Virginia Eastern District Court
Judge:Rossie D Alston, Jr
Referred: Ivan D Davis
Case #: 1:23-cv-01076
Nature of Suit442 Civil Rights - Employment
Cause28:1332 Diversity-Employment Discrimination
Case Filed:Aug 15, 2023
Last checked: Sunday Feb 11, 2024 4:11 AM EST
Defendant
Stateside Associates, Inc.
Represented By
Joy Catherine Einstein
Shulman Rogers, P.A.
contact info
Plaintiff
Melissa Martin
1604 Eton Way
Crofton, MD 21114
Represented By
Martin P. Hogan
Hogan & Pritchard, PLLC
contact info
Nathaniel David Johnson
Employment Law Firm (md-Na)
contact info


Docket last updated: 9 hours ago
Tuesday, March 04, 2025
44 44 respm Reply to Response to Motion Tue 03/04 10:35 AM
REPLY to Response to Motion re40 MOTION to Dismiss for Failure to State a Claim Partial, Second Amended Complaint filed by Stateside Associates, Inc.. (Einstein, Joy)
Related: [-]
Wednesday, February 26, 2025
43 43 8 pgs respm Memorandum in Opposition Wed 02/26 10:37 AM
Memorandum in Opposition re40 MOTION to Dismiss for Failure to State a Claim Partial, Second Amended Complaint filed by Melissa Martin. (Hogan, Martin)
Related: [-]
Monday, February 24, 2025
utility 1 - Terminate Motion and R&R Deadlines/Hearings Mon 02/24 1:14 PM
*** Motion Hearing deadline terminated - Per RDA's chambers, motion set for 3/12/2025 will be decided on the papers; no oral argument will be heard (tarm, )
Related: [-]
Friday, February 14, 2025
utility Set Motion and R&R Deadlines/Hearings Fri 02/14 10:40 AM
Set Deadline as to40 MOTION to Dismiss for Failure to State a Claim Partial, Second Amended Complaint . Motion Hearing set for 3/12/2025 at 10:00 AM in Alexandria Courtroom 1000 before District Judge Rossie D. Alston, Jr. (triv)
Related: [-]
Thursday, February 13, 2025
42 42 misc Notice of Hearing Date Thu 02/13 3:43 PM
Notice of Hearing Date for Defendant's Partial Motion to Dismiss Second Amended Complaint set for March 12, 2025 re Notice of Correction (Einstein, Joy)
Related: [-]
misc Notice of Correction Thu 02/13 9:48 AM
Notice of Correction re40 MOTION to Dismiss for Failure to State a Claim Partial, Second Amended Complaint . The filing user has been notified to file a Notice of Hearing or Notice of Waiver of Oral Argument. (swil)
Related: [-]
Wednesday, February 12, 2025
41 41 5 pgs respm Memorandum in Support Wed 02/12 4:32 PM
Memorandum in Support re40 MOTION to Dismiss for Failure to State a Claim Partial, Second Amended Complaint filed by Stateside Associates, Inc.. (Einstein, Joy)
Related: [-]
40 40 motion Dismiss for Failure to State a Claim Wed 02/12 4:28 PM
MOTION to Dismiss for Failure to State a Claim Partial, Second Amended Complaint by Stateside Associates, Inc..(Einstein, Joy)
Related: [-]
Att: 1 Proposed Order Proposed Order to Motion
39 39 answer Answer to Complaint Wed 02/12 4:10 PM
ANSWER to Complaint Second Amended, and Affirmative Defenses by Stateside Associates, Inc..(Einstein, Joy)
Related: [-]
Wednesday, January 29, 2025
38 38 cmp Amended Complaint Wed 01/29 2:03 PM
AMENDED COMPLAINT Second against Stateside Associates, Inc., filed by Melissa Martin.(Hogan, Martin)
Related: [-]
Att: 1 Exhibit marked up version 2nd Amended Complaint
37 37 cmp Amended Complaint Wed 01/29 1:56 PM
AMENDED COMPLAINT Second against Melissa Martin, filed by Melissa Martin.(Hogan, Martin)
