California Central District Court
Judge:Josephine L Staton
Referred: Maria A Audero
Case #: 2:23-cv-06783
Nature of Suit830 Property Rights - Patent
Cause35:271 Patent Infringement
Case Filed:Aug 17, 2023
Terminated:Oct 26, 2023
Last checked: Tuesday Feb 13, 2024 12:28 AM PST
Defendant
Does
Defendant
Laforst Shoes, Inc.
Plaintiff
Skechers U.S.A. Inc.
Represented By
Michael Hurey
Kleinberg And Lerner LLP
contact info
Steven Junsuk Kim
Kleinberg And Lerner LLP
contact info
Marshall A Lerner
Kleinberg And Lerner LLP
contact info
Bradford E Mattes
Kleinberg And Lerner LLP
contact info
Plaintiff
Skechers U.S.A., Inc. II
Represented By
Michael Hurey
Kleinberg And Lerner LLP
contact info
Steven Junsuk Kim
Kleinberg And Lerner LLP
contact info
Marshall A Lerner
Kleinberg And Lerner LLP
contact info
Bradford E Mattes
Kleinberg And Lerner LLP
contact info


Docket last updated: 05/23/2025 11:59 PM PDT
Friday, October 27, 2023
18 18 misc Report of Determination of Patent/Trademark Action (CLOSE) (AO 120) Fri 10/27 9:31 AM
REPORT ON THE DETERMINATION OF AN ACTION Regarding a Patent or Trademark. (Closing). (jp)
Related: [-]
Att: 1 Judgment
Thursday, October 26, 2023
17 17 judgmentCV Judgment Fri 10/27 9:26 AM
JUDGMENT by Judge Josephine L. Staton is hereby entered in favor of Skechers and against Laforst on each one of Skechers five claims that Laforst infringed each one of the following five United States design patents owned by Skechers. Skechers and Laforst shall each bear their respective costs and attorney fees. The Court ORDERS as follows: Laforst and its officers, agents, employees, representatives, assigns, and attorneys and those in active concert or participation with Laforst who receive actual notice of this order, are enjoined. (MD JS-6, Case Terminated). See document for further information. (jp)
Related: [-]
Thursday, October 19, 2023
16 16 stip Judgment Thu 10/19 4:07 PM
STIPULATION for Judgment as to Entry of Judgment and Injunction against defendant Laforst Shoes, Inc. filed by plaintiff Skechers U.S.A. Inc., Skechers U.S.A., Inc. II.(Mattes, Bradford)
Related: [-]
Att: 1 Proposed Order Ex. 1 - Proposed Judgment and Injunction
Tuesday, September 26, 2023
15 15 2 pgs order Order Wed 09/27 4:49 PM
ORDER by Judge Josephine L. Staton, as follows: Skechers shall have thirty (30) days to either (1) finalize its settlement with Defendant Laforst Shoes and file a stipulated judgment and injunction, or (2) to file for a default judgment if a settlement has not been finalized by then and the complaint still has not been responded to by Defendant Laforst Shoes. Failure to do so shall result in the immediate dismissal of this case without further notice. (jp)
Related: [-]
14 14 textonly Generic Text Only Entry Tue 09/26 2:47 PM
TEXT ONLY ENTRY by Judge Josephine L. Staton. Counsel and/or the parties are advised that the Court has updated its procedures in civil cases, including procedures encouraging consent to the magistrate judge in ordinary civil cases; setting forth presumptive schedules for class certification motion briefing; simplifying the requirements for substituting named defendants for Doe defendants; clarifying requirements for submission of mandatory chambers copies of voluminous exhibits; substituting compliance with the Local Rule regarding limitations on the number of words in the parties briefing for the Courts previous page limitations on briefing; imposing further limitations on the number of words in reply briefs; updating the Courts procedures in the case of settlement, including procedures for orders imposing stays of proceedings, orders of dismissal, and retention of jurisdiction by the Court; imposing limitations on both the number of and the content of motions in limine; and clarifying trial exhibit preparation, including the requirement to prepare a separate binder of exhibits for each witness. These updates are found on the Courts procedures page, and/or the Courts Initial Standing Order and Civil Trial Order, attached thereto. IT IS SO ORDERED. THERE IS NO PDF DOCUMENT ASSOCIATED WITH THIS ENTRY. (cbr)
Related: [-]
Monday, September 18, 2023
