Virginia Eastern District Court
Case #: 3:23-cr-00104
Case Filed:Aug 15, 2023
Terminated:Apr 08, 2024
Last checked: Friday Aug 18, 2023 3:47 AM EDT
Defendant
Juan Francisco Alvarez (2)
Represented By
Nia Ayanna Vidal
Office Of The Federal Public Defender (richmond)
contact info
Defendant
Marcos Abraham Cousino-Martorell (3)
Represented By
Fernando Groene
Fernando Groene, P. C.
contact info
Defendant
Felipe de Jesus Campos Salazar (1)
Plaintiff
USA
Represented By
Olivia L. Norman
United States Attorney'S Office
contact info


Docket last updated: 11/05/2024 5:11 PM EST
Thursday, July 13, 2023
1 1 CRIMINAL COMPLAINT as to Juan Francisco Alvarez. (mful) [3:23-mj-00049-SLS]
Related: [-]
Att: 1 Affidavit
1 1 CRIMINAL COMPLAINT as to Marcos Abraham Cousino-Martorell. (mful) [3:23-mj-00104-SLS]
Related: [-]
Att: 1 Affidavit
2 2 Arrest Warrant Issued as to Juan Francisco Alvarez. (mful) [3:23-mj-00049-SLS]
Related: [-]
2 2 Arrest Warrant Issued as to Marcos Abraham Cousino-Martorell. (mful) [3:23-mj-00104-SLS]
Related: [-]
Thursday, July 20, 2023
Arrest of Juan Francisco Alvarez.(mful) [3:23-mj-00049-SLS]
Related: [-]
ORAL ORDER APPOINTING FEDERAL PUBLIC DEFENDER as to Juan Francisco Alvarez. (mful) [3:23-mj-00049-SLS]
Related: [-]
Arrest of Marcos Abraham Cousino-Martorell.(mful) [3:23-mj-00104-SLS]
Related: [-]
Federal Public Defender Office is conflicted out of this case. Clerk's Office will appoint CJA Attorney for Marcos Abraham Cousino-Martorell (mful) [3:23-mj-00104-SLS]
Related: [-]
CJA 20 as to Marcos Abraham Cousino-Martorell: Appointment of Attorney Fernando Groene AS OF 7/18/23 . (mful) [3:23-mj-00104-SLS]
Related: [-]
4 4 Arrest Warrant Returned Executed on 7/20/23 in case as to Juan Francisco Alvarez. (mful) [3:23-mj-00049-SLS]
Related: [-]
4 4 Arrest Warrant Returned Executed on 7/20/23 in case as to Marcos Abraham Cousino-Martorell. (mful) [3:23-mj-00104-SLS]
Related: [-]
5 5 Minute Entry for proceedings held before Magistrate Judge Summer L. Speight (Patricia Michelsen-King, Int): Initial Appearance as to Juan Francisco Alvarez held on 7/20/2023; Govt summarized charges; Deft advised of rights; Deft submitted financial affidavit and requested counsel - Granted; AFPD Nia Ayanna Vidal appointed; Govt seeking detention - Granted; Deft request to continue hearing outside of 3 day rule - Granted for good cause; Preliminary and Detention Hearing set for 7/27/2023 at 2:15 PM in Richmond Courtroom 5400 before Magistrate Judge Summer L. Speight; Deft remanded.(FTR)(mful) [3:23-mj-00049-SLS]
Related: [-]
5 5 Minute Entry for proceedings held before Magistrate Judge Summer L. Speight (Patricia Michelsen-King, Int): Initial Appearance as to Marcos Abraham Cousino-Martorell held on 7/20/2023; Govt summarized charges; Deft advised of rights; Deft requested counsel and was questioned about his financial status; Deft found to be eligible for court appointed counsel and CJA attorney formally appointed; Govt seeking detention - Granted; Deft requested to set hearings outside of normal 3 days - Granted, good cause found; Preliminary and Detention Hearing set for 7/27/2023 at 9:30 AM in Richmond Courtroom 5400 before Magistrate Judge Summer L. Speight; Deft remanded.(FTR)(mful) [3:23-mj-00104-SLS]
Related: [-]
6 6 CJA 23 Financial Affidavit by Juan Francisco Alvarez.(mful) [3:23-mj-00049-SLS]
Related: [-]
6 6 Temporary Detention Order as to Marcos Abraham Cousino-Martorell. Signed by Magistrate Judge Summer L. Speight on 7/20/23. (mful) [3:23-mj-00104-SLS]
Related: [-]
7 7 Temporary Detention Order as to Juan Francisco Alvarez. Signed by Magistrate Judge Summer L. Speight on 7/20/23. (mful) [3:23-mj-00049-SLS]
