF MEDIATOR ASSIGNMENT - Notice of assignment of mediator. Mediator Schedule due by 10/28/2024.(rpr)
Related: [-]
Tuesday, September 24, 2024
37 37 notice Notice of Appearance of Pro Bono Counsel - Limited Appearance Tue 09/24 4:07 PM
NOTICE OF LIMITED APPEARANCE OF PRO BONO COUNSEL for Christa Ava Jagnanan. Mediator to be Assigned by 10/8/2024..(Chen, David)
Related: [-]
Friday, September 20, 2024
36 36 2 pgs notice Notice of Appearance of Pro Bono Counsel Fri 09/20 10:15 AM
NOTICE OF APPEARANCE OF PRO BONO COUNSEL by Deborah N. Archer on behalf of Christa Ava Jagnanan.(Archer, Deborah)
Related: [-]
35 35 notice Notice of Appearance of Pro Bono Counsel Fri 09/20 10:09 AM
NOTICE OF APPEARANCE OF PRO BONO COUNSEL by Deborah N. Archer on behalf of Christa Ava Jagnanan.(Archer, Deborah)
Related: [-]
Monday, August 26, 2024
34 34 2 pgs order Order on Motion to Withdraw as Attorney Tue 08/27 9:43 AM
MEMO ENDORSED ORDER granting33 Motion to Withdraw as Attorney. ENDORSEMENT: This request is GRANTED. The Clerk of Court is respectfully requested to terminate Kevin W. Murray's representation of the Defendants. SO ORDERED. (Attorney Kevin W. Murray terminated.) (Signed by Magistrate Judge Jennifer E. Willis on 8/26/24) (yv)
Related: [-]
Wednesday, August 21, 2024
33 33 motion Withdraw as Attorney Wed 08/21 10:38 AM
MOTION for Kevin W. Murray to Withdraw as Attorney for Defendants . Document filed by Molly Lenore, Moey, Inc., Joseph K. Stein..(Murray, Kevin)
Related: [-]
Monday, August 19, 2024
32 32 notice Notice of Appearance Mon 08/19 12:58 PM
NOTICE OF APPEARANCE by Libbi L. Vilher on behalf of Molly Lenore, Moey, Inc., Joseph K. Stein..(Vilher, Libbi)
Related: [-]
Monday, July 29, 2024
31 31 1 pgs misc Status Report Mon 07/29 11:12 AM
STATUS REPORT. Document filed by Molly Lenore, Moey, Inc., Joseph K. Stein..(Greenhaus, David)
Related: [-]
Monday, June 17, 2024
30 30 1 pgs minutes Case Management Conference Thu 06/20 4:31 PM
Minute Entry for proceedings held before Magistrate Judge Jennifer E. Willis: Case Management Conference held on 6/17/2024. (cda)
Related: [-]
29 29 order Case Management Plan Mon 06/17 2:20 PM
CASE MANAGEMENT PLAN FOR PRO SE CASE: This case management plan is adopted. SO ORDERED. Deposition due by 10/18/2024. Discovery due by 12/18/2024. (Signed by Magistrate Judge Jennifer E. Willis on 6/17/2024) (tg)
Related: [-]
28 28 order Mediation Referral Order Mon 06/17 2:18 PM
ORDER:It is hereby ORDERED that this case is referred for mediation to the Court-annexed Mediation Program. The parties are hereby notified that Local Rule 83.9 and attached Standing Order shall govern the mediation and are directed to participate in the mediation in good faith. Pending the result of mediation, the discovery deadlines set forth in Dkt. No. 28 are stayed. A joint status letter must be filed by July 29, 2024. SO ORDERED. Please reference the following when corresponding with the Mediation Office. E-mail MediationOffice@nysd.uscourts.gov, telephone (212) 805-0643, and facsimile (212) 805-0647. Mediator to be Assigned by 7/1/2024. (Signed by Magistrate Judge Jennifer E. Willis on 6/17/2024) (tg)
Related: [-]
Wednesday, June 12, 2024
27 27 3 pgs misc Proposed Case Management Plan Mon 06/17 11:35 AM
PROPOSED CASE MANAGEMENT PLAN FOR PRO SE CASE. Document filed by Christa Ava Jagnanan. (rro)
Related: [-]
