Florida Middle District Court
Judge:John E Steele
Referred: Kyle C Dudek
Case #: 2:23-cv-00636
Nature of Suit710 Labor - Fair Labor Standards Act
Cause15:0002(a) Fair Labor Standards Act
Case Filed:Aug 17, 2023
Terminated:Feb 10, 2025
Last checked: Tuesday Feb 13, 2024 3:27 AM EST
Defendant
Bradford Square Retirement Community, LLC, a Nebraska Limited Liability Company
Represented By
Jeremy D. Smith
Dinsmore & Shohl, LLP
contact info
Plaintiff
Ebron Edmonds
Represented By
Benjamin H. Yormak
Yormak Employment & Disability Law
contact info
TERMINATED PARTIES
Defendant
Resort Lifestyle Communities, Inc.
Terminated: 12/13/2023
Represented By
Jeremy D. Smith
Dinsmore & Shohl, LLP
contact info
Christopher M. Jones
Dinsmore & Shohl LLP
contact info
Brandon Todd Holmes
Dinsmore & Shohl LLP
contact info


Docket last updated: 4 hours ago
Monday, February 10, 2025
43 43 notice Notice to Counsel of Local Rule Mon 02/10 3:34 PM
NOTICE of Local Rule 1.11(e), which provides that, unless an order states another time, a seal under Rule 1.11 expires ninety days after a case is closed and all appeals are exhausted. To prevent the content of a sealed item from appearing on the docket after the seal expires, a party or interested non-party must move for relief before the seal expires. (Signed by Deputy Clerk). (LD)
Related: [-]
42 42 misc Judgment Mon 02/10 3:28 PM
JUDGMENT dismissing this case without prejudice. ( Signed by Deputy Clerk) (LD)
Related: [-]
41 41 2 pgs order Order on Report and Recommendations Mon 02/10 10:39 AM
OPINION AND ORDER adopting 40 Report and Recommendations. The Clerk shall enter judgment dismissing the case without prejudice and close the file. Signed by Judge John E. Steele on 2/10/2025. (RKR)
Related: [-]
Thursday, January 23, 2025
40 40 motion Report and Recommendations Thu 01/23 4:57 PM
REPORT AND RECOMMENDATION re 23 Amended Complaint filed by Ebron Edmonds. Edmonds has ignored the Court's order, refused to answer outstanding discovery, and avoided defense counsel's attempts to discuss the matter. In short, he has not diligently prosecuted this case. These actions show a lack of interest. Thus, the Court should dismiss this matter without prejudice. Signed by Magistrate Judge Kyle C. Dudek on 1/23/2025. (CGW)
Related: [-]
Friday, January 03, 2025
39 39 2 pgs order Order Fri 01/03 10:34 AM
ORDER TO SHOW CAUSE. By January 17, 2025, Edmonds must file a notice explaining why he has not been in contact with defense counsel and whether he intends to prosecute this case. Failure to do so could result in a recommendation that this case be dismissed for failure to prosecute. Because the email address that the Court has for Edmonds (ebron2022@hotmail.com) does not appear to be working, the Clerk is directed to remove this email from the docket and mail all future Court filings to Edmonds. Signed by Magistrate Judge Kyle C. Dudek on 1/3/2025. (Dudek, Kyle)
Related: [-]
Friday, December 13, 2024
38 38 order Order Fri 12/13 12:48 PM
ENDORSED ORDER. Plaintiff Ebron Edmonds was directed to answer outstanding discovery and file a notice explaining why he has not been in contact with defense counsel and whether he intends to prosecute this case by 12/9/2024. (Doc. 37.) He did not. By 12/30/2024, Edmonds must comply with the Court's prior Order (Doc. 37). If Edmonds again does nothing, the undersigned will recommend that this case be dismissed. Signed by Magistrate Judge Kyle C. Dudek on 12/13/2024. (DM)
Related: [-]