Related: [-]
Att: 1 Exhibit marked up version 2nd Amend Complaint
Wednesday, January 15, 2025
36 36 14 pgs order Memorandum Opinion Order Wed 01/15 1:34 PM
MEMORANDUM OPINION and ORDER that ORDERED that Defendant's Motion to Dismiss (Dkt. 20) is GRANTED; and it is FURTHER ORDERED that Counts IV-VI and Count VII to the extent it relies on the ADEA are DISMISSED pursuant to Plaintiff's stipulation; and it is FURTHER ORDERED that Count VIII is DISMISSED because Plaintiff has failed to state a claim; and it is FURTHER ORDERED that Plaintiff may file any Amended Complaint within FOURTEEN (14) DAYS of the entry of this Memorandum Opinion and Order to amend Count VIII. If Plaintiff fails to file an Amended Complaint by that date, the Court will assume that Plaintiff is foregoing constructive discharge claim and will issue a scheduling order; and it is FURTHER ORDERED that Plaintiff's First Motion for Leave (Dkt. 29) is WITHDRAWN pursuant to Plaintiff's Notice of Withdrawal (Dkt. 32); and it is FURTHER ORDERED that Defendant's Motion to Strike (Dkt. 31) is DENIED as MOOT (see Order for further details). Signed by District Judge Rossie D. Alston, Jr on 1/15/2025. (swil)
Related: [-]
Thursday, May 16, 2024
35 35 respoth Response Other Thu 05/16 2:10 PM
Response to33 NOTICE,34 Exhibit filed by Stateside Associates, Inc.. (Einstein, Joy)
Related: [-]
Wednesday, May 08, 2024
34 34 trial Exhibit Wed 05/08 9:14 PM
EXHIBIT Ex 1 to Notice Supp Authority by Melissa Martin.. (Hogan, Martin)
Related: [-]
33 33 notice Notice (other) Wed 05/08 9:09 PM
NOTICE by Melissa Martin of Supplemental Authority (Hogan, Martin)
Related: [-]
32 32 notice Notice (other) Wed 05/08 9:02 PM
NOTICE by Melissa Martin re29 First MOTION for Leave to File Amend Plaintiff Memo in Opposition to Def MTD ,30 Memorandum in Support (Hogan, Martin)
Related: [-]
Thursday, May 02, 2024
31 31 motion Strike Thu 05/02 3:07 PM
MOTION to Strike29 First MOTION for Leave to File Amend Plaintiff Memo in Opposition to Def MTD or in the Alternative, Opposition by Stateside Associates, Inc.. (Einstein, Joy)
Related: [-]
Thursday, April 25, 2024
30 30 2 pgs respm Memorandum in Support Thu 04/25 5:30 PM
Memorandum in Support re29 First MOTION for Leave to File Amend Plaintiff Memo in Opposition to Def MTD filed by Melissa Martin. (Hogan, Martin)
Related: [-]
29 29 4 pgs motion Leave to File Document Thu 04/25 5:28 PM
First MOTION for Leave to File Amend Plaintiff Memo in Opposition to Def MTD by Melissa Martin.(Hogan, Martin)
Related: [-]
Att: 1 Proposed Order
Thursday, April 11, 2024
28 28 respm Response in Support of Motion Thu 04/11 2:09 PM
RESPONSE in Support re20 MOTION to Dismiss Amended Complaint filed by Stateside Associates, Inc.. (Einstein, Joy)
Related: [-]
Friday, April 05, 2024
27 27 19 pgs respm Memorandum in Opposition Fri 04/05 1:24 PM
Memorandum in Opposition re20 MOTION to Dismiss Amended Complaint filed by Melissa Martin. (Hogan, Martin)
Related: [-]
Friday, March 22, 2024
26 26 1 pgs order Order on Motion for Extension of Time to File Response/Reply Fri 03/22 12:36 PM
ORDERED that the Motion is GRANTED. Plaintiff shall file her response to Defendant's Partial Motion to Dismiss Amended Complaint no later than April 5, 2024 in re25 First MOTION for Extension of Time to File Response/Reply. Signed by Magistrate Judge Ivan D. Davis on 3/22/2024. (swil)