Tuesday, June 11, 2024
order Order Tue 06/11 3:00 PM
ORDER With apologies for any inconvenience, the case management conference scheduled for June 18, 2024, is rescheduled to June 17, 2024, at 11:00am, in Courtroom 228, United States Courthouse, 40 Foley Square New York, New York. SO ORDERED. (HEREBY ORDERED by Magistrate Judge Jennifer E. Willis) (Text Only Order)
Related: [-]
Monday, June 10, 2024
26 26 misc Proposed Case Management Plan Mon 06/10 2:39 PM
PROPOSED CASE MANAGEMENT PLAN. Document filed by Molly Lenore, Moey, Inc., Joseph K. Stein..(Greenhaus, David)
Related: [-]
Tuesday, May 21, 2024
25 25 misc Pro Se Memorandum to Change Address Wed 05/22 11:56 AM
PRO SE MEMORANDUM dated 5/21/2024 re: CHANGE OF ADDRESS for Christa Ava Jagnanan. New Address: 1235 Croes Avenue, #1C, Bronx, New York, 10472. (tro)
Related: [-]
Wednesday, May 15, 2024
23 23 3 pgs order Order for Initial Pretrial Conference Wed 05/15 5:23 PM
ORDER SCHEDULING INITIAL CASE MANAGEMENT CONFERENCE: Initial Conference set for 6/18/2024 at 11:00 AM in Courtroom 228, 40 Centre Street, New York, NY 10007 before Magistrate Judge Jennifer E. Willis. The Clerk of Court is respectfully requested to mail a copy of this order to the Pro-se litigant at the following address: 40-03 29th Street, Apt. #416, Long Island City, NY, 11101 SO ORDERED. (Signed by Magistrate Judge Jennifer E. Willis on 5/15/2024) (ks)
Related: [-]
Monday, May 13, 2024
24 24 service Marshal's Process Receipt and Return of Service Executed Complaints Mon 05/20 11:35 AM
MARSHAL'S PROCESS RECEIPT AND RETURN OF SERVICE EXECUTED Summons and 30/60 Days Amended Complaint served. Joseph K. Stein served on 4/19/2024, answer due 5/10/2024. Service was accepted by Justine Cooper. Document filed by Christa Ava Jagnanan..(rro)
Related: [-]
22 22 notice Notice of Appearance Mon 05/13 3:50 PM
NOTICE OF APPEARANCE by Kevin W. Murray on behalf of Molly Lenore, Moey, Inc., Joseph K. Stein..(Murray, Kevin)
Related: [-]
21 21 answer Answer to 30/60 Days Amended Complaint Mon 05/13 3:36 PM
ANSWER to8 30/60 Days Amended Complaint with JURY DEMAND. Document filed by Molly Lenore, Moey, Inc., Joseph K. Stein..(Greenhaus, David)
Related: [-]
20 20 1 pgs misc Rule 7.1 Corporate Disclosure Statement Mon 05/13 3:11 PM
RULE 7.1 CORPORATE DISCLOSURE STATEMENT. No Corporate Parent. Document filed by Moey, Inc...(Greenhaus, David)
Related: [-]
Tuesday, April 02, 2024
19 19 service Marshal's Process Receipt and Return of Service Executed Complaints Wed 04/03 3:14 PM
MARSHAL'S PROCESS RECEIPT AND RETURN OF SERVICE EXECUTED. Molly Lenore served on 3/15/2024, answer due 5/14/2024. Service was accepted by Kevin W. Murray. Document filed by Molly Lenore..(kgo)
Related: [-]
Friday, March 29, 2024
18 18 service Marshal's Process Receipt and Return of Service Executed Complaints Wed 04/03 3:12 PM
MARSHAL'S PROCESS RECEIPT AND RETURN OF SERVICE EXECUTED Summons and 30/60 Days Amended Complaint served. Moey, Inc. served on 3/15/2024, answer due 5/14/2024. Service was accepted by Kevin Murray, Esq.. Document filed by Christa Ava Jagnanan. (nb)
Related: [-]
Friday, March 08, 2024
17 17 misc Pro Se Memorandum to Change Address Mon 03/11 12:08 PM
PRO SE MEMORANDUM dated 3/10/24 re: CHANGE OF ADDRESS for Christa Ava Jagnanan. New Address: 40-03 29th Street, Apt. #416, Long Island City, NY, 11101. (sc)
