Beijing Overseas Education and Immigration Consult Service Co., Ltd. v. United States Immigration Fund, LLC et al
New York Southern District Court | |
Judge: | Arun Subramanian |
Case #: | 1:23-cv-07321 |
Nature of Suit | 190 Contract - Other Contract |
Cause | 28:1332 Diversity Action |
Case Filed: | Aug 17, 2023 |
Terminated: | Sep 08, 2023 |
Last checked: Tuesday Feb 13, 2024 3:37 AM EST |
Defendant
101 Murray Street Funding, LLC
|
|
Defendant
125 Greenwich Street 1200 Funding, LLC
|
|
Defendant
701 TSQ 1000 Funding, LLC
|
Represented By
|
Defendant
76 Eleventh Funding, LLC
|
|
Defendant
AYB Funding 100, LLC
|
|
Defendant
Brooklyn Public Library Funding 100, LLC
|
|
Defendant
Nassau Coliseum Funding 100, LLC
|
|
Defendant
United States Immigration Fund, LLC
|
|
Defendant
Via Mizner Holdings, LP
|
|
Defendant
Weho Funding 100, LLC
|
|
Plaintiff
Beijing Overseas Education and Immigration Consult Service Co., Ltd.
|
Represented By
|
Docket last updated: 6 hours ago |
Friday, September 08, 2023 | ||
16 | 16
![]() NOTICE OF VOLUNTARY DISMISSAL pursuant to Rule 41(a)(1)(A)(i) of the Federal Rules of Civil Procedure, the plaintiff(s) and or their counsel(s), hereby give notice that the above-captioned action is voluntarily dismissed, without prejudice against the defendant(s) 101 Murray Street Funding, LLC, 125 Greenwich Street 1200 Funding, LLC, 701 TSQ 1000 Funding, LLC, 76 Eleventh Funding, LLC, AYB Funding 100, LLC, Brooklyn Public Library Funding 100, LLC, Nassau Coliseum Funding 100, LLC, United States Immigration Fund, LLC, Via Mizner Holdings, LP, Weho Funding 100, LLC. Document filed by Beijing Overseas Education and Immigration Consult Service Co., Ltd.. Proposed document to be reviewed and processed by Clerk's Office staff (No action required by chambers). ..(Corcoran, Kieran) |
|
Wednesday, September 06, 2023 | ||
15 | 15
![]() ORDER: granting14 Letter Motion for Extension of Time. Accordingly, it is hereby ORDERED that, on or before September 27, 2023, Plaintiff shall amend its Complaint to allege the citizenship of each constituent person or entity comprising each Defendant (including the state of incorporation and principal place of business of any corporate entity member). If, by that date, the Plaintiff is unable to amend the Complaint to truthfully allege complete diversity of citizenship, then the Complaint will be dismissed for lack of subject-matter jurisdiction without further notice to either party. Defendants deadline to respond to the Complaint is adjourned until twenty-one (21) days after Plaintiff files an amended complaint. The Clerk of Court is directed to terminate the motion at ECF No. 14. SO ORDERED. Amended Pleadings due by 9/27/2023. (Signed by Judge Arun Subramanian on 9/06/2023) (ama) |
|
14 | 14
![]() LETTER MOTION for Extension of Time addressed to Judge Arun Subramanian from Richard G. Haddad dated September 6, 2023. Document filed by 701 TSQ 1000 Funding, LLC..(Haddad, Richard) |
|
Thursday, August 31, 2023 | ||
13 | 13
![]() AFFIDAVIT OF SERVICE of Summons and Complaint,,. 101 Murray Street Funding, LLC served on 8/25/2023, answer due 9/15/2023; 125 Greenwich Street 1200 Funding, LLC served on 8/25/2023, answer due 9/15/2023; 701 TSQ 1000 Funding, LLC served on 8/25/2023, answer due 9/15/2023; 76 Eleventh Funding, LLC served on 8/25/2023, answer due 9/15/2023; AYB Funding 100, LLC served on 8/25/2023, answer due 9/15/2023; Brooklyn Public Library Funding 100, LLC served on 8/25/2023, answer due 9/15/2023; Nassau Coliseum Funding 100, LLC served on 8/25/2023, answer due 9/15/2023; United States Immigration Fund, LLC served on 8/25/2023, answer due 9/15/2023; Via Mizner Holdings, LP served on 8/25/2023, answer due 9/15/2023; Weho Funding 100, LLC served on 8/25/2023, answer due 9/15/2023. Service was accepted by Chris Mentas, Intake Specialist. Document filed by Beijing Overseas Education and Immigration Consult Service Co., Ltd...(Corcoran, Kieran) |