Monday, November 25, 2024
37 37 3 pgs order Order on Motion to Compel Mon 11/25 3:44 PM
ORDER granting 30 Motion to Compel discovery responses. By December 9, 2024, Plaintiff Ebron Edmonds must answer the outstanding discovery. By December 9, 2024, Edmonds must also file a notice explaining why he has not been in contact with defense counsel and whether he intends to prosecute this case. Failure to do so could result in a recommendation that this case be dismissed for failure to prosecute. Signed by Magistrate Judge Kyle C. Dudek on 11/25/2024. (CGW)
Related: [-]
Wednesday, November 20, 2024
36 36 order Order Wed 11/20 9:50 AM
ENDORSED ORDER requiring Plaintiff Ebron Edmonds to show cause as to: (1) why he failed to respond to the motion to compel (Doc. 30) within the time required by M.D. Fla. R. 3.01(c); and (2) why the motion should not be granted. No later than 11/26/2024, Ebron must file a written response to this Order and respond in writing to the pending motion (Doc. 30). Ebron is warned that failure to comply fully with this Order will result in the Court deeming the motion to be unopposed and considering the motion on its merits without a response. Signed by Magistrate Judge Kyle C. Dudek on 11/20/2024. (DM)
Related: [-]
Thursday, November 14, 2024
35 35 order Case Management Scheduling Order Thu 11/14 2:20 PM
AMENDED CASE MANAGEMENT AND SCHEDULING ORDER: Dispositive motions due by 1/24/2025; Pretrial statement due by 7/11/2025; All other motions due by 7/7/2025; Final Pretrial Conference set for 7/25/2025 at 09:30 AM in Ft. Myers Courtroom 6 A before Judge John E. Steele; Jury Trial set for 8/4/2025 trial term in Ft. Myers Courtroom 6 A before Judge John E. Steele. Conduct mediation hearing by 1/3/2025. Lead counsel to coordinate dates. Signed by Magistrate Judge Kyle C. Dudek on 11/14/2024. (CGW)
Related: [-]
Tuesday, November 12, 2024
34 34 respoth Response Tue 11/12 4:22 PM
RESPONSE re 31 Order dated November 8, 2024 filed by Bradford Square Retirement Community, LLC, a Nebraska Limited Liability Company. (Smith, Jeremy)
Related: [-]
33 33 order Order on Motion for Extension of Time to File Tue 11/12 9:31 AM
ENDORSED ORDER granting in part and denying in part 32 Defendant's Unopposed Motion for Extension of Time to Mediate. The motion is denied to the extent it seeks an indefinite extension. Instead, the Court grants a 60-day extension of the mediation deadline. A new case management and scheduling order will follow. Signed by Magistrate Judge Kyle C. Dudek on 11/12/2024. (BLW)
Related: [-]
Friday, November 08, 2024
32 32 motion Extension of Time to File Fri 11/08 4:53 PM
Unopposed MOTION for Extension of Time to File MOTION TO EXTEND MEDIATION DEADLINE by Bradford Square Retirement Community, LLC, a Nebraska Limited Liability Company, Resort Lifestyle Communities, Inc.. (Smith, Jeremy)
Related: [-]
31 31 order Order Fri 11/08 1:10 PM
ENDORSED ORDER. Defendant Bradford Square Retirement Community, LLC, failed to supplement the 3.01(g) certification included in its recent motion (Doc. 30). Local Rule 3.01(g)(3) requires a party to do so within three days. By 11/12/2024, Defendant must SHOW CAUSE as to why it failed to comply with Local Rule 3.01(g) and why its motion should not be denied as a result. Defendant may alternatively discharge this show cause order by properly supplementing by the same date. Signed by Magistrate Judge Kyle C. Dudek on 11/8/2024. (DM)
Related: [-]
Friday, November 01, 2024