Related: [-]
Thursday, March 21, 2024
25 25 motion Extension of Time to File Response/Reply Thu 03/21 12:40 PM
First MOTION for Extension of Time to File Response/Reply as to20 MOTION to Dismiss Amended Complaint by Melissa Martin.(Hogan, Martin)
Related: [-]
Att: 1 Proposed Order
utility 1 - Terminate Motion and R&R Deadlines/Hearings Thu 03/21 10:05 AM
*** Motion Hearing deadline terminated - Per RDA's chambers, motion set for 5/8/2024 will be decided on the papers; no oral argument will be heard (tarm)
Related: [-]
Wednesday, March 20, 2024
24 24 misc Notice of Hearing Date Wed 03/20 10:46 AM
Notice of Hearing Date May 8, 2024 re20 MOTION to Dismiss Amended Complaint (Einstein, Joy)
Related: [-]
utility Set Motion and R&R Deadlines/Hearings Wed 03/20 3:52 PM
Set Deadline as to20 MOTION to Dismiss Amended Complaint. Motion Hearing set for 5/8/2024 at 10:00 AM in Alexandria Courtroom 1000 before District Judge Rossie D. Alston Jr. (wgar, )
Related: [-]
Monday, March 18, 2024
23 23 12 pgs answer Answer to Complaint Mon 03/18 1:29 PM
ANSWER to Complaint with Affirmative Defenses by Stateside Associates, Inc..(Einstein, Joy)
Related: [-]
22 22 misc Notice of Hearing Date Mon 03/18 1:26 PM
Notice of Hearing Date re20 MOTION to Dismiss Amended Complaint ,21 Memorandum in Support (Einstein, Joy)
Related: [-]
21 21 12 pgs respm Memorandum in Support Mon 03/18 1:22 PM
Memorandum in Support re20 MOTION to Dismiss Amended Complaint filed by Stateside Associates, Inc..(Einstein, Joy)
Related: [-]
Att: 1 Proposed Order
20 20 2 pgs motion Dismiss Mon 03/18 1:19 PM
MOTION to Dismiss Amended Complaint by Stateside Associates, Inc.. (Einstein, Joy)
Related: [-]
19 19 2 pgs misc Financial Disclosure Statement Mon 03/18 1:10 PM
Financial Interest Disclosure Statement (Local Rule 7.1) by Stateside Associates, Inc.. (Einstein, Joy)
Related: [-]
misc Notice of Correction Mon 03/18 2:20 PM
Notice of Correction: The filing user has been notified to re notice the hearing for a Wednesday Docket in re20 MOTION to Dismiss Amended Complaint. (jlan)
Related: [-]
Monday, March 04, 2024
18 18 26 pgs cmp Amended Complaint Mon 03/04 1:57 PM
AMENDED COMPLAINT against Stateside Associates, Inc. filed by Melissa Martin.(swil)
Related: [-]
17 17 1 pgs order Order on Motion for Leave to File Mon 03/04 1:55 PM
ORDERED that the Motion is GRANTED. Plaintiff's Amended Complaint [Dkt. No. 10-1] is deemed the operative Complaint in this matter, and it shall be docketed as of the date of this Order in re10 First MOTION for Leave to File Amended Complaint. Signed by Magistrate Judge Ivan D. Davis on 3/4/2024. (swil)
Related: [-]
Thursday, February 01, 2024
16 16 1 pgs order Order on Motion for Pro hac vice Thu 02/01 12:19 PM
ORDER granting15 Motion for Pro hac vice Appointed Nathaniel David Johnson for Melissa Martin. Signed by District Judge Rossie D. Alston, Jr on 2/1/2024. (swil)
Related: [-]
Monday, January 29, 2024
15 15 motion Pro Hac Vice Mon 01/29 6:43 PM
First Motion to appear Pro Hac Vice by Nathaniel Johnson and Certification of Local Counsel Martin P Hogan Filing fee $ 75, receipt number AVAEDC-9333835. by Melissa Martin. (Hogan, Martin)
Related: [-]