|
Wednesday, August 30, 2023 | ||
12 | 12
![]() RULE 7.1 CORPORATE DISCLOSURE STATEMENT. No Corporate Parent. Document filed by Beijing Overseas Education and Immigration Consult Service Co., Ltd...(Corcoran, Kieran) |
|
Thursday, August 24, 2023 | ||
11 | 11
![]() ELECTRONIC SUMMONS ISSUED as to 101 Murray Street Funding, LLC, 125 Greenwich Street 1200 Funding, LLC, 701 TSQ 1000 Funding, LLC, 76 Eleventh Funding, LLC, AYB Funding 100, LLC, Brooklyn Public Library Funding 100, LLC, Nassau Coliseum Funding 100, LLC, United States Immigration Fund, LLC, Via Mizner Holdings, LP, Weho Funding 100, LLC..(jgo) |
|
Wednesday, August 23, 2023 | ||
10 | 10
![]() REQUEST FOR ISSUANCE OF SUMMONS as to United States Immigration Fund, LLC; VIA Mizner Holdings, LP; 701 TSQ 1000 Funding, LLC; 101 Murray Street Funding, LLC; AYB Funding 100, LLC; 76 Eleventh Funding, LLC; 125 Geenwich Street 1200 Funding, LLC; WEHO Funding 100, LLC; Brooklyn Public Library Funding 100, LLC; Nassau Coliseum Funding 100, LLC, re:2 Complaint,,. Document filed by Beijing Overseas Education and Immigration Consult Service Co., Ltd...(Corcoran, Kieran) |
|
misc
Notice to Attorney Regarding Deficient Request for Issuance of Summons
Wed 08/23 2:00 PM
***NOTICE TO ATTORNEY REGARDING DEFICIENT REQUEST FOR ISSUANCE OF SUMMONS. Notice to Attorney Kieran M. Corcoran to RE-FILE Document No. 9 Request for Issuance of Summons,,. The filing is deficient for the following reason(s): the date field on the official A.O. Summons form was completed by the attorney. Re-file the document using the event type Request for Issuance of Summons found under the event list Service of Process - select the correct filer/filers - and attach the correct summons form PDF. (jgo) |
||
Tuesday, August 22, 2023 | ||
9 | 9
![]() REQUEST FOR ISSUANCE OF SUMMONS as to United States Immigration Fund, LLC; VIA Mizner Holdings, LP; 701 TSQ 1000 Funding, LLC; 101 Murray Street Funding, LLC; AYB Funding 100, LLC; 76 Eleventh Funding, LLC; 125 Geenwich Street 1200 Funding, LLC; WEHO Funding 100, LLC; Brooklyn Public Library Funding 100, LLC; Nassau Coliseum Funding 100, LLC, re:2 Complaint,,. Document filed by Beijing Overseas Education and Immigration Consult Service Co., Ltd...(Corcoran, Kieran) |
|
8 | 8
![]() NOTICE OF INITIAL PRETRIAL CONFERENCE: Unless and until the Court orders otherwise, counsel for all parties shall appear for an initial pretrial conference with the Court on December 8, 2023 at 10:30 a.m. The conference will be held in Courtroom 15A of 500 Pearl Street, New York, NY 10007. Additionally, in accordance with Paragraph 4.D of the Court's Individual Practices, the parties are hereby ORDERED to file on ECF a joint letter, described below, as well as a proposed Civil Case Management Plan and Scheduling Order attached as an exhibit to the joint letter, no later than Thursday of the week prior to the conference date. The parties shall use this Court's form Proposed Civil Case Management Plan and Scheduling Order, which is also available at https://nysd.uscourts.gov/hon-arun-subramanian. Any open legal issues can be addressed at the conference. The joint letter shall not exceed three (3) pages, and shall provide the following information in separate paragraphs as further set forth in this Order. Counsel who have entered a notice of appearance as of the issuance of this order are directed (1) to notify counsel for all other parties in this action who have not yet appeared by serving upon each of them a copy of this order and the Court's Individual Practices forthwith, and (2) to file proof of such notice with the Court. If unaware of the identity of counsel for any of the parties, counsel receiving this order must forthwith send a copy of this order and the Court's Individual Practices to that party personally. SO ORDERED. (Initial Conference set for 12/8/2023 at 10:30 AM in Courtroom 15A, 500 Pearl Street, New York, NY 10007 before Judge Arun Subramanian.) (Signed by Judge Arun Subramanian on 8/22/23) (yv) |