Related: [-]
Friday, July 21, 2023
Interpreter Information: Patricia Michelsen-King is the Interpreter. Spanish is the type of language required. Appointment is set for July 27, 2023 @ 2:15 PM for a Preliminary and Detention Hearing. (lgar, ) [3:23-mj-00049-SLS]
Related: [-]
Interpreter Information: Patricia Michelsen-King is the Interpreter. Spanish is the type of language required. Appointment is set for July 27, 2023 @ 9:30 AM for a Preliminary and Detention Hearing. (lgar, ) [3:23-mj-00104-SLS]
Related: [-]
Tuesday, July 25, 2023
7 7 Pretrial Services Bond REPORT (Initial Pretrial Services Bond Report) (SEALED - government and defense counsel) as to Marcos Abraham Cousino-Martorell. (taylor, sheree) [3:23-mj-00104-SLS]
Related: [-]
8 8 Pretrial Services Bond REPORT (Initial Pretrial Services Bond Report) (SEALED - government and defense counsel) as to Juan Francisco Alvarez. (taylor, sheree) [3:23-mj-00049-SLS]
Related: [-]
Thursday, July 27, 2023
8 8 Minute Entry for proceedings held before Magistrate Judge Summer L. Speight (Patricia Michelsen-King Interpreting): Preliminary and Detention Hearings as to Marcos Abraham Cousino-Martorell held on 7/27/2023; Court reminded counsel of prosecutorial obligations as required under Rule 5(f); CJA Fernando Groene previously appointed, but financial affidavit reviewed and filed for the record; Govt adduced evidence at preliminary hearing; Arguments heard; Findings stated from the bench; Probable cause found; Arguments heard on detention; Findings stated from the bench; Deft held without bond pending further proceedings; Deft remanded. (FTR.)(jsau, ) [3:23-mj-00104-SLS]
Related: [-]
9 9 Minute Entry for proceedings held before Magistrate Judge Summer L. Speight (Patricia Michelsen-King Interpreting): Preliminary and Detention Hearings as to Juan Francisco Alvarez held on 7/27/2023; Court reminded counsel of prosecutorial obligations as required under Rule 5(f); Deft submitted written waiver of Preliminary Hearing; Probable Cause found; Deft submitted Written waiver of Detention hearing; Deft held without bond pending further proceedings; Deft remanded. (FTR.)(jsau, ) [3:23-mj-00049-SLS]
Related: [-]
9 9 CJA 23 Financial Affidavit by Marcos Abraham Cousino-Martorell (jsau, ) [3:23-mj-00104-SLS]
Related: [-]
10 10 WAIVER of Preliminary Hearing by Juan Francisco Alvarez (jsau, ) [3:23-mj-00049-SLS]
Related: [-]
10 10 ORDER as to Marcos Abraham Cousino-Martorell. This matter comes before the Court on its own initiative. In accord with the Due Process Protections Act and Rule 5(f) of the Federal Rules of Criminal Procedure, this Court CONFIRMS the United States obligation to disclose to the defendant all exculpatory evidence, that is, evidence that favors the defendant or casts doubt on the United States case, as required by Brady v. Maryland, 373 U.S. 83 (1963) and its progeny, and hereby ORDERS the United States to do so. Failure to disclose exculpatory evidence in a timely manner may result in serious consequences, including, but not limited to, exclusion of evidence, adverse jury instructions, dismissal of charges, contempt proceedings, disciplinary action, or sanctions by the Court. Having given counsel the oral admonition required by the Due Process Protection Act, this Order serves as the reminder of prosecutorial obligation and duties in accordance with Rule 5(f) and the Eastern District of Virginia Standing Order concerning the same. Signed by Magistrate Judge Summer L. Speight on 7/27/23. (jsau, ) [3:23-mj-00104-SLS]
Related: [-]
11 11 WAIVER of Detention hearing by Juan Francisco Alvarez (jsau, ) [3:23-mj-00049-SLS]