Friday, January 26, 2024
14 14 notice Notice of Appearance Fri 01/26 3:36 PM
NOTICE of Appearance by Joy Catherine Einstein on behalf of Stateside Associates, Inc. (Einstein, Joy)
Related: [-]
13 13 notice Notice of Appearance Fri 01/26 1:22 PM
NOTICE of Appearance by Martin P. Hogan on behalf of Melissa Martin (Hogan, Martin)
Related: [-]
Tuesday, January 23, 2024
12 12 misc Waiver of Tue 01/23 6:27 PM
Waiver of Oral Argument Re Leave to Amend Complaint by Melissa Martin (Hogan, Martin)
Related: [-]
11 11 2 pgs respm Memorandum in Support Tue 01/23 6:23 PM
Memorandum in Support re10 First MOTION for Leave to File Amended Complaint filed by Melissa Martin. (Hogan, Martin)
Related: [-]
10 10 motion Leave to File Document Tue 01/23 6:20 PM
First MOTION for Leave to File Amended Complaint by Melissa Martin.(Hogan, Martin)
Related: [-]
Att: 1 Exhibit
Friday, January 12, 2024
9 9 service Affidavit of Service Fri 01/12 5:06 PM
AFFIDAVIT of Service on 01 12-2024 filed by Melissa Martin. (Hogan, Martin)
Related: [-]
Wednesday, January 03, 2024
8 8 service Summons Issued Wed 01/03 2:55 PM
Summons Issued as to Stateside Associates, Inc., NOTICE TO ATTORNEY: Please remove the headers and print two duplexed copies of the electronically issued summons for each Defendant. Please serve one copy of the summons and a copy of the Complaint upon each Defendant. Please ensure that your process server returns the service copy (executed or unexecuted) to your attention and electronically file it using the filing events, Summons Returned Executed or Summons Returned Unexecuted.(swil)
Related: [-]
Att: 1 Summons Notice
Tuesday, January 02, 2024
7 7 misc Proposed Summons Tue 01/02 2:57 PM
Proposed Summons re1 Complaint by Melissa Martin. (Hogan, Martin)
Related: [-]
Thursday, November 30, 2023
6 6 1 pgs order Order on Motion for Leave to File Thu 11/30 12:38 PM
ORDER granting3 First MOTION for Leave to File Serve Complaint. Signed by Magistrate Judge Ivan D. Davis on 11/30/2023. (swil)
Related: [-]
Tuesday, November 21, 2023
5 5 misc Waiver of Tue 11/21 7:16 PM
Waiver of re3 First MOTION for Leave to File Serve Complaint Notice of Waiver of Oral Argument by Melissa Martin (Hogan, Martin)
Related: [-]
4 4 respoth Brief in Support Tue 11/21 7:13 PM
Brief in Support to3 First MOTION for Leave to File Serve Complaint filed by Melissa Martin. (Hogan, Martin)
Related: [-]
Thursday, November 16, 2023
misc Notice of Correction Thu 11/16 3:08 PM
Notice of Correction re3 First MOTION for Leave to File Serve Complaint . The filing user has been notified to file a Notice of Hearing or Notice of Waiver of Oral Argument and to file the the Memorandum in Support separately. (swil)
Related: [-]
Wednesday, November 15, 2023
3 3 motion Leave to File Document Wed 11/15 4:31 PM
First MOTION for Leave to File Serve Complaint by Melissa Martin.(Hogan, Martin)
Related: [-]
Att: 1 Memorandum in Support of Motion
Tuesday, August 15, 2023
2 2 service Summons Issued Thu 08/17 3:04 PM
Summons Issued to be served by SPS as to Stateside Associates, Inc. (swil)
Related: [-]
1 1 cmp Complaint Thu 08/17 3:04 PM
COMPLAINT against Stateside Associates, Inc. ( Filing fee $ 402, receipt number 100003433.), filed by Melissa Martin.(swil)
Related: [-]
Att: 1 Civil Cover Sheet,
Att: 2 Receipt