Related: [-]
Monday, March 04, 2024
16 16 4 pgs order Order on Application for the Court to Request Counsel Mon 03/04 4:54 PM
ORDER DENYING REQUEST FOR PRO BONO COUNSEL denying15 Application for the Court to Request Counsel. For the foregoing reasons, Plaintiff's Application for the Court to Request Counsel is denied. Denial of Plaintiff's request is without prejudice to Plaintiff's renewed application later in the case. The Clerk of the Court is respectfully directed to close the motion at Dkt. No. 15. The Court certifies under 28 U.S.C. § 1915(a)(3) that any appeal from this Order would not be taken in good faith and therefore IFP status is denied for the purpose of an appeal. See Coppedge v. United States, 369 U.S. 438, 444-45 (1962). SO ORDERED. (Signed by Magistrate Judge Jennifer E. Willis on 3/4/2024) (tg)
Related: [-]
Wednesday, February 21, 2024
15 15 motion Court to Request Counsel Thu 02/22 9:16 AM
APPLICATION, Re: for the Court to Request Pro Bono Counsel. Document filed by Christa Ava Jagnanan.(sc)
Related: [-]
14 14 misc FRCP 4 Service Package - Mailed Wed 02/21 11:35 AM
INFORMATION PACKAGE MAILED to Christa Ava Jagnanan, at, on 2/21/2024 Re:12 Order of Service. The following document(s) were enclosed in the Service Package: a copy of the order of service or order to answer and other orders entered to date, the individual practices of the district judge and magistrate judge assigned to your case, Instructions for Litigants Who Do Not Have Attorneys, Notice Regarding Privacy and Public Access to Electronic Case Files, a flyer about the free legal assistance clinic located in the Thurgood Marshall Courthouse (only in non prisoner cases), a Motions guide, a notice that the Pro Se Manual has been discontinued, a Notice of Change of Address form to use if your contact information changes, a handout explaining matters handled by magistrate judges and consent form to complete if all parties agree to proceed for all purposes before the magistrate judge, a form for you to complete if you consent to receive filings electronically (only in nonprisoner cases). (nb)
Related: [-]
13 13 service Summons Issued Wed 02/21 11:32 AM
SUMMONS ISSUED as to Molly Lenore, Moey, Inc., Joseph K. Stein. (nb)
Related: [-]
misc FRCP 4 Service Package - Hand Delivered to U.S.M. Wed 02/21 11:34 AM
FRCP 4 SERVICE PACKAGE DELIVERED TO U.S.M.: on 2/21/2024 Re: Judge Analisa Torres12 Order of Service,,. The following document(s) were enclosed in the Service Package: Amended Complaint, Summons, IFP, Order of Service, Completed U.S.M. form(s) for defendant(s)Molly Lenore, Moey, Inc., Joseph K. Stein. (nb)
Related: [-]
Tuesday, February 20, 2024
12 12 3 pgs order Order of Service Tue 02/20 5:12 PM
ORDER OF SERVICE: The Clerk of Court is directed to issue summonses for Moey, Inc, Molly Lenore, and Joseph Kirshner Stein, complete the USM-285 forms with the addresses for these defendants, and deliver all documents necessary to effect service to the U.S. Marshals Service. The Clerk of Court is further directed to mail an information package to Plaintiff. SO ORDERED. (Signed by Judge Analisa Torres on 2/20/2024) (ks)
Related: [-]
11 11 order Mediation Referral Order for Pro Se Employment Discrimination Cases Tue 02/20 5:10 PM