30 30 motion Compel Fri 11/01 7:56 PM
MOTION to Compel (1) Discovery Responses and (2) Extend the Discovery Deadline by Bradford Square Retirement Community, LLC, a Nebraska Limited Liability Company, Resort Lifestyle Communities, Inc..(Smith, Jeremy)
Related: [-]
Att: 1 Exhibit 1 - Declaration of Jeremy D. Smith,
Att: 2 Exhibit A - a true and accurate copy of my service email with attachments,
Att: 3 Exhibit B - Letter to Mr. Edmonds sent via Certified Mail on October 2, 2024 with attachments,
Att: 4 Exhibit C - Exhibit C-1 - is the current USPS tracking status for the October 2, 2024 letter as of the date of this declaration Exhibit C-2 - includes a screenshot of the USPS tracking status for the October 2, 2024 letter as of October 9, 2024,
Att: 5 Exhibit D - a copy of the October 2, 2024 email (which is the letter and attachments attached as Exhibit B) to Mr. Edmonds,
Att: 6 Exhibit E - Email indicating that the email could not be delivered to this email address (ebron2002@hotmail.com)
Thursday, August 22, 2024
29 29 order Order on Motion to Withdraw as Attorney Thu 08/22 9:17 AM
ENDORSED ORDER granting 28 Motion to Withdraw Attorney Appearance. Although the motion fails to comply fully with M.D. Fla. Rs. 2.02(c) and 3.01(g), the Court accepts the motion as filed in the interests of judicial economy and efficiency. Attorney Christoper M. Jones has no further responsibility in this case. The Clerk of Court is directed to terminate Jones as counsel of record in this case and to remove him from the electronic service list in CM/ECF. Signed by Magistrate Judge Kyle C. Dudek on 8/22/2024. (BLW)
Related: [-]
Wednesday, August 21, 2024
28 28 motion Withdraw as Attorney Wed 08/21 2:43 PM
MOTION for Christopher M. Jones to Withdraw as Attorney by Resort Lifestyle Communities, Inc.. (Jones, Christopher)
Related: [-]
Friday, April 26, 2024
27 27 order Order Fri 04/26 10:53 AM
ENDORSED ORDER directing the Clerk to lift the stay (Doc. 26). All deadlines in the Case Management and Scheduling Order (Doc. 19) remain in effect. Signed by Magistrate Judge Kyle C. Dudek on 4/26/2024. (DM)
Related: [-]
Tuesday, March 26, 2024
26 26 2 pgs order Order on Motion to Withdraw as Attorney Tue 03/26 4:13 PM
ORDER granting 25 Motion to Withdraw as Attorney. Attorney Yormak shall have no further responsibility in this action. The Clerk is directed to terminate him and remove him from the electronic service list in CM/ECF for this case. The Clerk is directed to add this address to the docket for Plaintiff and mail Plaintiff a copy of this Order: Ebron Edmonds, 12331 McGregor Palms Drive, Fort Myers, Florida 33908, ebron2002@hotmail.com, (239) 309-8019. No later than April 25, 2024, Ebron Edmonds may retain new counsel and have counsel file a notice of appearance in this case. If no notice is filed, the Court assumes that Plaintiff intends to proceed pro se, which is without the benefit of counsel. The deadlines in the Case Management and Scheduling Order (Doc. 19) are stayed pending further order. The Court will reset the deadlines, if necessary. Signed by Magistrate Judge Kyle C. Dudek on 3/26/2024. (CGW)
Related: [-]
Monday, March 25, 2024
25 25 motion Withdraw as Attorney Mon 03/25 8:53 AM
Unopposed MOTION for Benjamin H. Yormak, Esq. to Withdraw as Attorney by Ebron Edmonds. (Yormak, Benjamin)
Related: [-]
Wednesday, December 27, 2023
24 24 answer Answer to amended complaint Wed 12/27 2:57 PM