|
misc
Notice to Attorney Regarding Deficient Request for Issuance of Summons
Tue 08/22 2:36 PM
***NOTICE TO ATTORNEY REGARDING DEFICIENT REQUEST FOR ISSUANCE OF SUMMONS. Notice to Attorney Kieran M. Corcoran to RE-FILE Document No. 7 Request for Issuance of Summons,. The filing is deficient for the following reason(s): the docket entry text must list all of the party names whom summons is for and must not include 'et al'; the PDF attached to the docket entry for the issuance of summons is not correct; the PDF 'To' section must list all of the party names the summons request is for and must not include 'et al'; if all of the party names do not fit, a rider/addendum may be attached;. Re-file the document using the event type Request for Issuance of Summons found under the event list Service of Process - select the correct filer/filers - and attach the correct summons form PDF. (jgo) |
||
Monday, August 21, 2023 | ||
7 | 7
![]() REQUEST FOR ISSUANCE OF SUMMONS as to UNITED STATES IMMIGRATION FUND, LLC et al, re:2 Complaint,,. Document filed by Beijing Overseas Education and Immigration Consult Service Co., Ltd...(Corcoran, Kieran) |
|
misc
Notice to Attorney Regarding Deficient Request for Issuance of Summons
Mon 08/21 3:24 PM
***NOTICE TO ATTORNEY REGARDING DEFICIENT REQUEST FOR ISSUANCE OF SUMMONS. Notice to Attorney Kieran M. Corcoran to RE-FILE Document No. 4 Request for Issuance of Summons,. The filing is deficient for the following reason(s): the PDF attached to the docket entry for the issuance of summons is not correct; all of the party names must be visible on the PDF case caption. If all of the party names do not fit, include 'et al';. Re-file the document using the event type Request for Issuance of Summons found under the event list Service of Process - select the correct filer/filers - and attach the correct summons form PDF. (jgo) |
||
Friday, August 18, 2023 | ||
6 | 6
![]() CIVIL COVER SHEET filed..(Corcoran, Kieran) |
|
5 | 5
![]() FILING ERROR - PDF ERROR - CIVIL COVER SHEET filed..(Corcoran, Kieran) Modified on 8/18/2023 (jgo) |
|
4 | 4
![]() REQUEST FOR ISSUANCE OF SUMMONS as to UNITED STATES IMMIGRATION FUND, LLC; VIA MIZNER HOLDINGS, LP; 701 TSQ 1000 FUNDING, LLC; 101 MURRAY STREET FUNDING, LLC; AYB FUNDING 100, LLC; 76 ELEVENTH FUNDING, LLC; 125 GREENWICH STREET 1200 FUNDING, LLC; WEHO FUNDING 100, LLC; BROOKLYN PUBLIC LIBRARY FUNDING 100, LLC; NASSAU COLISEUM FUNDING 100, LLC, re:2 Complaint,,. Document filed by Beijing Overseas Education and Immigration Consult Service Co., Ltd...(Corcoran, Kieran) |
|
3 | 3
![]() FILING ERROR - PDF ERROR - CIVIL COVER SHEET filed..(Corcoran, Kieran) Modified on 8/18/2023 (jgo) |
|
2 | 2
![]() COMPLAINT against 101 Murray Street Funding, LLC, 125 Greenwich Street 1200 Funding, LLC, 701 TSQ 1000 Funding, LLC, 76 Eleventh Funding, LLC, AYB Funding 100, LLC, Brooklyn Public Library Funding 100, LLC, Nassau Coliseum Funding 100, LLC, United States Immigration Fund, LLC, Via Mizner Holdings, LP, Weho Funding 100, LLC. Document filed by Beijing Overseas Education and Immigration Consult Service Co., Ltd...(Corcoran, Kieran) |
|
Att: 1
![]() |
||
misc
Notice to Attorney Regarding Deficient Pleading
Fri 08/18 9:26 AM
***NOTICE TO ATTORNEY REGARDING DEFICIENT PLEADING. Notice to Attorney Kieran M. Corcoran to RE-FILE Document No. 1 Complaint. The filing is deficient for the following reason(s): the All Defendant radio button was selected. Re-file the pleading using the event type Complaint found under the event list Complaints and Other Initiating Documents - attach the correct signed PDF - select the individually named filer/filers - select the individually named party/parties the pleading is against. (vf) |
||