MEDIATION REFERRAL ORDER FOR PRO SE EMPLOYMENT DISCRIMINATION CASES...IT IS ORDERED that this pro se case is referred for mediation to the Court's Mediation Program. Local Civil Rule 83.9 and the Mediation Program Procedures shall govern the mediation. Unless otherwise ordered, the mediation will have no effect upon any scheduling order issued by this Court, and all parties are obligated to continue to litigate the case. IT IS FURTHER ORDERED that the Clerk of Court shall attempt to locate pro bono counsel to represent Plaintiff at the mediation. Pro bono counsel will contact Plaintiff directly. The time to assign a mediator under Local Civil Rule 83.9 and the Court's Mediation Program Procedures will be deferred until pro bono counsel has filed a Notice of Limited Appearance of Pro Bono Counsel. Pro bono counsel will represent Plaintiff solely for purposes of the mediation, and that representation will terminate at the conclusion of the mediation process. IT IS FURTHER ORDERED that any objection by Plaintiff either to the mediation or to the Court's request for pro bono counsel to represent Plaintiff in the mediation must be filed within 14 days of this order. SO ORDERED. (Signed by Judge Analisa Torres on 2/20/2024) (ks)
Related: [-]
10 10 1 pgs order Order Referring Case to Magistrate Judge Tue 02/20 5:08 PM
ORDER OF REFERENCE TO A MAGISTRATE JUDGE: The above-entitled action is referred to the Honorable Jennifer Willis for the following purposes: Order that case be referred to the Clerk of Court for assignment to a Magistrate Judge for General Pretrial (includes scheduling, discovery, non-dispositive pretrial motions, and settlement). Referred to Magistrate Judge Jennifer E. Willis. SO ORDERED. (Signed by Judge Analisa Torres on 2/20/2024) (ks)
Related: [-]
Friday, February 16, 2024
notice Notice of Case Assignment/Reassignment Fri 02/16 1:38 PM
NOTICE OF CASE REASSIGNMENT to Judge Analisa Torres. Judge Laura Taylor Swain is no longer assigned to the case. (vba)
Related: [-]
utility Case Designation Fri 02/16 1:39 PM
Magistrate Judge Jennifer Willis is designated to handle matters that may be referred in this case. Pursuant to 28 U.S.C. Section 636(c) and Fed. R. Civ. P. 73(b)(1) parties are notified that they may consent to proceed before a United States Magistrate Judge. Parties who wish to consent may access the necessary form at the following link:[LINK:https://nysd.uscourts.gov/sites/default/files/2018-06/AO-3.pdf] . (vba)
Related: [-]
Monday, February 05, 2024
8 8 cmp 30/60 Days Amended Complaint Tue 02/06 1:41 PM
AMENDED COMPLAINT against Molly Lenore, Moey, Inc., Joseph K. Stein, Re: amending1 Complaint.Document filed by Christa Ava Jagnanan. Related document:1 Complaint.(sc) (sc)
Related: [-]
Wednesday, December 20, 2023
7 7 2 pgs order Order Thu 12/21 9:13 AM
ORDER: The Court grants Plaintiff's request for an extension of time to file an amended complaint. Plaintiff must file an amended complaint within 45 days of the date of this order. If Plaintiff fails to file an amended complaint within the prescribed time, and she cannot show good cause to excuse such failure, the Court will dismiss the complaint for the reasons stated in its October 10, 2023 order. SO ORDERED. (Signed by Chief Judge Laura Taylor Swain on 12/20/2023) (tg)
Related: [-]
Monday, December 18, 2023
6 6 misc Pro Se Consent to Receive Electronic Service Tue 12/19 5:00 PM