13 13 misc Response Mon 09/18 4:29 PM
RESPONSE filed by Plaintiffs Skechers U.S.A. Inc., Skechers U.S.A., Inc. IIto Minutes of In Chambers Order/Directive - no proceeding held,,, Set/Reset Deadlines/Hearings,,12 (Mattes, Bradford)
Related: [-]
Att: 1 Proposed Order
Wednesday, September 13, 2023
12 12 order Minutes of In Chambers Order/Directive - no proceeding held ~Util - Set/Reset Deadlines/Hearings Wed 09/13 3:31 PM
MINUTE ORDER IN CHAMBERS by Judge Josephine L. Staton: ORDER TO SHOW CAUSE RE DISMISSAL FOR LACK OF PROSECUTION. The Court, on its own motion, hereby ORDERS plaintiff, to show cause in writing no later than September 20, 2023, why this action should not be dismissed for lack of prosecution. As an alternative to a written response by plaintiffs, the Court will consider the filing of one of the following, as an appropriate response to this OSC, on or before the above date: Answer to the Complaint; Request for Entry of Default; or Notice of Voluntary Dismissal (F.R.Civ.P. 41). The Order will stand submitted upon the filing of a responsive pleading or motion on or before the date upon which a response by plaintiffs is due. (lc)
Related: [-]
Thursday, August 24, 2023
11 11 service Service of Summons and Complaint Returned Executed (21 days) Thu 08/24 7:03 PM
PROOF OF SERVICE Executed by Plaintiff Skechers U.S.A. Inc., Skechers U.S.A., Inc. II, upon Defendant Laforst Shoes, Inc. served on 8/18/2023, answer due 9/8/2023. Service of the Summons and Complaint were executed upon Patrick Chow, Agent for Service of Process in compliance with Federal Rules of Civil Procedure by substituted service on a domestic corporation, unincorporated association, or public entity and by also mailing a copy (Lerner, Marshall)
Related: [-]
10 10 order Initial Order upon Filing of Complaint - form only Thu 08/24 10:11 AM
INITIAL STANDING ORDER FOR CIVIL CASES ASSIGNED TO JUDGE JOSEPHINE L. STATON. (gga)
Related: [-]
Friday, August 18, 2023
9 9 service Summons Issued (Attorney Civil Case Opening) Fri 08/18 1:15 PM
21 DAY Summons Issued re Complaint (Attorney Civil Case Opening),1 as to Defendant Laforst Shoes, Inc. (ghap)
Related: [-]
8 8 notice Notice to Counsel Re: Consent to Proceed Before a US Magistrate Judge - optional html form Fri 08/18 1:00 PM
Notice to Counsel Re Consent to Proceed Before a United States Magistrate Judge. (ghap)
Related: [-]
7 7 adr Notice to Parties of Court-Directed ADR Program (ADR-8) - optional html form Fri 08/18 1:00 PM
NOTICE TO PARTIES OF COURT-DIRECTED ADR PROGRAM filed. (ghap)
Related: [-]
6 6 notice Notice of Assignment to United States Judges (CV-18) - optional html form Fri 08/18 12:59 PM
NOTICE OF ASSIGNMENT to District Judge Josephine L. Staton and Magistrate Judge Maria A. Audero. (ghap)
Related: [-]
Thursday, August 17, 2023
5 5 cmp Complaint (Attorney Civil Case Opening) Thu 08/17 7:42 PM
COMPLAINT with filing fee previously paid (402.00 paid on 08/17/2023,, filed by plaintiff Skechers U.S.A. Inc..(Hurey, Michael) (Entered: 08/17/2023)
Related: [-]
4 4 cmp Complaint (Attorney Civil Case Opening) Thu 08/17 7:41 PM
COMPLAINT with filing fee previously paid (402.00 paid on 08/17/2023,, filed by plaintiff Skechers U.S.A. Inc..(Hurey, Michael) (Entered: 08/17/2023)
Related: [-]
3 3 cmp Complaint (Attorney Civil Case Opening) Thu 08/17 7:38 PM
COMPLAINT with filing fee previously paid (402.00 paid on 08/17/2023,, filed by plaintiff Skechers U.S.A. Inc..(Hurey, Michael) (Entered: 08/17/2023)
Related: [-]
2 2 cmp Complaint (Attorney Civil Case Opening) Thu 08/17 7:35 PM
COMPLAINT with filing fee previously paid (402.00 paid on 08/17/2023,, filed by plaintiff Skechers U.S.A. Inc..(Hurey, Michael) (Entered: 08/17/2023)
Related: [-]
1 1 15 pgs cmp Complaint (Attorney Civil Case Opening) Thu 08/17 7:21 PM
COMPLAINT Receipt No: ACACDC-35879612 - Fee: $402, filed by plaintiff Skechers U.S.A. Inc.. (Attorney Michael Hurey added to party Skechers U.S.A. Inc.(pty:bkmov))(Hurey, Michael)
Related: [-]
Att: 1 Exhibit 1 to Complaint,
Att: 2 Exhibit 2 to Complaint,
Att: 3 Exhibit 3 to Complaint,
Att: 4 Exhibit 4 to Complaint,
Att: 5 Exhibit 5 to Complaint