ANSWER and affirmative defenses to 23 Amended Complaint by Bradford Square Retirement Community, LLC, a Nebraska Limited Liability Company.(Smith, Jeremy)
Related: [-]
Wednesday, December 13, 2023
23 23 cmp Amended Complaint Wed 12/13 5:16 PM
AMENDED COMPLAINT against Bradford Square Retirement Community, LLC, a Nebraska Limited Liability Company with Jury Demand. filed by Ebron Edmonds. Related document: 1 Complaintfiled by Ebron Edmonds.(Yormak, Benjamin)
Related: [-]
22 22 order Order on Motion to Amend / Correct / Modify / Supplement Wed 12/13 5:13 PM
ENDORSED ORDER granting 21 Plaintiff's unopposed motion to amend. An amended pleading--other than one filed as of right under Rule 15(a)(1)--can be filed without the court's leave by noting in the amended pleading itself or certifying in a contemporaneously filed notice that it is filed by consent. See Fed. R. Civ. P. 15(a)(2). Plaintiff is directed to file his amended pleading as a separate docket entry. Signed by Magistrate Judge Kyle C. Dudek on 12/13/2023. (Dudek, Kyle)
Related: [-]
21 21 motion Amend / Correct / Modify / Supplement Wed 12/13 3:14 PM
Unopposed MOTION to Amend1 Complaint by Ebron Edmonds.(Yormak, Benjamin)
Related: [-]
Att: 1 Exhibit 1 - Amended Complaint
Monday, November 13, 2023
19 19 order Case Management Scheduling Order Mon 11/13 1:51 PM
CASE MANAGEMENT AND SCHEDULING ORDER: Amended Pleadings due by 12/13/2023; Joinder of Parties due by 12/13/2023; Discovery due by 11/1/2024; Dispositive motions due by 11/29/2024; Pretrial statement due by 5/16/2025; All other motions due by 5/12/2025; Plaintiff disclosure of expert report due by 8/3/2024; Defendant disclosure of expert report due by 9/2/2024; Final Pretrial Conference set for 5/30/2025 at 09:30 AM in Ft. Myers Courtroom 6 A before Judge John E. Steele; Jury Trial set for 6/2/2025 trial term in Ft. Myers Courtroom 6 A before Judge John E. Steele. Conduct mediation hearing by 11/8/2024. Lead counsel to coordinate dates. Signed by Magistrate Judge Kyle C. Dudek on 11/13/2023. (CGW)
Related: [-]
18 18 minutes Preliminary pretrial conference Mon 11/13 12:48 PM
Minute Entry. Virtual Proceedings held before Magistrate Judge Kyle C. Dudek: PRELIMINARY PRETRIAL CONFERENCE held on 11/13/2023. (Digital) (CGW)
Related: [-]
17 17 order Order on Motion to Appear Pro Hac Vice Mon 11/13 10:32 AM
ENDORSED ORDER granting 16 Unopposed Motion for Christopher M. Jones to specially appear to represent Defendant, which complies with Local Rule 2.01(c). Unless non-resident attorney Jones already has CM/ECF filing credentials for the Middle District of Florida, he shall submit an E-Filer Registration Form within fourteen days of the date of this order. Failure to complete this step may cause the court to revoke its permission to appear specially without further notice. Signed by Magistrate Judge Kyle C. Dudek on 11/13/2023. (BLW)
Related: [-]
Friday, November 10, 2023
16 16 motion Appear Pro Hac Vice Fri 11/10 2:22 PM
Unopposed MOTION for Christopher M. Jones, Esq. to appear pro hac vice, Special Admission fee paid, Receipt No. AFLMDC-21450981 for $150 by Resort Lifestyle Communities, Inc.. (Holmes, Brandon)
Related: [-]
Thursday, November 09, 2023
15 15 order Order on Motion to Appear Pro Hac Vice Thu 11/09 4:23 PM