Related: [-]
11 11 ORDER OF DETENTION as to Marcos Abraham Cousino-Martorell. Signed by Magistrate Judge Summer L. Speight on 7/27/23. (jsau, ) [3:23-mj-00104-SLS]
Related: [-]
12 12 ORDER as to Juan Francisco Alvarez. This matter comes before the Court on its own initiative. In accord with the Due Process Protections Act and Rule 5(f) of the Federal Rules of Criminal Procedure, this Court CONFIRMS the United States obligation to disclose to the defendant all exculpatory evidence, that is, evidence that favors the defendant or casts doubt on the United States case, as required by Brady v. Maryland, 373 U.S. 83 (1963) and its progeny, and hereby ORDERS the United States to do so. Failure to disclose exculpatory evidence in a timely manner may result in serious consequences, including, but not limited to, exclusion of evidence, adverse jury instructions, dismissal of charges, contempt proceedings, disciplinary action, or sanctions by the Court. Having given counsel the oral admonition required by the Due Process Protection Act, this Order serves as the reminder of prosecutorial obligation and duties in accordance with Rule 5(f) and the Eastern District of Virginia Standing Order concerning the same. Signed by Magistrate Judge Summer L. Speight on 7/27/23. (jsau, ) [3:23-mj-00049-SLS]
Related: [-]
13 13 ORDER OF DETENTION as to Juan Francisco Alvarez. Signed by Magistrate Judge Summer L. Speight on 7/27/23. (jsau, ) [3:23-mj-00049-SLS]
Related: [-]
Monday, August 07, 2023
14 14 Addendum to Pretrial Services Bond Report (Sealed Document) as to Juan Francisco Alvarez (Geurts, Sami) [3:23-mj-00049-SLS]
Related: [-]
Wednesday, August 09, 2023
15 15 MOTION to Reopen Detention Hearing by Juan Francisco Alvarez. (Vidal, Nia) [3:23-mj-00049-SLS]
Related: [-]
Monday, August 14, 2023
Motion Hearing set for 8/17/2023 at 11:30 AM in Richmond Courtroom 5400 before Magistrate Judge Summer L. Speight. (mful) [3:23-mj-00049-SLS]
Related: [-]
Tuesday, August 15, 2023
Interpreter Information: Patricia Michelen-King is the Interpreter. Spanish is the type of language required. Appointment is set for August 17, 2023 @ 11:30 AM for a Hearing (lgar, ) [3:23-mj-00049-SLS]
Related: [-]
16 16 3 pgs INDICTMENT as to Felipe de Jesus Campos Salazar (1) counts 1 & 2, Juan Francisco Alvarez (2) counts 1 & 2, Marcos Abraham Cousino-Martorell (3) counts 1 & 2. (adun, )
Related: [-]
18 18 1 pgs Minute entry as to Felipe de Jesus Campos Salazar, Juan Francisco Alvarez, Marcos Abraham Cousino-Martorell. Before Magistrate Judge Speight. Appearances: Ellen Hubbard, AUSA and Joshua Delaughter, Court Reporter. Indictment, a true bill, returned before a Magistrate Judge at Richmond. Government's motion for the issuance of arrest warrant as to Salazar, heard and so ordered. Defendants Alvarez and Cousino-Martorell are currently in federal custody; no warrant to issue at this time. (adun, )
Related: [-]
27 27 INDICTMENT as to Felipe de Jesus Campos Salazar (1) counts 1 & 2, Juan Francisco Alvarez (2) counts 1 & 2, Marcos Abraham Cousino-Martorell (3) counts 1 & 2. (adun, )
Related: [-]
29 29 Minute entry as to Felipe de Jesus Campos Salazar, Juan Francisco Alvarez, Marcos Abraham Cousino-Martorell. Before Magistrate Judge Speight. Appearances: Ellen Hubbard, AUSA and Joshua Delaughter, Court Reporter. Indictment, a true bill, returned before a Magistrate Judge at Richmond. Government's motion for the issuance of arrest warrant as to Salazar, heard and so ordered. Defendants Alvarez and Cousino-Martorell are currently in federal custody; no warrant to issue at this time. (adun, )
Related: [-]