misc
Notice to Attorney Regarding Deficient Civil Cover Sheet
Fri 08/18 9:27 AM
***NOTICE TO ATTORNEY REGARDING DEFICIENT CIVIL COVER SHEET. Notice to attorney Kieran M. Corcoran to Document No. 1 Complaint,. The filing is deficient for the following reason(s): the wrong event type was used to file the civil cover sheet. The Civil Cover Sheet is filed as its own individual ECF Event; the form used for the civil cover sheet is not the S.D.N.Y. Civil Cover Sheet form dated October 1, 2020. Re-file the document using the event type Civil Cover Sheet found under the event list Other Documents and attach the correct PDF. Use civil cover sheet issued by S.D.N.Y. dated October 1, 2020. The S.D.N.Y. Civil Cover Sheet dated October 1, 2020 is located at http://nysd.uscourts.gov/file/forms/civil-cover-sheet. (vf) |
||
misc
Notice to Attorney Regarding Case Opening Statistical Error Correction
Fri 08/18 9:29 AM
***NOTICE TO ATTORNEY REGARDING CIVIL. CASE OPENING STATISTICAL ERROR CORRECTION: Notice to attorney Kieran M. Corcoran. The following case opening statistical information was erroneously selected/entered: Citizenship Plaintiff code 6 (Foreign Nation); Citizenship Defendant code 2 (Citizen of Another State); Dollar Demand 75,000,000; County code New York; Fee Status code due (due). The following correction(s) have been made to your case entry: the Citizenship Plaintiff code has been modified to 3 (Citizen or Subject of a Foreign Country); the Citizenship Defendant code has been modified to 5 (Incorporated/Principal Place of Business-Other State); the Dollar Demand has been modified to 75,000; the County code has been modified to XX Out of U.S.; the Fee Status code has been modified to pd (paid). (vf) |
||
notice
Case Opening Initial Assignment Notice
Fri 08/18 9:34 AM
CASE OPENING INITIAL ASSIGNMENT NOTICE: The above-entitled action is assigned to Judge Arun Subramanian. Please download and review the Individual Practices of the assigned District Judge, located at[LINK:https://nysd.uscourts.gov/judges/district-judges] . Attorneys are responsible for providing courtesy copies to judges where their Individual Practices require such. Please download and review the ECF Rules and Instructions, located at[LINK:https://nysd.uscourts.gov/rules/ecf-related-instructions] ..(vf) |
||
utility
Case Designation
Fri 08/18 9:34 AM
Magistrate Judge Sarah L. Cave is so designated. Pursuant to 28 U.S.C. Section 636(c) and Fed. R. Civ. P. 73(b)(1) parties are notified that they may consent to proceed before a United States Magistrate Judge. Parties who wish to consent may access the necessary form at the following link:[LINK:https://nysd.uscourts.gov/sites/default/files/2018-06/AO-3.pdf] . (vf) |
||
utility
Case Designated ECF
Fri 08/18 9:34 AM
Case Designated ECF. (vf) |
||
misc
Notice to Attorney Regarding Deficient Civil Cover Sheet
Fri 08/18 2:14 PM
***NOTICE TO ATTORNEY REGARDING DEFICIENT CIVIL COVER SHEET. Notice to attorney Kieran M. Corcoran to RE-FILE Document No. 5 Civil Cover Sheet. The filing is deficient for the following reason(s): the PDF attached to the docket entry for the civil cover sheet is not correct; the PDF was not properly signed by the attorney;. Re-file the document using the event type Civil Cover Sheet found under the event list Other Documents and attach the correct PDF. Use civil cover sheet issued by S.D.N.Y. dated October 1, 2020. The S.D.N.Y. Civil Cover Sheet dated October 1, 2020 is located at http://nysd.uscourts.gov/file/forms/civil-cover-sheet.. (jgo) |
||
Thursday, August 17, 2023 | ||
1 | 1
![]() COMPLAINT against All Defendants. (Filing Fee $ 402.00, Receipt Number ANYSDC-28165376)Document filed by Beijing Overseas Education and Immigration Consult Service Co., Ltd...(Corcoran, Kieran) |
|
Att: 1
![]() |
||
Att: 2
![]() |