ENDORSED ORDER granting 14 Unopposed Motion for Jeremy D. Smith to specially appear to represent Defendant, which complies with Local Rule 2.01(c). Unless non-resident attorney Smith already has CM/ECF filing credentials for the Middle District of Florida, he shall submit an E-Filer Registration Form within fourteen days of the date of this order. Failure to complete this step may cause the court to revoke its permission to appear specially without further notice. Signed by Magistrate Judge Kyle C. Dudek on 11/9/2023. (BLW)
Related: [-]
14 14 motion Appear Pro Hac Vice Thu 11/09 3:54 PM
MOTION for Jeremy David Smith to appear pro hac vice, Special Admission fee paid, Receipt No. AFLMDC-21449505 for $150 by Resort Lifestyle Communities, Inc.. (Smith, Jeremy)
Related: [-]
Tuesday, November 07, 2023
13 13 misc Case Management Report Tue 11/07 3:08 PM
CASE MANAGEMENT REPORT. (Yormak, Benjamin)
Related: [-]
Friday, September 29, 2023
12 12 notice Notice of hearing Fri 09/29 10:55 AM
NOTICE of hearing: Preliminary Pretrial Conference set for 11/13/2023 at 09:15 AM via Zoom Video Conference before Magistrate Judge Kyle C. Dudek. Case Management Report due by 11/7/2023. Zoom instructions will be sent via separate email to counsel of record. (CGW)
Related: [-]
Thursday, September 28, 2023
11 11 misc Corporate Disclosure Statement Thu 09/28 10:18 AM
CORPORATE Disclosure Statement by Resort Lifestyle Communities, Inc. identifying Corporate Parent Bradford Square Retirement Community, LLC, a Nebraska Limited Liability Company for Resort Lifestyle Communities, Inc. (Holmes, Brandon) Modified on 9/28/2023 (CTR)
Related: [-]
10 10 answer Answer to Complaint Thu 09/28 10:12 AM
ANSWER and affirmative defenses to 1 Complaint by Resort Lifestyle Communities, Inc.(Holmes, Brandon) Modified on 9/28/2023 (CTR)
Related: [-]
9 9 notice Notice of Lead Counsel Designation Thu 09/28 10:03 AM
NOTICE of Lead Counsel Designation by Brandon Todd Holmes on behalf of Resort Lifestyle Communities, Inc. Lead Counsel: Brandon T. Holmes. (Holmes, Brandon) Modified on 9/28/2023 (CTR)
Related: [-]
Friday, September 15, 2023
8 8 service Summons returned executed Fri 09/15 11:25 AM
RETURN of service executed on 9/7/2023 by Ebron Edmonds as to Resort Lifestyle Communities, Inc.. (Yormak, Benjamin)
Related: [-]
Monday, August 21, 2023
7 7 order Civil Action Order Mon 08/21 10:54 AM
CIVIL Action Order. Signed by All Divisional Judges on 8/21/2023. (CGW)
Related: [-]
Friday, August 18, 2023
6 6 service Summons issued Fri 08/18 10:21 AM
SUMMONS issued as to Resort Lifestyle Communities, Inc.. (HAI)
Related: [-]
Thursday, August 17, 2023
5 5 utility Case Assigned/Reassigned Fri 08/18 8:30 AM
NEW CASE ASSIGNED to Judge John E. Steele and Magistrate Judge Kyle C. Dudek. New case number: 2:23-cv-636-JES-KCD. (ABC)
Related: [-]
4 4 notice Notice of Lead Counsel Designation Thu 08/17 11:33 PM
NOTICE of Lead Counsel Designation by Benjamin H. Yormak on behalf of Ebron Edmonds. Lead Counsel: Benjamin H. Yormak, Esq.. (Yormak, Benjamin)
Related: [-]
3 3 misc Certificate of Interested Persons and Corporate Disclosure Statement Thu 08/17 11:31 PM
CERTIFICATE of interested persons and corporate disclosure statement by Ebron Edmonds. (Yormak, Benjamin)
Related: [-]
2 2 notice Notice of a Related Action Thu 08/17 11:31 PM
NOTICE of a related action per Local Rule 1.07(c) by Ebron Edmonds. Related case(s): No (Yormak, Benjamin)
Related: [-]
1 1 cmp Complaint Thu 08/17 10:27 PM
COMPLAINT against Resort Lifestyle Communities, Inc. with Jury Demand (Filing fee $402 receipt number BFLMDC-21162383) filed by Ebron Edmonds.(Yormak, Benjamin)
Related: [-]
Att: 1 Civil Cover Sheet,
Att: 2 Proposed Summons