PRO SE CONSENT TO RECEIVE ELECTRONIC SERVICE. The following party: Crista Jagnanan consents to receive electronic service via the ECF system. Document filed by Christa Ava Jagnanan.(sc)
Related: [-]
5 5 misc Letter Tue 12/19 4:44 PM
LETTER addressed to Judge Laura Taylor Swain from C. Jagnanan, re: 60-DAY ORDER TO AMEND THE EXTENSION REQUEST. Document filed by Christa Ava Jagnanan.(sc)
Related: [-]
Thursday, October 12, 2023
misc Mailing Receipt Thu 10/12 1:19 PM
MAILING RECEIPT: Document No: 4. Mailed to: Christa Ava Jagnanan 8936 88th Street Woodhaven, NY 11421. (sha)
Related: [-]
Tuesday, October 10, 2023
4 4 order Order 60 Days Amended Complaint (case opening) Tue 10/10 3:20 PM
ORDER TO AMEND: Plaintiff is granted leave to file an amended complaint that complies with the standards set forth above. Plaintiff must submit the amended complaint to this Court's Pro Se Intake Unit within sixty days of the date of this order, caption the document as an "Amended Complaint," and label the document with docket number 23-CV-7299 (LTS). An Amended Complaint for Employment Discrimination form is attached to this order. No summons will issue at this time. If Plaintiff fails to comply within the time allowed, and she cannot show good cause to excuse such failure, the complaint will be dismissed for failure to state a claim upon which relief may be granted. A copy of the flyer with details of NYLAG Clinic is also attached to this order. The Court certifies under 28 U.S.C. § 1915(a)(3) that any appeal from this order would not be taken in good faith, and therefore IFP status is denied for the purpose of an appeal. Cf. Coppedge v. United States, 369 U.S. 438, 444-45 (1962) (holding that an appellant demonstrates good faith when he seeks review of a nonfrivolous issue). SO ORDERED. (Signed by Judge Laura Taylor Swain on 10/10/2023) (sac)
Related: [-]
Tuesday, October 03, 2023
misc Received Returned Mail Thu 10/05 7:49 AM
Received returned mail re:3 Order Granting IFP Application. Mail was addressed to Christa Ava Jagnanan, 8936 88th Street, Woodhaven, NY 11421 and was returned for the following reason(s): Return To Sender Attempted - Not Known Unable To Forward. (vn)
Related: [-]
Tuesday, September 19, 2023
notice Notice of Case Assignment/Reassignment - Sua Sponte Tue 09/19 8:55 AM
NOTICE OF CASE REASSIGNMENT - SUA SPONTE to Judge Laura Taylor Swain. Judge Unassigned is no longer assigned to the case. (sac)
Related: [-]
Tuesday, September 05, 2023
misc Mailing Receipt Tue 09/05 12:09 PM
MAILING RECEIPT: Document No: 3. Mailed to: Christa Ava Jagnanan 8936 88th Street Woodhaven, NY 11421. (sha)
Related: [-]
Friday, September 01, 2023
3 3 1 pgs order Order Granting IFP Application Fri 09/01 11:56 AM
ORDER GRANTING IFP APPLICATION: Leave to proceed in this Court without prepayment of fees is authorized. 28 U.S.C. § 1915. (Signed by Judge Laura Taylor Swain on 08/31/2023) (sha) Modified on 9/1/2023 (sha)
Related: [-]
Thursday, August 17, 2023
2 2 misc Request to Proceed In Forma Pauperis Thu 08/17 2:28 PM
REQUEST TO PROCEED IN FORMA PAUPERIS. Document filed by Christa Ava Jagnanan. (sac)
Related: [-]
1 1 18 pgs cmp Complaint Thu 08/17 2:27 PM
COMPLAINT against Joseph Kirshner Stein, Molly Lenore, Moey, Inc. Document filed by Christa Ava Jagnanan. (sac)
Related: [-]
utility Case Designated ECF Thu 08/17 2:28 PM
Case Designated ECF. (sac)
Related: [-]